ASTORIA FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00468-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Astoria Federal Savings And Loan Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Eisenhart +1 202 261 3306 +1 202 261 3333 feisenhart@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Hugh Roberson +1 202 353 7972 +1 202 514 8640 john.roberson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/21/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 3/10/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '08-5051'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (251) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 234 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
CAFC Case Number 08-5051 for [231] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 233 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $16,042,887.00, consisting of $14,611,157.00 in expectancy damages and $1,431,730.00 in "wounded bank" damages. Costs are awarded to plaintiff. (lld)
      LREF
      Legal Document 232 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
      RESPONSE to [230] MOTION for Clarification, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Reply due by 3/24/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Eisenhart, Frank)
        LREF
        Legal Document 231 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008
        NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 230 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008
          MOTION for Clarification, filed by USA.Response due by 3/24/2008.(Roberson, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 229 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
            Cumulative Index (pages 1-50) for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 19, 2007 through June 6, 2007. Filed with plaintiff and defendant exhibits. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (dw1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 228 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Court Filing
              This Opinion is PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                LREF
                Legal Document 227 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                RESPONSE to [226] Order of the Court dated December 26, 2007, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 9A Revised 12-07.pdf# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 9B Revised 12-07.pdf)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 226 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit exact calculations for Dr. Kaplan's Exhibits 9A and 9B. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 225 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-129) held on November 2, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 224 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Court Filing
                      The Court will hear closing arguments on Friday, November 2, 2007 at 2:00 PM at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W., Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 223 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                        POST TRIAL BRIEF Reply, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 222 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                          POST TRIAL BRIEF (Reply), filed by USA. (Yerawadekar, Sameer)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 221 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                            NOTICE, filed by USA re [220] Post Trial Brief Defendant's Notice of Filing of Post Trial Memorandum of Fact and Law on CD-ROM (Roberson, John)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 220 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                              POST TRIAL BRIEF Defendant's Post Trial Memorandum of Facts and Law, filed by USA. (Roberson, John)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 219 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 218 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                  Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 217 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying [216] Motion to Compel Discovery Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mon)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 216 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007, Terminated: 7/17/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice of Status of Its Search For Evidence, Including Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice of Status of Its Search For Evidence, Including Plaintiff's Motion to Compel# (2) Exhibit March 21, 1990 Letter (PX 2000)# (3) Exhibit Excerpt from the May 25, 2007 Transcript# (4) Exhibit Portion of June 6, 2007 hearing transcript# (5) Exhibit Excerpt from Mr. Dionne's testimony in the LISB case)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 215 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                        NOTICE, filed by USA of the Status of Defendant's Search for Evidence (Roberson, John)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 214 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                                          Exhibit List Joint Admitted Exhibit List, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # (1) Joint Admitted Exhibit List)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 213 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 5864-5886) held on June 6, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 212 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                              POST TRIAL ORDER: Post Trial Briefs due 8/6/2007. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mo'n)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/6/2007. (vp1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/29/2007. (vp1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 211 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 5819-5863) held on May 29, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 210 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 4821-5818) held on May 21, 2007 through May 25, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 209 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 3648-4820) held on May 14, 2007 through May 18, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 208 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings
                                                          MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings, filed by USA.Response due by 6/15/2007.(Yerawadekar, Sameer)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 207 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2615-3647) held on May 7, 2007 through May 11, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 206 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1547-2614) held on April 30, 2007 through May 4, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/16/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 205 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007
                                                                  RESPONSE to [204] Motion in Limine, to Preclude Dr. Donald Kaplan's Expert Report, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 204 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                    MOTION in Limine to exclude new expert disclosures, filed by USA.Response due by 5/18/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exh. 1 part 1# (2) Exh. 1 part 2# (3) Exh. 1 part 3# (4) Exh. 1 part 4# (5) Exh. 1 part 5# (6) Exh. 1 part 6# (7) Exh. 1 part 7# (8) Exh. 1 part 8# (9) Exhs. 2-4)(Roberson, John)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 23-27, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 16, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 201 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-323) held on April 19 & 20, 2007 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 200 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007
                                                                          Exhibit List (Motion to Revise Amended Exhibit List), filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Roberson, John)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007
                                                                            ORDER granting [199] Defendant's Motion to Amend its Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 199 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007
