BANK UNITED, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00473-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bank United, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter B Stuart, IV +1 713 758 2222 +1 917 206 8100 wstuart@velaw.com
No Logo Bank United Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "BANK UNITED CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter B Stuart, IV +1 713 758 2222 +1 917 206 8100 wstuart@velaw.com
No Logo Hyperion Partners LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter B Stuart, IV +1 713 758 2222 +1 917 206 8100 wstuart@velaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Jay Hoffman
Office COFC
Filed 7/25/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 1/21/2004
Origin 1
Reopened 12/19/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (338) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 317 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004
Certified transcript, dated March 4, 2004, providing for the payment of costs, forwarded to Walter B. Stuart IV. See letter in file. (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank 316 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Costs Taxed
    Costs Taxed in amount of $ $141,847.73 against defendant. (Signed by Clerk) (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 315 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004
      Certified transcript of judgment dated January 8, 2002 returned and destroyed. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 314 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Certified Transcript to Attorney
        Certified transcript of judgment, dated January 22, 2004, forwarded to Walter B. Stuart IV. See letter in file. (bre,)
          LREF
          Blank 313 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs, Bank United, Bank United Corp. and Hyperion PArtners L.P., recover of and from the United States the sum of $4,884,283.00. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be awarded to plaintiffs ("the prevailing party"). (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 312 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION vacating the prior judgment of this court and directing the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of the plaintiffs in the amount of $4,884,283.00. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 311 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 310 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Court Filing
                NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004
                  Case reassigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block. Judge James T. Turner no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
                    LREF
                    Blank 309 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003
                    MANDATE of CAFC affirming in part and reversing in part [286] Judgment. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Terminated:
                      CAFC Case Number Re: [308-1] appeal by USA CAFC NUMBER: 02-5137 (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 308 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                        NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL by USA. Copies to Judge James Turner, BANK UNITED OF TEXAS FSB, et al., and CAFC. Fee not required. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Terminated:
                          CAFC Case Number Re: [307-1] appeal by BANK UNITED CORP., HYPERION PARTNERS, BANK UNITED. CAFC NUMBER: 02-5132. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 307 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2003 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by BANK UNITED, HYPERION PARTNERS, BANK UNITED CORP. Copy to Judge James T. Turner, Defendant and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 054155. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 306 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [304-1] motion for Leave to file response to Defendant's sur-reply in response to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 05/15/2002
                                LREF
                                Blank 305 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Response
                                RESPONSE by BANK UNITED, HYPERION PARTNERS and BANK UNITED CORP. to [301-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 5/8/02. (FE) Modified on 05/15/2002
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 304 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002, Terminated: 5/10/2002 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by BANK UNITED (Service: 5/8/02) for Leave to file response to Defendant's sur-reply in response to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs . Response due: 5/28/02. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 303 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002
                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 16, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 302 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Court Filing
                                      ORDER denying as moot [292-1] motion to Strike [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK denying [288-1] motion for amended findings, denying motion for reopening the record for additional evidence (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Oral Argument
                                        Oral Argument re: [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED, [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK UNITED, [292-1] motion to Strike [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK UNITED by USA (DS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 301 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Memorandum
                                          SUR-REPLY by USA re: [293-1] reply to objection bill of costs by BANK UNITED CORP., HYPERION PARTNERS, BANK UNITED. Service: 4/5/02. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 300 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [299-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to Plaintiffs' reply to response to Plaintiff's bill of costs (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 299 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002, Terminated: 4/5/2002 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/5/02) for Leave to file sur-reply to Plaintiffs' reply to response to Plaintiff's bill of costs . Response due: 4/22/02. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 298 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002
                                                SUR-REPLY by USA to [292-1] motion to Strike [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK UNITED by USA, [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED, [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK UNITED. Service: 4/1/02. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 297 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [296-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 296 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002, Terminated: 4/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/1/02) for Leave to file sur-reply . (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 295 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. 4/16/02 for [292-1] motion to Strike [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK UNITED, set for 10:30 a.m. 4/16/02 for [288-1] motion for amended findings, set for 10:30 a.m. 4/16/02 for [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 294 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE by BANK UNITED, BANK UNITED CORP. (Service: 3/8/02 ) to [292-1] motion to Strike [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK UNITED. Reply due: 3/22/02. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 294 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          REPLY by BANK UNITED, BANK UNITED CORP. to response to [288-1] motion for amended findings, [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence. Service: 3/8/02. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 293 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Reply to Objections to Bill of Costs
                                                            REPLY by BANK UNITED, HYPERION PARTNERS and BANK UNITED CORP. to [291-1] objection bill of costs by USA, filed with (1) one volume of exhibit's in support. Service:3/7/02. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002, Terminated: 4/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/22/02) to Strike [288-1] motion for amended findings by BANK UNITED and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence by BANK UNITED . Response due: 3/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 292 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002, Terminated: 4/16/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/22/02) to [288-1] motion for amended findings and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence. Reply due: 3/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 291 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Objections to Bill of Costs
                                                                  OBJECTION (Reply due 3/7/02) by USA to [290-1] bill of costs by BANK UNITED CORP., BANK UNITED. Service: 2/21/02 (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 290 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Bill of Costs
