CAIN, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00499-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Cain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
No Logo FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
No Logo JIM KOCHEVAR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
No Logo L. N. DANTZLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
No Logo LAURANCE A. HARDEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
No Logo TED I. HANEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
No Logo WALTER SHERMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Delisa Maria Sanchez +1 202 616 0337 +1 202 305 7643 delisa.sanchez@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Charles Gilbert +1 202 898 3871 +1 202 898 3908 AGilbert@FDIC.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/3/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/6/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (172) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 155 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [152] Judgment, [151] Order. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number Re: [154-1] appeal by FDIC. CAFC NUMBER: 03-5025. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 154 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by FDIC. Copy to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich, Plaintiff and C.A.F.C. [filing fee waived] (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Terminated:
        CAFC Case Number Re: [153-1] appeal by WALTER SHERMAN, JIM KOCHEVAR, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, TED I. HANEY, L. N. DANTZLER, DAVID CAIN CAFC NUMBER: 03-5020 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002
          Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 055216. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 153 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR, WALTER SHERMAN. Copy to Defendant, FDIC, Chief Judge Edward J. Damich and to C.A.F.C. Fee not included. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 152 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that Count VII of the Individual Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Counts I and II of Plaintiff-Intervenor FDIC's Complaint is in intervention are dismissed with prejudice. The remainder of Plaintiff's claims are dismissed as directed by the July 26, 2002 Opinion of the court. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 151 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Court Filing
                ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment dismissing the complaint. ( signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002
                  Case closed (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 150 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Stipulation
                    Stipulation by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR, USA, FDIC, WALTER SHERMAN of voluntary dismissal pertaining to COUNT VII, of the individaul plaintiffs' second amended complaint and COUNTS I and II of plaintiff-intervenor FDIC's complaint in intervention, etc. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 149 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Status Report
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT. Service: 8/9/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 148 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                        PUBLISHED DECISION denying [130-1] motion for adjudication of claim ownership, denying [96-1] cross motion, granting in part, denying in part [90-1] motion to Dismiss the complaint of FDIC, granting in part, denying in part [83-1] motion to Dismiss the Cain Plaintiffs second amended complaint, denying [78-1] motion for Summary Judgment., granting in part, denying in part [32-1] cross motion, denying [28-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on Thrift liability: the acquisition of Security Federal Savings Bank of Florida, the parties are further ordered to file a joint status report within 10 days of the entry of this opinion (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 147 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER denying [143-1] motion to Strike [141-1] motion reply by DAVID CAIN, denying [142-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to Plaintiff's reply in support of motin for leave to submit additional authority, granting [138-1] motion for Leave to file notice of additional authority (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 146 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY by USA to response to [143-1] motion to Strike [141-1] motion reply by DAVID CAIN. Service: 6/12/02. (LTD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 145 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN (Service: 6/6/02) to [142-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to Plaintiff's reply in support of motion for leave to submit additional authority. Reply due: 6/24/02. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 144 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002, Terminated: 9/6/2002 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR, WALTER SHERMAN (Service: 6/3/02 ) to [143-1] motion to Strike [141-1] motion reply by DAVID CAIN Reply due: 6/20/02 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 143 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002, Terminated: 7/2/2002 Motion to Strike
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/30/02) to Strike [141-1] motion reply by DAVID CAIN . Response due: 6/17/02. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002
                                    Deadline updated; Response to [143-1] motion to Strike [141-1] motion reply by DAVID CAIN reset to 6/17/02 . (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 142 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/29/02) for Leave to file sur-reply to Plaintiff's reply in support of motin for leave to submit additional authority . Response due: 6/17/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 141 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY by DAVID CAIN to response to [138-1] motion for Leave to file notice of additional authority. Service: 5/23/02. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 140 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Court Filing
