GRANITE MANAGEMENT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00515-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Keenan +1 415 986 2800 rkeenan@flk.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tarek Sawi Tarek.Sawi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 12/6/2006
Origin 4
Reopened 8/12/2005
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '04-5065'[], '07-5054'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (202) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 192 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [188] Published Opinion/Order that directed the Clerk to enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 191 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 07-5054 for [190] Notice of Appeal filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 190 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007, Terminated: 2/29/2008 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 066109. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 189 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant. No costs. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 188 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 187 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Transcript - Cumulative Index
            Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 5, 2006 through June 9, 2006. Filed with Exhibits. Px: 1,2,3,5,8,9,11-14,16,17,20,21,41,43,45,48,49,55,60,64,68,74,77,79,80,88,90-96,100,101,107,112,126,128,151,158,159,161,163,176,195,534,571-584,601-613,615-640,642,650. Dx: 34,56,95,101,111,138,160,174,176,180,193,196,199,215,232,239,245,258,270,272,273,277,287,288,291,295,298-300,306,324,383,410,419,433,543,543. (dw1, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/12/2006. (vp1, )
                LREF
                Blank 186 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-150) held on September 7, 2006 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 185 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                  POST TRIAL (Reply) BRIEF, filed by USA. Service: 8/28/2006.(hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 184 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                    POST TRIAL (Reply) BRIEF, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 8/28/2006.(hw1, ) .
                      LREF
                      Blank 183 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of filing the Agreed Correction to the Trial Transcript, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, and USA. Service: 8/28/2006.(hw1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 182 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                        POST TRIAL BRIEF filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 8/16/2006.(hw1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 181 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                          POST TRIAL BRIEF filed by USA. Service: 8/16/2006.(hw1, ) .
                            LREF
                            Blank 180 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [179] Motion to Amend/Correct the list of admitted exhibits. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (hw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 179 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006, Terminated: 8/7/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                              MOTION to Correct The List of Admitted Exhibits, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 8/2/2006.Response due by 8/21/2006.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 178 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Response
                                RESPONSE to court's request: List of Exhibits Offered into Evidence at Trial, filed by USA. Service: 7/28/2006.(hw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 177 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Closing Argument set for 9/7/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (hw1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 176 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) The parties shall file Post Trial Briefs simultaneously by 8/16/2006 (briefs shall not exceed thirty (30) pages each); (2) The parties shall file Post Trial Response Briefs by 7/28/2006 (responses shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages); (3) Closing Argument set for 9/7/2006 at 10:00 A.M. before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey; and (4) The location shall be indicated by further order of this court. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (hw1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/24/2006. (vp1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 175 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2820-3154) held on July 17, 2006 before Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 174 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages2209-2819) held on July 13-14, 2006 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 173 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying [166] Motion to Preclude Rebuttal. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 172 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [166] MOTION to Preclude Rebuttal , filed by USA. Service: 7/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 171 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Response to Motion
                                                Amended RESPONSE to [166] MOTION to Preclude Rebuttal , filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1366-2208) held on July 5-7, 2006 before Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 170 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [167] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Response to Motion [Dispositive]
                                                      RESPONSE to [161] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Reply due by 7/13/2006. Service: 6/29/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006, Terminated: 7/10/2006 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION to Amend [148] Exhibit List , filed by USA. Service: 6/29/2006.Response due by 7/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006, Terminated: 7/14/2006 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION to Preclude Rebuttal, filed by USA. Service: 6/22/2006.Response due by 7/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [162] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Response to [161] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment due by 6/29/2006. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE to [162] MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles , filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Reply due by 7/3/2006. Service: 6/16/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 6/20/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles , filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/15/2006.Response due by 7/3/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 6/20/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/14/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by USA. Service: 6/13/2006.Response due by 7/14/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 160 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 5-9, 2006 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Exhibit
                                                                          Second Amended Exhibit List, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 6/1/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: Allowing the filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Exhibit
