BODDIE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00417-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LILLIE M. BODDIE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darshpaul Singh Padda +1 202 307 0282
Office COFC
Filed 6/23/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/18/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated July 5, 1996 affirmed [13-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [16-1] appeal by LILLIE M. BODDIE. CAFC NUMBER: 96-5060. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/7/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by LILLIE M. BODDIE. Copy to USA, Judge Horn and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 040875. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: 1/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER entered directing the return unfiled plaintiff's submission. Plaintiff's case in this court is closed ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER returning plaintiff's motion for leaveto proceed as an in propria persona litigant [case closed] (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Judgment*
            JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint for lack of jurisdiction. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 Terminated Case
              Case closed. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                UNPUBLISHED DECISION dismissing [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  CASE assigned to Judge Marian B. Horn. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/29/95) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until January 5, 1996). Response due: 12/18/95. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/1/95 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/26/1995, Terminated: 11/17/1995 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/20/95) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until 12/1/95). (FE) Modified on 11/16/1995
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [3-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 10/23/95 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of related cases by LILLIE M. BODDIE. Service: 9/5/95 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 Terminated:
                              MOTION by LILLIE M. BODDIE (Service: 9/5/95) for depositions and discovery . Response due: 9/22/95 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 Terminated:
                                MOTION by LILLIE M. BODDIE (Service: 9/5/95) to proceed as a veteran and a petitioner . Response due: 9/22/95 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by LILLIE M. BODDIE (Service: 9/5/95) to curtail Defendant's enlargement of time . Response due: 9/22/95 (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995, Terminated: 9/19/1995 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/17/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to October 23, 1995]. Response due: 9/5/95 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/10/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Darshpaul Singh Padda. Service: 7/6/95 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/23/1995, Entered: 6/26/1995 Terminated:
                                        COMPLAINT FILED. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 39549. Answer due on 8/22/95. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/1995, Entered: 6/26/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?