CITYFED FINANCIAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00508-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CITYFED FINANCIAL CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Eisenhart +1 202 261 3306 +1 202 261 3333 feisenhart@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Michael Dintzer +1 202 307 0282 +1 202 514 8624 kenneth.dintzer@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thelma Wanda Diaz +1 202 942 3615
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/16/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaints are dismissed, with prejudice pursuant to RCFC 41(a)(2). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 37 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Court Filing
    ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Dismiss claims with prejudice, granting [29-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice the claims of Cityfed Financial Corp. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002, Terminated: 4/16/2002 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/11/02) to [35-1] motion to Dismiss claims with prejudice. Reply due: 3/28/02. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002, Terminated: 4/16/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 2/22/02) to Dismiss claims with prejudice . Response due: 3/25/02. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by FDIC. Service: 6/27/00 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000
                REPLY by FDIC to response to [29-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice the claims of Cityfed Financial Corp. Service: 6/19/00 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by CITYFED FINANCIAL to response to [29-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice the claims of Cityfed Financial Corp. Service: 6/16/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/5/00 ) to [29-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice the claims of Cityfed Financial Corp. Reply due: 6/22/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Terminated:
                      MOTION by CITYFED FINANCIAL, FDIC (Service : 5/19/00 ) to dismiss with prejudice the claims of Cityfed Financial Corp. Response due: 6/19/00 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Opt-Out of Case Specific Discovery by CITYFED FINANCIAL. Service: 4/21/00 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Opt-Out of Case Specific Discovery by CITYFED FINANCIAL. Service: 4/27/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Opt-Out of Case Specific Discovery by CITYFED FINANCIAL. Service: 3/31/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 25 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                              NOTICE of change of address by Frank J. Eisenhart. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth Michael Dintzer Service : 11/7/97 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                  Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/31/97. RECEIPT # Not Requird. ( Answer due 6/2/97 ) (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                    MOTION by CITYFED FINANCIAL (Service : 8/21/96 ) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order , [by leave of the Judge]. Response due: 9/9/96 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Anthony Schollmann. Service: 10/1/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                        SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                              NOTICE of change of address by Carol Lynn Wallack (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/31/1996 Status Report
                                                STATUS REPORT by CITYFED FINANCIAL Service: 5/28/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/31/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Deadline updated; reset Status Report deadline to 8/26/96 (90 days) (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by CITYFED FINANCIAL (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File a response to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996 Status Report
                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT Service: 3/1/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                              Deadline updated; reset Status Report deadline to 6/3/96 (90 days). (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 Status Report
                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Deadline updated; set Status Report deadline to 3/4/96 [90 days]. (FE) Modified on 12/08/1995
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings and setting Joint Status Report deadline to 12/4/95 with further status reports to be at 90-day intervals etc. (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings. Service: 10/23/95. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                        RESPONSE by CITYFED FINANCIAL (Service: 9/16/95[sic]) to [6-1] motion to Stay of proceedings. Reply due: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/18/1995, Terminated: 10/30/1995 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/13/95) to Stay of proceedings re: petition for writ of CERTIORARI (WINSTAR). Response due: 10/30/95. (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file its motion for leave to take discovery, etc. set Interrogatories deadline to 10/16/95 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995, Terminated: 9/11/1995 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by CITYFED FINANCIAL (Service : 9/6/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file its motion for leave to take discovery, etc. , (45 days). (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Carol Lynn Wallack. Service : 8/21/95 (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Complaint
                                                                                    RULE 27 COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39838. (Motion for discovery under Rule 27 due by 9/6/95) (FE)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?