COMMERCIAL FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00472-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E. Alex Blanton +1 202 772 5800 +1 202 772 5858 blanton@blankrome.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ashley Nicole Bailey +1 202 626 3900 +1 202 626 3961
Office COFC
Filed 7/24/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 1/29/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '04-5075'[], '04-5076'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (188) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 166 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [156] Published Order/Opinion, the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 165 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 04-5076 for [162] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 164 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 04-5075 for [161] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 162 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 5/31/2005 Notice of cross-appeal
        NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Copies to opposing party and judge. Filing fee $ 255.00, receipt number 060307. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 163 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Nicole Bailey for USA. Service: 4/16/2004.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 161 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Terminated:
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 160 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)Court Filing
              ORDER: [159] Dft's Motion for Reconsideration is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 159 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re: [156] Published Order/Opinion, and [157] Judgment by USA.Service: 2/12/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 158 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                  Certified transcript of judgment, dated January 29, 2004, forwarded to Alex Blanton. See letter in file. (bre,)
                    LREF
                    Blank 157 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $5,602,000.00. Each party to pay its own costs, fees, and expenses. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 156 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                      PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $5,602,000.00. All other outstanding motions are moot. Each side to pay its own costs, fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bohdan A. Futey : Oral Argument held on 10/23/2003. (lgs)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003
                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/28/2003. (vp1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 155 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 23, 2003 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 154 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                              ORDER: Pursuant to [152] Dft's Motion to Use Trial Technology and Request for the Electronic Courtroom, the following is hereby ordered: Oral argument on the post-trial briefs shall take place on Thursday, 10/23/2003, at 10:00 am at the National Courts Building, in Courtroom 4. Dft's request for real time reporting is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 153 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                AMENDED NOTICE of SUBMISSION of Exhibits relied upon in Post-Trial Brief and in Reply to Defendant's Post-Trial Brief by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/9/03.(jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 10/23/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building in Courtroom 4 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 151 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Response
                                    REPLY to [147] Dft's Post Trial Brief filed by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 10/9/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 150 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Response
                                      REPLY to [146] Pltf's Post Trial Brief filed by USA. Service: 10/9/03.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 152 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Terminated:
                                        MOTION to Use Trial Technology and Request for the Electronic Courtroom by USA.Service: 10/8/03. Response due by 10/27/2003. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 148 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 23, 2003 through July 25, 2003 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Defendant's Exhibits: 8,10,13,14,17,20,24,32,33,35,38,39,40,41,47,50,56,58,58A, 61,62,67,68,69,73,76,83,88,89,94,98,103,109,115,118,123, 124,134,141,144,150,152,154,159,160,161,164,164B,164D,165, 169,172,174,175,176,181,186,188,192,201,207,209,210,211,215, 217,220,223,226,228,233,235,238,241,242,243,246,249,251,252, 256,257,259,264,266,270,271,277,278,280,283,286,287,289,291, 295,296,297,298,299,302,303,305,306,307,308,311,315,316,320, 321,325,326,328,332,333,334,337,338,340,345,359,368,372,373, 385,405,410,412,416,421,425,426,432,442,443,462,472,473,474, 478,483,490,495,507,510,518,521,522,1004-1056,1057-1103, 1104-1175,1176-1185,1187,1190,1191,1192,1193,1195,1197-1209, 1210,1500,1504,1505,1506; Plaintiff's Exhibits: 2,4,5,6,7,8,9,11,12,13,14,15,18,19,20,23,25,26,27,28,29,30, 32,34,37,38,40,43,53,55A,60,61,64,65,66,67,68,69,70,72,73,74, 75,77,78,79,80-102,104-112,114-126,129-134,136,137,139-146, 148-156,158-161,163-166,168,169,172,175,182,186,187,189,190, 191,194,195,197,200-203,205,206,211-213,500,503,504,505,602, 604-606,608. (dw1, ) Modified on 4/20/2004 (hw1, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 149 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Exhibit
                                            Exhibit List by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (jat, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 147 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Post-Trial Brief
                                              POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (hw1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 146 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Post-Trial Brief
                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (dw1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                  NOTICE of Submission of Exhibits Admitted into Evidence at Trial by USA Pursuant to the Court's Instruction at the Close of Trial. Service: 9/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003
                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/2/2003. (vp1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bohdan A. Futey : Trial held June 23, 2003 through July 25, 2003, except July 3, 4, and 9. (lgs, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 144 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Court Filing
                                                        TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER:The parties shall simultaneously file Post Trial Briefs, not to exceed 40 pages including attachments, by Thursday, 9/25/2003. The parties shall simultaneously file Post Trial Response Briefs by Thursday, 10/9/2003. Oral argument on the post-trial briefs shall be conducted on Thursday, 10/23/03 at the National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003
