CANONICA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00437-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEXANDER F. CANONICA, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hillary Adrienne Stern +1 202 616 0177 hillary.stern@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/3/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/30/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, in part for lack of jurisdiction and in part for failure to state a claim upon which relief can ber granted. Each party shall bear its own costs. (Signed by Clerk.) Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [9-1] defendant's motion, filed November 6, 1995, to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and directing the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendant dismissing the complaint, in part for lack of jurisdiction and in part for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Each party shall bear its own costs. (Signed by Judge James T. Turner.) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER for supplemetation of record ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/5/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
          REPLY by ALEXANDER F. CANONICA to [21-1] response (to Court's 6/27/96 Order) by USA [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 9/27/96. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by USA to [17-2] order. Service: 8/28/96. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 8/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to court order dated 6/27/96 and reset Additional Documents [supplementation to order to dismiss] due: 8/28/96 for USA (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996, Terminated: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/26/96) to Extend Time to respond to court order dated 6/27/96 (to August 28, 1996). Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                  NOTICE of change of address by Hillary Adrienne Stern (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER set Additional Documents [supplementation to motion to dismiss] due: 7/29/96 for USA [plaintiff's response within the time limits provided in RCFC 83.2(c)] (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                      RESPONSE by ALEXANDER F. CANONICA to [15-1] motion reply by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/14/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by USA to response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 2/28/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/28/96 for [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996, Terminated: 1/23/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/17/96) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss [to February 28, 1996]. Response due: 2/5/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by ALEXANDER F. CANONICA (Service: 1/5/96 ) to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 1/22/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss and Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 1/5/96 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995, Terminated: 12/11/1995 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by ALEXANDER F. CANONICA (Service: 12/6/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [to January 5, 1996]. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/6/95) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Response due: 12/7/95 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to answer complaint and reset Answer deadline to 11/6/95 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995, Terminated: 10/6/1995 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/5/95) to Extend Time to answer complaint until 11/6/95. Response due: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and resetting Answer deadline to 10/5/95 (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995, Terminated: 9/8/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/5/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until October 5, 1995 filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER advising parties of special procedures to facilitate discovery, conserve resources and expedite disposition of case (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Hillary Adrienne Stern. Service : 7/24/95 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39594. Answer due on 9/1/95. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/3/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?