COLUMBIA FIRST BANK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00510-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary C. Gill +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 253 8192 mary.gill@alston.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian L. Owsley +1 202 305 7561 +1 202 305 7643
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 3/16/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (228) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 204 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of the defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 203 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION granitng [189] MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 202 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Response
      DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by USA. Service: 02/13/2004.(lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 201 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
        ORDER granting [200] Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 200 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004, Terminated: 2/18/2004 Terminated:
          MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Pltf's Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 2/13/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 199 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
            ORDER: [198] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Dft's Motion for Directed Verdict is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 198 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Terminated:
              MOTION for Leave to File notice of supplemental authority in support of its opposition to Defendant's Motion for directed verdict by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB.Service: 1/30/04. Response due by 2/17/2004 (hw1, ).
                LREF
                Blank 197 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT: (Judge Emily C. Hewitt) Plaintiff's Exhibits #1, 22, 26, 27, 31, 36, 46, 57, and 58 that were missing from the previous 4 volumes of trial transcripts, originally filed on 12/3/2003. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 195 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Description not available
                  REPLY BRIEF in Support of [189] Dft's MOTION for Judgment Upon Partial Findings filed by USA. Service: 12/12/03.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 194 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Response
                    RESPONSE to [193] Pltf's Counter-Facts in Connection With Its Opposition to Dft's Motion for Directed Verdict filed by USA. Service: 12/12/03.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 193 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Statement of Facts
                      COUNTER-FACTS in Connection With Its Opposition to Dft's Motion for Directed Verdict by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Service: 12/5/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 192 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Response
                        OPPOSITION to Dft's Rule 52(c) Motion for Directed Verdict (Oral) filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Reply due by 12/12/2003. Service: 12/5/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 196 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          CORRECTED COPY OF TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Four (4) Volumes [Volume 1 (pages 1-298) on 11/4/2003; Volume 2 (pages 299-610) on 11/5/2003; Volume 3 (pages 611-937) on 11/6/2003; and Volume 4 (pages 938-1262) on 11/7/2003] before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 191 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (4 volumes) held on 11/4/2003 - Volume 1 (pages 1-298); 11/5/2003 - Volume 2 (pages 299-610), 11/6/2003 - Volume 3 (pages 611-937); and 11/7/2003 - Volume 4 (pages 938-1262) before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 190 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The court grants pltf's request and MODIFIES its Order of 11/10/2003 to change the due dates for Pltf's Response and Dft's Reply as follows: Pltf's Response shall be filed on or before 12/5/2003. Dft's Reply shall be filed on or before 12/12/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Informal Telephonic Status Conference held on November 24, 2003. Plaintiff requested enlargement of briefing schedule set out in Order of November 10, 2003. Granted in Order of November 25, 2003 modifying briefing schedule. (jb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 189 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Terminated:
                                  MOTION for Judgment Upon Partial Findings by USA.Service: 11/21/03. Response due by 12/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 188 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact by USA. Service: 11/21/03.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 187 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Stipulation
                                      STIPULATED Findings of Fact by all parties. Service: 11/3/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 186 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                        ORDER: [183] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Stipulated Findings of Fact is GRANTED. The parties' Stipulated Finding of Fact attached to Pltf's Motion are accepted as timely filed. [181] Dft's Motion for the Exclusion of Witnesses was GRANTED orally by the court at the opening of trial on 11/4/2003. All witnesses other than expert witnesses and the parties' representatives were excluded from the courtroom. Dft's Rule 52(c) Motion was made orally at trial after the close pltf's case on 11/7/2003. The court set the following schedule for briefs: Dft's brief in support of its Rule 52(c) Motion shall be filed on or before 11/21/2003. Pltf's Response shall be filed on or before 12/2/2003. Dft's Reply shall be filed on or before 12/8/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 11/21/2003. Reply due by 12/8/2003. Response due by 12/2/2003 (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003
                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/12/2003. (vp1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Trial held on 11/04-07/2003, plaintiff's case concluded, further trial cancelled. (jb2)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 185 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Witness List
