ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00488-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gomberg, Sharfman, Gold and Ostler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Jay Sharfman +1 312 332 6194
No Logo JOHN G. YEDINAK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gomberg, Sharfman, Gold and Ostler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Jay Sharfman +1 312 332 6194
No Logo MICHAEL EDELSTEIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gomberg, Sharfman, Gold and Ostler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Jay Sharfman +1 312 332 6194
No Logo SERGIO MARTINUCCI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gomberg, Sharfman, Gold and Ostler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Jay Sharfman +1 312 332 6194
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ashley Nicole Bailey +1 202 626 3900 +1 202 626 3961
Office COFC
Filed 7/31/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 4/10/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 47 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii).(dls, )
    LREF
    Blank 46 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/5/03) to Dismiss . Response due: 3/24/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 45 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER Hearing on discovery issues is set for 10:00 a.m. on 3/19/03 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 44 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 43 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
          REPLY by USA to response to [38-1] motion to Compel. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/4/03 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 42 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: discovery documents. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 41 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [40-1] motion for Leave to file response to motion to compel (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 40 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003, Terminated: 1/28/2003 Terminated:
                MOTION by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN (Service : 1/21/03 ) for Leave to file response to motion to compel . Response due: 2/10/03 (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 39 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Remark
                  Certificate of service showing service of defendant's motion to compel on the correct attorney of record on January 2, 2003. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 38 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 12/20/02) to Compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories. Response due: 1/6/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                      MOTION by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS (Service: 11/6/02) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 11/14/02. Response due: 11/25/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by USA to response to [33-1] motion for continuance as to Plaintiffs' "short-form" motion for partial summary judgment on liability. Service: 7/29/02. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ashley Nicole Bailey. Service: 7/25/02. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS (Service: 7/19/02) to [33-1] motion for continuance as to Plaintiffs' "short-form" motion for partial summary judgment on liability. Reply due: 8/5/02. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/8/02) for continuance as to Plaintiffs' "short-form" motion for partial summary judgment on liability . Response due: 7/25/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delfa Castillo. Service: 2/8/01. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000
                                    NOTICE of Opt Out of Third Thirty Cases by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN. Service: 5/23/00 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN Service: 4/28/99 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of Opt Out of Second Thirty Cases by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN. Service: 4/1/99 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8). ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Glenn Irwin Chernigoff. Service : 7/30/98. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/16/98) to Stay proceedings, etc. (until this case enters discovery in accordance with the Master Litigation Plan. Response due: 8/6/98. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY by USA to response to [19-1] motion to Stay all motions practice and discovery, [19-2] motion to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing. Service: 7/10/98 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service : 7/13/98. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/9/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998
                                                    RESPONSE by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN (Service: 7/2/98 ) to [19-1] motion to Stay all motions practice and discovery, or, in the alternative motion for enlargement of time for a consolidated filing of briefs. Reply due: 7/20/98 (CDC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to File Objection to Defendnt's Motion for Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion for Enlargement of Time for a Consolidated Filing of Briefs. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998, Terminated: 7/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN (Service : 6/25/98 ) for Leave to File Objection to Defendnt's Motion for Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion for Enlargement of Time for a Consolidated Filing of Briefs. (Objection attached) Response due: 7/13/98 (JT) Modified on 06/29/1998
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/1/98 ) to Stay all motions practice and discovery or, in the alternative, to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing [to September 2, 1998]. Response due: 6/18/98 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Peebles Sholar Jr. Service : 6/1/98 (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                              SHORT FORM MOTION by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN (Service : 4/2/98 ) for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability. 2 Separate Volumes of Appendix Response due: 6/1/98 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Cheryl Coombe Service : 10/4/96 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Steven Jay Abelson (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS (Service: 5/8/96) to [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action. Reply due: 5/20/96 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File to respond to motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996, Terminated: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS, JOHN G. YEDINAK, SERGIO MARTINUCCI, MICHAEL EDELSTEIN (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File to respond to motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision and directing parties to file a status report on or before 30 days after decision (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt0. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Status Report
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by ARGO FEDERAL SAVINGS. Service: 10/15/95 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995, Terminated: 10/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/13/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Jay Abelson Service: 8/22/95 (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Complaint
                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39766. Answer due on 9/29/95. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 401 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?