MUTUAL FEDERAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00514-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MUTUAL FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael Burns +1 202 467 8800
No Logo PARK NATIONAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael Burns +1 202 467 8800
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Charles Hoffman +1 202 616 0341 +1 202 514 8624 david.hoffman3@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Stipulation
County
Terminated 3/19/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003
Certified transcript judgment, dated March 20, 2003, forwarded to James Michael Burns. See letter in file. (bre, )
    LREF
    Blank 33 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $10,000.00, inclusive of interest, with each party to bear its own attorney fees, costs and expenses. This amount shall be paid by the United States to Century National Bank, Mutual Federal Savings Bank's successor in interest. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Stipulation
      STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by all parties. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Terminated:
          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/28/02 ) to Extend Time within which to permit government to conduct fact discovery and to respond plaintiff's motions , within 45 days after completion of fact discovery, etc. Response due: 7/15/02 (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by David Charles Hoffman. Service : 10/12/00 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Opt Out of Third Wave of Discovery by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999, Terminated: 8/13/1999 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                  MOTION by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL (Service : 8/13/99 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Michael Timothy Lempres for PARK NATIONAL, attorney Michael Timothy Lempres for MUTUAL FEDERAL Added James Michael Burns. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
                    RENEWED NOTICE of Opt-Out From Second Wave of Discovery by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Opt-Out from second wave of discovery by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL. Service: 4/1/99 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Geoffrey J. L. Brown. Service: 8/21/98. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                            REPLY by USA to response to [19-1] motion to Stay. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/11/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE by MUTUAL FEDERAL and PARK NATIONAL (Service: 7/27/98 ) to [19-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 8/10/98 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL (Service: 7/17/98 ) to [18-1] motion to Extend Time for a simultaneous filing of briefs. Reply due: 8/3/98 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/16/98 ) to Stay proceedings on motions for summary judgment in certain cases, etc. Response due: 8/6/98 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/30/98) to Extend Time for a simultaneous filing of briefs until 8/26/98. Response due: 7/17/98. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Terminated:
                                      SHORT FORM MOTION by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL (Service : 4/27/98 ) for Summary Judgment on Liability: The Aqcuisition of Zanesville Federal. Response due: 6/26/98 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Terminated:
                                        SHORT FORM MOTION by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL (Service : 4/27/98 ) for Summary Judgment on Liability: The Acquisition of Logan Federal. Response due: 6/26/98 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER directing the Clerk to return Plaintiff's 4/3/98 filing for the correction of defects. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/27/98 for Plaintiff to file corrected document. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by MUTUAL FEDERAL, PARK NATIONAL (Service : 3/6/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Kevin Gerard Matthews for PARK NATIONAL, attorney Kevin Gerard Matthews for MUTUAL FEDERAL Added Michael Timothy Lempres. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/18/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by MUTUAL FEDERAL and PARK NATIONAL (Service : 7/16/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Barbara Ann Duncombe for PARK NATIONAL, attorney Barbara Ann Duncombe for MUTUAL FEDERAL Added Kevin Gerard Matthews. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Nuriye Uygur (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/29/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/16/96 (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar (signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995 Status Report
                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/4/95 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995, Terminated: 10/18/1995 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/2/95) to Stay pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Nuriye Uygur Service: 8/14/95 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39832. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?