                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument on the post trial briefs shall be conducted on Thursday, 10/23/2003 in National Courts Building before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 143 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                            Brief in Support of its Motion for Judgment Based Upon Partial Findings by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/10/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 142 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Motion for Judgment Based Upon Partial Findings by 3 pages by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/10/03 by hand. Response due by 7/24/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 141 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE to [139] MOTION in Limine filed by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 7/7/2003. Service: 6/20/03.(dw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                  Amended Exhibit List by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB, by leave of the Judge. (hw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 140 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                    Third Amended Exhibit List by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                      Third Amended Exhibit List by UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge. (hw1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 139 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION in Limine to exclude the declaration of Richard T. Pottorff concerning the admissibility of 459 exhibits by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/17/03. Response due by 7/7/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER re: Guidelines for Joint Exhibit's and Individual Exhibit's. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            REPLY to Response re [133] MOTION for Clarification filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/6/03.(hw1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                              RESPONSE to [133] MOTION for Clarification filed by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 6/16/2003. Service: 6/3/03.(dls, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Clarification concerning the admission of exhibits into evidence filed by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/2/03. Response due by 6/19/2003 (dls, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [131] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ miles. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003, Terminated: 5/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/20/03. Response due by 6/6/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bohdan A. Futey : Pretrial Conference held on 05/06/03 on the record. (lgs, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying [100] Motion in Limine, denying [104] Motion in Limine, denying [106] Motion in Limine. Trial scheduled for 6/23/03, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (hw1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 6, 2003 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003
                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/12/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 128 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                              First Amended Joint Exhibit List by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB, The United States. (hw1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File proposed agenda for pretrial conference scheduled for 5/6/03 by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB, The United States.Service: 4/25/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                  Amended Exhibit List by The United States. (hw1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                    Second Amended Exhibit List by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (dw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER RETURNING second amended exhibit list received on April 11, 2003, for binding and copies. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dls, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 8, 2003 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/14/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER denying [103] Motion in Limine, denying [105] Motion in Limine, granting [107] Motion to Strike and granting [107] Motion to strike. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lrd)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bohdan A. Futey : Telephone Conference on Defendant's Motions In Limine and Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Defendant's Motions In Limine held on 3/20/2003. (lgs, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File supplemental appendices to Defendant's Motion in Limine, by The United States. Service: 4/7/03. Response due 4/24/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  First Amended Exhibit List by The United States, by leave of the Judge. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    First Amended Exhibit List by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB, by leave of the Judge. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, with two volumes of exhibits, to re [106] Motion in Limine, [100] Motion in Limine, [103] Motion in Limine, [104] Motion in Limine, [105] Motion in Limine, filed by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due 4/7/2003. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/27/03 by hand. (lrd)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Substitute Attorney Alex Blanton in place of Edward L. Lublin by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/26/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                          ***Attorney Alex Blanton for COMMERCIAL FEDERAL BANK, FSB added. Attorney Edward Louis Lublin terminated. (lrd)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (one volume, no exhibits) held on 3/20/03, in Washington, D.C. before Judge Bohdan Futey. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion; Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 4/8/2003 at 02:00 PM before Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2003 at 2:30 PM before Bohdan A. Futey. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003
                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/25/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [110] Motion to assign a Court Reporter for the hearing scheduled 3/20/03 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      JOINT Stipulation of facts by USA and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                        JOINT Stipulation by USA and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL of pre-trial and trial procedures. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          JOINT Exhibit list by USA and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) for assignment of court reporter . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/6/03 ) to [107-1] motion to Strike [100-1], [103-1] through [106-1] motions in Limine. Reply due: 3/20/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Telephonic Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 3/20/03 , and Plaintiff's issues in the motions in limine due 3/27/03 (signed by Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service by hand: 3/3/03) to Strike [100-1], [103-1] through [106-1] motions in Limine ; and for telephone conference . Response due: 3/17/03 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/28/03 ) in Limine to exclude any evidence related to plaintiff's tax "gross-up" of its alleged damages . Response due: 3/17/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/28/03 ) in Limine to exclude opinions of Dr. Donald Kaplan that exceed the scope of his expertise or constitute legal conclusions . Response due: 3/17/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/28/03 ) in Limine to exclude any evidence related to Dr. Donald A. Kaplan's :lost Profit" damages model that improperly seeks pre-judgment interest . Response due: 3/17/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 4/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/03) in Limine to exclude opinions of Dr. Donald Kaplan