STRICKLAND v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00504-WCR
District Judge Wilkes C. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TIMOTHY C. STRICKLAND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Eugene Bergman +1 478 923 3176
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Owen Mason +1 703 760 5200 +1 703 748 0244 tmason@williamsmullen.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/4/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $101000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/3/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
PUBLISHED DECISION denying [27-1] motion for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [25-1] order (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Terminated:
    MOTION by TIMOTHY C. STRICKLAND (Service: 10/11/96) for Reconsideration/Rehearing Pursuant to Rule 59 re: [25-1] order . (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 that the complaint is dismissed. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION denying [20-1] cross motion, granting [12-1] motion to Dismiss and granting [12-2] motion judgment upon the administrative record (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
            NOTICE of change of address by Thomas Owen Mason (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/26/96 ) to [20-1] cross motion. Reply due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to motion to dismiss and respond to cross motion for summary judgment and Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 4/26/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996, Terminated: 4/2/1996 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/27/96) to Extend Time to reply to motion to dismiss and respond to cross motion for summary judgment (to April 26, 1996). (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                    CROSS MOTION for summary judgment by TIMOTHY C. STRICKLAND (Service: 2/29/96) and RESPONSE to [12-1] motion to Dismiss by USA by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/19/96 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by TIMOTHY C. STRICKLAND by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/29/96 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                        COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by TIMOTHY C. STRICKLAND by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/7/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                          MOTION by TIMOTHY C. STRICKLAND (Service: 2/29/96) to Extend Time to file response to motion to dismiss [to March 6, 1996] by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Deadline updated; Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 4/19/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Deadline updated; Response to [20-1] cross motion reset to 4/1/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER returning plaintiff's denial of defendant's motion to dismiss/for judgment plaintiff's motion for judgment [Rules 56.1(b), 56.1 and caption] (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 2/7/96, [12-2] motion judgment upon the administrative record reset to 2/7/96 ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996, Terminated: 1/19/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    MOTION by TIMOTHY C. STRICKLAND (Service: 1/5/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss [to February 7, 1996] by leave of Judge. Response due: 1/22/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 Administrative Record
                                      Administrative record [two volumes] filed by USA. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/1/95) to Dismiss or in the alternative judgment upon the administrative record . Response due: 1/2/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 Statement of Facts
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 12/18/95 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File motion to dismiss, etc., out of time (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995, Terminated: 1/2/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/95) for Leave to File motion to dismiss, etc., out of time . (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER returning Defendant's motion to dismiss, etc. due to defects [Rules 5(e), 10(a) and 56.1(b)] (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint set Answer deadline to 12/1/95 ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995, Terminated: 11/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/2/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 12/1/95. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to answer complaint reset Answer deadline to 11/3/95 ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995, Terminated: 10/5/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/29/95) to Extend Time to answer complaint until 11/3/95. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Thomas Owen Mason Service : 8/16/95 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39796. Answer due on 10/3/95. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?