                                                                              Exhibit List Motion to Amend, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Roberson, John)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 198 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                                                                Exhibit List Plaintiff's Second Revised List of Exhibits it Expects to Offer Into Evidence at Trial, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 197 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [187] Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (MO)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 196 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (MO)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 195 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [177] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Takings Claim - Rule 12(b)(6) Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (MO)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [177] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiff's Takings Claim And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by USA. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [177] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiff's Takings Claim And Request For Expedited Consideration Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Takings Claim, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Reply due by 4/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Takings Claim)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 192 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [162] Motion to Produce; denying [178] Motion in Limine Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (MO)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 191 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                              Objection to Exhibit List, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Related document: [181] Exhibit List filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants Exhibits Part 1 of 2# (2) Exhibit Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants Exhibits Part 2 of 2)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 190 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                                STIPULATION of Facts Filed Jointly by Defendant and Plaintiff, filed by USA. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 189 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                                                                                                  Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [175] Exhibit List filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 188 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [183] MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of the OTS Investigation of Bruno Greco and Thomas Dixon Lovely and Their Voluntary Settlement with OTS, [178] MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of the OTS Investigation of Bruno Greco and Thomas Dixon Lovely and Their Voluntary Settlement with OTS, filed by USA.Reply due by 4/13/2007. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 187 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007, Terminated: 4/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit List Addendum to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend its Exhibit List, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 186 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit List Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend its Exhibit List (Expedited Consideration Requested), filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 185 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct [184] MOTION for Leave to File A Corrected Copy of Defendant's Motion To Present Deposition Testimony at Trial, filed by USA.Response due by 4/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 184 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File A Corrected Copy of Defendant's Motion To Present Deposition Testimony at Trial, filed by USA.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 183 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of the OTS Investigation of Bruno Greco and Thomas Dixon Lovely and Their Voluntary Settlement with OTS, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 4/9/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 182 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                                                Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 181 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                                                  Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 180 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                                                    Witness List, filed by USA. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 179 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Designations, filed by USA.Response due by 4/2/2007.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 178 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of the OTS Investigation of Bruno Greco and Thomas Dixon Lovely and Their Voluntary Settlement with OTS, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 4/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of the OTS Investigation of Bruno Greco and Thomas Dixon Lovely and Their Voluntary Settlement with OTS)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 177 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007, Terminated: 4/9/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiff's Takings Claim And Request For Expedited Consideration, filed by USA.Response due by 4/6/2007.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 176 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Revised List of Exhibits It Expects to Offer into Evidence at Trial is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mpo)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 175 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Revised List of Exhibits it Expects to Offer Into Evidence at Trial, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 174 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER Regarding Video Trial Testimony: Granting Motion to Produce [163], [164],[165] Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mpo)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 173 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [169] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mpo)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 172 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [165] MOTION to Produce Present The Trial Testimony of Dr. Richard T. Pratt by Video Conference, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/6/2007. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 171 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [163] MOTION to Produce Present The Trial Testimony of Bruno Greco by Video Conference, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/6/2007. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 170 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [164] MOTION to Produce Present The Trial Testimony of Thomas Dixon Lovely by Video Conference, filed by USA.Reply due by 3/6/2007. (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance With Appendix A of the Rules of the Court of Federal Claims and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by USA.Response due by 3/9/2007.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 168 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Plaintiff's List of Exhibits it Expects to Offer into Evidence at Trial, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                Witness List, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Produce Present The Trial Testimony of Dr. Richard T. Pratt by Video Conference, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 3/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Pratt letter of January 4, 2007)(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Produce Present The Trial Testimony of Thomas Dixon Lovely by Video Conference, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 3/2/2007.(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Produce Present The Trial Testimony of Bruno Greco by Video Conference, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 3/2/2007.(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 162 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Produce Present Deposition Testimony at Trial, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 3/2/2007.