                                          ORDER returning Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion for leave to submit additional authority and Plaintiff to re-file Reply to Response to Motion by 5/23/02 for [138-1] motion for Leave to file notice of additional authority (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 139 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/13/02) to [138-1] motion for Leave to file notice of additional authority. Reply due: 5/28/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 138 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002, Terminated: 7/2/2002 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                              MOTION by DAVID CAIN (Service: 4/26/02) for Leave to file notice of additional authority . Response due: 5/13/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 137 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                ORDER to file Notice of Additional Authority as a motion for leave to submit additional authority (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Transcript
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: evidentiary hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 18, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002
                                                    Oral Argument on Ownership of Claims held ( Transcript due 5/20/02 ) (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER Oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/18/02 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        REPLY by DAVID CAIN to [132-1] response by USA. Service: 3/25/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                          REPLY by FDIC to [132-1] response by USA, [131-1] response by DAVID CAIN, et al. to supplemental brief. Service: 3/25/02 (included in reply to responses to motion for adjudication of claim ownership) (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY by FDIC to responses to [130-1] motion for adjudication of claim ownership. Service: 3/25/02 (also includes reply to responses to supplemental brief) (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [131-1] response to supplemental brief by DAVID CAIN, et al., [131-1] motion response by plaintiffs, and [130-1] supplemental brief by FDIC. Service: 3/15/02 (included in response to motion for adjudication) (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/15/02) to [130-1] motion for adjudication of claim ownership. Reply due: 3/25/02 (also includes responses to supplemental brief and shareholder plaintiffs' response to FDIC's motion) (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                  RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN, et al. to [130-1] supplemental brief by FDIC. Service: 3/8/02 (filed with response to motion for adjudication) (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Terminated:
                                                                    RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR, WALTER SHERMAN (Service: 3/8/02) to [130-1] motion for adjudication of claim ownership. Reply due: 3/22/02. (FE) Modified on 03/18/2002
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by FDIC (Service: 3/4/02) for adjudication of claim ownership (and supplemental brief on standing). Response due: 3/8/02. (LTD) Modified on 03/18/2002
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Memorandum
                                                                        Supplemental brief on standing filed by FDIC. Service: 3/4/02 (filed with motion for adjudication) (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Transcript
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 21, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [124-1] motion by Walter Sherman to be substituted into the case pursuant to RCFC 25(a); directing FDIC to file a motion to adjudicate ownership of the claims of plaintiffs Cain, et al. by 3/4/02 ; plaintiffs Cain, et al. to file a response by 3/8/02; defendant to file a response to FDIC's corrected motion and a supplemental brief to its motion to dismiss, etc. (filed on 10/17/00) by 3/15/02; and FDIC and plaintiffs Cain, et al. to file their replies by 3/25/02 . ( signed by Judge J. Damich ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Status Conference
                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/25/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 2/21/02 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                  JOINT MOTION for a status conference . (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                    CASE reassigned to Judge Edward J. Damich . (DS)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/30/02) to [124-1] motion to be substituted into the case pursuant to RCFC 25(a). Reply due: 2/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 2/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by WALTER SHERMAN (Service: 1/16/02) to be substituted into the case pursuant to RCFC 25(a) as the Personal Representative for the Estate of Thomas Jefferson Sherman, II. Response due: 2/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002
                                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Edward J. Damich, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Suggestion of Death
                                                                                              SUGGESTIONS OF DEATH by T. J. SHERMAN. Service: 11/15/01. (HW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 9/6/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/4/01 ) to [119-1] motion for Oral Argument on the Motion to Transfer case pursuant to Rule 77(f). Reply due: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by DAVID CAIN (Service: 9/17/01) for Oral Argument on the Motion to Transfer case pursuant to Tule 77(f) . Response due: 10/4/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/27/01) for Leave to file opposition to Cain Plaintiff's out-of-time oral motion to extend the deadline for disclosing expert witnesses and producing expert reports, in anticipation of the 8/3/01 conference call scheduled by the Cain Plaintiff's . Response due: 8/10/01. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 Witness List
