WEYERHAEUSER, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00507-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Weyerhaeuser Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Henry Ledig +1 202 639 7000
No Logo WEYERHAEUSER FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Henry Ledig +1 202 639 7000
No Logo Weyerhaeuser Real Estate Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Henry Ledig +1 202 639 7000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Ann Smith +1 703 548 3774 +1 703 518 5545 pasmithaty@aol.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/11/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL, USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (DS)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, re: Plaintiff to produce documents by 7/24/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
        RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 7/8/02) to [36-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 7/17/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, re: Response to Motion for Protective Order and discovery procedures (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
            MOTION by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI and WEYERHAEUSER REAL (Service by hand: 7/3/02) for Protective Order , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/17/02. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service by hand: 7/8/02 (JPSR due 8/29/02). (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patricia Ann Smith. Service: 5/17/01. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Susan F. LaMarca Service : 10/30/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL. Service: 7/21/00 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000
                        NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Discovery by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL. Service: 5/17/00 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Discovery by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                            NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Discovery by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/28/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Francis Ryan. Service : 8/3/98. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Discovery by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL. Service: 1/30/98 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Katherine Mary Kelly Service : 7/22/97 (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    MOTION by Sterling Savings Association for Leave to File Joinder in Motion to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/21/97 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL to response to [21-1] motion to Compel Production of Core Documents. Service: 3/24/97 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/19/97) to plaintiffs' [21-1] motion to Compel Production of Core Documents. Reply due: 4/4/97. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by WEYERHAEUSER, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCI, WEYERHAEUSER REAL (Service : 3/14/97 By Hand) to Compel Production of Core Documents . Response due: 3/28/97 (FE) Modified on 03/24/1997
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joel Jeffreys Roessner. Service : 11/7/96. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/16/1996 Memorandum
                                              MEMORANDUM by WEYERHAEUSER re: proposed omnibus case management order. Service BY HAND: 9/9/96 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996, Terminated: 8/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996, Terminated: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Arnold Mark Auerhan (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996, Terminated: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/29/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Stay pending completion of WINSTAR writ of certiorari (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995, Terminated: 10/2/1995 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/26/95) to Stay pending completion of WINSTAR writ of certiorari Response due: 10/13/95 (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arnold Mark Auerhan Service : 9/1/95 (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference, identifying filing requirements for conference and precluding filing of dispositive motions (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Laureen Kapin Service: 8/15/95 (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                              NOTICE by WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY, WEYERHAEUSER FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., and WEYERHAEUSER REAL ESTATE COMPANY of related case(s). (90-8 C, 90-773 C and 90-772 C). (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39839. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?