LANDMARK LAND, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00502-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Land Company,inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Paul M Fish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul M Fish +1 505 848 1871
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Herman Kamp +1 214 754 0098
No Logo PLAINTIFFS COORDINATING COMMITTEE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/4/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/11/2002
Origin 4
Reopened 11/26/2001
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (436) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 413 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
Certified copy of judgment, which provides the recovery by plaintiff for attorney fees and expenses, forwarded to Arlene Pianko Groner. See letter in file. (bre, )
    LREF
    Blank 412 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff is awarded Attorney Fees's fees and expenses in the sum of $719,181.10, inclusive of interest, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney fees, and with said sum to be paid by the subject agency as provided in 28 U.S.C. Section 2412(d). (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 411 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Stipulation
      STIPULATION for entry of judgment re: application for fees and expenses under EAJA filed by LANDMARK LAND COMPANY, INC., The United States. (dls, )
        LREF
        Blank 410 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003
        Certified transcript judgment,dated March 4, 2003, providing for the payment of costs, forwarded to Paul Mathew Fish. See letter in file. (bre, )
          LREF
          Blank 409 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Costs TaxedCourt Filing
          Taxation of Costs for LANDMARK in the amount of $234,489.22. (signed by Judge Hodges). Copy to parties. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 408 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION re: attorneys' fees and other cost pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, etc. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 410 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Transcript
              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: one volume, at Washington, DC, for date of January 3, 2003, exhibits: none. Notice to parties. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Status Conference
                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 2/3/03 ) (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 407 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Memorandum
                  MEMORANDUM by LANDMARK re: [369-1] bill of costs by LANDMARK. Service: 11/19/02. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 406 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Response
                    RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [403-2] order. Service: 12/27/02. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 405 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Status Report
                      Joint STATUS REPORT by USA, LANDMARK Service: 12/27/02 (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 404 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/7/2002 ~Notice (other)
                        Response to the Court's Request Regarding Location of the Hearing by LANDMARK Service: 12/4/02 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 403 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER Parties Brief, not to exceed 10 pages, is due 1/10/03 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 402 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002 Status Report
                            Joint STATUS REPORT by USA, LANDMARK Service: 11/19/02 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 401 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER re: counsel shall agree on a time for oral argument on the EAJA application and advise the court. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 400 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Status Report
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 399 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [397-1] motion for Leave to file telefaxed signature (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 398 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of filing of original signatures by LANDMARK. Service: 9/30/02. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 397 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002, Terminated: 10/7/2002 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 9/30/02) for Leave to file telefaxed signature . Response due: 10/17/02. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 396 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [395-1] joint motion to Extend Time to file status report Status Report due 9/30/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 395 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002, Terminated: 9/19/2002 Terminated:
                                          JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to file status report until 9/30/02. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 394 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [393-1] motion for Leave to file telefaxed signature (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 393 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002, Terminated: 9/19/2002 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/16/02) for Leave to file telefaxed signature . (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 392 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting Defendant's motion to file a status report on September 16. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 391 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/02. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 390 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by LANDMARK. Service: 8/29/02. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 389 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant's Status report due 8/30/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 388 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Status Report
                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/31/02 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 387 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Status Report
                                                          STATUS REPORT by LANDMARK. Service: 7/30/02. (NN)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 386 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER set deadline of 7/31/02 for the parties to report to the court re: progress of negotiations to date. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/09/2002
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 385 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              REPLY by LANDMARK to response to [381-1] motion for Attorney Fees . Service: 4/22/02 (AB)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 384 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/12/02 ) to [381-1] motion for Attorney Fees. Reply due: 4/29/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (HW) Modified on 04/22/2002
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 383 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER, re: January Order should have stated that Defendant has 28 days to respond (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 382 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                    RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 3/12/02 ) to [377-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to Landmark's reply to defendant's opposition to Landmark's restated Bill of Costs. Reply due: 3/26/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 381 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by LANDMARK (Service: 3/12/02) for Attorney Fees . Response due: 4/12/02. (LTD) Modified on 03/26/2002
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 380 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER, re: Publication of 4/5/00 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/14/2002
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 379 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Response
                                                                          SUR-REPLY by USA to [374-1] reply to objection bill of costs by LANDMARK. Service: 3/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 378 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [377-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to Landmark's reply to defendant's opposition to Landmark's restated Bill of Costs (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/14/2002
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 377 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002, Terminated: 3/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/02) for Leave to file a sur-reply to Landmark's reply to defendant's opposition to Landmark's restated Bill of Costs . Response due: 3/28/02. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 376 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY by COORDINATING COMMITTEE to response to [371-1] motion for Publication of Order filed April 5, 2000. Service: 3/5/02 (DS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 375 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/1/02) to [371-1] motion for Publication of Order filed April 5, 2000. Reply due: 3/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 374 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002
                                                                                    REPLY by LANDMARK to [372-1] objection bill of costs by USA. Service: 2/27/02. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 372 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                      OBJECTION (Reply due 3/4/02) by USA to [369-1] bill of costs by LANDMARK. Service: 2/20/02 (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 373 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER re: The Coordinating Committee has requested that an April 2000 order be published relating to restitution in the Landmark case, if defendant has a view on this motion, the defendant should notify the Court in writing (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 371 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002, Terminated: 12/9/2002 Description not available
                                                                                          OUT OF TIME MOTION by COORDINATING COMMITTEE (Service: 2/15/02) for Publication of Order filed April 5, 2000 . Response due: 3/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 370 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER returning Plaintiff's EAJA Application (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 369 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Bill of Costs
