PERPETUAL FINANCIAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00497-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Perpetual Financial Corp., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by moneylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Burton L. Raimi +1 941 957 0733 +1 941 957 0449 burt@moneylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tonia June Tornatore +1 202 305 7562 +1 202 305 7643 tonia.tornatore@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellis Merritt, Jr. +1 214 754 0098
Office COFC
Filed 8/3/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 6/25/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (143) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 133 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff's Amended Complaint and plaintiff-intervenor's Complaint are dismissed for lack of standing. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 132 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION concluding plaintiff's Amended Complaint and plaintiff-intervenor's Complaint are dismissed for lack of standing. Remaining motions are dismissed as moot. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 131 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Court Filing
      PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION. For the foregoing reasons. Perpetual Financial's Amended Complaint and the plaintiff-intervenor FDIC's Complaint are dismissed for lack of standing. Accordingly, Perpetual Financial's April 3, 1998 Motion for Summary Judgment on Contract Issues, the Government's July 29, 2003 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Contract Issues, and all other outstanding motions hereby are dismissed as moot. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 130 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [127] Pltf's Motion to Extend the Order Postponing Discovery. This stay of discovery is hereby extended. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 129 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [127] Pltf's MOTION for a Postponement of Expert Discovery, filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 4/29/2004.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 128 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Response to Motion
            OPPOSITION to [127] Pltf's MOTION for a Second Postponement of Expert Discovery, filed by USA. Reply due by 5/10/2004. Service: 4/26/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 127 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004, Terminated: 5/7/2004 Terminated:
              MOTION to Extend the Order Postponing Discovery, by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 4/20/2004. Response due by 5/7/2004. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 126 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Terminated:
                Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Ellis Merritt, Jr. in place of Mary Ann McNamar by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 2/20/2004. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 125 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [122] Motion to postpone expert discovery and depositions. Plaintiff's expert depositions and related discovery and document review are hereby postponed for a period of 60 days, within whivh time the court anticipates issuing a decision on the pending dispositive motions. At the time the opinion is issued, the court will advise the parties regarding a schedule for further discovery, if necessary. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 124 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [122] Pltf's MOTION to a Postpone Expert Discovery and Depositions filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 123 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Response to Motion
                      OPPOSITION to [122] Pltf's MOTION to Postpone Expert Discovery and Depositions filed by USA. Reply due by 2/11/2004. Service: 1/28/2004.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 122 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004, Terminated: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                        MOTION to Postpone Expert Discovery and Depositions by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 1/14/2004. Response due by 2/2/2004. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 121 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Response
                          REPLY to [119] Dft's Response to Submissions Made Pursuant to the Court's Request During the Hearing Held 11/12/2003 filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 12/17/03.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 120 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Dft's RESPONSE to [116] Pltf's Submission Made Pursuant to the Court's Request During the Hearing Held November 12, 2003, by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Together with Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Response) [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 12/9/03. Response due by 1/2/2004. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 120 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE to [117] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Pltf's Submission Made Pursuant to the Court's Request in the Hearing Held November 12, 2003 filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Together with a Motion to Reply to Dft's Response) [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 12/29/2003. Service: 12/9/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 119 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Response
                                RESPONSE to [116] Pltf's Submission Made Pursuant to the Court's Request During the Hearing Held November 12, 2003, filed by USA. Service: 12/3/03.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 118 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [117] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Response to Pltf's Post-Hearing Submission. In addition, pltf may file a response to dft's submission, and/or reply to dft's resposne, by 12/22/2003. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 117 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003, Terminated: 12/8/2003 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Pltf's Submission Made Pursuant to the Court's Request in the Hearing Held November 12, 2003 by USA.Service: 12/3/03. Response due by 12/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 116 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Memorandum
                                      SUBMISSION Made Pursuant to the Court's Request During the November 12, 2003 Hearing by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 11/24/03.(jat, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Oral Argument held on 11/12/2003. (jb1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 115 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 12, 2003 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (hw1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 114 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/SUBMISSION Pursuant to the Court's Request in the 11/12/2003 Hearing, to Supplement the Appendix to the Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Service: 11/14/03.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003
                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/17/2003. (vp1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 113 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY to Pltf's Response to [109] Dft's MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Judith E. McCaffrey in its Entirety and to Strike the Portions of the Affidavits of Ross Towne and Gilbert DeLome That Contain Inadmissable Hearsay, filed by USA. Service: 11/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                  RESPONSE to [109] MOTION to Strike filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 11/3/2003. Service: 10/22/03.(jat, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [19] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment, and [62] Dft's Motion to Dismiss: Oral Argument set for 11/12/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Description not available