                                                                    Bill of costs, together with two volumes of appendix, filed by BANK UNITED, BANK UNITED CORP. Service by hand: 2/7/02 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 2/21/02 ) (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 289 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER Response to [288-1] motion for amended findings and [288-2] motion for reopening the record for additional evidence due 2/22/02 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 288 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by BANK UNITED (Service: 1/23/02) for amended findings , and for reopening the record for additional evidence . Response due: 2/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 287 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002
                                                                          CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated January 8, 2002, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 286 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002
                                                                            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiffs, Bank United, Bank United Corp. and Hyperion Partners L.P., recover of and from the United States the sum of $8,826,783.00. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be awarded to plaintiffs ("the prevailing party"). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 1/21/2004 (lld, ).[VACATED per court order of 01/20/04]
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 285 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [283-1] motion to advise the Court regarding the names of the entities in whose favor judgment should be entered pursuant to the Court's opinion and order of 10/29/01 and directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiffs Bank United, Bank United Corp. and Hyperion Partners L.P. in the amount of $8,826,783. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be awarded to plaintiffs ("the prevailing party"). ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002
                                                                                Case closed (LD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 284 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/21/01) to [283-1] motion to advise the Court regarding the names of the entities in whose favor judgment should be entered pursuant to the Court's opinion and order of 10/29/01. Reply due: 1/10/02. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 283 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 12/17/01 ) to advise the Court regarding the names of the entities in whose favor judgment should be entered pursuant to the Court's opinion and order of 10/29/01 . Response due: 1/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 282 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION. Based on the foregoing, plaintiffs are entitled to judgment in the amount of $8,826,783. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be awarded to plaintiffs ("the prevailing party"). Notwithstanding plaintiffs' entitlements, entry of judgment shall be withheld pending notification from the parties concerning the precise entity or entities in whose favor judgment should be entered. The parties are requested to confer concerning the precise names of the entities in whose favor judgment should be entered and to advise the court accordingly. Thereupon, judgment will be entered in favor of such designated entities. Based upon the foregoing disposition, all currently outstanding, unresolved motions are DECLARED TO BE MOOT: (1) mooting [280-1] motion regarding willingness to provide further briefing or to attend a conference; (2) mooting [271-1] motion to notify the Court of subsequent factual developments; (3) mooting [169-1] motion For Expedited Consideration; (4) mooting [167-1] motion to notify the court regarding Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file Plaintiffs' amended memorandum and this Court's April 21, 1999 Order; (5) mooting [158-2] motion for expedited consideration; (6) mooting [138-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply in support of its motion for bifurication of trial to resolve the scope of a pivotal contract-damages issue prior to a prolonged, GLENDALE type, lost profits trial; (7) mooting [137-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply in support of motion for bifurication of trial to resolve scope of a pivotal contract-damages issue prior to a prolonged, Glendale-type lost profits trial; (8) mooting [129-1] motion to Extend Time to file a reply to response to motion for summary judgment; (9) mooting [120-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for bifrcation of trial, etc.; (10) mooting [114-1] motion for clarification of the priority cases pretrial scheduling order; (11) mooting [113-1] joint motion for amendment to the pretrial schedule; (12) mooting [122-1] motion to Extend Time to file opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment upon Bank United's lost profits damages claim; (13) mooting [121-1] motion to Extend Time to file Plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on Bank United's lost profits damages claim; (14) mooting [104-1] motion in Limine; (15) mooting [101-1] motion for reassignment of assigned trial date and adjustment of pretrial schedule; (16) mooting [99-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation; (17) mooting [98-1] motion to Extend Time to file a motion to dismiss or for summary judgment; (18) mooting [92-1] motion for Leave to clarify motion for an enlargement of time to conduct expert discovery and to submit expert reports; (19) mooting [91-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct expert discovery and to submit expert reports; (20) mooting [89-1] motion to suplement the record concerning plaintiff's short-form motion for summary judgment; (21) mooting [86-1] motion to assign trial Judge; (22) mooting [59-1] motion for entry of order pursuant to the attached stipulation; (23) mooting [58-1] motion to Compel production of documents; (24) mooting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to July 30, 1997, to respond to reply in support of motion for partial summary judgment; (25) mooting [33-1] motion for Leave to File affidavit of Scott A. Shay and the reply affidavit of Salvatore A. Ranieri with facsimile signatures; (26) mooting [25-1] motion for a ruling upon its affirmative defense of accord and satisfaction; (27) mooting [22-1] motion for Leave to File an extension of time to provide a written response to requests; (28) mooting [14-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order; (29) mooting [13-1] motion for Leave File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures; (30) mooting [8-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures; and (31) mooting [7-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 281 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [280-1] motion regarding willingness to provide further briefing or to attend a conference. Service: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 280 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS (Service: 9/24/01) regarding willingness to provide further briefing or to attend a conference . Response due: 10/11/01. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 279 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [277-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 278 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                              RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 4/13/01) to [277-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. Reply due: 4/27/01. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 277 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001, Terminated: 4/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/11/01) for Leave to file supplemental authority . Response due: 4/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 276 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [274-1] motion for Leave to file out of time request for publication of the opinion and order filed 3/19/99 and order entered 7/2/99 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 275 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/5/01) to [274-1] motion for Leave to file out of time request for publication of the opinion and order filed 3/19/99 and order entered 7/2/99. Reply due: 4/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 274 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, et al. (Service: 3/19/01) for Leave to file out of time request for publication of the opinion and order filed 3/19/99 and order entered 7/2/99 . Response due: 4/5/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 273 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [271-1] motion to notify the Court of subsequent factual developments. Service: 9/20/00 (DS)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 272 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 9/8/00 ) to [271-1] motion to notify the Court of subsequent factual developments. Reply due: 9/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 271 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/1/00 ) to notify the Court of subsequent factual developments. Response due: 9/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 270 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Agreed Correction to the Trial Transcript by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 269 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/8/2000
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 7, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Trial Held