                                                Joint Updated Witness List by all parties. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to confer and to prepare an updated list of witnesses to be delivered to the court by email or facsimile at or before 5 pm on Monday, 11/3/2003 if practicable, and, in any event, in duplicate hard copy at the beginning of trial on 11/4/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003, Terminated: 11/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File the Attached Joint Stipulated Findings of Fact by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB.Service: 11/3/03 by hand. Response due by 11/17/2003. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Witness List
                                                      Notification of Trial Testimony/Witness List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION for Exclusion of Witnesses by USA.Service: 11/3/03. Response due by 11/20/2003. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 180 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION: The court has before it Columbia First Bank's Objections to Dft's Witness and Exhibit Lists filed 8/13/2003, PLtf Columbia First Bank's Post Conference Brief filed on 10/17/2003, Dft's Response to Pltf's Objections to Dft's Trial Exhibits filed on 10/24/2003, and Pltf's Reply in Further Support of its Post Conference Brief filed on 10/28/2003. The court, in order to resolve evidentiary issues raised at the Pre-Trial Conference held on 10/8/2003, issued an Order on 10/9/2003 setting out several issues for post-conference briefing. The court, having considered the arguments presented by the parties, rules on five briefed evidentiary issues in this opinion.. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: On the record before the court, PICC-related evidence of an alleged defense of offset to pltfs' lost profits claims has not been excluded by agreement of the parties and may be introduced at trial. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 Response
                                                              REPLY in Further Support of [175] Pltf's Post Conference Brief filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Service: 10/23/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Response
                                                                RESPONSE to [147] Pltf's Objections to Dft's Trial Exhibits, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume filed by USA. Service: 10/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: Further to an informal telephonic conference held on 10/15/2003, the court and the parties have agreed that pltf's Refomatted Trial Exhibit List filed on 10/14/2003 shall establish the PX numbering for pltf's exhibits offered at trial. The Order SUPERCEDES the Order of 10/3/2003 and 10/9/2003 in this respect. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Memorandum
                                                                    POST CONFERENCE BRIEF by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Service: 10/17/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: Further to the pre-trial conference held on 10/8/03, the court issues this Order to supplement its [172] Order of 10/9/03, addressing several pre-trial matters. The court orders any party serving a subpoena on a witness for this trial to provide notice of that subpoena by transmitting a courtesy copy to opposing counsel and to the court. Pre-Trial Conference of 10/8/03 Transcript at 10-11. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003
                                                                        Minute EntryBefore Judge Emily C. Hewitt: Informal Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/15/2003 regarding conformity of plaintiff's Reformatted Trial Exhibit List with court's Order of October 9, 2003. (jb2)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Exhibit
                                                                          Notice of Filing Reformatted Trial Exhibit List by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. (jat, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Order on Cross MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: [138] Dft't Cross Motion for a Protective Order is MOOT. [140] Pltf's Motion for Partial Withdrawal of Motion Regarding Pre-Trial Matters is MOOT. [163] Dft's Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial is GRANTED. The court modifies paragraph 7 of the parties' joint stipulations to read in pertinent parts wherever notification is required: "shall promptly notify the other parties and the court." As modified, the Joint Stipulations of Pre-Trial and Trial Procedures are approved and entered as an Order of the court. The parties shall file, on or before 10/21/2003, any joint stipulations with the court. 11/10/2003 has been substituted for the 11/11/2003 trial day. This Order SUPERSEDES the Orders of 1/16/2003 and 6/26/2003 in this respect. Pltf shall file on or before 10/14/2003 a reformatted version of its Trial Exhibit List. Pltf shall file its post-conference brief on or before 10/17/2003. Dft shall file its responsive brief on or before 10/24/2003. Pltf shall file its reply brief, if any, on or before 10/28/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Unpublished OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                              UNPUBLISHED OPINION: Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Deposition Testimony with Accompanying Memorandum is DENIED. Insofar as the updated Exhibit A of pltf's motion was filed as a separate motion entitled "[170] Pltf's Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Testimony," that motion is also DENIED.Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 167 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 8, 2003 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Trial set for 11/10/2003 09:00 AM before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 10/23/2003. Notice of Compliance due by 10/17/2003. Reply due by 10/28/2003. Response due by 10/24/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003
                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/9/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt: Pretrial Conference held on 10/08/2003. (jb2)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 170 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Testimony by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB.Service: 10/6/03. Response due by 10/23/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 169 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Response