                                                      REPLY in Support of [87] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [19] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment with Appendix filed by USA. Service: 10/9/03.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Judith E. McCaffrey Submitted With the Reply of Pltf, Perptual Financial Corporation, to its Motion for Summary Judgment, by USA.Service: 10/9/03. Response due by 10/27/2003. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 29, 2003 before Judge Susan Braden. (dw1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                            Proposed Agenda for status conference scheduled for September 29, 2003 by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/24/03.(dw1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [102] Motion for Leave to File Proposed Agenda and denying [105] Motion to Strike [102] MOTION for Leave to File proposed agenda for September 29, 2003 status conference. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                MOTION to Strike [102] MOTION for Leave to File proposed agenda for September 29, 2003 status conference by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge.Service: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/14/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003
                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/14/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                    RESPONSE to [87] CROSS MOTION to [19] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due by 10/9/2003. Service: 9/22/03.(jat, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                      RESPONSE to [86] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/22/03.(jat, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003, Terminated: 10/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File proposed agenda for September 29, 2003 status conference by FDIC.Service: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/14/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          PROPOSED AGENDA for the Status Conference Scheduled for September 29, 2003 by USA. Service: 9/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                            MOTION to Strike From the Record of This Case the Letter of Mary Ann McNamar, Counsel for the FDIC to Judge Susan G. Braden, by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 9/18/3. Response due by 10/9/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER: In the interest of fairness of the parties, the [93] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [87] Dft's CROSS MOTION and Reply to [19] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED. Pltf's Reply is due 9/22/2003. In the interest of fairness to the parties, the Dft's Motion for Status Conference is hereby GRANTED. Upon mutual arrangement with the parties, it is ORDERED that a status conference be set for September 29, 2003 at 11 am. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Description not available
                                                                                REPLY in Support of [87] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss the FDIC Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Service: 9/8/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [93] Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Dft's Opposition to [19] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Which to Respond to [87] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [19] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment and MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Reply due by 9/18/2003. Service: 9/4/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION for Status Conference by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE to [87] Dft's July 21, 2003, "MOTION to Dismiss the FDIC Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by FDIC. Reply due by 9/8/2003. Service: 8/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                        RESPONSE to [86] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by FDIC. Service: 8/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Respond to [87] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [19] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment and MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), until 9/22/03, by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 8/19/03. Response due by 9/5/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                            REPLY in Support of [81] Dft's MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 6/30/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                              RESPONSE to [81] Dft's MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 9/2/2003. Service: 6/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Susan Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any cases if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Susan Braden. Judge Lawrence J. Block no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                    RULE 81(D)(4) MOTION to Change and Substitute Attorney Mary Ann McNamar in place of Richard Schwartz by FDIC.Service: 8/13/03. Response due by 9/2/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                      ***Attorney Mary Ann McNamar for FDIC added. Attorney Richard M. Schwartz terminated. (jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                        OPPOSITION and CROSS MOTION to [19] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION, and MOTION to Dismiss the FDIC, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge as a Cross-Motion to Plaintiff's Motion Filed on 4/3/98 for Summary Judgment.Service: 7/21/03. Response due by 8/21/2003. Response due by 8/21/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [83] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of Our Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 7/23/2003. Service: 7/9/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of [83] Dfts MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of Our Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of Our Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/8/03. Response due by 7/25/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by Tonia June Tornatore for UNITED STATES. Service: 6/4/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel responses to interrogatories filed by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/4/03. Response due by 6/23/2003 (dls, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Burton L. Raimi. Service: 5/20/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Status Conference was held on 5/8/03. (smm1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: General Status Conference set for 5/8/2003 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (vro, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block for all further proceedings. Judge Loren A. Smith no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [67-1] motion to Compel Telephonic Status Conference set for 4:30 p.m. on 3/13/03 (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by FDIC to response to [53-1] motion for Leave to substitute for shareholder plaintiff, [53-2] motion to Dismiss all claims of perpetual Savings Bank. Service: 2/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [62-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff-Intervenor and the Derivative and Non-Contractual claims asserted by Shareholder-Plaintiff. Service: 2/19/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/19/03) to [67-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 3/5/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 2/11/03) to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss . Response due: 2/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 1/31/03) to [62-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff-Intervenor and the Derivative and Non-Contractual claims asserted by Shareholder-Plaintiff, [53-1] motion for Leave to substitute for shareholder plaintiff, [53-2] motion to Dismiss all claims of perpetual Savings Bank. Reply due: 2/18/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER to file Plaintiff's submission, received 2/4/03 (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/22/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [62-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff-Intervenor and the Derivative and Non-Contractual claims asserted by Shareholder-Plaintiff. Service: 2/7/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 3/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 1/31/03) to Compel the Defendant to file an answer to the amended complaint. Response due: 2/18/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [64-1] order. Service: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/21/03 for [53-1] motion for Leave to substitute for shareholder plaintiff. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 1/21/03) to [62-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff-Intervenor and the Derivative and Non-Contractual claims asserted by Shareholder-Plaintiff. Reply due: 2/7/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [60-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion of the FDIC to substitute itself as Plaintiff and/or to dismiss the complaint. Briefing schedule: (1) Plaintiffs shall have until January 31,2003, to respond to plaintiff-intervenor's motion; (2) Defendant shall have until January 31, 2003, to amend their response to plaintiff-intervenor's motion; and (3) Plaintiff-Intervenor shall have until February 21, 2003, to reply to plaintiff's and defendant's responses (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 01/02/2003