that fail to meet the threshold for admissibility under rule of evidence 702 . Response due: 3/17/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 5/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/28/03 ) in Limine to exclude any evidence related to Dr. Ronald A. Kaplan's replacement cost damages model that improperly seeks pre-judgment interest . Response due: 3/17/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 102 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [94-1] exhibits list by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 2/19/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Hearing set for 2:00 p.m. on 3/26/03 for [100-1] motion in Limine to exclude any evidence related to Dr. Ronald A. Kaplan's replacement cost damages model that improperly seeks pre-judgment interest , and Pretrial Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 4/8/03 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit list by USA. Service: 2/19/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by USA, re: Contentions of Fact and Law. Service: 2/19/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                      Witness list by USA. Service: 2/19/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/25/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of Contentions of Fact and Law by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/25/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                          Witness list by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/25/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit list by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 1/21/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Edward Louis Lublin (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COMMERCIAL FEDERAL (Service: 1/14/03 ) to [90-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 8/5/02 order. Reply due: 1/28/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: further proceedings (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/03) for Clarification of the Court's 8/5/02 order . Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Pursuant to parties' joint status report, the following is hereby ORDERED: (1) Meeting of counsel to exchange exhibit and witness list scheduled for 12/16/02; (2) Defendant's memorandum of contentions of fact and law, with witness and exhibit lists by deadline of 2/18/03; Plaintiff's response due by 3/3/03; (3) Plaintiff's memorandum of contentions of fact and law, with witness and exhibit lists by deadline of 1/21/03; (4) Motion in limine, if any, by deadline of 2/28/03; responses by 3/7/03; (5) Joint stipulations due by Brief deadline of 3/10/03 ; and (6) Pretrial Conference and hearing on motions in limine scheduled for 3/13/03 . Trial to be scheduled by further order of the court ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA and COMMERCIAL FEDERAL. Service: 7/29/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 7/29/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by Commercial Federal Bank, FSB and USA. Service: 6/24/02 (NN)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 6, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER withdrawing [23-1] cross motion and granting [19-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment Joint Status Report due 6/24/02 and mooting oral argument scheduled for 7/16/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT Stipulation. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [81-1] motion to Withdraw [42-1] opposition to plaintiff's motion to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as the named party plaintiff; granting [41-1] motion to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as named party plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002, Terminated: 5/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/02) to Withdraw [42-1] opposition to plaintiff's motion to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as the named party plaintiff . Response due: 5/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; Response to [81-1] motion to Withdraw [42-1] opposition to plaintiff's motion to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as the named party plaintiff set to 5/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER pursuant to the telephonic conference held 4/10/02, defendant shall file its motion to withdraw its opposition to plaintiff's motion to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as the named party plaintiff by Motion Filing deadline of 4/25/02 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER mooting [22-1] motion to Extend Time, [17-1] motion for Leave, [16-1] motion for Leave, [14-1] motion for Leave, [13-1] motion for Leave, and [11-1] motion for Leave; directing parties to file supplemental briefs and submit a binder containing copies of all pending dispositive motions and briefs by 5/31/02 ; and scheduling oral argument at 10:30 a.m. on 7/16/02 for [52-2] motion for Summary Judgment, [23-1] cross motion, and [19-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment . ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 05/03/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                              "CORRECTED" JOINT STATUS REPORT. Service: 3/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [76-1] motion for Leave to file "corrected" Joint Status Report (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002, Terminated: 4/3/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/26/02) for Leave to file "corrected" Joint Status Report . Response due: 4/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER resetting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 4/10/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: Expert report of Dr. Bajaj (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Joint Status Report due 3/18/02 , and telephonic Status Conference set for 3:30 p.m. on 3/27/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to the Court's oral request in our 2/21/02 conference call, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/21/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/22/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority . Response due: 3/11/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 21, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 2/20/02) to [67-1] motion to compel depositions. Reply due: 3/1/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/25/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 2/21/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002, Terminated: 1/22/2004 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MID-CONTINENT (Service: 2/15/02) to compel depositions , etc. Response due: 3/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE reassigned to Judge Bohdan A. Futey . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment to Bohdan A. Futey, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 02/05/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/05/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness list by USA. Service: 9/5/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 02/05/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 2/5/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE NO. 95-518C FOR TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: hearing held on July 27, 2001. (DS) Modified on 02/05/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing held ( Transcript due 8/27/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing on defendant's motion for telephonic discovery conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 7/27/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing the parties to confer and agree and notify the Court by 7/31/01 on a date for a telephonic discovery conference (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IDENTIFICATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by MID-CONTINENT. Service: 5/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [57-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in support of opposition to supplemental motion for summary judgment (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of correction of telephone number by Edward Louis Lublin (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Edward Louis Lublin (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001, Terminated: 4/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MID-CONTINENT (Service: 1/23/01) for Leave to file a surreply in support of opposition to supplemental motion for summary judgment . Response due: 2/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [52-1] motion to Dismiss, [52-2] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 1/18/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES (Filed by leave of the Judge) by MID-CONTINENT. Service: 12/21/00. (FE) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by MID-CONTINENT (Service: 12/21/00) to [52-1] motion to Dismiss, [52-2] motion for Summary Judgment. due: 1/8/01. (FE) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Plaintiff's oral motion to quash the deposition scheduled by Defendant after the close of discovery. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/14/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER mooting [46-1] motion to Strike Plaintiff's letter to the Court dated 6/19/00 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 13, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing submission of documents for July 13, 2000 discovery teleconference by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 7/11/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing held ( Transcript due 8/14/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to objections of Mid-Continent to deposition subpoenas issued by Defendant. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Telephonic Hearing set at 1:00 p.m. on 7/13/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/28/00 ) to Strike Plaintiff's letter to the Court dated 6/19/00. Response due: 7/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Submission of Documents for 6/21/00 discovery teleconference by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/19/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by MID-CONTINENT to response to [41-1] motion to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as named party plaintiff. Service: 6/5/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/6/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Submission of Documents for the 5/31/00 discovery teleconference by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/30/00 (JT) Modified on 06/06/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/19/00 ) to [41-1] motion to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as named party plaintiff. Reply due: 6/5/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MID-CONTINENT (Service: 5/2/00) to substitute Commercial Federal Bank as named party plaintiff . Response due: 5/19/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing "Initial Disclosure List" by USA. Service: 9/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joanne Elizabeth Johnson. Service: 6/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [36-1] response by MID-CONTINENT. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by MID-CONTINENT to [35-1] notice by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of filing motion for stay of proceedings in 90-8C filed by USA. Service: 7/20/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Melissa Barbara Rogers. Service : 7/20/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by MID-CONTINENT to [32-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [31-1] response [proposed Order] by MID-CONTINENT Service: 4/30/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by MID-CONTINENT to [30-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to the Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [23-1] cross motion . Service: 8/25/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by MID-CONTINENT (Service: 7/11/97 ) to [23-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/28/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for partial summary judgement . Response to [23-1] cross motion reset to 7/14/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997, Terminated: 6/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MID-CONTINENT (Service : 6/16/97 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for partial summary judgement (until 7/14/97). (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by USA re: [19-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: the acquisition of Reserve Savings and Loan Association of Wichita, Kansas by MID-CONTINENT. Service: 5/20/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997, Terminated: 6/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 4/7/97 ) and RESPONSE to [19-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by MID-CONTINENT. Response due: 5/2/97 (FE) Modified on 05/03/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [23-1] cross motion reset to 5/2/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/3/97) to Extend Time to respond to partial summary judgment (to April 7, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Response to [19-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: the acquisition of Reserve Savings and Loan Association of Wichita, Kansas reset to 4/3/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: 3/28/1997, Terminated: 4/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/21/97) to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (to April 3, 1997). (FE) Modified on 03/28/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION, together with one volume of exhibits, by MID-CONTINENT (Service BY HAND: 1/21/97) for partial Summary Judgment on liability regarding the acquisition of Reserve Savings and Loan Association of Wichita, Kansas. Response due: 3/24/97 (FE) Modified on 05/03/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/20/96) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by William Patrick Donovan Jr. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MID-CONTINENT (Service : 5/9/96 ) for Leave to File response to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Continuing stay of proceedings , directing parties a status report is due on or before the date 30 days after the Supreme Court renders its decision in Winstar and denying plaintiff's motion for a protective order (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/14/1996 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [8-1] report by MID-CONTINENT, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/26/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Brief [defendant's response to plaintiff's status report] deadline to 3/8/96 (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by MID-CONTINENT Service: 2/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 2/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MID-CONTINENT (Service: 10/11/95) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Gregory Paul Schaffer for MID-CONTINENT Added Edward Louis Lublin . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 2/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [3-1] joint motion to Stay proceedings pending decision in Winstar, with further proceedings stayed until February 15, 1996, at which time the parties are to file a Status Report ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Patrick Donovan Jr. Service : 8/15/95 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995, Terminated: 8/21/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION to Stay proceedings pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 4), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39725. Answer due on 9/22/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?