                                                                                              Bill of costs, with two volumes of Appendix, by LANDMARK. Service: 2/4/02 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 2/21/02). (LTD)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 368 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [364-1] motion for a scheduling order. Service: 1/14/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 367 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002
                                                                                                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint of plaintiff-intervenor, FDIC, is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 366 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER vacating the March 6, 2000 judgment in part, as it applies to plaintiff-intervenor, FDIC. THe clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint of plaintiff-intervenor, FDIC. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002
                                                                                                      Case closed (LD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 365 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 1/2/02 ) to [364-1] motion for a scheduling order. Reply due: 1/15/02. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 364 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 12/27/00) for a scheduling order filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 1/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 363 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001
                                                                                                            MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated November 26, 2001 affirming/reversing in part [325-1] judgment order. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 362 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001
                                                                                                              MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated November 23, 2001 affirming/reversing in part [325-1] judgment order. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 361 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001
                                                                                                                MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated November 23, 2001 affirming/reversing in part [325-1] judgment order. (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 360 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Parties please advise the Court of any objections to removing the seal from this case, if the Court does not hear from parties, this case will be transferred to open files on January 19, 2001 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 359 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                    MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 8/22/00 ) for Attorney Fees and Other Expenses. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 9/22/00 (JT) Modified on 08/29/2000
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 358 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER re: We do not expect anyone to expend any resources evaluating, considering addressing or responding to plaintiff's motion pursuant to the EAJA until the appeals run their course (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 357 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/21/00 ) for Clarification of the Court's Order regarding Landmark's EAJA Application. Response due: 9/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 356 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [354-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [353-1] order. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 355 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt of Funds and Reduction of Bill of Costs by LANDMARK. Service: 8/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 354 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000, Terminated: 8/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/1/00) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [353-1] order . (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 353 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER asking that the Clerk accept Plaintiff's motion pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act for filing. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 352 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/22/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 7/14/00 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [351-1] order. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 351 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: the Clerk states that Plaintiffs' motion pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act is premature because the case is on appeal. The Clerk is to return Plaintiffs' motion unfiled. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 350 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 6/5/00 ) to [347-1] motion for Leave to File a sur-reply to Plaintiff's reply to response to bill of costs. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 349 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY by USA to [344-1] reply to objection bill of costs by LANDMARK. Service: 6/5/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 348 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [347-1] motion for Leave to File a sur-reply to Plaintiff's reply to response to bill of costs (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 347 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000, Terminated: 6/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/5/00 ) for Leave to File a sur-reply to Plaintiff's reply to response to bill of costs. Response due: 6/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              CAFC Case Number Re: [346-1] appeal by FDIC. CAFC NUMBER: 00-5073. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 346 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL by FDIC. Copy to LANDMARK LAND, Defendant, Judge Robert H. Hodges, and CAFC. Fee not required. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 345 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL by USA. Copy to LANDMARK LAND, FDIC, and to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. Fee not required. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 344 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by LANDMARK to [343-1] objection bill of costs by USA. Service:4/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 343 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION ( Reply due 5/5/00 ) by USA to [340-1] bill of costs by LANDMARK. Service: 4/21/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        CAFC Case Number Re: [341-1] appeal by LANDMARK CAFC NUMBER: 00-5065 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 341 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000, Terminated: 11/26/2001 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by LANDMARK. Copy to Defendant, Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 049408. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 342 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [337-2] motion to Strike the Bonchak Affidavit and denying [327-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [325-1] judgment. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 340 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              Bill of costs by LANDMARK. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Service: 4/4/00 ( Objection to Bill of Costs due by 4/21/00 ) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 339 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 4/3/00 ) to [337-2] motion to Strike the Bonchak Affidavit. Reply due: 4/17/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 338 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [337-2] motion to Strike the Bonchak Affidavit. Service: 4/4/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 337 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/31/00) for Leave to reply to responses to petition for rehearing and to Strike the Bonchak Affidavit . Response due: 4/17/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 336 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000, Terminated: 1/11/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 3/30/00) to [327-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [325-1] judgment. Reply due: 4/13/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 335 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 3/28/00 ) to [327-1] motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [325-1] judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 334 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 3/20/00 ) to [330-1] motion to Strike Landmark's letter to the Court dated 3/16/00. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 333 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by LANDMARK to Defendant's response to motion to reopen the evidence. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/20/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 332 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Plaintiff and Plaintiff-Intervenor may comment on defendant's motion to reconsider by 3/31/00 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 330 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/17/00) to Strike Landmark's letter to the Court dated 3/16/00 , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/3/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 329 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/17/00) to [328-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [324-1] order, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/31/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 331 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [328-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [324-1] order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 328 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000, Terminated: 3/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 3/15/00 ) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [324-1] order. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 327 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000, Terminated: 4/5/2000 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/00 ) for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [325-1] judgment . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 326 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 9, 2000, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 325 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff Landmark Land shall recover of and from the United States the sum of $21,458,571, and plaintiff FDIC shall recover of and from the United States the sum of $17.7 million. Costs to plaintiffs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                              Case closed (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 324 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED DECISION directing the Clerk to enter judgment for plaintiff Landmark in the amount of $21,458,571, and for plaintiff FDIC in the amount of $17.7 million. Costs to plaintiffs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 323 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 33 volumes taken at Washington, D.C., for the dates of August 25, 1999 through December 16, 1999. Filed together with Cumulative Index and Defendant's Exhibits: 18, 22, 25, 37, 49-50, 52-53, 58, 60, 65, 68-71, 75, 77-80, 82-83, 85, 92-94, 98-99, 103-104, 107, 111-112, 114, 142, 148, 155, 166, 168, 175, 178, 183, 186, 223-224, 226, 229, 231-232, 234, 239-240, 244, 250, 253, 267, 270, 310, 326, 330, 343, 370, 377, 379, 398, 432, 461, 467, 469, 482, 513, 516, 518, 521, 531, 545-546, 570, 581, 585, 595-596, 611-614, 627, 637, 640, 661-662, 666, 738, 744, 758, 761, 763, 769, 781, 787-788, 811, 813-814, 832, 857, 860-861, 899, 906, 908, 919, 963-964, 979, 1134, 1146, 1149-1150, 1157-1160, 1174, 1179, 1182-1183, 1188, 1202, 1204, 1206, 1208, 1212, 1214, 1218, 1225, 1228, 1232R, 1251, 1258, 1263-1266, 1270-1271, 1273, 1277-1278, 1283, 1286, 1293, 1305-1306, 1316, 1318, 1324-1326, 1334, 1340, 1348, 1360, 1366, 1368-1369, 1382, 1387, 1392-1393, 1402, 1406-1407, 1410, 1413, 1415, 1417, 1422, 1426, 1433-1434, 1438, 1441, 1456, 1458, 1461, 1463, 1466, 1469, 1492, 1505-1506, 1516, 1520, 1522, 1524, 1540, 1575R, 1577, 1586, 1600, 1615, 1618, 1622, 1632, 1645, 1649, 1655, 1693, 1697, 1838, 1851-1852, 1857-1859, 1868, 1872, 1894, 1921-1922, 1925-1926, 1928, 1943, 1945, 1954, 1961, 1973, 1980, 1982, 1993, 2011, 2013-2015, 2027, 2034-2035, 2037, 2058, 2061-2084, 2098R, 2100, 2107, 2109, 2111R, 2113, 2116, 2119, 2121, 2124, 2129, 2133, 2137, 2142, 2149, 2151, 2270, 2272, 2281-2282, 2286, 2356, 2368, 2387-2389, 2392, 2394-2395, 2397, 2399, 2402, 2408, 2439, 2444, 2452, 2454, 2463, 2465-2467, 2469, 2516, 2519-2520, 2599, 2606, 2614, 2616, 2635, 2650, 2696-2697, 2742, 2748-2749, 2756, 2760, 2767, 2772, 2782-2783, 2787, 2790, 2795-2796, 2802R, 2807-2813, 2827, 2832, 2841, 2851, 2853, 2861-2863, 2876, 2888, 2891, 2895, 2962-2963, 2966, 2979, 2985, 2990, 2997-2999, 3005, 3010, 3017-3037, 3040-3053, 3058, 3060, 3062, 3068, 3086, 3112-3119, 3157, 3170, 3176-3177, 3179, 3207, 3209-3217, 3219-3220, 3222, 3246-3248, 3250-3256, 3260-3266, 4000-4001, 4003, 4005-4009, 4012, 4014R, 5002-5005, 5009, 5011-5014, 5016, 5020, 5023-5024, 5026-5036, 5038-5053, 5056-5153, 5155-5195, 5197, 5199-5208, 5215-5217, 5222-5224, 6000-6004, 6010, 6016-6019, 6021-6022, 6026-6027, 6029-6033, 6037-6039, 6048, 6051, 6062-6063, 6070, 6073-6074. Plaintiff's Exhibits: 39, 41, 68, 75, 81, 83-84, 91, 100, 105-106, 108-110, 114, 116, 120-122, 124, 127, 130, 132, 134-136, 139, 141-145, 148-150, 152, 159, 169, 171-172, 182-183, 187-188, 196, 203, 206, 210-212, 214-217, 220, 227, 231, 234, 237, 239, 241-242, 245-246, 249-250, 252, 263-264, 275, 290, 292-293, 305, 320, 323-324, 331-332, 339-340, 353-353, 355, 358, 363, 370, 374-375, 381, 391, 395-396, 399, 407, 416, 422, 427, 430-432, 434-436, 442-443, 450, 454, 457, 460, 462-464, 471, 479, 526-527, 529-530, 548, 555, 573, 601, 605, 612, 634, 643, 645, 648, 666-667, 673, 683, 686-687, 695, 708-709, 713, 719, 730, 734, 736, 740, 743, 746, 761, 768, 770, 772, 775-777, 779, 781-782, 784, 789, 791-794, 796, 800, 802, 805, 813, 815-816, 830-832, 836-839, 844-847, 857, 868-872, 874, 886-887, 891-896, 899, 911, 914-916, 920, 931, 940, 943, 948-950, 953, 963, 965, 968, 970, 972, 976-977, 979-980, 995, 997, 1000, 1002, 1006, 1008-1009, 1013, 10161-1017, 1019-1020, 1022, 1026, 1031, 1034-1035, 1040, 1042, 1045-1046, 1048-1050, 1053, 1055-1056, 1058-1060, 1063, 1065, 1069-1070, 1073-1074, 1076, 1081-1083, 1085, 1094, 1105, 1107, 1111-1113, 1115, 1117, 1145, 1152-1153, 1162-1165, 1171, 1188, 1193, 1199, 1202, 1205-1206, 1208-1213, 1241, 1248-1250, 1252-1254, 1260-1272, 1274-1276, 1281, 1286-1299, 1305-1306, 1308, 1311, 1315, 1319, 1340-1342, 1347, 1349-1350, 1352-1354, 1356-1357, 1398, 1423, 1434, 1446, 1452, 1454, 1462-1464, 1464A, 1466, 1470-1472, 1481, 1493-1494, 1511-1512, 1534, 1537, 1553-1559, 1561-1562, 1564-1565, 1568, 1570, 1572-1578, 1580-1590, 1596-1602, 1606, 1616-1617, 1621-1626, 1631, 1635-1636, 1638-1646, 1648, 1650, 1652, 1657R, 1658-1660, 1663, 1667R, 1668R, 1669R, 1670R, 1671R, 1678, 1679R, 1681R, 1682R, 1683. Joint Exhibits: 1, 3-4, 607. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 322 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Post-trial brief by FDIC. Service: 1/11/00. (FE) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 321 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by LANDMARK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/6/00 (JT) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 320 Filed: 1/10/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [315-1] motion to Extend Time to file the post trial brief. Reset FDIC's Post-trial brief deadline to 1/11/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 319 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                          FINDINGS OF FACT in support of post-trial brief in response to Plaintiff's brief by USA. Service: 1/7/00 (AB) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 318 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Post-trial brief by USA in response to Plaintiff's brief. Service: 1/7/00 (AB) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 317 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINDINGS OF FACT by USA Service: 1/7/00 (AB) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 316 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/10/2000 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Post-trial brief by USA . Service: 1/7/00 (AB) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 315 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000, Terminated: 1/10/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/6/00 ) to Extend Time to file the post trial brief [until January 11, 2000]. Response due: 1/24/00 (JT) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 314 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Paul Mathew Fish (HW) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 313 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [303-1] motion for Leave to File memoranda in support of motions for judgment upon partial findings and proposed findings of fact (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trial held ( Transcript due 1/18/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 312 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by LANDMARK re: objection to specified testimony of Ronald Hendricks. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/23/99 (JT) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 311 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by LANDMARK re: objection to specified testimony of Christopher B. Barry. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/23/99 (JT) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 310 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by LANDMARK re: objection to specified testimony of Peter J. Phalon. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/23/99 (JT) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 309 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by LANDMARK re: objection to specified testimony of Daniel M. Conway. Service: 11/18/99 (JT) Modified on 01/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 308 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 1/13/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by USA re: motion for judgment upon partial findings against FDIC filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/15/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 307 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 1/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed findings of fact in support of defendant's motion for judgment upon partial findings against Landmark Land filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/15/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 306 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 1/13/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA re: motion for judgment upon partial findings against plaintiff, Landmark Land. Service by hand: 11/15/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 305 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [303-1] motion for Leave to File memoranda in support of motions for judgment upon partial findings and proposed findings of fact. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 304 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 1/13/2000 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT in support of defendant's motion for judgment upon partial findings against FDIC filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/15/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 303 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999, Terminated: 11/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/15/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File memoranda in support of motions for judgment upon partial findings and proposed findings of fact. Response due: 11/29/99 (JT) Modified on 11/17/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 302 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Richard Herman Kamp. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 301 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Paul Mathew Fish. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 300 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Notice of Change of AddressCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE (10/9/99 through 10/29/99) of change of address by Arlene Pianko Groner, filed by leave of the Judge. (HW) Modified on 11/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 299 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/3/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/21/99 ) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial and for expedited consideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 298 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [297-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 297 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999, Terminated: 10/22/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/21/99 ) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 296 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of supplement to Appendix G Exhibit List by LANDMARK. Service: 10/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 294 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (14 volumes) taken at Washington, D.C., for the dates of August 25, 1999 through September 15, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 295 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of temporary change of address by USA. Service: 10/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Phase Two Supplemental) Exhibit list by USA. Service: 9/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 293 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Phase Two Witness list by USA. Service: 9/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 292 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Fraud Claims by LANDMARK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 290 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact and Conclusions of Law by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 289 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by FDIC. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 286 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [268-1] motion to Dismiss first amended counterclaim asserting special plea in fraud, etc. Trial by 10:00 a.m. 10/12/99 , in Charleston, SC (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 287 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Paul Mathew Fish. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 285 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: pretrial conference (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on September 17, 1999 . Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pre-Trial Conference held ( Transcript due 9/20/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pre-Trial Conference set at 12:00 on 9/17/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 284 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fifth Supplemental Exhibit list by USA. Service: 9/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 283 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Answer to CounterclaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by LANDMARK to [179-2] counter claim by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 282 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by LANDMARK to testimony of Defendant's accounting witnesses. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 281 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fourth Supplemental Exhibit list by USA. Service: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 279 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 20, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 278 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of (temporary) change of address by Richard Herman Kamp. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 277 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/20/99 ) to [268-1] motion to Dismiss first amended counterclaim asserting special plea in fraud, etc., [268-2] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Exhibits) Reply due: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 276 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/20/99 ) to [249-1] motion for dismissal for failure to state claim upon which relief can be granted, [249-2] motion for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Exhibits) Reply due: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 275 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/20/99 ) to [250-1] motion for reconsideration of [242-4] order under Rule 83.2. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 274 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES in support of response to Landmark Land's motion for dismissal by USA. Service: 8/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 273 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES in support of response to FDIC's motion to dismiss by USA. Service: 8/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 272 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [269-1] motion for Leave to File out of time. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 288 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Paul Mathew Fish. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 280 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/30/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of (temporary) change of address by Paul Mathew Fish. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 270 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third Supplemental Exhibit list by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 271 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/23/99) to [254-1] motion to exclude opinions disclosed in reports which were not timely served. Reply due: 9/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 269 Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999, Terminated: 8/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/21/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File out of time response to motion for dismissal and alternatively for summary judgment, response to motion to dismiss first amended counterclaim, or alternatively, for partial summary judgment, and response to motion to reconsider. Response due: 9/7/99 (JT) Modified on 08/24/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 268 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999, Terminated: 9/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FDIC (Service: 8/20/99) to Dismiss first amended counterclaim asserting special plea in fraud, etc. , or alternatively for Partial Summary Judgment , and memorandum of law in support thereof. Response due: 9/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 267 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/17/99) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial and for Expedited Consideration . Response due: 9/3/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 266 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [220-1] motion for Leave to Present Deposition Testimony. Service: 8/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 265 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 264 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second Supplemental Exhibit List by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pre-Trial Conference held ( Transcript due 9/20/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 263 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT of The Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy by LANDMARK. Service 8/19/99 (JT) Modified on 08/26/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pre-Trial Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 8/20/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 262 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [251-1] motion for Leave to file supplement to Appendix G Exhibit List. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 261 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing the Clerk to return unfiled Plaintiff-Intervenor's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff-Intervenor is directed to file its proposed findings in accordance with RCFC 56(d) and comply with RCFC 82(c). ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 256 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [147-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental brief concerning the 1983 asset conveyance and filing Defendant's answer (8/5/97), Defendant's reply re: motion for partial summary judgment (2/16/99), Plaintiff's supplemental brief (3/2/99), and Defendant's response to supplemental brief (3/18/99). ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/19/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 255 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 1 "Affidavit of Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy" by LANDMARK re: [249-1] motion for dismissal for failure to state claim upon which relief can be granted by LANDMARK, [249-2] motion for Summary Judgment by LANDMARK, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 254 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 8/10/99 ) to exclude opinions disclosed in reports which were not timely served. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/27/99 (JT) Modified on 08/18/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 253 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the Clerk's office to accept for filing Plaintiffs' motion to exclude. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/17/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 252 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of withdrawal of witness "William Dockser" by LANDMARK. Service: 8/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999, Terminated: 8/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/13/99) for Leave to file supplement to Appendix G Exhibit List . Response due: 8/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 250 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 8/12/99 ) for reconsideration of [242-4] order under Rule 83.2 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 249 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LANDMARK (Service: 8/12/99) for dismissal for failure to state claim upon which relief can be granted , and, alternatively for Summary Judgment , on defendant's special plea in fraud. Response due: 8/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 247 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/10/99 ) for clarification of the Order of August 5, 1999. Response due: 8/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 246 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 8/6/99 ) to [220-1] motion for Leave to present deposition testimony. Reply due: 8/23/99 (motion for leave to counter-designate included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 246 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 8/6/99 ) for Leave to counter-designate deposition testimony. Response due: 8/23/99 (response to motion for leave included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second Supplement to Exhibit list by LANDMARK. Service: 8/6/99 (JT) Modified on 08/10/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 3, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 245 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by USA against LANDMARK amending [245-1] counterclaim answer by USA.