AMERICAN FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00498-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Federal Bank, FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Neil Cayne +1 202 942 5566 +1 202 942 5999 howard_cayne@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Thomas infelise +1 202 616 8254 +1 202 514 8624 jeffery.infelise@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/3/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 11/2/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5040'[]
Def Custody Status
Pending Status AppRecord
Flags APPEAL, BOC, CLOSED
  Entries (364) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
Appeal record sent to CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 333 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 07-5040 for [332] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 332 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 331 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated November 3, 2006, forwarded to Howard Neil Cayne. See letter in file. (bre, )
          LREF
          Blank 330 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the net sum of $30,657,030.00. Plaintiff is awarded its costs. (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 329 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED ORDER directing the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff for the net amount of $30,657,030.00; and DENYING [326] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by USA. Plaintiff is awarded its costs. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls )
              LREF
              Blank 328 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
              REVISED NOTICE filed by USA re [255] Notice of Appearance. Service: 10/31/06.(dw1)
                LREF
                Blank 327 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 ~Notice (other)
                Reply in support of its computation of damages pursuant to the court's Septemebr 1, 2006 opinion filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 10/24/06.(dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 326 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006, Terminated: 11/1/2006 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [320] Published Opinion and Response to plaintiff's computation of damages pursuant to the court's September 1, 2006 opinion filed by USA. Service: 10/16/06.(dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 325 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Objections to Bill of Costs
                    Objections to [323] Bill of Costs filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 10/26/2006. Service by hand: 10/12/06.(dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 324 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                      Computation of Damages pursuant to the courts Order dated September 1, 2006 opinion filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/28/06.(dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 323 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Bill of Costs
                        BILL OF COSTS filed by USA.Objection to Bill of Costs due by 10/30/2006. Service: 9/28/06.(dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/29/2006. (vp1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 322 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (1-41) held on September 14, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 321 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Court Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/14/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mij, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 320 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                PUBLISHED OPINION: Making Post-Trial Findings-of-Fact and Conclusions of Law regarding damages, and Granting-in-part and Denying-in-part [313] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by USA. Plaintiff shall provide by 9/28/2006 a calculation of the costs of replacement capital, using the detailed methodology set out in the opinion; Defendant's response due by 10/16/2006; and Plaintiff's reply due by 10/24/2006. Defendant shall provide its detailed enumeration of reimbursable costs due by 9/28/2006; and plaintiff's response due by 10/12/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants detailed enumeration of reimbursable costs due by 9/28/2006. Pplaintiffs Response due by 10/12/2006. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/14/2006. (vp1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 319 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [313] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by USA. Service: 8/1/06.(dw1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 318 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Court Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 3251-3367) held on July 28, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 317 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Closing Argument set for 7/28/2006 01:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 316 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Response to Motion
                                            RESPONSE to [313] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 8/4/2006. Service: 7/21/2006.(dw1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 315 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [314] Motion Postpone Closing Argument. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Closing Argument set for 7/28/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 314 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006, Terminated: 7/12/2006 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION to Postpone Closing Argument (Unopposed) , filed by USA. Service: 7/11/2006 by hand.Response due by 7/28/2006.(lld, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 313 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Costs, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 312 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                                                      POST TRIAL RESPONSE BRIEF, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 311 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                                                        POST TRIAL REPLY BRIEF, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 310 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                                                          POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 6/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 309 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of Filing, filed by USA. Service: 6/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 308 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                                                              POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. Service: 6/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 307 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [306] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Post-Trial Briefs not to exceed 65 pages due by 6/16/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 306 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006, Terminated: 6/15/2006 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Post-Trial Briefs by 5 pages , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB, USA.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 305 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE of filing filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB and USA. Defendant's Exhibit 1829D and Plaintiff's Exhibit's 4002-4003. Service: 6/9/2006.(dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 304 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006
