CHARTER FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00513-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Matthew Buchanan +1 202 371 5787 +1 202 371 5950 tbuchana@winston.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Michael Dintzer +1 202 307 0282 +1 202 514 8624 kenneth.dintzer@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Stipulation
County
Terminated 3/23/2006
Origin 1
Reopened 3/12/2004
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (142) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 133 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 24, 2006, forwarded to Thomas Matthew Buchanan. See letter in file. (bre, )
    LREF
    Blank 132 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $2,716,694.00. This award shall be payable to AmSouth, Banccorporation. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 131 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Court Filing
      ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff, Charter Federal Savings Bank, payable to AmSouth, Banccorporation in the amount of $2,716,694.00. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 130 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006
        STIPULATION for entry of judgment by all parties filed [by leave of the judge]. (dls )
          LREF
          Blank 127 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 19, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 129 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Witness List
            Witness List, filed by USA. Service: 1/24/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 128 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Exhibit
              Exhibit List, filed by USA. Service: 1/24/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 126 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Exhibit
                Exhibit List, filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 1/23/2006.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 125 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Witness List
                  Witness List, filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 1/23/2006.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 124 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Memorandum
                    Direct Examinations, filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/17/2006.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006
                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/21/2006. (vp1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 123 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 12, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/13/2006. (vp1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 122 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Stipulation
                            STIPULATIONS of Pre-Evidentiary Hearing and Evidentiary Hearing Procedures, filed by all parties. Service: 1/6/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 121 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/30/2006 at 9:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 120 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 6, 2005 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005
                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/6/2006. (vp1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 119 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Court Filing
                                    PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re: liability. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 118 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion (with separate appendix) re [108] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 117 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [109] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by USA. Service: 5/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 116 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Response to Motion
                                          RESPONSE to [109] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Reply due by 5/23/2005. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 5/4/2005.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 115 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                            RESPONSE to [110] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/4/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 114 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE to [108] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Damages, filed by USA. Reply due by 5/19/2005. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 5/4/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 113 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [112] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [108] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [109] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 5/4/2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005, Terminated: 4/29/2005 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [109] MOTION for Summary Judgment, until 5/4/2005, filed by USA. Service: 4/28/2005 by hand. Response due by 5/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Notice of Additional Authority
                                                    NOTICE of Recent Decision, filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/11/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/19/2005 (mb2, ). Modified on 4/19/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [108] MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Damages Claims. (with separate appendix) filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/8/2005. Response due by 5/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Damages. (with separate five (5) volume appendix) filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/8/2005. Response due by 5/2/2005. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Notice of Change of Address
                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Matthew Buchanan. Service: 4/1/2005.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/14/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion(s) due by 4/8/2005. Response due by 5/2/2005. Reply due by 5/16/2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/14/05 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (eph, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan G. Braden for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dls)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [101] Dft's Motion for Leave to Respond to Pltf's Notice of Recent Decisions. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/30/2004, Terminated: 11/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File response to plaintiff's notice of recent decisions by USA.Service: 10/26/2004. Response due by 11/12/2004 (hw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE of Recent Decisions by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 10/15/04.(jat, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [98] Motion for Leave to File Notice of Recent Decisions. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jat, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004, Terminated: 10/21/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Notice of recent Decisions by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK.Service: 10/15/04. Response due by 11/1/2004 (vro, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Response
                                                                                  RESPONSE to [95] Pltf's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Recent Case Law, filed by USA. Service: 5/21/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Response
                                                                                    REPLY to [94] Dft's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Liability Issues, filed by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/21/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Regarding Recent Case Law Pursuant to This Court's [92] 3/25/2004 Order, by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK. Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                        SUPPLEMENETAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to [16] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Liability Issues, and in Support of [57] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Reply due by 5/21/2004. Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Answer
                                                                                          ANSWER to the [1] Complaint by USA.Service: 3/31/2004 by hand. JPSR due by 5/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [90] Joint Motion for a Scheduling Order. The parties shall file simultaneous briefs on or before 4/30/2004 and simultaneous responses on or before 5/21/2004. Dft shall file its answer to the complaint on or before 3/31/2004. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jcp, ) Modified on 3/29/2004 for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt (jcp, ).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 3/31/2004. Brief due by 4/30/2004. Response due by 5/21/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file, on or before 4/1/2004, a joint status report. Signed by Judge George W. Miller for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, ) Modified on 3/22/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004, Terminated: 3/25/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION for Scheduling Order by CHARTER FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, USA.Service: 3/17/2004. Response due by 4/5/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 CAFC Mandate Reversing
                                                                                                    MANDATE of CAFC reversing [85] Published Decision, and remanding case to the United States Court of Federal Claims. (hw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                      CAFC Case Number Re: [87-1] appeal by CHARTER FEDERAL. CAFC NUMBER: 03-5032. (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002, Terminated: 3/12/2004 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by CHARTER FEDERAL. Copy to Defendant, Judge Diane Sypolt and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 055466. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002
                                                                                                          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendnat and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002