(Ans. to Amd. Ans. Counterclaim due: 8/25/99) Service: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 243 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ( - First Amended Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law - ) by USA. Service: 7/29/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 242 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [117-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, denying [135-1] cross motion, denying [134-1] cross motion, denying [184-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damage claims, granting [202-1] motion to preclude testimony, granting [230-1] motion for Leave to File first amendment to Defendant's answer, affirmative defenses, and counterclaims in response to Landmark Land Company, Inc.'s complaint., granting [229-1] motion for Leave to File first amended memorandum of facts and contentions of law., granting [228-1] motion for Leave to File first amendment to Defendant's answer, affirmative defenses, and counterclaims in response to FDIC's complaint. Set Plaintiff's motion filing deadline to 8/13/99 and set Defendant's response deadline to 8/20/99. Set trial to begin in the National Courts Building at 10:00 a.m. on 8/25/99. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 241 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 7/30/99) to [192-1] motion in Limine to bar evidence of alleged government misconduct post FIRREA, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Response due: 8/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 240 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of disclousure of witnesses to be called at Phase I of the trial by FDIC. Service: 8/2/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pre-Trial Conference held ( Transcript due 9/2/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 239 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED AGENDA by FDIC re: the 8/3/99 pre-trial conference. Service: 7/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 238 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/2/99) to [231-1] motion in Limine. Reply due: 8/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 237 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [209-1] motion to amend [199-1] counterclaim answer by LANDMARK. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 236 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [227-1] motion for Leave to File proposed agenda and comments on the proposed agenda for the August 3, 1999 pretrial conference. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 235 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant does not state whether Plaintiffs will oppose its motion for leave to file its amended answer, affirmative defenses and counterclaims in response to FDIC's complaint. We will address these matters once Plaintiffs' response is filed. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 234 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [217-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental response to question of the Court at oral argument. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 233 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing "Disclosure Of Phase I Witnesses" by LANDMARK. Service: 7/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 232 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LANDMARK (Service: 7/30/99) to Compel proper responses to requests for admissions or that they be deemed admitted . Response due: 8/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 231 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by LANDMARK (Service: 7/30/99) in Limine , opinion testimony from employees of regulatory agencies. Response due: 8/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 230 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/29/99 ) for Leave to File first amendment to Defendant's answer, affirmative defenses, and counterclaims in response to Landmark Land Company, Inc.'s complaint. Response due: 8/16/99 (JT) Modified on 08/02/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 229 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/29/99 ) for Leave to File first amended memorandum of facts and contentions of law. Response due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 228 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/29/99 ) for Leave to File first amendment to Defendant's answer, affirmative defenses, and counterclaims in response to FDIC's complaint. Response due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 227 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/29/99 ) for Leave to File proposed agenda and comments on the proposed agenda for the August 3, 1999 pretrial conference. (proposed agenda included) Response due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 226 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL FILING by USA re: cross-motion for partial summary judgment, and in opposition to Landmark's motion for partial summary judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 225 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/29/99 ) to [217-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental response to question of the Court at oral argument. Reply due: 8/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pre-Trial Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 8/3/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit list by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/27/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: the first phase of trial will be tried in Washington. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [221-1] motion to Extend Time of the trial date. Reset Trial for 8/25/99 in Charleston, South Carolina. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 220 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/99 ) for Leave to Present Deposition Testimony. Response due: 8/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 219 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by USA. Service: 7/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 218 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by USA. Service: 7/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 217 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999, Terminated: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 7/20/99 ) for Leave to File supplemental response to question of the Court at oral argument. (supplemental response included) Response due: 8/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 216 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 16, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 221 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999, Terminated: 7/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FDIC (Service : 7/21/99 ) to Extend Time of the trial date [until August 25, 1999]. Response due: 8/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [184-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damage claims. by USA ( Transcript due 8/16/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 215 Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [184-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damage claims. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BILL OF PARTICULARS by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/12/99 (JT) Modified on 07/15/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 209 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999, Terminated: 8/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 7/8/99 ) to amend [199-1] counterclaim answer by LANDMARK. Response due: 7/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; response to [209-1] motion to amend [199-1] counterclaim answer by LANDMARK reset to 7/26/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 7/9/99 ) to [200-2] motion that the Court establish pretrial deadlines. Reply due: 7/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by FDIC to [179-2] counter claim by USA. Service: 7/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by LANDMARK, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 214 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by LANDMARK, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 213 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by LANDMARK, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 212 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by LANDMARK, filed by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 211 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 6/21/99) to [184-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damage claims and [59-1] motion fo partial Summary Judgment, together with two volume separate appendix, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Reply due: 7/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [201-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to defendant's answer, affirmative defenses and counterclaims to July 12, 1999. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 7/8/99) to [200-1] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 7/22/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [184-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damage claims, filed with (1) one appendix. Service: 7/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 202 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999, Terminated: 8/5/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/15/99 ) to preclude testimony by witnesses that were not identified in response to interrogatories , or in the alternative, for Leave to depose newly identified trial witnesses after the close of discovery and for expedited briefing and consideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 07/09/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 203 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [202-1] motion to preclude testimony by witnesses that were not identified in response to interrogatories, [202-2] motion for Leave to depose newly identified trial witnesses after the close of discovery and for expedited briefing and consideration, [180-1] motion to suspend its obligation to submit Appendix G materials. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999, Terminated: 7/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service: 7/6/99) to Extend Time to file response to defendant's answer, affirmative defenses and counterclaims in response to the FDIC-R's complaint , (until July 12, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/6/99) for a status conference and that the Court eatablish pretrial deadlines . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by LANDMARK to [179-2] counter claim by USA. Service: 7/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 7/1/99 ) to Extend Time to file response to motion in limine [until 7 days after the government files its Appendix G disclosures which are due by 7/23/99]. Response due: 7/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC. Service: 6/28/99 (statement of general issues included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC. Service: 6/28/99 (proposed findings of fact included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 196 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 6/28/99 ) to [184-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damage claims. Reply due: 7/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 195 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplement to Exhibit List by LANDMARK. Service: 6/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 194 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FDIC to Defendant's motion to preclude testimony and for expedited briefing and consideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m., 7/16/99 for [184-1] motion for partial summary judgment on damage claims and set Defendant's Appendix G deadline on 7/23/99. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/25/99) in Limine to bar evidence of alleged government misconduct post FIRREA , filed together with separate one volumne appendix. Response due: 7/13/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by LANDMARK to Defendant's motion to preclude testimony or for leave to depose. Service: 6/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 190 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 6/18/99 ) to [180-1] motion to suspend obligation to submit Appendix G materials. Reply due: 7/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 189 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/24/99 ) to [176-1] motion for Leave to present deposition testimony, [170-1] motion for Leave to present deposition testimony. Reply due: 7/12/99 (motion for leave included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 189 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/24/99 ) for Leave to Counter-Designate and to present deposition testimony. Response due: 7/12/99 (responses to motions included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 188 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service: 6/18/99) to Extend Time to file response to motion for partial summary judgment on damages , (until July 2, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 187 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 6/18/99) to [180-1] motion to suspend its obligation to submit Appendix G materials and [180-2] motion for expedited briefing and consideration. Reply due: 7/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 186 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 179 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against FDIC. Service: 8/5/97 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION granting [52-1] motion for Summary Judgment, granting [59-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, denying [55-1] cross motion, granting [66-1] motion for Leave to File answer including special plea in fraud. It is further ordered that this case is assigned for all further proceedings, except for motions for clarification of this order, to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., as Trial Judge. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 185 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 5/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 184 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/24/99 ) for partial summary judgment on damage claims. (4 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 6/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 183 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [181-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation of their motion for partial summary judgment. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 182 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [161-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental evidence in support of its amended cross-motion for partial summary judgment, and in opposition to Landmark's motion for partial summary judgment concerning the October 31, 1983 asset conveyance. Service: 6/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 181 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999, Terminated: 6/16/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/24/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation of their motion for partial summary judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 06/18/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 180 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 6/15/99 ) to suspend its obligation to submit Appendix G materials and for expedited briefing and consideration. Response due: 7/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 177 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by FDIC. Service: 6/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 6/8/99) for Leave to present deposition testimony . Response due: 6/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit list by FDIC Service: 6/8/99 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT OF LAW by FDIC. Service: 6/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit list by LANDMARK. Service: 6/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness list by LANDMARK. Service: 6/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 171 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by LANDMARK Service: 6/7/99 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 170 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by LANDMARK (Service: 6/7/99) for Leave to present Deposition Testimony Response due: 6/24/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 169 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 6/7/99) to Extend Time to file and serve the pleadings required in paragraphs 11, 12 and 13 of Appendix G , (until June 7, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 168 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 6/2/99 ) to [161-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental evidence in support of its amended cross-motion for partial summary judgment, and in opposition to Landmark's motion for partial summary judgment concerning the October 31, 1983 asset conveyance. Reply due: 6/17/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 167 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by FDIC to response to [162-1] motion to Extend Time to file and serve the pleadings required in paragraphs 11,12 and 13 of Appendix G of the RCFC. Service: 6/2/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 166 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 6/2/99 ) to [160-1] motion to Extend Time o file dispositive motions, [153-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file dispositive motions. Reply due: 6/14/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 165 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing "Clarification to Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time" by FDIC. Service: 6/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 164 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/28/99 ) to [162-1] motion to Extend Time to file and serve the pleadings required in paragraphs 11,12 and 13 of Appendix G of the RCFC. Reply due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 163 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by USA re: [160-1] motion to Extend Time to file dispositive motions by USA. Service: 5/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 162 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/27/99) to Extend Time to file and serve the pleadings required in paragraphs 11,12 and 13 of Appendix G of the RCFC until 6/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 161 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/26/99 ) for Leave to File supplemental evidence in support of its amended cross-motion for partial summary judgment, and in opposition to Landmark's motion for partial summary judgment concerning the October 31, 1983 asset conveyance. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 160 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 5/20/99) to Extend Time o file dispositive motions , (until May 24, 1999). Response due: 6/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 159 Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [156-1] motion for modification of the pretrial schedule and adoption of a negotiated schedule. Reset dispositive motion filing deadline to 5/20/99 ; reset Plaintiff's Appendix G Deadline to 6/1/99 and Defendant's Appendix G deadline to 6/11/99 ; reset requests for admissions to 6/7/99 ; reset proposed stipulations deadline to 6/21/99 ; reset response to dispositive motions due 6/22/99; replies to responses to dispositive motions due 7/9/99 ; reset motions in limine filing deadline to 6/28/99 and responses to motions in limine due 7/8/99 ; and trial begins 8/2/99. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 158 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER by FDIC (Service: 4/30/99 ) to [156-1] motion for modification of the pretrial schedule and adoption of a negotiated schedule. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 157 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 4/29/99 ) to [156-1] motion for modification of the pretrial schedule and adoption of a negotiated schedule. Reply due: 5/13/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999, Terminated: 5/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/19/99) for modification of the pretrial schedule and adoption of a negotiated schedule . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 155 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Trial deadline set on 8/2/99. See Order of 4/8/99 in 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 153 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/5/99 ) to Extend Time within which to file dispositive motions , (until May 20, 1999). Response due: 4/22/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 152 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 3/29/99 ) for relief from the court rule governing exhibits and for expedited consideration. Response due: 4/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 151 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/18/99 ) to [147-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental brief concerning the 1983 asset conveyance, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 260 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [259-1] memorandum by LANDMARK. (nunc pro tunc 3/18/99) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 150 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER vacating the Order entered on March 8, 1999, Plaintiff Landmak Land Company having filed a Withdrawal of Subpoenas Duces Tecum on March 9, 1999. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 149 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion for protective order by 3/10/99. The court will hear argument at 11:00 a.m., 3/11/99 by telephone. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery Conference set at 11:00 a.m. on 3/11/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/4/99 ) for protective order and for expedited consideration. Response due: 3/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 259 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by LANDMARK re: the 1983 Asset Conveyance. (nunc pro tunc 3/2/99) FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 08/19/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999, Terminated: 8/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 3/1/99 ) for Leave to file supplemental brief concerning the 1983 asset conveyance , brief included with video tape. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Response due: 3/18/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by LANDMARK to response to [131-1] motion for Sanctions. Service: 2/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [126-1] motion to strike exhibits, [126-2] motion to compel the return of privileged documents, [126-3] motion for entry of a protective order ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by LANDMARK to response to [126-1] motion to strike exhibits, [126-2] motion to compel the return of privileged documents, [126-3] motion for entry of a protective order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/20/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/16/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation , (in excess of 20 pages), filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to motion for partial summary judgment. (nunc pro tunc 2/16/99) Service: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/16/99 ) to [131-1] motion for sanctions. Reply due: 3/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/11/99 ) to [126-1] motion to strike exhibits, [126-2] motion to compel the return of privileged documents, [126-3] motion for entry of a protective order. Reply due: 2/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/8/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment [until February 16, 1999]. Response due: 2/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [130-1] motion to Extend Time to provide supplemental reports, granting [130-2] motion establishment of a pretrial schedule. Set discovery deadline to 2/16/99. Depositions of Plaintiffs' experts shall be completed by 2/24/99. Set Defendant's expert report deadline to 2/15/99, supplemental expert report responding to Landmark's late-filed materials and supplemental reports by 3/1/99 and supplemental expert reports responding to FDIC witness Richard M. Starfield by 3/15/99. Plaintiffs shall conduct their depositons of Defendant's expert witnesses between 2/25/99 and 4/27/99. Set dispositive motion filing deadline to 4/5/99. Set Plaintiff's appendix G deadline to 4/30/99 and Defendant's appendix G deadline to 5/5/99. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/17/99 for the filings of any motion in limine and set responses to any motions in limine to 5/27/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/08/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [130-1] motion to Extend Time to provide supplemental reports, [130-2] motion establishment of a pretrial schedule, [130-3] motion for expedited breifing and consideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 2/3/99 ) to [130-1] motion to Extend Time to provide supplemental reports. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999, Terminated: 3/6/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 2/3/99 ) to [130-1] motion to Extend Time to provide supplemental reports and amend the pre-trial schedule. Reply due: 2/16/99 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 1/25/99 ) to [135-1] cross motion. Reply due: 2/11/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 12/23/98 ) and RESPONSE to [117-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by LANDMARK. 1 volume of supplemental appendix. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 12/18/98 ) and RESPONSE to [117-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by LANDMARK. 1 separate volume of appendix. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [127-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, granting [125-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Defendant's cross-motion and opposition brief, Defendant's amended cross-motion and opposition brief and Plaintiff's reply and opposition brief. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 1/29/99 ) for Sanctions . Response due: 2/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999, Terminated: 2/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 2/1/99 ) to Extend Time to provide supplemental reports [until March 1, 1999], establishment of a pretrial schedule and for expedited breifing and consideration. Response due: 2/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999, Terminated: 2/3/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 1/25/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999, Terminated: 2/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 1/25/99 ) to strike exhibits , to compel the return of privileged documents and for entry of a protective order. Response due: 2/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/98 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation , filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of "Line" by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/23/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/19/99 ) to [122-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental brief concerning complete liability summary judgment. Reply due: 2/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 1/12/99 ) for Leave to file supplemental brief concerning complete liability summary judgment , (Brief included). Response due: 2/1/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [118-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery and complete depositions of plaintiff's experts . By February 15, 1999, defendant shall complete its depositions of plaintiffs' experts and fact discovery ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [118-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery and complete depositions of plaintiff's experts, [118-2] motion to Extend Time to provide final reports of experts. Service: 12/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 12/24/98 ) to [118-1] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery and complete depositions of plaintiff's experts, [118-2] motion to Extend Time to provide final reports of experts. Reply due: 1/11/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998, Terminated: 1/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/16/98 ) to Extend Time to complete discovery and complete depositions of plaintiff's experts , (until February 10, 1999) and to Extend Time to provide final reports of experts , (until February 15, 1999). Response due: 1/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/11/1998, Terminated: 8/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 12/9/98 ) for partial Summary Judgment concerning the October 31, 1983 asset conveyance. Response due: 1/11/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 11/20/98 ) to Withdraw [111-1] motion response by LANDMARK. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to response to [109-1] motion for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Brief". Service: 11/18/98. (FE) Modified on 11/30/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 11/6/98 ) for Leave to Substitute Page 5 of the Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion to File Common Issue 11 Briefs. (Page included) Response due: 11/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [107-1] motion to Strike portion of deposition record and request for return of inadvertently produced documents. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [107-1] motion to Strike portion of deposition record and request for return of inadvertently produced documents, [FILED UNDER SEAL] by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/2/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 10/30/98 ) to [109-1] motion for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Brief". Reply due: 11/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/30/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to (LANDMARK) response to motion to strike , (until November 3, 1998). Response due: 11/30/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Brief" . Response due: 11/12/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 10/13/98 ) to [107-1] motion to Strike portion of deposition record and request for return of inadvertently produced documents. Reply due: 10/30/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998, Terminated: 11/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/24/98 ) to Strike portion of deposition record and request for return of inadvertently produced documents . FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 10/13/98. (HW) Modified on 09/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [77-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental response, etc. Service: 8/27/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED ORDER filed 8/14/98 signed this date by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 8/20/98 ) to [77-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental response, etc. Reply due: 9/8/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority with the Court by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated Order governing videotaping of depositions (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service : 8/6/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Richard Stephen Gill for FDIC Added Richard Herman Kamp. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/6/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [95-1] motion to assign a trial judge. Service: 8/3/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 7/28/98 ) to [95-1] motion to assign a trial judge. Reply due: 8/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [95-1] motion to assign a trial judge. Service: 7/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 7/17/98 ) to [95-1] motion to assign a trial judge. Reply due: 7/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/16/98 ) to assign a trial judge. Response due: 8/3/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arlene Pianko Groner. Service : 7/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY by USA to [90-1] response by FDIC and [89-1] response by LANDMARK. Service: 5/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [91-1] motion to Extend Time to file sur-reply to Plaintiff's Reply and FDIC's Reply to Defendant's 4/30/98 responses ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998, Terminated: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/98 ) to Extend Time to file sur-reply to Plaintiff's Reply and FDIC's Reply to Defendant's 4/30/98 responses [to May 29, 1998]. Response due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by FDIC to [88-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by LANDMARK to [88-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to [87-1] response by LANDMARK. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by LANDMARK to [83-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [85-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation to their responsive brief to Defendant's show cause filing. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998, Terminated: 4/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 3/31/98 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation to their responsive brief to Defendant's show cause filing. Response due: 4/3/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FDIC to [83-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [78-1] order Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Richard Stephen Gill. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Richard Stephen Gill. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Peebles Sholar Jr. Service : 2/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE 92-138C FOR OPINION RE: LIABILITY. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: 10/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/6/97) for Leave to File supplemental response, etc. Response due: 10/23/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental reply ( signed by Judge Miller for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997, Terminated: 9/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 9/16/97 ) for Leave to File supplemental reply to defendant's reply in support of its motion for leave to file answer including a special plea in fraud. (Supplemental reply included in motion) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [66-1] motion for Leave to File answer including special plea in fraud. Service: 9/8/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 8/22/97 ) to [66-1] motion for Leave to File answer including special plea in fraud, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/8/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 8/22/97 ) to [66-1] motion for Leave to File answer including special plea in fraud Reply due: 8/22/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE 90-8C FOR TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: oral argument (2 volumes), taken at San Francisco, California on August 7 and 8, 1997. Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental brief by LANDMARK re: information requested by Court during oral argument. Service: 8/11/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [67-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental brief, granting [64-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation for its sur-reply brief to the defendant's Omnibus brief of July 21, 1997., granting [61-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to First Set of Interrogatories reset Interrogatories deadline to 8/29/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997, Terminated: 8/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 8/11/97 ) for Leave to File supplemental brief Response due: 8/28/97 (CDC) Modified on 08/15/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [55-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 9/8/97 ), [52-1] motion for Summary Judgment by LANDMARK ( Transcript due 9/8/97 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 257 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/19/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to by USA. Service: 8/5/97 (nunc pro tunc 8/5/99) (JT) Modified on 08/19/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/97 ) for Leave to File answer including special plea in fraud . Response due: 8/22/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sur-reply brief by LANDMARK to defendant's omnibus brief. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 7/31/97 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation for its sur-reply brief to the defendant's Omnibus brief of July 21, 1997. Response due: 7/31/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 7/31/97 ) to [63-1] cross motion reply to [59-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 8/14/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 7/18/97 ) and RESPONSE to [59-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by FDIC. Response due: 8/4/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [63-1] cross motion reset to 8/4/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997, Terminated: 8/13/1997 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FDIC (Service : 7/17/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to First Set of Interrogatories (until 8/29/97). (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [60-1] motion to Extend Time to July 18, 1997, to reply to response to defendant's cross motion for partial summary judgment. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 7/18/97 for [55-1] cross motion ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997, Terminated: 7/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/27/97 ) to Extend Time to July 18, 1997, to reply to response to defendant's cross motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 7/14/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  "SHORT FORM" MOTION by FDIC (Service : 6/19/97 ) fo partial Summary Judgment on liability. [IN CAMERA]. Response due: 7/21/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; oral argument set for 10:00 8/7/97 and possibly 8/8/97 for [52-1] motion for Summary Judgment, for [55-1] cross motion (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by LANDMARK Re: [56-1] motion response by LANDMARK, by leave of the Judge. Service 5/13/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 5/13/97 ) to [55-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 5/30/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of supplemental filing re: paragraph 5.d of the Omnibus case management order by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/14/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 4/14/97 ) and RESPONSE to [52-1] motion for Summary Judgment by LANDMARK Filed by leave of the judge. Response due: 5/15/97. (CDC) Modified on 05/19/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/14/97. Fee waived. ( Answer due 5/16/97 ) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Owen Mason Service: 11/13/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by LANDMARK (Service: 11/1/96) for Summary Judgment on liability: Landmark Land Company, Inc. (in two volume). Response due: 12/2/96 (re-served 12/31/96) (HW) Modified on 01/09/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of certification relating to production of indices by LANDMARK. Service: 10/29/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of certification relating to production of core documents by LANDMARK. Service: 10/30/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Scheduling Conference for 9:00 a.m. on 7/31/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 7/9/96) for initial pretrial conference and scheduling order . Response due: 7/26/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 6/13/96 ) to [32-1] motion for partial modification of protective order. Reply due: 6/27/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Leave to File status report and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/24/96 ) for Leave to File status report (and status report). Response due: 6/10/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] motion for partial modification of protective order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/14/96 (FE) Modified on 05/22/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by LANDMARK to response to [31-1] motion to Compel Disclosure of Information . Service: 5/6/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 5/7/96) to defendant's [33-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures. Reply due: 5/24/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by LANDMARK (Service: 4/30/96) to [32-1] motion for partial modification of protective order. Reply due: 5/13/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/29/96 ) to [31-1] motion to Compel Disclosure of Information. Reply due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/18/96) for partial modification of protective order . Response due: 5/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 4/12/96 ) to Compel Disclosure of Information . Response due: 4/29/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/96 ) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 . Response due: 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [21-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Documentation [response to January 29, 1996 Order] by LANDMARK. Service: 2/7/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing parties to review the proposed protective order and contact the court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Documentation [response to 12/5/95 order] by USA. Service: 1/29/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995 Additional Documentation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Documentation [response to order re: preservation of evidence] by USA. Service: 12/15/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to motion to stay proceedings. Service: 12/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to File reply to plaintiff's opposition to stay of proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/15/1995, Terminated: 12/18/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/13/95 ) for Leave to File reply to plaintiff's opposition to stay of proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER the court will consider issuing a protective order and invite comment from the parties on this point ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [12-1] order. Service: 11/30/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by LANDMARK to [12-1] order Service: 11/28/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER entered directing parties to advise court by 11/30/95 decision in WINSTAR 90-8C. (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing counsel to begin considering how to proceed once Supreme Court enters a decision in Winstar case (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/18/95) to [9-1] motion to Compel answer. Reply due: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/18/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by LANDMARK (Service : 10/9/95) to Compel answer . Response due: 10/26/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by USA re: [5-1] response [supplement to notification of intention] by USA by leave of Judge. Service: 9/18/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by LANDMARK re: supplement of notification of intention re: [6-1] report by LANDMARK by leave of Judge. Service: 9/8/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by LANDMARK. Service: 8/25/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [3-2] order. Service: 8/23/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos Service : 8/21/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER entered directing the parties to notify court of their intentioons ; set Status Report deadline to 8/31/95 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39798. Answer due on 10/3/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?