                                                                                                                  Final argument held ( Transcript due 3/8/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 268 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER rescheduling closing arguments at 9:30 a.m. on 2/7/00. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 266 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                      Post-trial reply brief by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS . Service: 1/14/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 265 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                        Post-trial reply brief by USA . Service: 1/14/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 264 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Final Exhibit list by USA. Service: 12/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 263 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                            First Amended Joint Trial Exhibit list by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, and USA. Service: 12/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 262 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Third Amended Exhibit list by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS. Service: 12/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 261 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                Post-trial brief by USA. Service: 12/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 260 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                  Post-trial brief by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS. Service: 12/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [255-1] motion for Leave to Receive certain exhibits into the evidentiary record of the case. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 259 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/13/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                      TRIAL EXHIBITS filed, taken at Washington, D.C., for the dates of September 13, 1999 through October 21, 1999. Defdendant's Exhibits: 860, 889, 907, 976A, 1022A, 1033, 1035, 1056, 1057A, 1118, 1132(A-B), 1137, 1155, 1162C, 1228, 1287, 1301-1302, 1318, 1329-1336, 1338-1348, 1350-1393, 1395, 1404-1406. Plaintiff's Exhibits: 301-307, 309-310, 313, 323, 326, 329, 331-336, 338-348, 350, 352, 354, 357-358, 360-363, 369, 371-372, 375, 380-381, 383-387, 389-393, 403, 414, 421, 424, 426-427, 432, 435, 439, 446-450, 460-461, 476, 479, 482-499, 507, 511-512, 519, 529, 538, 548, 562, 571(B-E), 572, 575-577, 579-580, 582-584, 587-592, 598, 600, 603-610, 612, 616, 618, 623-627, 630-633, 637-640, 642-644, 648-681, 682A, 683-708, 710-736, 738-741, 746-747, 749-750, 2003 (A-C), 2006, 2008, 2010 (A-B), 2012, 2013 (A-C), 2014, 2016, 2019-2022, 2024A, 2027, 2029, 2035-2036, 2038-2039, 2042-2048, 2055, 2058-2060, 2089. Joint Exhibit: 288. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 255 Filed: 12/1/1999, Entered: 12/4/1999, Terminated: 12/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, USA for Leave to Receive certain exhibits into the evidentiary record of the case. (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 257 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                          Trial Exhibits filed in Washington, D.C., September 13, 1999 through October 21, 1999. Joint Exhibits: 258-288; and Defendant's Exhibits: 739, 753-758, 758 (A-D), 759 (A), 760-764, 765 (A), 766-767, 768 (A), 769-771, 772 (A-B), 773-774, 775 (A-I), 776-778, 779 (A), 780-786, 787 (A), 788 (A), 789 (B), 790-793, 794 (A), 795-799, 800 (A), 801-806, 808-817, 819-821, 823-828, 831, 833-835, 836 (volume 4: entire binder), 837, 839-840, 841 (B), 842-843, 846-848, 850-853, 854 (A), 855-859, 861-867, 869-873, 875-876, 879-888, 890-897, 898 (A), 899-906, 908, 909 (A), 910-916, 917 (A), 918, 919 (A-C), 920-965, 966 (A), 967-1019, 1020 (A), 1021-1027, 1030-1032, 1034, 1036 (A), 1038-1044, 1046, 1081, 1097, 1107 (A), 1108, 1122, 1124, 1128 (A), 1129 (A), 1131 (A), 1132-1136, 1137 (A-C), 1138-1155, 1158-1159, 1161 (B), 1163 (B), 1164-1165, 1167, 1171-1174, 1177-1184, 1188-1189, 1196, 1198-1199, 1207, 1213, 1216-1228, 1238, 1240 (A), 1242, 1247-1250, 1251 (A), 1260-1268, 1270-1272, 1274-1278, 1280, 1283, 1285-1286, 1288, 1300, 1302-1303, 1306, 1309, 1311, 1315-1317, 1323, 1326, 1327 (A), 1328 (A), 1398, 1402-1403.Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 256 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 26 volumes, at Washington, D.C., for the dates of September 12, 1999 through October 21, 1999. Filed with cumulative index and Joint Exhibits: 1-18, 20-33, 39-40, 42-257. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 267 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 1/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying, without prejudice [252-1] motion for judgment based upon partial findings., denied as moot [207-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on liability issues . Final argument shall be conducted 10:00 a.m., 1/26/00 , at the Court of Federal Claims in Washington, DC ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                Post-trial oral argument scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on 1/26/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 253 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by USA re: the testimony of John R. Hall. Service: 10/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                    Trial held ( Transcript due 11/22/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 252 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/16/1999, Terminated: 10/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/11/99 ) for judgment based upon partial findings. Response due: 11/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 251 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Second Amended Exhibit list by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS. Service: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 250 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Joint Exhibit list by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 249 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            Second Amended Exhibit list by USA. Service: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 248 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/10/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: pretrial conference (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on September 2, 1999 . Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 247 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [183-1] motion for Leave to File the deposition transcripts of Neil Twomey, denying [208-1] motion in Limine to exclude certain expert exhibits and testimony, denying [216-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence of Professor Myers' substitute capital cost estimate, denying [215-1] motion in Limine to exclude Professor Myers' model on grounds that it's based on post-firrea benefits bestowed on Bank United, granting [214-1] motion in Limine to exclude testimony on non-breach regulatory actions related to the Hold-Separate Policy, denying [213-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence of Bank United's tax "Gross-Up" of it's alleged damages, denying [212-1] motion in Limine to Professor Myers's "Lost Profits" model, denying [220-1] motion in Limine to exclude any evidence related to Professor Myers' lost profits damages model that improperly seeks pre-judgment interest, denying [219-1] motion in limine to exclude all evidence by which Plaintiffs attempt to measure damages at the time of trial, instead of at the time of the implementation of Firrea, denying [218-1] motion in limine to exclude testimony regarding non-breach regulatory actions, mooting [245-1] motion regarding items to be discussed during the final pre-trial conference. Set Trial for 10:00 a.m., 9/13/99 in Courtroom 4 of the Court of Federal Claims. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 246 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 9/2/99) to [245-1] motion regarding items to be discussed during the final pre-trial conference. Reply due: 9/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 245 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/2/99) regarding items to be discussed during the final pre-trial conference . Response due: 9/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                      Pre-Trial Conference held ( Transcript due 10/4/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 244 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS to response to [208-1] motion in Limine to exclude certain expert exhibits and testimony. Service: 9/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 243 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to response to [207-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on liability issues. Service: 9/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 242 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [240-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 241 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 23, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 240 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999, Terminated: 9/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/31/99) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 239 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                  First Amended Exhibit list by USA. Service: 8/31/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 238 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/30/99) to [208-1] motion in Limine to exclude certain expert exhibits and testimony. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 237 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/30/99) to [207-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence on liability issues. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 236 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM (Amended Trial Exhibit List) by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS re: [180-1] exhibits list by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC. and BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. Service: 8/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 235 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [218-1] motion in limine to exclude testimony regarding non-breach regulatory actions. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 234 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [219-1] motion in limine to exclude all evidence by which Plaintiffs attempt to measure damages at the time of trial, instead of at the time of the implementation of Firrea. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 233 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [220-1] motion in Limine to exclude any evidence related to Professor Myers' lost profits damages model that improperly seeks pre-judgment interest. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 232 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [212-1] motion in Limine to exclude Professor Myers's "Lost Profits" model. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 231 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [213-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence of Bank United's tax "Gross-Up" of it's alleged damages. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 230 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [214-1] motion in Limine to exclude testimony on non-breach regulatory actions related to the Hold-Separate Policy. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 229 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [215-1] motion in Limine to exclude Professor Myers' model on grounds that it's based on post-firrea benefits bestowed on Bank United. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 228 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/30/99) to [216-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence of Professor Myers' substitute capital cost estimate. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 227 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to response to [183-1] motion for Leave to File the deposition transcripts of Ken Thorn, Neil Twomey, Stuart Root, and Lawrence White. Service: 8/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 226 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [223-1] motion for Leave to File out of time reply to response to motion for leave to file deposition transcripts. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 225 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 5, 1999 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Lack of Opposition by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS. Service: 8/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 222 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [221-1] motion for an order to require attendance of certain witnesses at trial (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999, Terminated: 8/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 8/25/99 ) for Leave to File out of time reply to response to motion for leave to file deposition transcripts. Response due: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [211-1] motion for Leave to take the testimony of Billy Wood out of turn (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 221 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999, Terminated: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 8/24/99 ) for an order to require attendance of certain witnesses at trial. Response due: 9/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 220 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/23/99 ) in Limine to exclude any evidence related to Professor Myers' lost profits damages model that improperly seeks pre-judgment interest. Response due: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/23/99 ) in limine to exclude all evidence by which Plaintiffs attempt to measure damages at the time of trial, instead of at the time of the implementation of Firrea. Response due: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/23/99 ) in limine to exclude testimony regarding non-breach regulatory actions. Response due: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 216 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/23/99) in Limine to exclude evidence of Professor Myers' substitute capital cost estimate . Response due: 9/9/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 215 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/23/99) in Limine to exclude Professor Myers' model on grounds that it's based on post-firrea benefits bestowed on Bank United . Response due: 9/9/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/23/99) in Limine to exclude testimony on non-breach regulatory actions related to the Hold-Separate Policy . Response due: 9/9/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/23/99) in Limine to exclude evidence of Bank United's tax "Gross-Up" of it's alleged damages . Response due: 9/9/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/23/99) in Limine to exclude Professor Myers's "Lost Profits" model . Response due: 9/9/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [203-1] motion to Quash subpoenas duces tecum. Further, Plaintiffs withdrew in open court their motion for an order to require attendance of certain witnesses at trial. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999, Terminated: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/23/99 ) for Leave to take the testimony of Billy Wood out of turn. Response due: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 210 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [203-1] motion to Quash subpoenas duces tecum. Service: 8/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 208 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS (Service : 8/23/99 ) in Limine to exclude certain expert exhibits and testimony. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/23/99) in Limine to exclude evidence on liability issues . Response due: 9/9/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument re: [203-1] motion to Quash subpoenas duces tecum by USA ( Transcript due 9/22/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 206 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/19/99 (by hand)) to [203-1] motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum. Reply due: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 p.m., 8/23/99 for [203-1] motion to quash subpoenas duces tecum. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 205 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 8/18/99 ) for a court order requiring the appearance at trial of certain witnesses. Response due: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999, Terminated: 8/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/13/99) to Quash subpoenas duces tecum . Response due: 8/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [199-1] motion for Leave to File status report. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 199 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999, Terminated: 8/13/1999 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/12/99 ) for Leave to File status report. (status report included) Response due: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings BENCH RULING, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 5, 1999 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER mooting [197-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental exhibits to motion for summary judgment upon Bank United's "Lost Profits" damages claim (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 196 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 200 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 7, 1999 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/5/99) for Leave to file supplemental exhibits to motion for summary judgment upon Bank United's "Lost Profits" damages claim , supplemental exhibits included. Response due: 8/19/99. (FE) Modified on 08/09/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA ( Transcript due 9/7/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Supplemental Volume of Exhibits by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (JT) Modified on 08/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [192-1] motion for Leave to file a supplemental volume of exhibits in support of second amended memorandum in opposition to motion for summary judgment on Bank United's lost profits damages claims. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/2/99 ) to [183-1] motion for Leave to File the deposition transcripts of Ken Thorn, Neil Twomey, Stuart Root, and Lawrence White. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999, Terminated: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service by hand: 8/2/99) for Leave to file a supplemental volume of exhibits in support of second amended memorandum in opposition to motion for summary judgment on Bank United's lost profits damages claims . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 191 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [187-1] motion to enter agreed order regarding Appendix G filings (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 190 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit list by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 Witness ListCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness list by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/26/99 (JT) Modified on 07/29/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999, Terminated: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, USA to enter agreed order regarding Appendix G filings. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Service: 7/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED MEMORANDUM by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS re: [109-1] motion for summary judgment by USA. (3 Separate Volumes of Exhibits) Service: 7/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [182-1] motion for Leave to file second amended memorandum in opposition to motion for summary judgment on lost profits damages claim and second amended statement of genuine issues and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact in opposition to motion for summary judgment on lost profits damages claim. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/23/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999, Terminated: 9/3/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 7/15/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File the deposition transcripts of Ken Thorn, Neil Twomey, Stuart Root, and Lawrence White. (depositions included) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999, Terminated: 7/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 7/21/99) for Leave to file second amended memorandum in opposition to motion for summary judgment on lost profits damages claim and second amended statement of genuine issues and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact in opposition to motion for summary judgment on lost profits damages claim . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS, filed together with a separate two volume appendix. Service by hand: 7/15/99. (FE) Modified on 07/15/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Trial Exhibit list by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS. Service by hand: 7/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness list by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS. Service by hand: 7/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting oral argument on Defendant's motion for summary judgment to 10:30 a.m., 8/5/99, and denying [108-1] motion for bifurcation. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA set at 10:30 a.m. on 8/5/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/6/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS re: [152-1] motion to Clarify by USA, [152-2] motion to Modify by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/18/99 (JT) Modified on 07/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 176 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REBUTTAL by USA re: [152-1] motion to Clarify by USA, [152-2] motion to Modify by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [174-1] motion for Leave to File a sur-rebuttal, granting [170-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply, denying [152-1] motion to Clarify, denying [152-2] motion to Modify. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 174 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999, Terminated: 7/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/25/99 ) for Leave to File a sur-rebuttal in support of its motion to clarify or modify the Court's 3/19/99 Opinion and Order and request for expedited consideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 173 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [171-1] motion for a status conference set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 7/7/99 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 172 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 6/29/99 ) to [171-1] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 7/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/24/99) for a status conference . Response due: 7/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 170 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 5/18/99) for Leave to file sur-reply to defendant's reply to response in opposition to motion to clarify or modify the Court's March 19, 1999 opinion and order . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 5/6/99) For Expedited Consideration . Response due: 5/24/99. (FE) Modified on 05/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 169 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [152-1] motion to Clarify, [152-2] motion to Modify. Service: 5/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 168 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 30, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 167 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/22/99 ) to notify the court regarding Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file Plaintiffs' amended memorandum and this Court's April 21, 1999 Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/10/99 (JT) Modified on 04/29/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS and HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 4/21/99) to [152-1] motion to Clarify and [152-2] motion to Modify. Reply due: 5/6/99. (FE) Modified on 05/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 166 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS. Service: 4/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 4/19/99 ) to [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (3 Separate Volumes of Exhibits). (JT) Modified on 04/27/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [162-1] motion for Leave to File amended memorandum in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and statement of genuine issues and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 162 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999, Terminated: 4/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 4/19/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File amended memorandum in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and statement of genuine issues and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact. Response due: 5/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 161 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 30, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 160 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER set trial of damages issues for 10:00 a.m., 9/13/99 , set pretrial conference for 10:30 a.m., 9/2/99 and set Plaintiff's Appendix G deadline to 7/15/99 and 7/26/99 for Defendant. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 159 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot [158-1] motion for Leave to File reply to Plaintiffs' sur-reply to Defendant's motion for enforcement. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/29/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 158 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999, Terminated: 3/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/29/99 ) for Leave to File reply to Plaintiffs' sur-reply to Defendant's motion for enforcement (reply included) and for expedited consideration. Response due: 4/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SURREPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to [151-1] motion reply by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [155-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to defendant's motion for enforcement of the court's order of February 3, 1999, and request for expedited consideration (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999, Terminated: 3/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 3/26/99 ) for Leave to file a sur-reply to defendant's motion for enforcement of the court's order of February 3, 1999, and request for expedited consideration . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 154 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part, denying in part [141-1] motion for enforcement of this Court's Order of 2/3/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 153 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM by USA. Service: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 152 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/5/99 - per amended certificate of service received on April 5, 1999) to Clarify or to Modify the Court's March 19, 1999 Opinion and Order (with appendix). Response due: 4/22/99 (HW) Modified on 04/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 151 Filed: 3/25/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [141-1] motion for enforcement of this Court's Order of 2/3/99, [141-2] motion requests for expedited consideration. Service by hand: 3/24/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 150 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting General Status conference on Damages for 10:30 a.m. 3/30/99 ; (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 149 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 3/19/99 ) to [141-1] motion for enforcement of this Court's Order of 2/3/99. Reply due: 3/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 148 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge James T. Turner . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 147 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION denying [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment, granting [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment and directing that this case be reassigned to Judge Turner, except for requests for clarification of this opinion, which will be considered by Chief Judge Smith and defendant's pending motion for enforcement of the February 5, 1999, order, which will be considered by Discovery Judge Miller. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [108-1] motion for Bifurcation, (filed together with separate appendix, volume 3, which is in 2 parts)(volume 3 is only volume to appendix)). Service: 3/5/99. (HW) Modified on 03/19/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 145 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment, (filed together with separate Supplemental appendix). Service: 2/11/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 144 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [142-1] motion for Leave to File Surreply., granting [140-1] motion for Leave to Substitute a corrected appendix, Volume 3 to Defendant's motion for bifurcation of trial., granting [139-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limitation., granting [136-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [141-2] motion requests for expedited consideration. Plaintiffs' response to [141-1] motion for enforcement of this Court's Order of 2/3/99 reset to 3/22/99 and Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 3/25/99 for [141-1] motion for enforcement of this Court's Order of 2/3/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 142 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999, Terminated: 3/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 3/12/99 ) for Leave to File Surreply. Response due: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 141 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999, Terminated: 3/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/12/99 ) for enforcement of this Court's Order of 2/3/99 and requests for expedited consideration. Response due: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 140 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/99 ) for Leave to Substitute a corrected appendix, Volume 3 to Defendant's motion for bifurcation of trial. Response due: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 139 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA out of time (Service : 3/5/99 ) for leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/26/99 ) to Extend Time to file reply in support of its motion for bifurication of trial to resolve the scope of a pivotal contract-damages issue prior to a prolonged, GLENDALE type, lost profits trial , (until March 5, 1999). Response due: 3/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/19/99 ) to Extend Time to file reply in support of motion for bifurication of trial to resolve scope of a pivotal contract-damages issue prior to a prolonged, Glendale-type lost profits trial , (until February 26, 1999). Response due: 3/22/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/11/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation , out of time. Response due: 3/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Partial Designation of Witnesses to be called at trial by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS. Service: 2/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Partial Designation of Witnesses to be called at trial by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS. Service: 2/9/99 (JT) Modified on 02/11/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/10/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 2/4/99 ) to [108-1] motion for Bifurcation. (2 Separate volumes of exhibits) Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [124-1] motion for Leave to Lodge Plaintiffs' briefs relating to this dispute with the discovery judge, denying [124-2] motion for Leave to file a short sur-reply memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for clarification of the priority cases pretrial scheduling order (and request that this motion be assigned to the discovery judge). ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part (Defendant shall have an adequate opportunity to depose any witness whose identity has been disclosed after discovery concluded), denying in part [105-1] motion in limine. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/10/99 for Plaintiffs to file a designation of any witnesses among the 13 whom they intend to call at trial. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [123-1] motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' brief relating to this discovery dispute with the discovery judge. By February 14, 1999, Plaintiffs shall deliver to defense counsel all the documents called for in Defendant's first request for production of documents nos. 59 and 60. Alternatively, plaintiffs may advise defense counsel in writing that they will not introduce any documentary or testimonial evidence relating to the matters covered by these requests during trial. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/99 ) to Extend Time to file a reply to response to motion for summary judgment [until February 11, 1999]. Response due: 2/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [105-1] motion in Limine and request for expedited consideration. Service: 2/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY by USA re: [114-1] motion for clarification of the priority cases pretrial scheduling order by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. Service: 1/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: In light of the recent revision to the trial date in this case, all pending motions to modify the pretrial and trial schedules that were originally filed prior to the court's announcement of the scheduling change on January 5, 1999 are denied as moot ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [104-1] motion in Limine, (filed by leave of the Judge). Service: 1/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999, Terminated: 2/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 1/27/99 ) for Leave to Lodge Plaintiffs' briefs relating to this dispute with the discovery judge and for Leave to file a short sur-reply memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for clarification of the priority cases pretrial scheduling order (and request that this motion be assigned to the discovery judge). Response due: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999, Terminated: 2/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/27/99 ) for Leave to File Plaintiffs' brief relating to this discovery dispute with the discovery judge. (Brief included) Response due: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/19/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/19/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 1/19/99 ) to [109-1] motion for Summary Judgment, (together with three separate volumes of exhibits), filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/2/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 1/19/99 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for bifrcation of trial, etc. , (until February 5, 1999). Response due: 2/5/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 1/15/99) to [105-1] motion in Limine and request for expedited consideration., [104-1] motion in Limine Reply due: 2/1/99 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to response to [114-1] motion for clarification of the priority cases pretrial scheduling order. Service: 1/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/4/99 ) to [114-1] motion for clarification of the priority cases pretrial scheduling order, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 12/23/98 ) for clarification of the priority cases pretrial scheduling order , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS, USA for amendment to the pretrial schedule , by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 1/11/99 ) to [105-1] motion in Limine and request for expedited consideration. Reply due: 1/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999, Terminated: 7/7/1999 Motion to BifurcateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/99 ) for Bifurcation of trial to resolve the scope of a pivotal contract-damages issue prior to a prolonged, GLENDALE-TYPE, LOST-PROFITS TRIAL, (filed together with separate two volume), filed by leave of the Judge. UNDER SEAL. Response due: 1/21/99 (HW) Modified on 01/15/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 1/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [107-1] motion for Leave to File, Out of Time, Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ACTING CHIEF JUDGE for Chief Judge Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999, Terminated: 8/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/8/98) for Summary Judgment upon Bank United's "Lost Profits" damages claims, (filed together with a separate two volume appendix). UNDER SEAL. Response due: 1/8/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 12/30/98 ) to Extend Time to file opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment upon Bank United's lost profits damages claim. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 1/11/99 (by hand)) to Extend Time to file Plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment on Bank United's lost profits damages claim. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999, Terminated: 1/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/7/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File, Out of Time, Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact. Response due: 1/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/4/99 ) to [101-1] motion for reassignment of assigned trial date and adjustment of pretrial schedule. Reply due: 1/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999, Terminated: 2/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/30/98 ) in Limine and request for expedited consideration. Response due: 1/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/98 ) in Limine (to exclude testimony on issues relating to a prior litigation, regarding which plaintiffs have refused to produce documents, etc.), together with separate appendix. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/11/99. (HW) Modified on 02/01/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/5/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [102-1] motion to Extend Time to file Appendix G materials. The Clerk is directed to return Plaintiffs' Appendix G papers which Plaintiffs filed on 12/28/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 01/05/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998, Terminated: 12/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 12/22/98 (by hand)) to Extend Time to file Appendix G materials. Response due: 1/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 12/22/98 (by hand)) for reassignment of assigned trial date and adjustment of pretrial schedule. Response due: 1/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [95-1] motion to Strike [93-1] motion response by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION (out of time) by USA (Service : 12/8/98 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation (by 9 pages). Response due: 12/28/98. (HW) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/2/98 ) to Extend Time to file a motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [until December 8, 1998]. Response due: 12/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 12/3/98 ) to [95-1] motion to Strike [93-1] motion response by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. Reply due: 12/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [94-1] motion to Extend Time to complete fact discovery until 11/25/98 and depose Kenneth Thorn no later than 1/8/99. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/03/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 12/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/24/98 ) to Strike [93-1] motion response by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. Response due: 12/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998, Terminated: 11/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/24/98 ) to Extend Time to complete fact discovery , (until November 25, 1998). Response due: 12/28/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to [95-1] motion to strike [93-1] motion response by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS reset to 12/11/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: 11/20/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (letter form) by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 11/12/98 ) to [91-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct expert discovery and to submit expert reports. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/98 ) for Leave to clarify motion for an enlargement of time to conduct expert discovery and to submit expert reports . Response due: 11/30/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/10/98 ) to Extend Time to conduct expert discovery and to submit expert reports , (until December 31, 1998). Response due: 12/11/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 10/23/98 ) [89-1] motion to suplement the record concerning plaintiff's short-form motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 11/6/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/8/98) to suplement the record concerning plaintiff's short-form motion for summary judgment , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/26/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 7/28/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Ky P. Ewing for HYPERION PARTNERS, attorney Ky P. Ewing for HYPERION HOLDINGS, attorney Ky P. Ewing for USAT HOLDINGS, INC., attorney Ky P. Ewing for BANK UNITED OF TEXAS Added Walter B. Stuart IV. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 7/24/98) to [86-1] motion to assign trial Judge. Reply due: 8/7/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/17/98 ) to assign trial Judge . Response due: 8/7/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to [84-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, together with two separate volumes of appendix, by USA to [70-1] memorandum (proposed order) by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Compel production of documents. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/6/98 for Plaintiffs to produce to the Defendant Document Nos. 107, 239, 289, 361 and 452 listed in Plaintiffs' 3/10/98 revised privilege log. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [68-1] motion to Compel production of documents. Service: 4/20/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [80-1] motion to file defendant's reply to plaintiffs' opposition to revised motion to compel under seal. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/23/1998, Terminated: 4/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/20/98 ) to file defendant's reply to plaintiffs' opposition to revised motion to compel under seal. Response due: 5/7/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to [75-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 4/17/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [77-1] motion to file under seal Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum, Supplemental Memorandum in Regard to Revised Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Proposed Order. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998, Terminated: 4/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/10/98 ) to file under seal Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum, Supplemental Memorandum in Regard to Revised Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Proposed Order. Response due: 4/27/98 (JT) Modified on 04/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998, Terminated: 1/8/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 4/9/98 ) to [68-1] motion to Compel production of documents. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/23/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 04/09/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by USA re: [68-1] motion to Compel production of documents by USA. Service: 4/7/98 (Response due 4/24/98) FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER OF APRIL 13, 1998. (JT) Modified on 04/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [73-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Plaintiffs' response time shall run from the date of service. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/09/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998, Terminated: 4/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/7/98 ) for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Response due: 4/24/98 FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER OF APRIL 13, 1998. (JT) Modified on 04/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/24/98 for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Regard to its Revised Motion to Compel Production of Documents. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan K. Heffron filed by plaintiffs in support of [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment [by leave of the judge]. FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by plaintiffs to defendant's "show cause" memorandum filed [by leave of the judge]. Service by hand: 3/31/98 FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed order granting plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment filed by plaintiffs [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED ORDER re: Defendant shall file a statement withdrawing, modifying or retaining Motion to Compel by 3/16/98 and Plaintiffs shall file a Response to [68-1] motion to Compel production of documents by 4/6/98. nunc pro tune, February 4, 1998. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998, Terminated: 4/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REVISED MOTION by USA to Compel production of documents FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 4/1/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [66-1] motion to file defendant's revised motion to compel production of documents under seal ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998, Terminated: 3/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/16/98 ) to file defendant's revised motion to compel production of documents under seal Response due: 4/2/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA. Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply AFFIDAVIT of Anthony J. Nocella by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Re: [61-1] motion response by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. Service 8/20/97 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second Reply AFFIDAVIT of Salvatore A. Ranieri by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Re: [61-1] motion response by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. Service 8/20/97 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 8/20/97 ) to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [46-1] motion for Leave to File response to Government's reply in support of its cross-motion for a ruling on its affirmative defense. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 2/3/98 ) for entry of order pursuant to the attached stipulation. Response due: 2/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to defendant's motion to compel documents ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: 1/6/1998, Terminated: 1/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS (Service by hand: 12/23/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to defendant's motion to compel documents [until April 6, 1998.] Response due: 1/6/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [54-1] motion to file their motion to compel production of documents under seal ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/12/97 ) to Compel production of documents . [IN CAMERA]. Response due: 12/29/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: 1/5/1998, Terminated: 12/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/12/97 ) to file their motion to compel production of documents under seal Response due: 12/29/97 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to response to [46-1] motion for Leave to File response to Government's reply in support of its cross-motion for a ruling on its affirmative defense. Service: 9/15/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/3/97 ) to [46-1] motion for Leave to File response to Government's reply in support of its cross-motion for a ruling on its affirmative defense. Reply due: 9/15/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS to [43-1] notice by USA Service by hand: 7/16/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/21/97 ) to [42-1] motion for Leave to File response to notice regarding a hearing on the motion to compel. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [48-1] motion to Withdraw [31-1] motion to Compel a further response to interrogatory 19-25, 29 and 35 of defendant's first set of interrogatories by USA; granting [47-1] motion for leave to respond to plaintiffs' motion leave to file a response to the Government's notice regarding a hearing on the motion to compel, granting [42-1] motion for Leave to File response to notice regarding a hearing on the motion to compel ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997, Terminated: 8/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/25/97 ) to Withdraw [31-1] motion to Compel a further response to interrogatory 19-25, 29 and 35 of defendant's first set if interrogatories by USA (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997, Terminated: 8/28/1997 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/21/97 ) for leave to respond to plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a response to the Government's notice regarding a hearing on the motion to compel Response due: 9/8/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997, Terminated: 2/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 8/20/97 ) for Leave to File response to Government's reply in support of its cross-motion for a ruling on its affirmative defense. Response due: 9/8/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Jay Hoffman Service : 8/13/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment filed [by leave of the judge] and placed IN CAMERA . Service by hand: 7/30/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS (Service by hand : 7/16/97 ) for Leave to File response to notice regarding a hearing on the motion to compel Response due: 7/30/97 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/25/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of that it will not seek a hearing upon its motion to compel, etc. by USA. Service: 7/11/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/24/97 ) to Extend Time to July 30, 1997, to respond to reply in support of motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 7/11/97 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC) Modified on 07/17/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [31-1] motion to Compel a further response to interrogatory numbers 19-25, 29 and 35 of defendant's first set if interrogatories by USA set at 2:00 7/7/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [31-1] motion to Compel a further response to interrogatory numbers 19-25, 29 and 35 of defendant's first set if interrogatories . Service: 6/23/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Salvatore A. Ranieri (Original signature) by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Re: [34-1] affidavit (Fascimile signature) by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS Service FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC) Modified on 06/18/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Scott A. Shay (Original signature) by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Re: [35-1] affidavit (Facsimile signature) by HYPERION PARTNERS, HYPERION HOLDINGS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., BANK UNITED OF TEXAS. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC) Modified on 06/18/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service BY HAND: 6/12/97 ) to [31-1] motion to Compel a further response to interrogatory numbers 19-25, 29 and 35 of defendant's first set of interrogatories Reply due: 6/23/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Anthony J. Nocella by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service 5/30/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Scott A. Shay by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service 5/30/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Salvatore A. Ranieri by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service 5/30/97 (CDC) Modified on 06/18/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 5/30/97 ) for Leave to File affidavit of Scott A. Shay and the reply affidavit of Salvatore A. Ranieri with facsimile signatures. Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 6/16/97 (CDC) Modified on 06/18/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS to response to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment. [IN CAMERA]. Service: 5/30/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 5/29/97 ) to Compel a further response to interrogatory numbers 19-25, 29 and 35 of defendant's first set if interrogatories . Response due: 6/16/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [28-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. Twenty extra pages (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/7/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/21/97 ) to [28-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/9/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997, Terminated: 5/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 5/16/97 By Hand) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 5/30/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [26-1] motion to extend time to file reply to motion for partial summary judgment and response to motion for a ruling on affirmative defense Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/30/97 for [25-1] motion for a ruling upon its affirmative defense of accord and satisfaction ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997, Terminated: 5/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS (Service : 4/30/97 ) to extend time to file reply to motion for partial summary judgment and response to motion for a ruling on affirmative defense (to May 30, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION together with APPENDIX (FILED UNDER SEAL) by USA (Service : 4/24/97) for a ruling upon its affirmative defense of accord and satisfaction . Response due: 5/12/97(FE) Modified on 05/07/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/24/97 ) to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 5/12/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to set forth defences in accordance with 5(d) of the Omnibus Case Management Order Response to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 4/24/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997, Terminated: 4/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/26/97 ) to Extend Time to set forth defences in accordance with 5(d) of the Omnibus Case Management Order , [until 4/24/97]. (AB) Modified on 04/10/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 3/10/97 ) for Leave to File an extension of time to provide a written response to discovery requests . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/27/97) to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 2/13/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 Additional DocumentationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Documentation [errata for short-form motion for partial summary judgment on liability] by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File Errata for Short Form Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (signed by Acting Chief Judge James F. Merow for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/14/1997, Terminated: 1/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 1/10/97 ) for Leave to File Errata for Short Form Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 1/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 12/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service by hand: 11/27/96 ) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of intention to file an amicus brief by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE ORDER IN 90-8c for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [8-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion for leave to file motion to adopt special case management procedures. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996, Terminated: 5/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion for leave to file motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Staying proceeding until litigation is concluded in Winstar (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER advising parties of special procedures to facilitate discovery, conserve resources and expedite disposition of cases (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos. Service: 8/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by BANK UNITED OF TEXAS, USAT HOLDINGS, INC., HYPERION HOLDINGS, HYPERION PARTNERS of related case(s). (90-8 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assigned to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39724. Answer due on 9/25/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?