STANDARD FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00478-DGS
District Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Standard Federal Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "STANDARD FEDERAL BANK"

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Louis Lublin +1 202 944 3560 lublin@blankrome.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tarek Sawi Tarek.Sawi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/26/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 10/14/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (166) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 155 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION for Leave to Withdraw Request for Costs by USA.Service: 12/14/04 by hand. Response due by 12/28/2004 (jat, )
    LREF
    Blank 154 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Affidavit
    AFFIDAVIT of Counsel in Support of Dft's Bill of Costs by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/15/2004.(jcp, )
      LREF
      Blank 153 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Memorandum
      MEMORANDUM in Support of Bill of Costs, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/15/2004.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 152 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: On 11/15/2004, dft submitted a memorandum in support of its bill of costs, a supporting affidavit of counsel, and an appendix. These materials are filed by leave of the court. The documents were prematurely filed, as a bill of costs is timely only during the period from when a judgment becomes "final" until 30 days thereafter. Dft is granted leave to file an amended bill of costs no earlier than 12/14/2004 and no later than 1/13/2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 151 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 150 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
            ORDER The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant based on the court's October 12, 2004 Decision. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 149 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Unpublished OpinionCourt Filing
              UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER Granting [132] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dls)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/14/2004. (vp1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt : Oral Argument held on 5/13/04. (lag, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 148 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 13, 2004 before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 147 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                      MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK, by leave of the Judge.Service: 5/5/04. Response due by 5/24/2004 (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 146 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                        ORDER: On 5/3/2004, pltf submitted for filing its motion for leave to file a notice of supplemental authority. Pltf's motion is filed by leave of the court. The [144] Dft's Motion for Leave to File, and [145] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File are granted. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 145 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 5/3/2004. Response due by 5/20/2004. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 144 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 4/30/2004. Response due by 5/17/2004. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 143 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [132] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages: Oral Argument shall be held on Thursday, 5/13/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 142 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek Sawi for USA Service: 04/19/2004.(lld, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 141 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                  RESPONSE to Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Damages by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/25/03.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 140 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Description not available
                                    REPLY BRIEF in Support of [132] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Damages filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/25/03.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 139 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Memorandum
                                      APPENDIX in Support of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgmnt Upon Damages, in Five (5) Large Separately Bound Volumes by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK, Filed per Order of 7/18/03. (jcp, ) Modified on 7/21/2003 (jcp, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 138 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [137] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File a 2,519 Page Appendix in Support of its Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, Exceedings the 50-Page Limitation Set by the Court's 2/8/02 Special Procedures Order. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 137 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003, Terminated: 7/18/2003 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Pltf's Appendix in Support of its Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by 2,519 pages by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK.Service: 7/11/03. Response due by 7/28/2003.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 136 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Proposed Additional Facts
                                            PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS in Support of its Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Damages by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 135 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [132] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Damages filed by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK. Reply due by 7/28/2003. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 134 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                RESPONSE to [133] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/20/03.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003, Terminated: 10/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment Upon Damages, Together with Four Large Seperately Bound Appendix Volumes by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/11/2003 (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [129] Dft's Motion for Leave to File 1) a 47-page motion for summary judgment on damages that exceeds the 40-page limitation and 2) a 2052-page appendix exceeding the 50-page limitation. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Hanrahan for UNITED STATES. Service: 6/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment and Appendix by 7 and 2002 pages by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/7/2003.(dw1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion(s) due by 6/20/2003. Plaintiff's Response due by 7/11/2003. Defnednat's Reply due by 7/25/2003. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (dw1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/21/03 before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane G. Sypolt : Status Conference held on 5/21/2003. (sms, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003
                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/20/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/21/2003 03:30 PM before Judge Diane G. Sypolt. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                      NOTICE of filing exhibits to April 18, 2003 Joint Status Report by The United States. Service: 4/18/03.(hw1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                        NOTICE of exhibits to joint status report (two volumes) by STANDARD FEDERAL BANK Service: 4/18/03.(hw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by The United States. Service: 4/18/03.(hw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2003.Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (dw1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Stipulation
                                                                              Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, re: Counts I,II,III,V,VI,VII and VIII. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Edward Louis Lublin (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                  UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [45-1] cross motion, granting in part, denying in part [44-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Fort Wayne and South Bend], granting in part, denying in part [43-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Niles], granting in part, denying in part [42-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Saginaw], granting in part, denying in part [41-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Detroit] . Plaintiff directed to file Response to [75-2] motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, VI, VII, and VIII by deadline of 1/31/03 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by James Louis Anderson Service :6/4/02 (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Transcript
