DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00427-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dollar Bank, Fsb, Plaintiff

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ho Sik Shin
Office COFC
Filed 6/27/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/20/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 65 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank 64 Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Certified Transcript to Attorney
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 63 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998
      JUDGMENT entered that plaintiff recover of and from the United States, the sum of $41,500,000.00. Each party shall bear its own attorney fees, costs and expenses. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 62 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Stipulation
          JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (LD) Modified on 07/20/1998
            LREF
            Blank 61 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. to [59-1] response by USA. Service: 5/14/98 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 60 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ho Sik Shin. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 59 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by USA to [58-1] response [proposed order] by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 58 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                  RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. to [54-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 57 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Response to Order to Show Cause
                    CORRECTED COPY of Response to order to show cause by USA. Service: 2/24/98 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 56 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [55-1] motion for Leave to File a Corrected Brief. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 55 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998, Terminated: 3/4/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/24/98 ) for Leave to File a Corrected Brief. Response due: 3/13/98 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 54 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                          RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 53 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                            Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC) Modified on 02/24/1998
                              LREF
                              Blank 52 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY by USA to response to [49-1] cross motion . Service: 6/25/97 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 51 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 5/12/97 ) to [49-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 5/29/97. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 50 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Memorandum
                                  Supplemental filing pursuant to Paragraph 5.d. of the Omnibus Case Management Order by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 4/10/97 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 49 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Terminated:
                                    CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 3/3/97) and RESPONSE to [43-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. Response due: 4/3/97 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Deadline updated; Response to [49-1] cross motion reset to 4/3/97 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 48 Filed: 2/27/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 2/27/97) to [47-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 3/13/97 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 47 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/24/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment until 3/3/97. Response due: 3/13/97. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 46 Filed: 2/14/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 Terminated:
                                            RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 2/14/97 ) to [45-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file initial response. Reply due: 3/3/97 (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 45 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/11/1997 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 2/6/97 ) to Extend Time within which to file initial response , (until 2/24/97). Response due: 2/24/97 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 44 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 1/23/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. to response to [37-1] motion for Leave to File to file proposed pretrial order . Service: 12/17/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 12/10/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service BY HAND: 12/10/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability . Response due: 1/7/97 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Melida Narcisa Hodgson. Service: 11/1/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service : 8/21/96) for Leave to File supplement the response to motion to adopt case management procedures . Response due: 9/9/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Continuing stay to 8/26/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 8/14/96) to [32-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 8/26/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File to file proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE [Preliminary report of plaintiff re: the effect on of this case of the WINSTAR decision] by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. to [31-2] order. Service: 8/9/96. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [31-2] order. Service: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Staying this case , until August 19, 1996 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [32-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER set Brief [parties' preliminary report] deadline to 8/9/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Agnes Marie Brown (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service : 5/20/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney John Curry Millian for DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. Added Paul Blankenstein . (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996, Terminated: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 5/13/96) for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/30/96. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. to [21-2] order. Service: 4/29/96 (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996, Terminated: 5/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to defendant's response to court's 3/1/96 order and reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/29/96 (signed Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/22/1996, Terminated: 4/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 4/17/96) to Extend Time within which to respond to defendant's response to court's 3/1/96 order [to 4/29/96. Response due: 5/6/96. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER set Notice of Compliance (plaintiff's response to defendant's response to 3/1/96 Order) deadline to 4/19/96 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [19-2] order Service: 4/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER Staying pending Winstar decision (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B., USA. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 2/26/96 ( signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Staying proceedings until writ of cert in WINSTAR with defendant to respond to complaint within twenty days of the termination of the stay. (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/26/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 10/17/95 ) to [8-1] motion to Stay of proceedings re writ certiorari (WINSTAR), filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service: 10/17/95 ) to [10-1] motion for Clarification of motion filed 9/25/95. Reply due: 10/30/95. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File, one day late, response to motion for clarification ( signed by Judge Diane G. Syplot ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995, Terminated: 10/25/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by DOLLAR BANK, F.S.B. (Service : 10/17/95 ) for Leave to File, one day late, response to motion for clarification Response due: 11/3/95 (DS)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice stating whether or not opposing a stay of proceedings int his case (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/95) for Clarification of motion filed 9/25/95 . Response due: 10/16/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/27/1995, Entered: 10/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Stay of proceedings re writ certiorari (WINSTAR) (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 9/28/1995, Terminated: 9/27/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/25/95 ) to Stay of proceedings re writ certiorari (WINSTAR) . Response due: 10/12/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Agnes Marie Brown Service: 9/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 Order
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 9/27/95 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995, Terminated: 8/28/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/25/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to September 27, 1995]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER ENTERED (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Kent Olivier. Service: 7/11/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/27/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/1995, Entered: 6/29/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39563. Answer due on 8/28/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?