PALFED, INC., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00496-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PALFED, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary C. Gill +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 253 8192 mary.gill@alston.com
No Logo PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary C. Gill +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 253 8192 mary.gill@alston.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sullivan, Edward +1 856 482 2010
Office COFC
Filed 8/3/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 7/30/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5001'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (127) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 124 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [121] Notice of Appeal filed by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 123 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004, Terminated: 11/18/2004 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 05-5001 for [121] Notice of Appeal filed by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 122 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Terminated:
      CAFC Appeal Fees received $255, receipt number 061479 re [121] Notice of Appeal filed by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 121 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Terminated:
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee due, not submitted with the Notice of Appeal. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 120 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that teh complaint is dismissed. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 119 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Court Filing
            PUBLISHED OPINION AND FINAL JUDGMENT granting the [50] Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts I and VI filed by USA, and denying as moot the [45] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 118 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Terminated:
              MOTION for Status Conference by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA.Service: 6/18/2004. Response due by 7/6/2004 (hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 117 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 RemarkCourt Filing
                Letter dated 12/8/03 from Alston & Bird, LLP. Filed by leave of the Judge. (jat, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 116 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 LetterCourt Filing
                  Letter to Judge Braden from Edward P. Sullivan as supplemental appellate authority supporting: i) dft's motion for summary judgment as to counts I and VI of pltfs' complaint; ii) dft's opposition to pltfs' motion for partial summary judgment on liability for breach of contract; and iii) dft's supplemental brief regarding liability. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 9/17/2003. (jb1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 115 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Susan Braden. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 114 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any cases if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Susan Braden. Judge James F. Merow no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 113 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                          SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to [100] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Causation and Palmetto's Wounded Bank and Woodside Damage Claim by PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/2/03.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 112 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 ~Notice (other)
                            Volume II Appendix to Motions for Summary Judgment on Damages by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/7/03.(dw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 111 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [101] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/7/03.(dw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 110 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [102] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/7/03.(dw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 109 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                  RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PALFED, INC. Service: 6/18/03.(hw1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 108 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                    RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA. Service: 6/18/03.(hw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 107 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to [101] MOTION for Summary Judgment, and [102] MOTION for Summary Judgment (together with a separate four volume appendix) filed by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA. Reply due by 7/3/2003. Service: 6/18/03.(hw1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 106 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER denying [96] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jat, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 105 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [104] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions for Summary Judgment Damages and granting [104] Motion to Withdraw the May 14, 2003 motion for extension of time. Response due by 6/19/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 104 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003, Terminated: 5/21/2003 Terminated:
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions for Summary Judgment on Damages, (until June 19, 2003), and MOTION to Withdraw plaintiffs May 14, 2003 Motion for Extension of time by PALFED, INC. and PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA.Service by hand: 5/21/03. Response due by 6/4/2003. (dw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 103 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Terminated:
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment on damages by Defendant,until 7/31/03, by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA.Service: 5/13/03. Response due by 5/30/2003 (vro, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 102 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment on Mitigation Damage Claims (together with a separate appendix) by The United States.Service: 4/21/03. Response due by 5/22/2003 (hw1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment on causation and Palmetto's Wounded Bank and Woodside damage claims by The United States.Service: 4/21/03. Response due by 5/22/2003 (hw1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/21/03.(hw1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [93] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by 30 pages. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (hw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003, Terminated: 6/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's 3/4/03 supplemental response to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file deposition testimony, by The United States. Service: 4/8/03. Response due 4/25/2003. (lrd)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          REPLY to Response to [93]MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of summary judgment motion by 40 pages. filed by The United States. Service: 4/7/03.(dls, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY to Response to [93]MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of summary judgment motion by 40 pages. filed by The United States. Service: 4/7/03.(dls, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [84] Motion for Leave to File filed by PALFED, INC. and PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/27/03.(dw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [93] MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of summary judgment motion by 40 pages filed by PALFED, INC. and PALMETTO FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK OF SOUTH CAROLINA, by leave of the Judge.Reply due by 4/10/2003. Service: 3/27/03.(dw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of summary judgment motion by 40 pages by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. Response due by 4/4/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Response
                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file deposition testimony filed by The United States. Service: 3/14/03. (lrd).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                      NOTICE of Appendix E by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL pursuant to 2/27/03 Order. Service: 2/27/03 (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [87-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority, granting [84-1] motion for Leave to file deposition testimony, granting [81-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                          RESPONSE by PALFED, INC. (Service: 1/31/03) to [87-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. Reply due: 2/14/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            REPLY by PALFED, INC. to response to [87-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. Service: 1/16/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003, Terminated: 2/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/14/03) for Leave to file supplemental authority . Response due: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Transcript
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 12, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/3/03) to [84-1] motion for Leave to file deposition testimony. Reply due: 1/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service : 12/23/02 ) for Leave to file deposition testimony . (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot [54-1] motion for Sanctions and [43-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                        Oral Argument held ( Transcript due 1/13/03 ) (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                          RESPONSE by PALFED, INC. to [76-1] notice by PALFED, INC. Service: 12/3/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 11/27/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority in further support of the motion for summary judgment. Response due: 12/16/02. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                              REPLY by PALFED, INC. to [77-1] response by USA. Service: 11/14/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Oral argument on pending motions set for 2:00 p.m. on 12/12/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                  Stipulation by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL and USA of Dismissal as to Counts II, III, IV, V and VII. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [76-1] notice by PALFED, INC. Service: 10/31/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE of supplemental authority by PALFED, INC. Service: 9/27/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER setting oral argument for 2:00 p.m. on 12/4/02 , Response to [49-1] motion to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VII and [43-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents due 11/12/02 , and Reply to Response to Motion [49-1] motion to Dismiss II, III, IV, V and VII due 11/25/02 for [43-1] to Compel Production of Documents (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [72-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority and granting [62-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply to motion for partial summary judgment on liability as to breach of contract (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Response