                                                                      Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 3, 2006 through April 20, 2006. Filed with plaintiff and defendant exhibits. Please see the Cumulative Index for list of parties exhibits. (dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/1/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 303 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE of Confidential Portions of Trial Transcript and Related Trial Exhibits to be Maintained Under Seal, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB Service: 5/18/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 302 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Post Trial Brief due 6/16/2006. Post Trial Response Brief due 7/7/2006. Trial set for 7/14/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 301 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 16-17, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/8/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 300 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 17-20, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 10-14, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 299 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                      BRIEF in Support of its Motion for Judgment Based Upon Partial Findings, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/12/2006 by hand.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/19/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 298 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM Concerning the Legal Standards Governing the Scope of a Rebuttal Case, filed by USA. Service: 4/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 295 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 3-7, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. The April 7, 2006 transcript is FILED UNDER SEAL. (dw1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 296 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying [272] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Supplemental Expert Report of John R. Jay, denying [283] Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Untimely Summary of Evidence. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 294 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Order on Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b)Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [291] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 293 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying [284] Motion in Limine, granting [288] Motion to Designate John R. Jay as its Party Representative, granting [289] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/11/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 292 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [283] MOTION in Limine , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 4/11/2006. Service: 3/31/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 291 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006, Terminated: 4/5/2006 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Exhibit List filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 3/28/2006.Response due by 4/11/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 290 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [284] MOTION in Limine filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Reply due by 4/10/2006. Service by hand: 3/30/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 289 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion , filed by USA. Service: 3/29/2006 by hand. Response due by 4/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 288 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION to Designate John R. Jay as its Party Representative , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/29/2006 by hand. Response due by 4/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 287 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              PRETRIAL ORDER: Trial set for 4/3/2006 at 9:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 286 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [272] Motion in Limine, granting [276] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 285 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [275] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+, granting [277] Motion for Leave to File, granting [279] Motion. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 284 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006, Terminated: 4/4/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Use of Deposition Testimony of Government Offical Bradley Waring, filed by USA. Service: 3/28/2006 by hand. Response due by 4/11/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 283 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Untimely Summary of Evidence , filed by USA. Service: 3/28/2006 by hand. Response due by 4/11/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 282 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 27, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 281 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [272] MOTION in Limine MOTION to Expedite , filed by USA. Service: 3/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 280 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [276] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Exhibit List for the Damages Phase of the Bifurcated Trial , filed by USA. Reply due by 4/4/2006. Service: 3/24/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 279 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Present the Testimony of Fact Witness Timothy T. Ward Out of Turn , filed by USA. Service: 3/24/2006 by hand. Response due by 4/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 278 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [272] MOTION in Limine MOTION to Expedite , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 4/3/2006. Service: 3/23/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 277 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Certificate of Service , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/22/2006. Response due by 4/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 276 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amended Exhibit List for the Damages Phase of the Bifurcated Trial , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/21/2006. Response due by 4/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 275 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles , filed by USA. Service: 3/22/2006. Response due by 4/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 274 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATIONS of Pre-Trial and Trial Procedure, filed by all parties. Service: 3/22/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 273 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATIONS of FACT, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB, USA. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 272 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Supplemental Expert Report of John R. Jay, MOTION to Expedite , filed by USA. Service: 3/22/2006 by hand. Response due by 4/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 271 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [270] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Stipulations of fact due by 3/22/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 270 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until March 22, 2006 to file the Stipulation of Facts filed by USA. Service: 3/20/06. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 269 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [257] Motion in Limine to exclude the Proposed Expert testimony of John R. Jay. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 267 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 14, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 268 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [262] MOTION to Compel defendant to respond to plaintiffs Interrogatories filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/29/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 266 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE with separate appendix to [257] MOTION in Limine , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 3/27/2006. Service: 3/14/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 3/16/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 265 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [262] MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 264 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [262] MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite , filed by USA. Reply due by 3/10/2006. Service: 3/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 263 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [262] Motion to Compel, granting in part and denying in part [262] Motion to Expedite. Response due by 3/10/2006. Reply due by 3/10/2006. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2006 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 262 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006, Terminated: 3/8/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, MOTION to Expedite , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/7/2006. Response due by 3/24/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 261 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 2/28/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 260 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Objections to the exhibits identified by plaintiff filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 2/28/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 259 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 2/28/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 258 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 2/28/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 257 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006, Terminated: 3/17/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of John R. Jay, filed by USA. Service: 2/28/2006 by hand. Response due by 3/14/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 256 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List, filed by USA. Service: 2/28/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 255 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery Thomas Infelise for USA. Service: 2/22/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/21/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 254 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [249] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 6, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 252 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [249] MOTION to Compel, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 2/2/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 251 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [249] MOTION to Compel, filed by USA. Reply due by 2/2/2006. Service: 1/30/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 250 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [249] Motion to Expedite. Response due by 1/30/2006. Reply due by 2/2/2006. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006, Terminated: 1/25/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests and, MOTION to Expedite , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 1/24/2006. Response due by 2/10/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [240] Motion in Limine, denying [241] Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 247 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [241] MOTION to Quash , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 1/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 246 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [241] MOTION to Quash , filed by USA. Reply due by 1/17/2006. Service: 1/3/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 245 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 12/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 244 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 12/23/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 243 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 12/23/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 241 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 12/19/2005 by hand. Response due by 1/3/2006. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 242 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [240] MOTION in Limine , filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 12/30/2005. Service: 12/16/2005.(vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 240 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 1/13/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude and Evidence in Support of a Model Measuring Cost of Replacement Capital by Reference to Amfed's Stock Price, filed by USA. Service: 12/15/2005. Response due by 1/3/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 239 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 18, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/1/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 238 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:.Appendix A Filings due by 12/23/2005. Discovery due by 2/17/2006. Opposing Appendix A Filings due by 2/28/2006. Stipulation due by 3/20/2006. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Trial set for 4/3/2006 at 9:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 236 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 16, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 237 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Trial set for 3/6/2006 at 9:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/16/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION on [219] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [214] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB, [214] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Hearings: Trial set for 3/6/2006 in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 233 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [232] MOTION for Leave to File to Notify the Court of New Authority, filed by USA. Reply due by 9/26/2005. Service: 9/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 232 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 8/24/2005. Response due by 9/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 231 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [229] MOTION for Leave to File Notify the Court of New Authority filed by USA. Reply due by 8/24/2005. Service by hand: 8/15/2005.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 230 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to the Additional Documents that Plaintiff Introduced for the First Time at Oral Argument, filed by USA. Service: 8/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 229 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Notify the Court of New Authority, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 8/4/2005. Response due by 8/22/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/9/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Response to plaintiff's presentation of materials relating to the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation's Deposit Insurance for the Nineties: Meeting the Challenge is due by 8/5/2005, and shall be limited in length to a total of ten (10) pages. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-122) of Proceedings held on 7/25/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 227 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response (with separate appendix) to Motion re [219] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [214] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 7/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 226 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [221] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Response to Cross Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE and reply (with separate appendix) to [219] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [214] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/19/2005. Service: 7/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [222] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [219] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [214] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, [214] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005, Terminated: 7/8/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply in support of the Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, and Opposition to Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages by six pages, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005 by hand. Response due by 7/19/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [219] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [214] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 6/20/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [215] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 6/20/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE (with six (6) volume appendix) to [214] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 6/20/2005 by hand. Dispositive Motion Response due by 7/5/2005, (mb2, ) Modified on 7/6/2005 to correct due date for response. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-54) of Proceedings held on 6/1/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/10/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [216] Motion to Expedite, granting in part and denying in part [216] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 217 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [216] MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Protective Order filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 6/13/2005. Service: 6/1/05.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 216 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005, Terminated: 6/3/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Expedited Consideration and MOTION for Protective Order filed by USA.Service by hand: 5/31/05. Response due by 6/14/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 215 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [214] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by USA. Service: 5/20/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment (with three appendices) filed by USA. Service: 5/20/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 6/20/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 213 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [212] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 212 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005, Terminated: 5/26/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by 20 pages filed by USA.Service: 05/19/2005 by hand. Response due by 6/2/2005. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 211 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [210] Motion for Extension of Time until 6/30/2005 to Depose Defendant's Expert R. Larry Johnson. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT (PG 1-78) of Proceedings held on 5/18/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 210 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005, Terminated: 5/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/2005 to Depose Defendant's Expert R. Larry Johnson, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB, USA. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 209 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [205] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 208 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [205] MOTION for Protective Order: Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2005 at 3:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 207 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [205] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by USA. Service: 5/9/205 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 206 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [205] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 5/20/2005. Service: 5/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 205 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005, Terminated: 5/11/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Plaintiff's Subpoenas of Expert Witnesses and for Expedited Consideration, filed by USA. Service: 5/4/2005 by hand. Response due by 5/18/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 204 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [203] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery. Expert Discovery due by 5/13/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 203 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005, Terminated: 4/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery, until 5/13/2005, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB, USA. Response due by 5/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 202 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [199] MOTION filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 201 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [199] MOTION to Preclude Defendant from Presenting Testimony from Nine Recently Disclosed Witnesses and to Preclude Counsel for the Defendant from Communicating with Those Witnesses Concerning and Matters Related to this Action. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 200 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [199] MOTION filed by USA. Reply due by 3/18/2005. Service: 3/8/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 199 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005, Terminated: 3/11/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Preclude Defendant from Presenting Testimony from Nine Recently Disclosed Witnesses and to Preclude Counsel for the Defendant from Communicating with Those Witnesses Concerning and Matters Related to this Action by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 2/23/2005. Response due by 3/9/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 2/25/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 198 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [196] MOTION to Strike filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 2/22/2005. Service: 2/4/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 197 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [196] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 196 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005, Terminated: 2/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's New Lost Profits Model by USA.Service: 01/28/05. Response due by 2/14/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 195 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [193] Motion for Clarification of Supplemental Discovery. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 194 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2005 03:45 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 193 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Clarification of Supplemental Discovery, MOTION to Expedited Consideration by USA.Service: 01/12/05 by hand. Response due by 01/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 192 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Further proceedings in this case shall take place in accord with the following schedule: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY - Plaintiff to serve revised or supplemental expert reports 1/19/05; Depositions of plaintiff's experts 2/22/05; Completion of supplemental fact discovery 3/1/05; Defendant to serve revised or supplemental expert reports 3/22/05; Depositions of defendants' experts 4/22/05. SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING - Defendant's motion for summary judgment 5/20/05; Plaintiff's response and cross-motion 6/20/05; Defendant's reply and response 7/5/05; Plaintiff's reply 7/19/05; Argument of any summary judgment motion and cross-motion 7/25/05. PRETRIAL SCHEDULE - Parties to confer and make exchanges required by RCFC App. A, Paragraph 13 12/2/05; Plaintiff's Appendix A filings 12/16/05; Defendant's Appendix A filings 1/20/06; Filing of any motions in limine and any objections to exhibits that can be made in advance of trial 1/31/06; Responses to any motions in limine 2/10/06; Replies to any motions in limine 2/17/06; Filing of any stipulations of fact pursuant to RCFC Appendix A Paragraph 17 2/22/06; Final pre-trial conference 2/28/06; and Commencement of trial 3/6/06.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/14/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A Status Conference shall be held on 11/29/2004 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Amend the Pretrial Schedule it Proposed in the November 1, 2004 Joint Status Report, by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 11/23/2004. Response due by 12/10/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Sullivan for USA. Service: 10/28/04 by hand.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 187 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: the issues for reconsideration is moot in light of the court's order dated October 25, 2004 denying defendant's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [185] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) or, Alternatively, to Re-open Discovery and/or the Record. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004, Terminated: 10/25/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration or, alternatively, to Re-Open Discovery and/or the Record by USA.Service: 10/15/04 by hand. Response due by 10/29/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED OPINION: American Federal has established the government's liability for breach of contract in this case. Prepatory steps for a trial on damages shall be undertaken. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [180] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority: La Van, Along With Dft's Response and Pltf's Reply. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of [180] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority: La Van filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 9/28/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [180] MOTION for Leave to File Notify the Court of New Authority: La Van filed by USA. Reply due by 10/12/2004. Service: 9/24/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004, Terminated: 9/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority: La Van by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 9/7/2004. Response due by 9/24/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CUMULATIVE INDEX of Proceedings held on 5/10/2004 - 5/20/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Filed with Plaintiff Exhibit's: 5-95, 97-161, 162-249, 250-310 and 312-1030; Defendant's Exhibits; 3-141, 144-287, 288-510, 515-2104 and 2105-6006. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [176] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority: Admiral Financial, filed by USA. Reply due by 9/1/2004. Service: 8/23/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [176] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority: Admiral Financial. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004, Terminated: 8/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority: Admiral Financial, by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 8/6/2004. Response due by 8/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 175 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 9, 2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [173] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Amend Two Citations in Its Initial Post Trial Brief. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow: Closing Argument held on 7/9/04. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/14/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004, Terminated: 7/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Amend Two Citations in its Initial Post-Trial Brief, by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 7/7/2004 by hand. Response due by 7/21/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            POST TRIAL RESPONSE BRIEF by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [170] Pltf's Post Trial Brief Concerning Liability for Breach of Contract, filed by USA. Service: 7/2/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Post-Trial BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL POST TRIAL BRIEF by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB, BY LEAVE OF THE Judge. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Nine (9) Volumes with the Cumulative Index, held on 5/10/2004 - 5/20/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/26/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow: Trial held on 5/10 through 5/20/04 (nine days). (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATED ORDER CONCERNING CONCORDANCES OF IDENTICAL TRIAL EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 166 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to Pltf's Motion for Leave to Call Robert J. Cohrs to Testify in its Case-in-Chief, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE][Motion was made orally at trial on 5/17/2004 and was denied orally at trial on 5/17/2004] Service: 5/17/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow: Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Counter Designations of Deposition Testimony of Patrick D. Foster [165] was granted on 5-10-04 at the trial beginning the same day. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 165 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Counter Designations of Deposition Testimony of Patrick D. Foster by USA.Service: 5/7/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/24/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 164 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATIONS OF FACT by all parties. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/10/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/3/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 162 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: [143] Dft's Motion in Limine, is denied. [144] Pltf's Motion in Limine, is denied. [159] Pltf's Renewed Motion to Introduce Deposition Testimony of Patrick Foster in the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial and for Expedited Consideration is granted insofar as pltf's counsel confirms through speaking with Mr. Foster that his ability to testify live at trial would be inconsistent with his physical condition. Each party shall serve intial post-trial briefs (limited to 70 pages) by hand delivery on or before 6/18/2004, and shall serve responsive briefs (limited to 20 pages) by the same method on or before 7/2/2004. Closing argument is scheduled for 7/9/2004, commencing at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, ) Modified on 6/22/2004 to include page limitations for post-trial briefs. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATEED ORDER Concerning Concordances of Identical Trial Exhibits. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [158] Joint Motion for Leave to File Agenda for Pre-Trial Conference. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/3/04. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 159 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RENEWED MOTION to Introduce Deposition Testimony of Patrick Foster in the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial, and MOTION for Expedited Consideration, by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 4/30/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/14/2004. Response due by 5/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION for Leave to File agenda for Pre-Trial Conference by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB and USA.Service: 4/29/04. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER: The Court grants the [139] Pltf's MOTION to conduct voluntary interviews with Messrs. Beesley and Connell outside the presence of the government's trial counsel. Any thrift agency monitor and Messrs. Beesley and Connell shall not reveal any content of the interviews to the government's trial counsel, nor shall the latter seek to acquire such content from the agency monitors or from the witnesses. Correspondingly, the government shall have the right to conduct voluntary interview of former employees of American Federal and its predecessors under comparable conditions and protections.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Pltf's Response to [152] Dft's MOTION for Status Conference filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/22/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/22/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/27/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow: Status Conference held on 4-22-04. (bjw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [152] Dft's Motion for Status Conference and for Expedited Consideration. A Status Conference shall be held on 4/22/2004 03:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [152] Dft's MOTION for Status Conference, filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 4/29/2004. Service: 4/20/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004, Terminated: 4/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Status Conference and MOTION for Expedited Consideration by USA.Service: 4/16/04. Response due by 5/3/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of [143] Dft's MOTION in Limine filed by USA. Service: 4/14/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File to file corrected reply in support of its motion to conduct voluntary, confidential interviews of trial witnesses who are former regulators outside the presence of counsel for the defendant by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service by hand: 4/9/04. Response due by 4/23/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [139] MOTION filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 4/8/04 by hand.