                                                                                                      Witness list by DAVID CAIN, et al. Service: 5/3/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                        SUBMISSION OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA pursuant to [112-2] order. Service: 2/16/01. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                          REPLY by FDIC to response to [96-1] cross motion. Service: 2/13/01. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 1/16/01) to [96-1] cross motion. Reply due: 2/2/01. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              REPLY by FDIC to response to [96-1] cross motion. Service: 1/10/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [111-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, granting [95-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation . Defendant directed to file a copy of the Certificate of Service by 2/16/01 (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/12/01 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation , [in Defendant's reply to Plaintiff FDIC's response in opposition to Defendant's Correcetd Motion to Dismiss the Complaint in Intervention of Plaintiff FDIC and alternative motion for summary judgment against Plaintiff-Intervenor and FDIC's Cross-motion for summary judgment on the Defendant's statute of limitations defense], filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by USA re: CORRECTED STATEMENT of GENUINE ISSUES in RESPONSE TO PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT of FDIC, etc. Service: 12/19/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA re: CORRECTED response to FDIC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 12/19/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER re: The Clerk is directed to file only the corrected versions of the opposition brief and the combined Statement of Genuine Issues and Proposed Findings which were subject to the 12/19/00 motions for leave, etc. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                          [CORRECTED] STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES and CORRECTED PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT by USA. Service: 12/19/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [94-1] motion for Leave to File a corrected version of statement of genuine issues., granting [93-1] motion for Leave to File a corrected version of opposition to FDIC's motion for summary judgment., granting [92-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/13/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation , Response to FDIC's Motion for Summary Judgment, (by 10 pages). (HW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES and PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/13/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/13/00 ) to [78-1] motion for Summary Judgment, (together with a separate appendix). Reply due: 1/2/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to Cain plaintiffs' motion for sanctions filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 1/12/01 (motion is incorporated into plaintiffs' cross-motion for partial summary judgment filed 1/11/01) (DS) Modified on 02/05/2001
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/12/01 ) to [99-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 2/9/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by DAVID CAIN, et al. ( Service by hand: 12/18/00 ) and RESPONSE to [83-1] motion to Dismiss the Cain Plaintiffs second amended complaint by USA, [83-2] motion for Summary Judgment by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES and PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by DAVID CAIN, et al. filed [by leave of the judge]. Service by hand: 12/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/19/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by FDIC ( Service: 12/19/00 ) and RESPONSE to [90-1] motion to Dismiss the complaint of FDIC by USA, [90-2] motion for Summary Judgment against FDIC filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION, out of time, by FDIC (Service : 1/10/01 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: reply brief. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000, Terminated: 2/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File a corrected version of statement of genuine issues. Response due: 1/2/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File a corrected version of opposition to FDIC's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 1/2/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/13/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service : 12/8/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/00 (by hand)) to Dismiss the complaint of FDIC or for Summary Judgment against FDIC. Response due: 11/14/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTED PROPOSED FINDINGS of Undisputed Fact by USA. Service: 10/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [85-1] motion for Leave to File a corrected version of the motion to dismiss, granting [84-1] motion for Leave to File a corrected version of the proposed findings of undisputed facts. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/00 ) for Leave to Respond to the Cain Plaintiffs' supplemental request pursuant to the Court's 9/20/00 Order. (response included) Response due: 11/13/00 (JT) Modified on 10/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of supplemental request pursuant to the Court's 9/20/00 Order by DAVID CAIN. Service: 10/23/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File a corrected version of the motion to dismiss. Response due: 10/31/00 (JT) Modified on 10/19/2000
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File a corrected version of the proposed findings of undisputed facts. Response due: 10/31/00 (JT) Modified on 10/19/2000
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss the Cain Plaintiffs second amended complaint and for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT) Modified on 10/12/2000