                                                                                            REVISED OBJECTIONS to [168] Dft's Exhibit List filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Service: 10/6/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 168 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                              First Amended Exhibit List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 166 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER re: Master Stipulation and Order concerning Authenticity of documents, etc. filed on December 7, 1999. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER re: Item's on the agenda for the Pre-trial conference scheduled for October 8, 2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                    First Joint Exhibit List by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB and USA. (dw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Informal Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/2/2003. (jb2)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 163 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas 100+ Miles by USA.Service: 10/2/03. Response due by 10/20/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 162 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATIONS of Pre-Trial and Trial Procedures by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB, USA. (jat, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 161 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit A due by 10/6/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 160 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                              UNPUBLISHED OPINION denying without prejudice [151] MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Testimony filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. The court also notes that plaintiff's Exhibit A attached to the motion, a chart of specific deposition testimony page and line references, remains incomplete in relation to the list of named deponents. If plaintiff wishes to present substantive evidence by way of deposition testimony at trial, it shall file its motion on or before 10/6/03.. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jat, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: . Motion(s) due by 10/6/2003. (jat, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER RETURNING Plaintiff's Amended Trial Exhibit List received 9/23/03. The filing is untimely and shall be returned. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION: The court agrees with dft that this dispute can best be resolved in the context of trial. The court finds that Dr. Frankel and Mr. Rush do present qualifications of the type contemplated by Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence and the Daubert line of cases. At this juncture, such limitations as may exist to their capacities as experts appear to the court to go to the weight of their anticipated testimony, rather than its admissibility. Accordingly, [125] Pltf's MOTION in Limine is DENIED.Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [151] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Testimony filed by USA. Reply due by 9/11/2003. Service: 8/27/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [147] Pltf's Objections to Dft's Witness Lists and Exhibit Lists filed by USA. Service: 8/27/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                          Witness List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Exhibit List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED OPINION: Because bad faith is an essential element of the spoliation doctrine that must be present for an adverse inference to be drawn from spoliation, and bad faith has not been shown in this case, [124] Dft's MOTION in Limine is DENIED. The court does note, however, that at trial dft may present testimony as to the effect of the loss of these documents on the preparation of its defense. The court may consider at that time whether the loss of the documents affects the weight of the evidence supporting pltf's claims and/or dft's defenses.Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Testimony, Together With Memorandum of Law in Support by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB.Service: 8/13/03 by hand. Response due by 8/27/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Trial Exhibit List by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                        Witness List by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Objection to Witness List
                                                                                                                                          Objections to Dft's Witness Lists and Exhibit Lists by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003
                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/27/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 26, 2003 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Pursuant to an on the record telephonic status conference held on Thursday, 6/26/03, the court reschedules the following: 1) Depositions of Witnesses; 2) Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law: In accordance with RCFC Appendix A paragragh 14, pltf shall file it Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law on or before Wednesday, 8/13/2003. Dft shall file its responsive Memorandum on or before 8/27/2003. 3) Pretrial Conference: The Pretrial Conference will be held on Wednesday, 10/8/2003 in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. This order supercedes the court's 1/16/03 order. The trial dates set for Tuesday through Friday, 11/4-11/7/03 and Tuesday through Friday, 11/11-11/14/03, remain the same. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/20/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 19, 2003 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [136] Motion as to depositions of witnesses identified in parties' trial schedules. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [138] Dft's CROSS MOTION for Protective Order to [136] Pltf's Motion to Conduct Trial Testimony Via Video Tape filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Reply due by 7/1/2003. Service: 6/17/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re: [138] Defendant's CROSS MOTION for a Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            PARTIAL MOTION to Withdraw [136] Plaintiff's MOTION to conduct trial testimony via video-tape in advance of trial and other discovery related matters by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB.Service: 06/10/03. Response due by 7/3/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [137] the Court's Show Cause Order filed by UNITED STATES. (Together with Defendant's Opposition and Cross-Motion for a Protective Order) Service: 06/13/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003, Terminated: 10/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION for a Protective Order to [136] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB by UNITED STATES. (Together with Opposition and Response to the Court's Show Cause order)Service: 06/13/03. Response due by 6/27/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003, Terminated: 10/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [136] MOTION to conduct trial testimony via video-tape in advance of trial and other discovery related matters filed by UNITED STATES. (Together with Cross-Motion for a Protective Order and Response to the Court's Show Cause Order) Reply due by 6/27/2003. Service: 06/13/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant is directed to show cause why Plaintiff's motion Regarding Pre-Trial Matters should not be granted by 6/13/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jat, ) Modified on 6/17/2003 (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003, Terminated: 6/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to conduct trial testimony via video-tape in advance of trial and other discovery related matters by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB.Service: 5/30/03. Response due by 6/16/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Telephone Number filed by Brian L. Owsley. Service: 5/27/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [127] Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/26/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response re [125] MOTION in Limine filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Service: 5/14/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response re [124] MOTION in Limine regarding an adverse inference for plaintiff's loss of relevant documents filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/14/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to [127] MOTION in Limine filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Service: 5/5/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [124] MOTION in Limine filed by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Reply due by 5/14/2003. Service: 5/5/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [125] MOTION in Limine (in limine to exclude certain expert testimony) filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/19/2003. Service: 5/1/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [127] MOTION in Limine filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/5/2003. Service: 4/23/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003, Terminated: 5/19/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to permit the proffer evidence on cost of replacement capital damages, by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Service: 4/14/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due 5/1/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing the parties to comply with court's rules in all future filings. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file plaintiff's expert motion despite deficiencies. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine (to exclude Certain Expert Testimony) by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 4/14/03. Response due by 5/5/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine regarding adverse inference for plaintiff's loss of relevant documents (together with separate appendix) by The United States.Service: 4/16/03. Response due by 5/5/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of trial schedule by The United States. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/9/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of filing of Proposed Trial Schedule by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, FSB. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/8/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER to file parties trial schedules. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 16, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Joint trial schedule due 4/9/03 , All motions i limine due 4/16/03 , Plaintiff's memorandum of contentions of fact and law due 8/6/03 and Defendant's responsive memorandum due 8/20/03 , Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/03 , and Trial set for 9:00 a.m. on 11/4/03 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [119-1] motion for Reconsideration of the spoliation issue, mooting [119-2] motion for Clarification concerning adverese inferences. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/2/03 ) for Reconsideration of the spoliation issue or for Clarification concerning adverese inferences. (JT) Modified on 02/05/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment and denying without prejudice Defendant's motion for dismissal or summary judgment based on the doctrine of spoliation or RCFC 37(b)(2) Joint Status Report due 1/15/03 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 30, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appendix references by USA. Service: 10/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Letter or informal memorandum, etc. due: 4:00 p.m. 10/29/02 for USA, for COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 10/30/02 for [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of filing of index to its attachments by USA. Service: 9/27/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 9/17/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Defendant's index to attachments due 9/30/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK to Defendant's [105-1] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Facts in connection with Motion for Summary Judgment upon damages claim. Service: 9/3/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service by hand: 9/3/02) to [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment, filed with a three (3) volume appendix in support. Reply due: 9/17/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 8/1/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/1/02 ) for Summary Judgment upon plaintiff's damages claims, (together with separate four volume appendix). Response due: 9/3/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: (1) Defendant shall provide its expert report to plaintiff on or before Friday, August 16, 2002; (2) If any party wishes to file a dispositive motion, such a motion shall be filed on or before Thursday, August 1, 2002. If no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before Monday, August 19, 2002 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 6/18/02) to [101-1] motion to Extend Time to file dispositive motions. Reply due: 7/5/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 6/13/02) to Extend Time to file dispositive motions until 8/1/02. Response due: 7/1/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 18, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER -- (1) Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint shall be treated as if it had been withdrawn and shall be disregarded in further proceedings in this matter; (2) Plaintiff's motion to strike affidavits is moot; (3) Plaintiff shall serve defendant with an amended expert report by 5/20/02; (4) Defendant shall advise the court and plaintiff by status report whether additional discovery is necessary, etc.; (5) If defendant wishes to file a summary judgment motion on damagesm it shall file by 7/17/02; and (6) If defendant does not file a summary judgment motion, the parties shall file a joint status report by 7/19/02 ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/23/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK and USA re: summary judgment and scheduling. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00am 4/18/02 ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL Brief regarding liability filed by USA. Service: 4/9/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 4/9/02) to Extend Time to file brief on recent authority , (until April 19, 2002). Response due: 4/26/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK. Service: 4/9/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Telephonic Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 4/11/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 15, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Telephonic status Conference set for 10:00 a.m. on 3/22/02 , Parties' Brief, not to exceed 10 pages, due 4/9/02 , and Parties' responses to briefs due 4/16/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/15/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/12/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK pursuant to [87-3] order. Service: 3/12/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Brian L. Owsley Service: 3/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Telephonic Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. 3/15/02 and Parties shall provide the Court with a brief introduction to the issues in the case by 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK and USA for a status conference . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE reassigned to Judge Emily C. Hewitt . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [81-1] motion to Strike [80-1] motion reply by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, [81-2] motion for Leave to file instanter attached surreply. Service: 9/7/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 8/22/01) for Leave to file instanter attached surreply . Response due: 9/10/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 8/23/01 [per corrected proof of service received on 8/31/01]) to [81-1] motion to Strike [80-1] motion reply by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK. Reply due: 9/7/01. (LTD) Modified on 09/04/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/7/01) to Strike [80-1] motion reply by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK , and for Leave to file instanter attached surreply . Response due: 8/24/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [81-1] motion to Strike [80-1] motion reply by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK reset to 8/24/01, [81-2] motion for Leave to file instanter attached surreply reset to 8/24/01 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (WITH ONE VOLUME OF APPENDIX) by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK to response to [78-1] motion for Leave to file first amended complaint. Service: 7/20/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/9/01) to [78-1] motion for Leave to file first amended complaint. Reply due: 7/23/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 6/22/01) for Leave to file first amended complaint . Response due: 7/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK to response to [70-1] motion to Strike [65-1] motion requesting that Defendant file the original deposition materials by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK . Service: 2/12/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/29/01) to [70-1] motion to Strike [65-1] motion requesting that Defendant file the original deposition materials by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK. Reply due: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES and PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/15/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, together with 5 volumes of appendix, by USA (Service: 12/15/00 ) to [61-1] motion for Summary Judgment filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/12/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK. Service: 1/10/01. (FE) Modified on 01/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to response to [61-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed with separate (volume) appendix. Service: 1/10/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page LimitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/15/00 ) out of time, For leave to exceed the page limitation , filed by leave of the Judge. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 1/10/01) to Strike [65-1] motion requesting that Defendant file the original deposition materials. by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pre-Judgment Interest Claim. Service: 1/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 12/12/00 ) to [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pre-Judgment Interest Claim., [62-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's takings claims. Reply due: 1/6/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation of Limited Withdrawal of Claims by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service : 10/9/00 ) requesting oral argument. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/26/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service : 10/10/00 ) requesting that Defendant file the original deposition materials. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/13/00 ) for entry of stipulated order. Response due: 10/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pre-Judgment Interest Claim. Response due: 11/29/00 (JT) Modified on 10/12/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to Dismiss Plaintiff's takings claims. Response due: 11/29/00 (JT) Modified on 10/12/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service : 10/9/00 ) for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/28/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK. Service: 10/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pre-Judgment Interest Claim reset to 11/29/00. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [62-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's takings claims reset to 11/29/00. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [58-1] motion for entry of stipulated order concerning a document from Mr. Norman H. Raiden. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000, Terminated: 9/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/26/00 ) for entry of stipulated order concerning a document from Mr. Norman H. Raiden. Response due: 10/13/00 (JT) Modified on 10/10/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [54-1] motion for entry of stipulated order permitting certain depositions to be taken after the close of fact discovery. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [53-1] motion for entry of stipulated order re: maintaining of videotape cassettes. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/19/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: motion for summary judgment. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 9/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/19/00 ) for entry of stipulated order permitting certain depositions to be taken after the close of fact discovery. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 9/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/19/00 ) for entry of stipulated order re: maintaining of videotape cassettes. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [51-1] motion for entry of stipulated order concerning certain documents and testimony. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000, Terminated: 8/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/14/00 ) for entry of stipulated order concerning certain documents and testimony. Response due: 8/31/00 (JT) Modified on 09/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [49-1] motion to Extend Time to file responses to first set of phase II case-specific requests to admit and interrogatories. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 8/8/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000, Terminated: 8/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/8/00) to Extend Time to file responses to first set of phase II case-specific requests to admit and interrogatories , (until August 15, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [47-1] motion for entry of a stipulated order concerning a document from Mr. Norman H. Raiden and Mr. Raiden's testimony. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000, Terminated: 8/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/31/00 ) for entry of a stipulated order concerning a document from Mr. Norman H. Raiden and Mr. Raiden's testimony. Response due: 8/17/00 (JT) Modified on 09/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Plaintiff will release the minutes to Defendant immediately unless it can make such a showing. Costs of this proceeding to Defendant. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [42-1] motion to Compel production of board minutes asserted by Plaintiff to be attorney-client privileged. Service: 3/2/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: 2/18/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service: 2/16/00 ) to [42-1] motion to Compel production of board minutes asserted by Plaintiff to be attorney-client privileged. Reply due: 3/2/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [41-1] motion for entry of stipulated order. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/00 ) to Compel production of board minutes asserted by Plaintiff to be attorney-client privileged. Response due: 2/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000, Terminated: 2/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 1/28/00 ) for entry of stipulated order. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ernest Leidenheimer Jr. Service : 6/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service : 9/4/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Ben Franklin Johnson for COLUMBIA FIRST BANK; Added Mary Catherine Gill. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Allen Davidovich. Service : 11/8/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Salomon Gomez (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion for special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK to [30-2] order, [29-2] order, [29-1] order. Service: 6/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Leave to File status report and status report (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to File response to motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996, Terminated: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/25/96 ) for Leave to File a copy fo the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/17/96) for Partial Modification of Protective Order . Response due: 5/6/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/96) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 . Response due: 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [15-1] order and [14-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: parties directed to review the proposed protective order and contact court by 2/9/96 whether they have any comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER the court will consider issuing a protective order and invite comment from parties on this point ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK to [10-1] order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER asking the clerk to accept plaintiff's response to court's order of 11/13/95 for filing, notwithstanding the fact that it is not signed by the attorney of record ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [10-1] order. Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER entered directing parties to notify court by 11/13/95 re WINSTAR 90-8C. (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing counsel to begin considering how to proceed once Supreme Court enters a decision in Winstar case (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by USA re: supplemental response to [5-2] order Service: 10/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/6/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: 10/2/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Salomon Gomez Service: 9/28/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 9/1/1995 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK and USA to [5-2] order. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER entered directing the parties to notify court of their intentions ; set Status Report deadline to 8/31/95 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Hal Scott Shapiro. Service : 8/16/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by COLUMBIA FIRST BANK of related case(s). (90-8 C, 90-773 C, 90-772 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39836. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?