FIRST FEDERAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00464-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 1001 HOLDING, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
Charter One Bank, NA Charter One Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "CHARTER ONE BANK, F.S.B."

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo First Federal Of Michigan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo FIRSTFED MICHIGAN CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Alan Levitt +1 202 307 0309 david.levitt@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/20/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/4/2002
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
195-cv-00528-LAS None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 59 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN, USA, CHARTER ONE BANK . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 58 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY by CHARTER ONE BANK to response to [51-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract regarding the Willoughby and Home acquisitions. Service: 7/23/02. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 57 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [54-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 56 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by CHARTER ONE BANK to response to [54-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. Service: 7/16/02. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 55 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/11/02) to [54-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. Reply due: 7/25/02. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 54 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002, Terminated: 7/23/2002 Terminated:
              MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL (Service: 7/10/02) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 9/9/02. Response due: 7/29/02. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 53 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/10/02) to [51-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract regarding the Willoughby and Home acquisitions. Reply due: 7/29/02. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 51 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 7/11/2002 Terminated:
                    MOTION by CHARTER ONE BANK (Service: 5/4/99) for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract regarding the Willoughby and Home acquisitions , filed with a one volume appendix in support. Response due: 6/4/99. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 50 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CHARTER ONE BANK. Service: 5/4/99. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 49 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN, CHARTER ONE BANK. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 48 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                          See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 47 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN, CHARTER ONE BANK. Service: 4/1/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 46 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery Subject to Extension of Opt-Out Deadline by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN, CHARTER ONE BANK. Service: 12/31/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 45 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 44 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 Terminated:
                                  RESPONSE by CHARTER ONE BANK to [43-1] notice by USA. Service: 8/21/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 43 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority with the Court by USA. Service: 8/7/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 42 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by CHARTER ONE BANK (Service: 7/30/98 ) to [41-1] motion to Stay proceedings upon Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment in this case until the case enters discovery. Reply due: 8/14/98. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 41 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/13/98 ) to Stay proceedings upon Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment in this case until the case enters discovery. Response due: 7/30/98 (JT) Modified on 07/16/1998
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 40 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Memorandum
                                          SURREPLY by USA re: [39-1] response by FIRST FEDERAL. Service: 5/22/98 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 39 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Terminated:
                                            RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL to [38-1] response by USA Service: 5/15/98 (AB)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 38 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Terminated:
                                              RESPONSE by USA to [37-1] memorandum by CHARTER ONE BANK, FIRSTFED MICHIGAN, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRST FEDERAL. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 37 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Memorandum
                                                MEMORANDUM by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN, CHARTER ONE BANK in support of entry of proposed orders. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER re: (1) Reply to Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed in case 95-528 C, by 4/27/98; and (2) Response to show cause order by 6/26/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                    Reply to [29-1] response by CHARTER ONE BANK to Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment (Filed in 95-528). Service: 3/11/98 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [30-1] motion to Extend Time to file its Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (re: 95-528 C). Reset Defendant's Reply Brief deadline to 3/27/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/26/1998
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                        RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in NO. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                          Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA. Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN (Service: 12/17/97 ) to [30-1] motion to Extend Time to file its Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/7/98. [Filed by leave of the Judge.] (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997, Terminated: 2/26/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/1/97 ) to Extend Time to file its Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment [to March 31, 1998]. filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/18/97 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 10/15/1997, Entered: 10/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by CHARTER ONE BANK to cross-motion for summary judgment filed in 95-528C. Service: 10/15/97 (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/15/1997, Entered: 10/24/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Deadline updated; set Brief deadline to 12/1/97 for defendant's reply brief re: cross-motion for summary judgment filed in 95-528C (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Consolidate this case with No. 95-528C. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                      Consolidated Lead Case (DS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 9/4/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997, Terminated: 9/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL (Service : 9/4/97 ) to Consolidate this case with No. 95-528C. (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Alan Levitt Service : 8/8/97 (CDC)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/19/96) for Leave to File Proposed Pretrial Order . Response due: 9/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion to adopt specialized case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/25/96. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/1/96 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Status Report
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN. Service: 4/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Status Report
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 4/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/25/96. (HW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                    Deadline updated; joint Status Report deadline to 4/15/96 . (HW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        CORRECTED STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 3/25/96, a joint status report by April 15, 1996 and staying case proceedings pending decision in Winstar (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 3/25/96, a joint status report by April 15, 1996 and staying proceedings pending decision in Winstar (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN. Service by hand: 2/15/96. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/96) reentry of stay of proceedings . Response due: 3/4/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending decision in Winstar, with stay to expire 10 days after Supreme Court decides whether to grant or deny writ of certiorari, and directing defendant to respond to the complaint by 12/19/95 if a petition for writ has not been filed by November 28, 1995 (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL (Service: 9/20/95) to [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending decision in Winstar. Reply due: 10/2/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for a Stay of Proceedings Response to [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending decision in Winstar reset to 9/21/95 (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995, Terminated: 9/13/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL, 1001 HOLDING, INC., FIRSTFED MICHIGAN (Service : 9/11/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion for a Stay of Proceedings until 9/21/95. Response due: 9/28/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995, Terminated: 9/22/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/25/95) to Stay proceedings pending decision in Winstar . Response due: 9/11/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos. Service: 8/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39685. Answer due on 9/18/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?