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [143] Dft's MOTION in Limine filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 4/16/2004. Service: 4/7/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [144] Pltf's MOTION in Limine, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume, filed by USA. Reply due by 4/14/2004. Service: 4/7/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address of Thurman Connell, Expected Trial Witness by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 3/31/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [139] Pltf's MOTION to Conduct Voluntary, Confidential Interviews of Trial Witnesses Who Are Former Regulators Outside the Presence of Counsel for the Dft, filed by USA. Reply due by 4/8/2004. Service: 3/30/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to exclude defendant's evidence and arguments regarding regulatory treatment and amortization periods of goodwill by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 3/24/04. Response due by 4/7/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 5/4/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine seeking a ruling, prior to commencement of trial, that would preclude plaintiff from introducing documentary evidence concerning merger documents produced in other Winstar-related cases by USA.Service: 3/24/04 (by hand). Response due by 4/7/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: [134] Dft's Motion for Authorization for Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Location of Trial is GRANTED with respect to W.L. Abercombie, Jr., H. Brent Beesley, Donald E. Bolt, George C. Campbell, Ronald B. Carreker, Robert J. Cohrs, Patrick D. Foster, Beth Lanier, William R. Merritt, Robert J. Moore, Jerry L. Rexroad, Robert G. Rowell, Jon Mark Rundle, John Laurence Sykes, and Kim Zweier. Dft's motion is DENIED as moot as concerns Mr. Trimble. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Pltf's Response to[134] Dft's MOTION for Authorization to Serve Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Location of Trial, filed by USA. Service: 3/23/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [134] Dft's MOTION for Authorization to Serve Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Location of Trial filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 3/26/2004. Service: 3/17/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Conduct Voluntary, Confidential Interviews of Trial Witnesses Who Are Former Regulators Outside the Presence of Counsel for the Dft by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 3/17/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/31/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED ORDER Concerning Objections to Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: [124] Pltf's Motion to Introduce Deposition Testimony is GRANTED with respect to X.L. McMahan and James P. Edwards. Pltf's motion is DENIED as concerns Patrick D. Foster. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Before the Court is [121] Pltf's Motion to Conduct a Videotaped Trial Deposition. Pltf is graned leave to conduct a videotaped trial deposition, on the condition that Mr. Trimble also be made available via video-telephone conferencing for testimony beyond that encompassed by the videotape. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Before the Court are pltf's motions requesting authorization for service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from the location of trial, along with dft's responses. Pursuant to RCFC 45(b)(2), both [117], [122] Pltf's Motions are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004, Terminated: 3/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Authorization to Serve Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Location of Trial by USA.Service: 3/3/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/17/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Concerning Objections to Trial Exhibits by USA.Service: 3/3/2004. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law on Liability by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE AND PARTIAL OPPOSITION to [124] Pltf's MOTION to Introduce Deposition Testimony in the Liability Phase of the Trial filed by USA. Reply due by 3/10/2004. Service: 3/1/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [122] Pltf's Second MOTION for Authorization for Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Location of Trial filed by USA. Reply due by 3/10/2004. Service: 3/1/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION to [121] Pltf's MOTION to Conduct a Videotaped Trial Deposition or, in the Alternative, to be Granted an Additional Trial Day to Present a Witness During Pltf's Case-in-Chief filed by USA. Reply due by 3/10/2004. Service: 3/1/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB that trial lwitness, James P. Edwards, is deceased and is, therefore, unavailbale to testify. Service: 02/17/2004.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [117] MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles filed by USA. Reply due by 2/26/2004. Service: 2/17/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004, Terminated: 3/4/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Introduce Deposition Testimony in the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 2/11/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List for the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND MOTION for Authorization for Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Location of Trial by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 2/11/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Conduct a Videotaped Trial Deposition or, in the Alternative, to be Granted an Additional Trial Day to Present a Witness During Pltf's Case-in-Chief by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 2/11/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List for the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Authorization for Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Location of Trial by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 1/30/2004. Response due by 2/17/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER directing parties to confer and exchange documents by 1/21/04; plaintiff to file its Appendix A filings by 2/11/04; defendant to file its Appendix A filings by 3/3/04; parties to file any motions in limine by 3/24/04, with responses due by 4/7/04, and replies due by 4/14/2004; parties to file a joint exhibit list by 4/29/04; scheduling the Final Pretrial Conference for 5/3/2004 at 10:00 AM in The National Courts Building; and scheduling trial to commence on 5/10/2004 at 09:30 AM in The National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/10/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Pending before the Court is Dft' Motion for Clarification of the Court's Opinion and Order Dated 11/7/2003, along with pltf's opposition to that motion. [112] Dft's Motion for Clarification is DENIED. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to [112] Dft's MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Order and Opinion Dated November 7, 2003 filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 12/17/2003. Service: 12/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003, Terminated: 12/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Opinion and Order Dated 11/7/2003, by USA.Service: 11/24/03 by hand. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION: The Court also grants [105] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority, and denies [108] Dft's MOTION to Strike Certain Exhibits to Pltf's Motion for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority (Anderson v. U.S.). The parties's cross-motions for partial summary judgment on liability ([30] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment, and [32] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment) are DENIED. A separate trial on liability will be held in this case. In accordance with RCFC Appendix A, paragraph 12, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 12/10/2003.