FIRST UNION CORP, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00509-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo First Union Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ben Franklin Johnson, III +1 404 881 7000
No Logo First Union National Bank Of Florida, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ben Franklin Johnson, III +1 404 881 7000
No Logo Meritor Savings, F.a., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ben Franklin Johnson, III +1 404 881 7000
No Logo PSFS THRIFT HOLDING COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ben Franklin Johnson, III +1 404 881 7000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathie Ann Whipple +1 202 307 0290
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/4/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FIRST UNION CORP, FIRST UNION, USA, PSFS THRIFT and MERITOR SAVINGS. Service:10/4/96 Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
      SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996, Terminated: 8/19/1996 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to submit a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/26/96) for Leave to submit a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of change of address by Kathie Ann Whipple (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File a response to motiion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996, Terminated: 5/15/1996 Terminated:
                    MOTION by FIRST UNION CORP, FIRST UNION (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File a response to motiion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/25/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/27/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995, Terminated: 10/11/1995 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/6/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 9/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying [3-1] notice which will be treated as a motion to consolidate Response to motion consolidate do within time period allowed by rule. (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kathie Ann Whipple Service : 8/21/95 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995, Terminated: 8/30/1995 Terminated:
                                    NOTICE by FIRST UNION CORPORATION and FIRST UNION NATIONAL BANK OF FLORIDA of related case(s). (90-8 C, 90-773 C and 90-772 C). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39837. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?