                                                                                                            Case closed (LD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                              PUBLISHED DECISION granting [17-1]defendant's motion to dismiss counts 1,2, and 3 of the complaint on grounds of collateral estoppel, and count 4 of the complaint for lack of jurisdiction over claims under Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment. No costs. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY by CHARTER FEDERAL to response to [81-1] motion for Leave to supplement opposition to motion for partial dismissal. Service: 5/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [82-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority, granting [81-1] motion for Leave to supplement opposition to motion for partial dismissal ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002, Terminated: 5/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/8/02) to Notice of recent decision and [81-1] motion for Leave to supplement opposition to motion for partial dismissal. Reply due: 5/22/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002, Terminated: 5/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 5/8/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 5/28/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        Notice of Recent Decision and MOTION by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service: 5/3/02) for Leave to supplement opposition to motion for partial dismissal . Response due: 5/20/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment (motion to dismiss included). Service: 3/19/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service: 3/15/02) to [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment (motion to dismiss included). Reply due: 4/1/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 12, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/11/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER resetting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 3/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE [summary of pending liability issues] by CHARTER FEDERAL pursuant to [74-3] order. Service: 2/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                      SUMMARY/OUTLINE by USA, pursuant to [74-3] order. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [72-1] joint motion for a status conference Status Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 3/12/02 , and Parties summary/outline, no more than 10 pages, due 2/28/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                            CASE reassigned to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt . (DS)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002, Terminated: 2/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by CHARTER FEDERAL and USA for a status conference . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [61-1] motion for Leave to take deposition out of time (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [61-1] motion for Leave to take deposition out of time. Service: 1/29/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA. Service: 1/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to response to [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed with separate appendix. Service: 1/12/01. (FE) Modified on 01/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service: 1/16/01) to [61-1] motion for Leave to take deposition out of time. Reply due: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CHARTER FEDERAL, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/11/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CHARTER FEDERAL, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/11/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service: 12/11/00 ) to [57-1] motion for Summary Judgment, filed by leave of the Judge, (together with separate two volume appendix). Reply due: 1/5/01. (HW) Modified on 01/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001, Terminated: 3/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/01) for Leave to take deposition out of time . Response due: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION (out-of-time) by USA (Service: 1/8/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/01 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to supplemental memorandum (to January 12, 2001). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service : 11/13/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/4/00 ) for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/4/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/99 ) to Extend Time to file initial disclosure [until September 27, 1999]. Response due: 10/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth Michael Dintzer. Service : 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by CHARTER FEDERAL. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                        See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY by USA re: [46-1] response by CHARTER FEDERAL. Service: 8/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [47-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to plaintiff's response. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998, Terminated: 11/4/1998 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/31/98 ) for Leave to file a sur-reply to plaintiff's response . Response due: 9/17/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CHARTER FEDERAL to Defendant's memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs Coordinating Committee's motion for leave to file supplemental materials (filed in 90-8). Service: 8/19/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [42-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Service: 8/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing of motion for leave to file supplemental authority [in Case No. 90-8C] by USA. Service: 8/6/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service: 7/27/98 ) to [42-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Reply due: 8/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/21/98) to Stay of proceedings on motions for summary judgment in certain cases, etc. Response due: 8/11/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY by CHARTER FEDERAL to [38-1] response by USA. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Leave to file a response to defendant's sur-reply ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998, Terminated: 7/2/1998 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service : 6/5/98 ) for Leave to file a response to defendant's sur-reply . Response due: 6/22/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SURREPLY to REPLY to RESPONSE by USA to [33-1] memorandum (proposed order) by CHARTER FEDERAL. Service: 5/29/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file its sur-reply ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998, Terminated: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/98 ) to Extend Time within which to file its ssurreply , (until May 29, 1998). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by CHARTER FEDERAL to [34-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [33-1] memorandum [proposed order] by CHARTER FEDERAL. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed order by CHARTER FEDERAL re: [16-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by CHARTER FEDERAL filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 3/31/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and Order of December 22, 1997, by USA. Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Craig Randall Gottlieb. Service : 2/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 11/12/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by CHARTER FEDERAL to response to [26-1] motion to strike new arguments presented in defendant's reply brief . Service: 11/12/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/30/97 ) to [26-1] motion to strike new arguments presented in defendant's reply brief Reply due: 11/14/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service : 10/14/97 ) to strike new arguments presented in defendant's reply brief Response due: 10/31/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File errata to reply brief ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997, Terminated: 8/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/97 ) for Leave to File errata to reply brief . Response due: 8/22/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/4/97 ) to [17-1] cross motion Reply due: 8/21/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/30/97) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/17/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (SUPPLEMENTAL FILING PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 5.d OF THE OMNIBUS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER) by USA to Service: 6/2/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/17/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to make supplemental filing pursuant to paragraph 5.d. of the omnibus case management order ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service: 6/16/97) to [17-1] cross motion. Reply due: 7/3/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997, Terminated: 6/17/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/2/97) for Leave to make supplemental filing pursuant to paragraph 5.d. of the omnibus case management order Response due: 6/19/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 3/18/97 ) and RESPONSE to [16-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by CHARTER FEDERAL [by leave of the Judge]. Response due: 4/4/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [17-1] cross motion reset to 4/4/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service BY HAND: 1/17/97) for partial Summary Judgment with one volume of exhibits AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Response due: 3/25/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William George Cole. Service : 9/30/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE ORDER IN 90-8C forNotice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/26/96 ) for Leave to File motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE) Modified on 07/30/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Elizabeth Anne Rinaldo (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service: 5/8/96) to [7-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File response to defendant's motion for leave to file its motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996, Terminated: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CHARTER FEDERAL (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to defendant's motion for leave to file its motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision [status report due on or before 30 days after decision] (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995, Terminated: 10/11/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/5/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Anne Rinaldo Service : 8/17/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 3), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39833. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 214 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?