(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 161 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Update to Expert Witness Report of Dr. David P. Rochester, filed by USA.Response due by 2/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mizoguchi, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Richard T. Pratt re: Trial April 19, 2007, by leave of the Judge. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [156] Motion in Limine Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mpo)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [157] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Plaintiff's Abandoned and Disavowed Damage Claims, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix)(Todor, John)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 157 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [156] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Plaintiff's Abandoned and Disavowed Damage Claims, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Reply due by 12/27/2006. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 156 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006, Terminated: 12/21/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Plaintiff's Abandoned and Disavowed Damage Claims, filed by USA.Response due by 12/26/2006.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 155 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA of Additional Person Whose Testimony Will Be Introduced By Deposition Transcript (Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 154 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 153 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting [151] and [152] Authorization for Issuance of Subpoenas Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.(mpo)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 152 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 151 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006, Terminated: 11/29/2006 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles, MOTION for Disclosure of Witnesses Whose Testimony Will Be Introduced By Deposition And Who Reside More Than 100 Miles From Washington, D.C., filed by USA.Response due by 12/18/2006.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 150 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-33) held on September 15, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/16/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/10/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 149 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER: On September 7, 2006, the Court held a pretrial conference with counsel for the parties to establish a schedule for trial and certain procedures. On September 15, 2006, the Court held a follow-up conference with counsel after distributing a draft Pretrial Order for review. A Pretrial Order was then issued establishing a trial schedule and resolving other procuderal issues. (mpo)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Master Order Concerning "De Bene Esse" Depositions in the Winstar-Related Cases (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Master Order Concerning "De Bene Esse" Depositions in the Winstar-Related Cases dated May 14, 1997)(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-61) held on September 7, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 146 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006, Terminated: 1/18/2007 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Status Conference Plaintiff's Proposed Pretrial Conference Agenda, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION.Response due by 9/22/2006.(Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 145 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006, Terminated: 1/18/2007 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Status Conference Agenda for the Pre-Trial Conference, filed by USA.Response due by 9/22/2006.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 144 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [142] Motion for Status Conference to Be on Record. Status Conference set for 9/7/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 143 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [139] Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 142 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006, Terminated: 8/28/2006 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Status Conference To Be Held On The Record, filed by USA. Response due by 9/11/2006.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 141 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [139] MOTION for Clarification OF THE COURT'S OPINION AND ORDER DATED AUGUST 22, 2006, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 9/11/2006. (Eisenhart, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 140 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL CONFERENCE to be held Thursday, September 7 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 9/11/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2006 10:00 AM in Conference Room before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 139 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006, Terminated: 8/28/2006 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Clarification OF THE COURT'S OPINION AND ORDER DATED AUGUST 22, 2006, filed by USA. Response due by 9/11/2006.(Roberson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [75] Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 137 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [132] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 136 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [132] MOTION for Reconsideration re [131] Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Strike, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/23/2006. (Todor, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER requesting Defendant to reply to [132] Motion for Reconsideration on or before August 10, 2006. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's response to the Motion for Reconsideration due by 8/10/2006. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 134 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [131] Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Strike , filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Service: 7/6/2006.Response due by 7/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [93] Motion for Leave to File, granting [108] Motion to Compel, granting [117] Motion for Leave to File, granting [122] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/20/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Status Conference , filed by USA. Service: 6/5/2006.Response due by 6/22/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Order Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [124] MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority , filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 12/12/2005. Service: 11/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of an Amended Certificate of Service, filed by USA. Service: 11/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority , filed by USA. Service: 11/10/2005 by hand. Response due by 11/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [122] MOTION to Strike [121] Additional Documents to be Included in the Record, as Well as Explanatory Materials Concerning Banking Practices, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike or Leave to Responsd to [121] Additional Documents to be Included in the Record, as Well as Explanatory Materials Concerning Banking Practices, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/8/2005. Response due by 11/18/2005. (mb2, ) Modified on 11/3/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Documents to be Included in the Record, as Well as Explanatory Materials Concerning Banking Proctices, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Directing the Clerk to file various submissions. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [117] MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Service: 8/18/2005.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [117] MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 9/1/2005. Service: 8/15/2005.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 8/1/2005. Response due by 8/18/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-263) of Proceedings held on 7/21/05 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/22/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Response to Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [111] Supplemental Brief, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Response to Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [112] Supplemental Brief, filed by USA. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [113] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Response to Supplemental Brief by 2 pages, filed by USA. Service: 7/6/2005. Response due by 7/25/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF In Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Plaintiff's Damages Claim, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [108] MOTION to Compel, filed by USA. Service: 4/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [108] MOTION to Compel, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 4/18/2005. Service: 4/4/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT (Pg. 1-52)of Proceedings held on 3/1/05 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of Documents withheld by Plaintiff filed by USA.Service: 3/21/2005. Response due by 4/7/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/1/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [92] Motion to Compel, denying request for costs. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Kaplan Deposition due 3/15/2005. Rebuttal Expert Report due by 4/15/2005. Deposition of Defendant's Rebuttal Experts due by 4/22/2005. Deposition due by 5/16/2005. Supplemental Briefing Due by 6/15/2005. Responses due by 7/8/2005. Oral Argument set for 7/21/2005 at 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/1/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John Hugh Roberson for USA. Service: 02/04/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED Memorandum OPINION and Order on [103] MOTION to Compel filed by USA, [99] MOTION for Recusal filed by USA. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for a Decision Regarding our Pending Motion to Recuse by USA.Service: 01/26/05. Response due by 2/14/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John Hugh Roberson for USA. Service: 4/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support of [99] Dft's MOTION to Recuse filed by USA. Service: 3/1/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [99] MOTION for Recusal filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 3/1/2004. Service: 2/17/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Recusal of the Assigned Judge, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume by USA.Service: 2/2/2004. Response due by 2/19/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Maurice Cohen for USA. Service: 2/2/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RETURNING: On 1/20/2004, the clerk's office received a document from dft entitled "Dft's Consolidated Motion to Recuse," and an accompanying appendix. These documents were not filed by the clerk's office due to dft's failure to follow the rules of this Court. First, the documents contain captions of three separate cases-- 93-162C, 95-468C, and 95-829C. But these cases have not been consolidated under Rules 42 or 42.1 of the RCFC. Second, the dft's motion was not signed by, or in the name of, the attorney of record in each case, as is required by RCFC Rules 11 and 83.1(c). For these reasons, the Clerk of the Court is instructed to return the documents to the dft for correction of these defects. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of [92] Dft's MOTION to Compel Resumption of Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert filed by USA. Service: 12/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [93] Dft's MOTION Regarding Potential Recusal filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 12/30/2003. Service: 12/17/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [92] Dft's MOTION to Compel Another Day of Deposition of Dr. Kaplan filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 12/30/2003. Service: 12/17/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003, Terminated: 6/22/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Issues Raised in a Related Case Regarding Potential Recusal by USA.Service: 12/3/03 by hand. Response due by 12/17/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003, Terminated: 3/1/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Resumption of Deposition of Pltf's Expert, Dr. Donald Kaplan, by USA.Service: 12/3/03 by hand. Response due by 12/17/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [75] MOTION for Summary Judgment upon plaintiff's damages claims filed by USA. Service: 9/29/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [89] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003, Terminated: 10/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by USA.Service: 9/29/03. Response due by 10/16/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [76] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Service: 9/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to [75] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 9/29/2003. Service: 9/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [85] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Rule 5.2(b)(2)'s page limit requirement will be extended to 73 pages for the filing of "Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Damages." Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003, Terminated: 9/17/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by 57 pages by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/12/03. Response due by 9/29/2003. (jcp, ) Modified on 9/22/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003, Terminated: 9/4/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [75] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Pltf's Damages, until 9/12/03, Due to Medical Emergency, With Request for Expedited Consideration by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, ) Modified on 9/11/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [83] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [75] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Pltf's Damages Claims, until 9/12/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Victor Wolski. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any cases if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Victor Wolski. Judge Lynn J. Bush no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: That [77] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time (with request for expedited reply and consideration) to File Response as to [75] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment, until 9/5/03, is GRANTED, in part, as to the request for an enlargement of time, and DENIED, in part, as to the request for expedited reply. Response due by 9/5/2003. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Government's Response to Motion re: [77] Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [75] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pltf's Damages Claims, until 9/5/03, filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION. Service: 7/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to [77] Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [75] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pltf's Damages Claims, until 9/5/03, filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 7/30/2003. Service: 7/21/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003, Terminated: 7/28/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [75] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pltf's Damages Claims, until 9/5/03, (with Request for Expedited Reply and Consideration) by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 7/18/03. Response due by 8/4/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Pltf's Damages Claims by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/3/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003, Terminated: 8/22/2006 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Pltf's Damages Claims, Together With Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 7/3/03 by hand. Response due by 8/1/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: That 1) The Clerk's office is directed to FILE Pltf's Reply to Dft's Motion to Exceed Page Limit as of the date of this order; 2) [72] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed 7/3/03, is GRANTED; 3) The Clerk office is directed to FILE Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Pltf's Damages Claims, Appendix Volume I and II and Dft's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Astoria's Damages Claims as of the date of this order; and 4) The Clerk's office is directed to FILE Pltf's Motion for Enlargement of Time (with Request for Expedited Reply Consideration). Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to [72] Dft's MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Damages Claims Made by Pltf by 57 pages filed by ASTORIA FEDERAL SAVINGS and LOAN ASSOCIATION, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 7/29/2003. Service: 7/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/17/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003, Terminated: 7/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Damages Claims Made by Pltf by 57 pages by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/3/03 by hand. Response due by 7/21/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b), that counts II, III and IV of the complaint are dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment pursuant to RCFC 54(b) insofar as there is no just reason for delay, dismissing counts II, III and IV of the complaint. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT Stipulation by ASTORIA FEDERAL and USA regarding Astoria's breach of contract claim and the dismissal of counts II-IV of the complaint. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER If a party does not intend to file a cross-motion for summary judgment, the party may only file an opposition brief, in accordance with the schedule set forth: (1) The parties shall file a complete and revised summary judgment motions addressing all liability and jurisdictional issues on or before 2/21/03; (2) The parties shall file their responses by 3/7/03; and (3) The parties shall file their reply briefs by 3/14/03 ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [63-1] motion for status conference, denying [56-1] motion for telephonic discovery conference, granting [52-1] motion to Stay Joint Status Report deadline to 12/2/02 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [63-1] motion for status conference. Service by hand: 4/5/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service by hand: 3/29/02) to [63-1] motion for status conference. Reply due: 4/12/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002, Terminated: 11/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/18/02) for status conference . Response due: 4/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Directing the parties to reach a reasonable agreement concerning locations for expert depositions (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiff's oral Motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Service: 2/19/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE reassigned to Judge Lynn J. Bush . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of reassignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 8/16/01 ) to [56-1] motion for telephonic discovery conference, (filed by leave of the Judge). Reply due: 8/27/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [56-1] motion for telephonic discovery conference. Service: 8/14/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/10/01) for telephonic discovery conference . Response due: 8/24/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [51-1] motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V. Service: 1/16/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [51-1] motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V, [51-2] motion for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Reply due: 1/12/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/30/00 ) to [52-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 12/14/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service by hand: 11/16/00) to Stay . Response due: 11/30/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V and for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II. (3 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED ORDER ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Stipulated Order by ASTORIA FEDERAL, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 2/18/00 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000, Terminated: 1/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service : 1/19/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories [until February 18, 2000]. Response due: 2/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Daniel D. McClain Service : 12/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL to [44-1] answer by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until october 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [40-1] motion to Stay. Service: 8/11/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 7/30/98 ) to [40-1] motion to Stay. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/16/98) to Stay proceedings etc., (until this case enters discovery in accordance with the Master Litigation Plan). Response due: 8/6/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to file surreply to Plaintiff's May 15, 1998 reply ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SURREPLY by USA re: [35-1] response by ASTORIA FEDERAL. Service: 5/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jacqueline Christine Romero. Service : 5/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998, Terminated: 5/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/98 ) to Extend Time to file surreply to Plaintiff's May 15, 1998 reply [to May 27, 1998]. Response due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by ASTORIA FEDERAL to [34-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [33-1] memorandum (proposed order) by ASTORIA FEDERAL. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in support of order granting summary judgment on all issues of liability for breach of contract by ASTORIA FEDERAL. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Frank J. Eisenhart. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/23/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gordon Michael Harvey Service : 1/22/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [22-1] cross motion . Service: 5/21/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/19/97 ) to Extend Time to May 21, 1997, to file reply in support of cross-motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 6/5/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 4/4/97 ) to [22-1] cross motion, together with separate one volume appendix. [IN CAMERA] Reply due: 4/18/97 (HW) Modified on 04/14/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service : 3/28/07 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Murray Alan Indick for ASTORIA FEDERAL Added Frank J. Eisenhart. Response due: 9/19/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Documentation [supplemental filing] by USA. Service: 3/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/97) for Leave to File supplemental filing . Response due: 3/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 1/28/97) and RESPONSE to [18-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability by ASTORIA FEDERAL. Response due: 2/28/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [22-1] cross motion reset to 2/28/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 1/10/97 By Hand) to [20-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 1/22/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment [to January 28, 1997]. Response due: 1/23/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: 12/12/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Murray Alan Indick (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 11/6/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability . Response due: 1/8/97 (FE) Modified on 01/08/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service : 10/22/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney William R. Richardson for ASTORIA FEDERAL Added Murray Alan Indick . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Cheryl Coombe Service : 10/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Matthew Steven Bode (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 5/13/96) for Leave to File a Response to Government's Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/28/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Matthew Steven Bode Service : 11/3/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by ASTORIA FEDERAL (Service: 10/2/95 ) to [4-1] motion to Stay. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995, Terminated: 10/4/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/19/95) to Stay . Response due: 10/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dorann Elise Banks. Service: 8/4/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/25/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39689. Answer due on 9/19/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 202 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?