U.S. BANCORP, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00505-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

U.S. Bancorp Corporation U.S. Bancorp Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "U.S. BANCORP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tarek Sawi Tarek.Sawi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/1/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 74 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees, costs, and expenses. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 73 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL directing the clerk to dismiss the case. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 75 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Stipulated Order of Dismissal by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL, USA. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 72 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Terminated:
          JOINT MOTION by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL, USA for order of dismissal . (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 71 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
            RESPONSE by USA to [70-1] response by U.S. BANK NATIONAL, U.S. BANCORP. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/12/00 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 70 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
              RESPONSE by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL to Defendant's Recommendations for Sanctions. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/00 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 69 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by USA to [67-1] order. Service: 6/23/00 (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 68 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Response to Order to Show Cause
                  Response to order to show cause by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL. Service: 6/23/00. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 67 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 6/23/00 for U.S. BANK NATIONAL, for U.S. BANCORP. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 66 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying [62-1] motion to withdraw from the second 30 Winstar cases. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 65 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by U.S. BANCORP and U.S. BANK NATIONAL to response to [62-1] motion to withdraw from the second 30 Winstar cases. Service: 6/2/00. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 64 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER denying [62-2] motion for expedited consideration. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 63 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/1/2000 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/31/00) to [62-1] motion to withdraw from the second 30 Winstar cases. Reply due: 6/12/00. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 62 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000, Terminated: 6/13/2000 Terminated:
                              MOTION by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL (Service : 5/17/00 (by hand)) to withdraw from the second 30 Winstar cases and for expedited consideration. Response due: 5/31/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 61 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying [60-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to second set of discovery requests. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 60 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000, Terminated: 5/9/2000 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL (Service by hand: 5/5/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to second set of discovery requests . Response due: 5/19/00 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 59 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL (Service : 4/14/00 (by hand)) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories [until May 15, 2000]. Response due: 4/28/00 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 58 Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      MOTION by U.S. BANCORP, U.S. BANK NATIONAL (Service : 10/27/99 (by hand)) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for continuance [until November 2, 1999]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/10/99 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 57 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        RESPONSE by U.S. BANCORP and U.S. BANK NATIONAL (Service by hand: 10/29/99) to [56-1] motion for continuance on Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability for breach of contract, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/9/99. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 56 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/16/1999 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/12/99 (by hand)) for continuance on Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on liability for breach of contract. Response due: 10/26/99 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 9/22/99 ( JPSR due 11/9/99 ) (AB)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 54 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [48-1] motion to change Plaintiffs' names ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                RESPONSE by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service: 1/25/99 ) to [51-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 2/8/99. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/99) to Stay proceeding to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 1/25/99. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM. Service: 12/15/98 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service : 12/15/98 (by hand)) for Summary Judgment on Liability for Breach of Contract. (2 Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 1/12/99 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998, Terminated: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service : 12/15/98 (by hand)) to change Plaintiffs' names. Response due: 12/29/98 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Tarek Sawi. Service: 8/23/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER reset Scheduling Conference for 9:00 a.m. on 7/31/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by William Patrick Donovan Jr. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST BANK, FSB to [38-2] order. Service: 6/12/96 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [37-1] motion for Leave to File status report and status report and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [32-1] motion for Partial Modification of Protective Order. Service: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion for leave to file motion to adopt specialized case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                    RESPONSE by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service: 5/6/96) to defendant's [32-1] motion for Partial Modification of Protective Order. Reply due: 5/23/96. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/17/96) for Partial Modification of Protective Order . Response due: 5/6/96. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/22/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to File letter dated April 9, 1996 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996, Terminated: 4/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST BANK, fsb, and FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service: 4/11/96) for Leave to File letter dated April 9, 1996 . Response due: 4/29/96. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/96) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 . Response due: 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [20-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER directing parties to review the proposed protective order and contact court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM. Service: 1/2/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER the court will consider issuing a protective order and invite comment from the parties on this point ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Memorandum
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by FIRST BANK, FSB re: [15-1] order. Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Memorandum
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by FIRST BANK, FSB re: [15-1] order. Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER entered directing the parties to notify court by 11/30/95 re WINSTAR 90-8C. (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER directing counsel to begin considering how to proceed after Supreme Court decision has been made in the Winstar case (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service: 10/17/95 ) to [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reply due: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/6/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint requests extension of 20 days. Response due: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service: 10/5/95 ) to [10-1] motion to Stay proceedings re: decision in WINSTAR Reply due: 10/20/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/18/95 ) to Stay proceedings re: decision in WINSTAR . Response due: 10/5/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST BANK, FSB and FIRST BANK SYSTEM to [6-1] motion to Stay re: CAFC decision in WINSTAR and [4-2] order. Service: 9/18/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's order dated 8/16/95 and reset Status Report deadline to 9/18/95 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995, Terminated: 9/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service : 9/11/95) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's order dated 8/16/95 until 9/18/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 9/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/95 ) to Stay re: CAFC decision in WINSTAR . Response due: 9/18/95. (HW) Modified on 09/13/1995
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 9/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST BANK, FSB, FIRST BANK SYSTEM (Service : 8/30/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to court's order , (until September 11, 1995) Response due: 9/18/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER entered directing parties to notify court of their intentions ; set Status Report deadline to 8/30/95 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Patrick Donovan Jr. Service: 8/15/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39841. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?