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL to Defendant's 6/25/02 and 8/6/02 Supplemental Briefs re: Liability-Related Issues. Service: 8/22/02 (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002, Terminated: 9/20/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/6/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 8/23/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [69-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental brief regarding liability issues Response to Supplemental Brief due 8/23/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by PALFED, INC. (Service: 7/11/02) to [69-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental brief regarding liability issues. Reply due: 7/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002, Terminated: 7/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/25/02) for Leave to file supplemental brief regarding liability issues . Response due: 7/12/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION for a status conference . (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                        CASE reassigned to Sr. Judge James F. Merow . (DS)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [62-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply to motion for partial summary judgment on liability as to breach of contract. Service: 3/12/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service: 2/26/01 ) to [62-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply to motion for partial summary judgment on liability as to breach of contract. Reply due: 3/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL to response to [54-1] motion for Sanctions. Service: 2/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/8/01) for Leave to file a surreply to motion for partial summary judgment on liability as to breach of contract . Response due: 2/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/26/01 ) to [54-1] motion for Sanctions. Reply due: 2/9/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [50-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and VI. Service: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [49-1] motion to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VII. Service: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [50-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and VI filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                              SUPPLMENENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Darrell R. Rains filed by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL [by leave of the judge]. Service 12/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [49-1] motion to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VII filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001, Terminated: 12/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service: 1/9/01) for Sanctions for failure to respond to discovery requests. Response due: 1/26/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL to response to [45-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Service: 1/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/12/00 ) to [45-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 12/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 12/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and VI. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss Counts II, III, IV, V and VII. Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Darrell R. Rains by PALFED, INC. and PALMETTO FEDERAL. Service: 10/6/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PALFED, INC. and PALMETTO FEDERAL. Service: 10/6/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PALFED, INC. and PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service: 10/6/00) for Partial Summary Judgment , filed with a (3) three volume appendix labeled A thru C. Response due: 11/6/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service: 3/3/00 ) to [43-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents. Reply due: 3/17/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/24/00) to Compel Production of Documents Response due: 3/13/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000, Terminated: 2/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service : 2/1/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Phase II case-specific interrogatories (10 days) filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Phase II case-specific interrogatories until February 14, 2000. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Pursuant to paragraph 15 of the 4/14/98 Amended Master Protective Order the document entitled "Declaration of S. Lynn Stokes" shall be returned until further order of the Court (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Edward Sullivan. Service : 8/2/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing the Clerk to return to Defendant the Notice of Appearance because the certificate of service indicates service on the wrong attorney with the wrong law firm. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service : 7/30/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Charles T. Lester for PALMETTO FEDERAL, PALFED, INC. Added Mary Catherine Gill. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/96) for Leave to File Proposed Pretrial Order . Response due: 9/3/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL (Service: 8/9/96 ) to [32-1] motion for Leave to File motion for relief from 6/6/96 order and response to defendant's motions to strike and for an enlargement of time. Reply due: 8/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/2/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to file motion for relief and response to motion to strike and for an enlargement [to August 9, 1996]. Response due: 8/19/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PALFED, INC. (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File motion for relief from 6/6/96 order and response to defendant's motions to strike and for an enlargement of time by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/8/96) to Strike or respond to plaintiff's 6/17/96 letter and to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [to September 3, 1996] by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Elizabeth Wells Newsom (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Staying pending decision in Winstar (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests, granting [23-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to production of documents 11-14 and 16-18, reset Interrogatories deadline to 6/10/96 and reset Request for Production of Documents deadline to 6/19/96 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Leave to File facsimile signature (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996, Terminated: 6/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/31/96) for Leave to File facsimile signature . Response due: 5/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996, Terminated: 6/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/30/96) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [to June 10, 1996] and to Extend Time to respond to production of documents 11-14 and 16-18 [to June 19, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report and reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 6/3/96 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996, Terminated: 5/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PALFED, INC. (Service: 5/6/96) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report [to June 1, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/29/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 3/21/96. (JPSR due 5/8/96). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/19/96) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PALFED, INC. (Service: 2/14/96) to [14-1] motion to Stay telephone conference and [14-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [14-1] motion to Stay telephone conference, granting [14-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 3/21/96 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996, Terminated: 2/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/2/96) to Stay telephone conference or to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to March 21, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint, granting [12-2] motion to Stay telephone conference, reset Answer deadline to 2/5/96 and reset Telephone Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 3/5/96 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/11/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to February 5, 1995] and to Stay telephone conference . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [5-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar ; set Answer deadline to 12/21/95 , and set Telephone Conference for 2:30 p.m., on 1/23/96 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar . Service: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File reply to motion for stay out of time ; reply Brief deadline to 11/15/95 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Wells Newsom. Service: 11/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995, Terminated: 11/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 11/6/95) for Leave to File reply to motion for stay out of time . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by PALFED, INC. (Service: 10/18/95) to [5-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar. Reply due: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995, Terminated: 11/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/2/95) to Stay pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dorann Elise Banks Service: 8/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by PALFED, INC., PALMETTO FEDERAL of related case(s). (90-8 C,92-577 C,90-981 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39794. Answer due on 10/2/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?