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact re: Cain Plaintiffs by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (re: FDIC) (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Undisputed Fact re: FDIC by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN to the Court's Order of 9/20/00. Service: 9/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (re: Cain Plaintiffs) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (re: Plaintiff FDIC) (JT) Modified on 10/02/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [73-1] motion for Leave to Depose V. Gerald Comizio beyond discovery cut-off. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000, Terminated: 8/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by DAVID CAIN (Service : 8/22/00 ) for Leave to Depose V. Gerald Comizio beyond discovery cut-off. Response due: 9/8/00 (JT) Modified on 08/24/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [62-1] motion for expedited mini-trial to determine liability. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: review of interrogatories defendant submitted to plaintiff-intervenor for sufficiency of response. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' second set of requests for admission. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Submission of Documents for 6/8/00 discovery teleconference by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/5/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000, Terminated: 6/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA, out of time, (Service : 6/16/00 (by hand)) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' second set of requests for admission [until June 16, 2000]. Response due: 6/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 7/17/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 6/15/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 7/14/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference set at 5:00 p.m. on 6/14/00 (in this and 92-731) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Submission of document for the 6/8/00 discovery teleconference by FDIC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/7/00 ) to [62-1] motion for expedited mini-trial to determine liability. Reply due: 6/19/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/6/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/1/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for an expedited mini-trial [until June 7, 2000]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/19/00 (JT) Modified on 06/06/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/24/00 ) to [62-1] motion for expedited mini-trial to determine liability. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service : 5/10/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Jon Arthur Stewart for FDIC Added Andrew Charles Gilbert. Filed by leave of the Judge.(JT) Modified on 05/26/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/21/2000, Terminated: 7/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by DAVID CAIN (Service : 5/18/00 (by hand)) for expedited mini-trial to determine liability. Response due: 6/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: guidelines in determining whether a motion to compel documents protected by privilege should be granted. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of Lodging of Documents for Discovery Conference by DAVID CAIN. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 1/24/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of submission of documents for 5/12/00 discovery teleconference by USA Service by hand: 5/11/00 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of lodging of documents for discovery conference filed by DAVID CAIN [by leave of the judge]. Service by hand: 5/8/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delisa Maria Sanchez. Service : 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FDIC (Service : 8/26/99 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Tina Ann Lamoreaux for FDIC Added Jon Arthur Stewart. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTED COPY of Brief by DAVID CAIN re: [50-1] memorandum by DAVID CAIN. Service: 10/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC to Plaintiffs' Cain et al. Corrected Brief regarding the FDIC's standing. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/2/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Brief" . Response due: 11/19/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR, T. J. SHERMAN (Service by hand : 10/20/98 ) for Leave to file corrected copies of brief regarding the FDIC's standing . Response due: 11/6/98. (FE) Modified on 10/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by DAVID CAIN et al. re: the FDIC's standing. Service: 10/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [46-1] motion to Stay proceedings upon motion for partial summary judgment until case enters discovery, etc. Service: 8/12/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN (Service: 8/4/98 ) to [46-1] motion to Stay proceedings upon motion for partial summary judgment until case enters discovery, etc. Reply due: 8/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/16/98) to Stay proceedings upon motion for partial summary judgment until case enters discovery, etc. Response due: 8/6/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lesleyanne Koch Kessler. Service : 7/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by DAVID CAIN to [43-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [39-1] response by DAVID CAIN. Service: 5/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to May 7, 1998, to submit response to plaintiffs' March 31, 1998 filing and proposed order. set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/22/98 for plaintiffs to file their reply. ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998, Terminated: 5/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/98 ) to Extend Time to submit response to plaintiffs' March 31, 1998 filing and proposed order. (to May 7, 1998) Response due: 5/18/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC to [37-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: 4/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN to [37-1] response by USA and Order for entering contract liability. Service: 3/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Tina Ann Lamoreaux. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC) Modified on 02/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC) Modified on 02/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] cross motion. Service: 9/11/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 7/29/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN (Service: 7/29/97 ) to [32-1] cross motion. Reply due: 9/15/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental filing by USA pursuant to paragraph 5.d. of the omnibus case management order. Service: 7/1/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/26/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 5/7/97 ) and RESPONSE to [28-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on Thrift liability: the acquisition of Security Federal Savings Bank of Florida by DAVID CAIN, by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/27/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/26/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [32-1] cross motion reset to 5/27/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/2/97 ) to Extend Time to May 7, 1997, to respond to plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 6/2/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by DAVID CAIN amending [14-1] amended complaint. Service: 4/16/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/26/97. Fee not required ( Answer due 5/28/97 ). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by DAVID CAIN (Service: 3/3/97) for partial Summary Judgment on Thrift liability: the acquisition of Security Federal Savings Bank of Florida . Response due: 4/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996, Terminated: 2/19/2004 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of filing amended certificate of service by FDIC. Service: 12/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to response to motion to intervene and substitute itself as party plaintiff to assert claims for damages caused to the failed financial institution by FDIC [motion filed in 90-8C]. Service: 12/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN to FDIC's motion to intervene [motion filed in 90-8C]. Service: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by DAVID CAIN (Service : 8/5/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert Keith Huffman for T. J. SHERMAN, attorney Robert Keith Huffman for JIM KOCHEVAR, attorney Robert Keith Huffman for FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, attorney Robert Keith Huffman for LAURANCE A. HARDEE, attorney Robert Keith Huffman for TED I. HANEY, attorney Robert Keith Huffman for L. N. DANTZLER, attorney Robert Keith Huffman for DAVID CAIN Added Emmett B. Lewis. Response due: 8/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/24/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by John Peebles Sholar Jr. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/17/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Peebles Sholar Jr. Service: 4/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings and directing parties to file status reports informing the Court of how they plan to proceed within 30 days after the Supreme Court's decision (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/31/1996, Entered: 2/7/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 1/31/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR and T. J. SHERMAN (Answer due 2/8/96 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 1/22/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File its reply to response to motion for stay, granting [12-2] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for stay and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/31/96 for [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996, Terminated: 1/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/2/96) for Leave to File its reply to response to motion for stay , and to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for stay until 14 days after the furlough is lifted. Response due: 1/19/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion For reconsideration of [8-1] order under Rule 83.2, vacating [8-1] order and Reply to Response to Motion to stay set to 12/29/95 (signed by Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/29/95 for [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings per 12/14/95 Order. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/24/95) to [9-1] motion For reconsideration of [8-1] order under Rule 83.2 by leave of Judge. Reply due: 12/7/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995, Terminated: 12/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR and T. J. SHERMAN (Service : 11/7/95 ) For reconsideration of [8-1] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by DAVID CAIN, L. N. DANTZLER, TED I. HANEY, LAURANCE A. HARDEE, FRANKLIN R. HARRISON, JIM KOCHEVAR, T. J. SHERMAN (Service: 10/27/95 ) to [5-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. [Filed by leave of the Judge]. Reply due: 11/13/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER entered re: "Plaintiff's Opposition to Stay of Proceedings." The plaintiff's submission was not filed for the following reason: Not signed by the attorney of record [Rule 11 and 82(d)]. The plaintiff's submission is to be returned to the plaintiff's attorney of record for a correct signature. The corrected submission is to be filed upon its resubmission, even if out of time without further order of the Court. The time defendant to file a reply to the plaintiff's opposition is to begin running from the date of reservice of the corrected submission ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 10/31/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995, Terminated: 3/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/2/95) to Stay Proceedings . (FE) Modified on 12/18/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Anne Rinaldo. Service: 8/14/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by DAVID CAIN, T. J. SHERMAN of related case(s). (90-773 C & 90-772 C, consolidated with 90-8 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39795. Answer due on 10/2/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?