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/19/02 ) to [60-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion of the FDIC to substitute itself as Plaintiff and/or to dismiss the complaint. Reply due: 1/6/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 1/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/02 ) to Dismiss Plaintiff-Intervenor and the Derivative and Non-Contractual claims asserted by Shareholder-Plaintiff. Response due: 1/21/03 (Response to Plaintiff-Intervenor's Renewed Motion to Substitute included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/19/02 ) to [53-1] motion for Leave to substitute for shareholder plaintiff. Reply due: 1/21/03 (Motion to Dismiss included) (HW) Modified on 01/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 12/18/02) to [60-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion of the FDIC to substitute itself as Plaintiff and/or to dismiss the complaint. Reply due: 1/6/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002, Terminated: 12/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 12/16/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion of the FDIC to substitute itself as Plaintiff and/or to dismiss the complaint until 1/31/03. Response due: 1/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [54-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories. Service: 12/16/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [52-1] motion to Stay (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 12/4/02 ) to [54-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories. Reply due: 12/16/02 (reply to response to motion to stay included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by FDIC to response to [52-1] motion to Stay. Service: 12/4/02 (response to motion to compel included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; set Defendant's deadline to reply to response to motion compel re: FDIC's response to 12/16/02. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/3/02 ) to Compel the production of documents , (includes reply to plaintiff's motion to compel). Response due: 12/20/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 11/25/02) to [54-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories, [52-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 12/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/21/02) to Compel responses to interrogatories . Response due: 12/9/02. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO FDIC'S MOTIN TO STAY PROCEEDINGS). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/21/02) to [52-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 12/9/02. (FILED WITH MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATOREIS). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 11/18/02) for Leave to substitute for shareholder plaintiff , or, in the alternative to Dismiss all claims of perpetual Savings Bank . Response due: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 11/4/02) to Stay pending a ruling on an impending dispositive motion. Response due: 11/21/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Stay resolution of Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment pending completion of fact discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [45-1] motion to Stay resolution of Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment pending completion of fact discovery. Service: 8/12/02 Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service : 7/15/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to stay. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 7/31/02 ) to [45-1] motion to Stay resolution of Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment pending completion of fact discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph IV(A)(1) of the Discovery Plan by USA. Service: 7/1/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Counsel by USA. Service 7/1/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002, Terminated: 10/24/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/1/02 ) to Stay resolution of Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment pending completion of fact discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/6/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney David Lewis Creskoff for FDIC Added Richard M. Schwartz. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 8/13/01) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Ronald Robert Glancz for PERPETUAL FINANCIAL Added Burton L. Raimi . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Charles Buckhold. Service: 10/6/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Election to Opt-Out by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Election to Opt-Out by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER mooting [32-1] motion for Clarification, mooting [32-2] motion to Extend Time of the opt-out date in light of the Order entered on 1/27/99 under the Plaintiffs in All Winstar-Related Cases at the Court caption. That order, which modifies the opt-out date to April 2, 1999, is appended hereto. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/7/99 ) for Leave to file motion to renew the stay of proceedings on motions for summary judgment in certain cases , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to File an Exhibit to their motion for partial summary judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service : 12/31/98 ) for Clarification or to Extend Time of the opt-out date. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs" . Response due: 11/30/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998, Terminated: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service : 10/16/98 ) for Leave to File an Exhibit to their motion for partial summary judgment. (Exhibit included) Response due: 11/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to file supplemental authority with the court by USA. Service: 8/26/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tonya Jean Williams * Service : 8/11/98 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 7/15/98 (JT) Modified on 07/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 7/10/98 ) to [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/22/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment [until after discovery is conducted]. Response due: 7/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time in which to file response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Response to [19-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Contract Issues reset to 6/23/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tarek Sawi. Service : 6/3/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998, Terminated: 6/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/2/98 ) to Extend Time in which to file response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [until 6/23/98]. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SHORT FORM MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service : 4/3/98 ) for Summary Judgment on Contract Issues. 1 separate volume of attachments Response due: 6/2/98 (JT) Modified on 04/06/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/13/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by David Lewis Creskoff. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Answer due 5/27/97 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Filed by leave of the judge. Service: 4/15/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/14/97. Fee waived ( Answer due 5/16/97 ). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** See 90-8C for docket entry: Reply by FDIC to it's motion to intervene, etc.*** (HW) Modified on 01/13/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL to FDIC's motion to intervene and substitute as party plaintiff [motion filed in 90-8C]. Service: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Armando Omar Bonilla (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 6/18/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service: 6/17/96) to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney Andrew Reed Herrup for PERPETUAL FINANCIAL. Added Ronald Robert Glancz . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PERPETUAL FINANCIAL (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File a response to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending outcome of WINSTAR CORP. v US (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995, Terminated: 9/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/95 ) to Stay proceedings pending outcome of WINSTAR CORP. v US . Response due: 10/2/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Armando Omar Bonilla. Service: 8/17/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39786. Answer due on 10/2/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?