HOMEBANC, INC., FSB v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00506-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HOMEBANC, INC., FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P Murphy +1 406 256 9700 +2569 256 256 9755 jamey.murphy09@gmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Joseph Dernelle +1 202 418 5411 +1 202 418 5523
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/21/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(i)(ii). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER for Plaintiff's counsel to advise the court no later than 11/29/02 whether it will file a motion for voluntary dismissal (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Terminated:
        RESPONSE by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB (Service: 11/12/02) to [36-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff's compliance with its document-production obligations under Rule 34(b) and the discovery plan. Reply due: 11/26/02 (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/25/02 ) to Compel Plaintiff's compliance with its document-production obligations under Rule 34(b) and the discovery plan. Response due: 11/12/02 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 7/8/02 (JPSR due 8/29/02). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002, Terminated: 2/8/2002 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)Court Filing
              MOTION by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB (Service: 1/18/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney David Michael Schwartz for HOMEBANC, INC., FSB Added James P. Murphy. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 02/08/2002
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gary Joseph Dernelle Service : 10/27/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/22/2000 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB. Service: 7/19/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Terminated:
                      MOTION by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB (Service : 7/5/00 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney John Van Arnum Austin for HOMEBANC, INC., FSB Added David Michael Schwartz. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999 Terminated:
                        MOTION by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB (Service : 11/12/99 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Michael A. Carvin for HOMEBANC, INC., FSB Added John Van Arnum Austin . (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patricia Ann Smith Service : 8/10/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case Specific Discovery by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                NOTICE of change of address by Michael A. Carvin. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB. Service: 12/30/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: 4/22/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gordon Michael Harvey. Service : 4/11/97 (AB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William George Cole. Service : 10/11/96. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                        NOTICE of change of address by Michael A. Carvin (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                            SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                NOTICE of change of address by Randi-Sue Rimerman (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [15-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file status report (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995 Status Report
                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/22/95 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Status Report
                                                              STATUS REPORT by HOMEBANC, INC., FSB. Service: 11/15/95 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SEE ORDER in 90-581C re stay & filing of papers under stay . (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995, Terminated: 12/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/14/95) to Extend Time to file status report until 11/29/95. Response due: 12/1/95 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER returning plaintiff's opposition to motion for stay for correction of defect [attorney's signature]. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision. Service: 11/2/95 (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        See 95-250C for STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 11/15/95, staying proceedings until 12/1/95 and directing parties to file any objections to stay by 11/2/95 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/6/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . Response due: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Randi-Sue Rimerman Service : 8/16/95 (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                              Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39840. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?