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Further Support of [108] Dft's MOTION to Strike Certain Exhibits to Pltf's Motion for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority (Anderson v. U.S.), filed by USA. Service: 11/7/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [108] MOTION to Strike filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB. Reply due by 11/7/2003. Service: 10/24/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike certain exhibits to Plaintiff's motion for leave to notify the Court of new authority by USA.Service: 10/14/03 by hand. Response due by 10/28/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [105] MOTION for Leave to notify the court of new authority filed by USA. Reply due by 10/23/2003. Service: 10/14/03 by hand.(jat, ) Modified on 10/20/2003 (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT RESPONSE to court's September 25, 2003 oral order filed by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB and USA. Service: 10/1/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to notify the court of new authority by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 9/30/03. Response due by 10/17/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 25, 2003 before Judge Charles Lettow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/30/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Regarding Liability Pursuant to [101] Court's August 25, 2003 Scheduling Order. Service: 9/16/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Pursuant to [101] Court's August 25, 2003 Scheduling Order. Service: 9/16/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:1) A Hearing on the pending cross motions for summary judgment on liability shall be held on 9/25/2003 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. 2) The parties each shall file with the Court on or before 9/16/2003, a short, concise supplmental memorandum, not to exceed ten (10) pages in length. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any cases if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Charles Lettow. Judge Lawrence M. Baskir no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [93] Motion to supplement the evidentiary record. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File corrected proposed finding 23 to consolidated statement of uncontroverted facts by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 5/5/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [93] MOTION for Leave to File to supplement the evidentiary record with previously unavailable evidence supporting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability (together with a separate two volume appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/15/2003. Service: 5/1/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts by all parties. Service: 4/29/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY re: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum regarding liabilty by The United States, filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support. Service by hand: 4/22/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003, Terminated: 5/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File to supplement the evidentiary record with previously unavailable evidence supporting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability (together with separate appendix) by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB.Service: 4/17/03. Response due by 5/5/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [69] Motion to Strike, denying [74] Motion for Reconsideration, denying [77] Motion for Leave to File, denying [80] Motion for Leave to File, denying [85] Motion for Leave to File, denying [83] Motion for Leave to File, denying [84] Motion to Strike, denying [87] Motion for Leave to File, granting [89] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall file COnsolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts by 4/29/2003. Defendant's reply brief due 4/22/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by AMERICAN FEDERAL to response to [89-1] motion for Leave to supplement the evidentiary record with previously unavailable evidence that supports plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability. Service: 3/4/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 2/21/03 ) to [89-1] motion for Leave to supplement the evidentiary record with previously unavailable evidence that supports plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability (together with two volume separate appendix). Reply due: 3/5/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/22/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service by hand: 2/7/03) for Leave to supplement the evidentiary record with previously unavailable evidence that supports plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability , (together with a separate appendix). Response due: 2/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (HW) Modified on 02/25/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 2/10/03) to [87-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: LaSalle Talman. Reply due: 2/10/03 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 1/23/03 ) for Leave to notify the court of new authority: LaSalle Talman . Response due: 2/10/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/6/02) to [84-1] motion to Strike [82-1] motion response by USA. Reply due: 11/21/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/28/02) for Leave to respond to plaintiff's notice of new authority: Coast Federal . Response due: 11/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002, Terminated: 4/8/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 10/23/02 ) for Leave to file corrected certificate of service . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 10/22/02 ) to Strike [82-1] motion response by USA . Response due: 11/8/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/17/02) to [80-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: Sterling Savings. Reply due: 10/31/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 10/10/02 ) for Leave to notify court of new authority: Coast Federal . Response due: 10/28/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service: 9/30/02) for Leave to notify the court of new authority: Sterling Savings . Response due: 10/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: First Commerce. Service: 8/15/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 8/5/02) to [77-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: HEGEWISCH. Reply due: 8/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service: 7/18/02) for Leave to notify the court of new authority: HEGEWISCH . Response due: 8/5/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [69-1] motion to Strike [66-1] response (to supplemental memorandum regarding liability) by AMERICAN FEDERAL. Service: 7/8/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service: 6/26/02) to [69-1] motion to Strike [66-1] response (to supplemental memorandum regarding liability) by AMERICAN FEDERAL. Reply due: 7/15/02. (FE) Modified on 07/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 6/21/02) For reconsideration of [73-1] order . (DS) Modified on 07/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to file corrected response to supplemental memorandum regarding liability. The Clerk of the Court is also directed to file by leave the response to plaintiff's motion for leave to clarify volume 1 of joint appendix ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/12/02 ) to [71-1] motion for Leave to clarify volume 1 of joint appendix, filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/25/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service: 6/17/02 ) to [68-1] motion for Leave to file corrected response to supplemental memorandum regarding liability. Reply due: 7/1/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002, Terminated: 4/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/17/02 ) to Strike [66-1] response (to supplemental memorandum regarding liability) by AMERICAN FEDERAL , together with memorandum in support and separate appendix. Response due: 7/1/02 (HW) Modified on 06/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002, Terminated: 6/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 6/3/02 ) for Leave to file corrected response to supplemental memorandum regarding liability . Response due: 6/20/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by AMERICAN FEDERAAL to [64-1] supplemental memorandum regarding liability by USA. Service by hand and mail: 5/31/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 5/28/02 ) for Leave to clarify volume 1 of joint appendix . Response due: 6/17/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of supplemental memorandum regarding liability including accompanying appendix, filed 4/22/2002 by USA. Service: 5/10/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by USA regarding liability (together with separate appendix). Service by hand: 5/10/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting defendant permission to withdraw its brief (filed on 4/22/02), and file new papers addressing the most recent authority by 5/10/02; directing plaintiff to respond by 5/31/02, with 25 pages allowed for defendant's brief and plaintiff's response and defendant to file its reply, not exceeding 10 pages, by 6/18/02 . (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 06/03/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM, together with a separate volume of appendix, regarding liability filed by USA. Service: 4/22/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT NOTICE of filing joint appendix, together with the joint appendix, consisting of two volumes. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Parties Joint Appendix due 4/15/02 , Defendant's supplemental Brief due 4/22/02 , Plaintiff's response to supplemental brief due 5/17/02 , and Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's response, Parties Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Joint Status Report due 5/31/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/5/02) to modify the schedule set forth in the Court's 3/21/02 Order : (1) Plaintiff's response to supplemental brief by 5/17/02; (2) Defendant's reply by 5/31/02; (3) Consolidated statement of uncontroverted facts by 5/31/02; and (4) Joint status report by 5/31/02. Response due: 4/22/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 21, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/22/02) for Leave to file status report regarding discovery matter related to deposition of R. Larry Johnson . Response due: 4/8/02. (FILED WITH STATUS REPORT). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Parties Joint Appendix due 4/15/02 , Defendant's supplemental brief due 4/22/02 and Plaintiff's response to supplemental brief due 5/10/02 , and Defedant's reply to Plaintiff's response, the parties Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, and Joint Status Report due 5/22/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/22/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/12/02) to [54-1] motion to Continue expert deposition day to day until completed and [54-2] motion for Expedited consideration. Reply due: 3/26/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service by hand: 3/11/02) to Continue expert deposition day to day until completed , and for Expedited consideration . Response due: 3/25/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Preliminary Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 3/21/02, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madsion Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Special Procedures (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [49-1] joint motion for a status conference Joint Status Report deadline to 3/4/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002, Terminated: 2/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION for a status conference . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE reassigned to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the parties to contact the Court by 7/30/01 for a telephone conference (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/17/01) telephonic discovery conference . Response due: 7/31/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Scott Lawlor. Service: 2/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] motion to Dismiss, [32-2] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 1/8/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [39-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation re: reply brief. Clerk directed to file Defendant's reply brief this date ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by AMERICAN FEDERAL filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 1/10/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by AMERICAN FEDERAL to response to [30-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 1/10/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, out of time, by USA (Service : 1/8/01 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: reply brief. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service: 12/13/00 ) to [32-1] motion to Dismiss, [32-2] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/10/01 (JT) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by AMERICAN FEDERAL. Service: 12/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact by USA. Service: 12/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 12/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/13/00 ) to [30-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/10/01 (JT) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tonya Jean Williams Service : 11/2/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by AMERICAN FEDERAL. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/26/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [26-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Mary Catherine Gill for AMERICAN FEDERAL Added Howard Neil Cayne (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000, Terminated: 7/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 6/1/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Mary Catherine Gill for AMERICAN FEDERAL Added Howard Neil Cayne. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Defendant's interrogatories. Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's interrogatories deadline reset to 4/17/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000, Terminated: 3/30/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 3/29/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the Defendant's interrogatories [until April 17, 2000]. Response due: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 4/3/00 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/21/2000, Terminated: 3/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/17/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories [until April 3, 2000]. Response due: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Pursuant to paragraph 15 of the 4/14/98 Amended Master Protective Order the document entitled "Declaration of S. Lynn Stokes" shall be returned until further order of the Court (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing "Initial Disclosure List" by USA. Service: 9/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Frank. Service: 5/5/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 9/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 8/29/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Ben Franklin Johnson for AMERICAN FEDERAL Added Mary Catherine Gill. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Melida Narcisa Hodgson. Service : 11/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassingment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Steven Eric Gordon (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Leave to File to respond to motion to adopt special case management procedures. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996, Terminated: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by AMERICAN FEDERAL (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File to respond to motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 5/1/96) for Leave to submit a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures Response due: 5/20/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven Eric Gordon Service: 5/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Staying proceedings pending decision in Winstar and directing parties to file a joint status report when stay is lifted (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re special procedures to facilitate discovery, etc. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lisa Beth Donis. Service : 8/24/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by AMERICAN FEDERAL BANK, FSB of related case(s). (90-8 C, 90-773 C, 90-772 C ). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39785. Answer due on 10/2/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?