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 22, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                        REPLY by USA to [115-1] response by STANDARD FEDERAL. Service: 5/17/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                          RESPONSE (MEMORANDUM) by STANDARD FEDERAL to [112-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 5/15/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE of intention to file opposition to Motion for Leave to file supplemental memorandum by STANDARD FEDERAL. Service: 5/2/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER to file Plaintiff's Notice of Intention to file opposition to defendant's motion for leave, etc. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by USA in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability regarding the principal supervisory agent's authority to contract in the Landmark and Niles transactions. Service: 5/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [110-1] motion for Leave to to file a supplemental memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability regarding the principal supervisory agent's authority (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002, Terminated: 5/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand : 4/25/02 ) for Leave to to file a supplemental memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment on liability regarding the principal supervisory agent's authority . Response due: 5/9/02 (AB)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 5/22/02 for [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [45-1] cross motion, [44-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Fort Wayne and South Bend], [43-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Niles], [42-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Saginaw], [41-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Detroit] (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Response
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to the Court's invitation to conduct an informal one-day hearing concerning liability. Service: 3/22/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 21, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/21/02 ) to [104-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. Reply due: 4/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER reset Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. 3/21/02 , in the U.S. Court of Federal Claims, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                Hearing held ( Transcript due 4/22/02 ) (DS) Modified on 04/03/2002
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service: 3/18/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority . Response due: 4/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER directing Clerk's Office to return plaintiff's motion for leave unfiled (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Response
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [99-1] memorandum by STANDARD FEDERAL. Service: 3/7/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER resetting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 3/19/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                          JOINT Summary of primary arguments filed pursuant to the order of February 8, 2002. (DS)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by STANDARD FEDERAL re: [97-4] order. Service: 2/21/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to Standard Federal Bank's memorandum filed on 2/21/02, due by 3/7/02 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [86-1] motion for Leave to file memorandum following the Federal Circuit's decision in Cal Fed Defendant's response to memorandum due 3/7/02 and Plaintiff's memorandum due 2/21/02 , Parties joint summary, not to exceed 15 pages including appendices, due 2/28/02 , and Status Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 3/19/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                    CASE reassigned to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt . (DS)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 02/05/2002
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/05/2002
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 2/5/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                          SEE NO. 95-518C FOR TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: hearing held on July 27, 2001. (DS) Modified on 02/05/2002
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                            Hearing held ( Transcript due 8/27/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                              Hearing on defendant's motion for telephonic discovery conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 7/27/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the parties to confer and agree on a time for the telephonic discovery conference. Parties to notify the Court by 7/31/01 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [89-1] motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Service by hand: 7/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service: 7/19/01) to [89-1] motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Reply due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/19/01) for Telephonic Discovery Conference . Response due: 8/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/3/01 ) to [86-1] motion for Leave to file memorandum following the Federal Circuit's decision in Cal Fed. Reply due: 5/17/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                          IDENTIFICATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by STANDARD FEDERAL. Service: 5/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001, Terminated: 2/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service: 4/19/01) for Leave to file memorandum following the Federal Circuit's decision in Cal Fed . Response due: 5/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [75-2] motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, VI, VII, and VIII . Service: 1/23/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [81-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of correction of the telephone number by Edward Louis Lublin. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Edward Louis Lublin (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001, Terminated: 2/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/23/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation , (by 8 pages). Response due: 2/9/01. (FE) Modified on 01/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix (Filed by leave of the Judge) in support of opposition to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss by STANDARD FEDERAL. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by STANDARD FEDERAL to [74-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/22/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service: 12/22/00) to [75-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [75-2] motion to Dismiss I, II, III, V, VI, VII, and VIII. Reply due: 1/8/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service : 11/16/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and to dismiss [until December 26, 2000] and For leave to exceed the page limitation. Response due: 12/4/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/18/00 ) to [73-1] motion for Leave to File response to Defendant's motion to exceed the page limitation in Defendant's dispositive motion on liability. Reply due: 10/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, VI, VII, and VIII. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service : 10/4/00 ) for Leave to File response to Defendant's motion to exceed the page limitation in Defendant's dispositive motion on liability. Response due: 10/23/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas P. Reilly Service : 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                            See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/17/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to RESPONSE to [65-1] notice by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/8/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by STANDARD FEDERAL to [65-1] notice by USA. Service: 8/21/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [63-1] motion to Stay proceedings in this case. Service: 8/13/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority with the Court by USA. Service: 8/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service: 7/30/98 ) to [63-1] motion to Stay proceedings in this case. Reply due: 8/14/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/14/98 ) to Stay proceedings in this case . Response due: 8/4/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SURREPLY to REPLY by USA to [58-1] response by STANDARD FEDERAL. Service: 5/29/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [60-1] motion to Extend Time to file sur-reply to plaintiff's proposed orders as to its motions for partial summary judgment on liability. ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998, Terminated: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/98 ) to Extend Time to file sur-reply to plaintiff's proposed orders as to its motions for partial summary judgment on liability. Response due: 6/8/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by STANDARD FEDERAL to [56-1] response and request for discovery in the Landmark and People's transactions by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by STANDARD FEDERAL to [56-1] response and consent to entry of summary judgment on liability in the Indiana transaction by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by STANDARD FEDERAL to [56-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [55-1] response by STANDARD FEDERAL Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 2/6/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by STANDARD FEDERAL to [54-1] response by USA to Standard's Motion for Summary Judgment in the Indiana and Peoples Transactions and Proposed Orders Entering Liability in each transaction. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by STANDARD FEDERAL to [54-1] response by USA as to Standard's Motion for Summary Judgment in the Niles and Landmark transactions. Service: 3/31/98 (also includes proposed orders) (CDC) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [45-1] cross motion . Service: 8/14/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time to August 15, 1997, to reply in support of its cross-motions for partial summary judgment. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/15/97 for [45-1] cross motion ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Marian Blank Horn for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997, Terminated: 8/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/25/97 ) to Extend Time to August 15, 1997, to reply in support of its cross-motions for partial summary judgment. Response due: 8/11/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by STANDARD FEDERAL to response to [44-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Fort Wayne and South Bend], [43-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Niles], [42-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Saginaw], [41-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Detroit], by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment, Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/20/97 for [45-1] cross motion, reset to 6/20/97 for [44-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Fort Wayne and South Bend], reset to 6/20/97 for [43-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Niles], reset to 6/20/97 for [42-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Saginaw], reset to 6/20/97 for [41-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Detroit] ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997, Terminated: 6/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service: 5/29/97) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment, (until June 20, 1997). Response due: 6/16/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of supplemental filing pursuant to Paragraph 5.d of the Omnibus Case Management Order by USA. Service: 4/30/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 3/3/97) and RESPONSE to [44-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Fort Wayne and South Bend] by STANDARD FEDERAL, [43-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Niles] by STANDARD FEDERAL, [42-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Saginaw] by STANDARD FEDERAL, [41-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Detroit] by STANDARD FEDERAL. Response due: 4/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [45-1] cross motion reset to 4/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service BY HAND: 12/31/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Fort Wayne and South Bend] and one volume of exhibits. Response due: 1/28/97 (FE) Modified on 01/03/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service BY HAND: 12/31/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Niles] and one volume of exhibits. Response due: 1/28/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service BY HAND: 12/31/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Saginaw] and one volume of exhibits. Response due: 1/28/97 (FE) Modified on 01/03/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service BY HAND: 12/31/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability: [Detroit] and one volume of exhibits. Response due: 1/28/97 (FE) Modified on 01/03/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Frank Jefferson Hughes Service : 10/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set Scheduling Conference for 9:00 a.m. on 7/31/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Agnes Marie Brown (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by STANDARD FEDERAL to the court's [31-2] order, setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96. [Filed as: "Plaintiff's Opposition to Modification of Court Order."] Service: 6/14/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to File status report and status report and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Leave to File a response to motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996, Terminated: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service : 5/9/96 ) for Leave to File a response to motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/26/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/19/96) for Modification of Court's [21-1] Protective Order . Response due: 5/6/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [26-1] motion for Modification of Court's [21-1] Protective Order set to 5/6/96 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated 4/1/96 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996, Terminated: 4/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/3/96 ) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated 4/1/96 . Response due: 4/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/28/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [14-1] order. Service: 2/14/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [16-1] motion to file response to 1/29/96 order out of time (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996, Terminated: 2/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/96) to file response to 1/29/96 order out of time . Response due: 3/4/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by STANDARD FEDERAL to [14-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing parties to review the proposed protective order and contact the court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER the court will consider issuing a protective order and invite comment from the parties on this point ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by STANDARD FEDERAL Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [10-1] order. Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER entered directing parties to advise court by 11/30/95 whether parties should await for decision in WINSTAR 90-8C. (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing counsel to begin considering how to proceed once Supreme Court enters a decision in Winstar case (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney Gregory Paul Schaffer for STANDARD FEDERAL. Added Edward Louis Lublin (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995, Terminated: 10/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL (Service: 10/11/95) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Gregory Paul Schaffer for STANDARD FEDERAL Added Edward Louis Lublin . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay proceeding pending the decision of the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in WINSTAR CORP. v. UNITED STATES ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995, Terminated: 8/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by STANDARD FEDERAL, USA (Service : 8/11/95 ) to Stay proceeding pending the decision of the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in WINSTAR CORP. v. UNITED STATES . Response due: 8/28/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Agnes Marie Brown Service: 8/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER. Parties' Status report re: impact of the Federal Circuit's en banc opinion on case due on 8/11/95 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copies to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39740. Answer due on 9/25/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?