                                                                              Revised Exhibit List, filed by USA. Service: 5/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER: Allowing the filing of Defendant's Revised Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [154] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ miles from the place of trial. Trial will commence on Monday, June 5, 2006 at 1:00 p.m. and is expected to conclude by Friday, June 9, 2006 and will re-convene on Wednesday, July 5, 2006 and conclude Saturday, July 8, 2006 in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 6/2/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles , filed by USA. Service: 6/1/2006.Response due by 6/19/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 153 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE of Exhibit Submission, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 152 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE of Exhibit Submission, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/26/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 6/6/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATIONS OF FACT, filed by all parties. Service: 5/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 150 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties Appendix A Filings (Stipulation of Facts) due by 5/26/2006. Trial set for 6/5/2006 - 6/9/2006 01:00 PM and to continue 7/5/2006 at 10:00 AM until 7/7/2006 before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 149 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                              Exhibit List, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 5/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 148 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                Revised Exhibit List, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 5/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 147 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial and Trial Procedures, filed by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/19/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 146 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 4/19/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 4, 2006 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Trial Management OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Trial set for 6/6/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Report due by 4/19/2006. Motion(s) in Limine due by 5/1/2006. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2006 10:30 AM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2006 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Trial set for 6/6/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Objection to Exhibit List
                                                                                                            Objection to Exhibit List, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Related document: [134] Exhibit List filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 3/31/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Response
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [137] Objection to the Exhibits identified by plaintiffs , filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/31/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/5/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/4/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 140 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [139] Motion for Court to Conduct Status Conference on the Record. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 139 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Court to Conduct Status Conference on the Record , filed by USA. Service: 3/27/2006. Response due by 4/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 138 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:. Response to Objections to Exhibits due by 3/31/2006. Status Conference set for 4/4/2006 at 2:30 PM before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 137 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Objection to the Exhibits identified by plaintiffs filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/17/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law filed by USA. Service: 3/17/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                            Witness List filed by USA. Service: 3/17/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Exhibit List filed by USA. Service: 3/17/06.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [132] Motion for Leave to File Amended Table of Contents to the Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006, Terminated: 3/14/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amemded Table of Contents to the Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law , filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 3/7/2006. Response due by 3/24/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                    Witness List, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 3/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/4/2006 at 2:30 PM before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 2/23/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                          Witness List, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 2/23/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 2/23/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Joint Scheduling Motion shall be discussed during the statud conference to be held on 3/30/2006. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [124] Motion for Pre-Trial Schedule. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Pretrial Brief due by 2/24/2006. Opposing Pretrial Brief due by 3/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 2/21/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    Joint Scheduling MOTION , filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, USA. Service: 2/15/2006. Response due by 3/6/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [116] Scheduling Order, , filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, USA. Service: 2/15/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Keenan. Service: 1/12/2006.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [120] Motion to allow plaintiff to use the ECF system. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT MOTION to allow plaintiff to use the ECF system and proposed order filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/7/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                              Identification of Potential Expert Witnesses, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 10/10/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by Tarek Sawi for USA. Service: 10/5/05.(dls )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Richard Keenan in place of Charles J. Cooper filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.Service: 10/4/05. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                    ***Attorney Richard Keenan for GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION added. Attorney Charles J. Cooper terminated. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Memorandum on Contentions of Fact and Law due by 2/21/2006. Responsive Memorandum due by 3/14/2006. Status Conference set for 3/30/2006 before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, ) Modified on 10/4/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Schedule for Proceeding on Remand, filed by USA. Service: 9/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Proposed Schedule, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 9/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/28/2005. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT NOTICE, filed by all parties. Service: 9/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [110] Motion. Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2005. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [109] Status Conference Order, filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 9/7/2005. Response due by 9/26/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/8/2005 03:00 PM before Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of CAFC affirming in part and vacating in part [103] Published Order/Opinion and remanding. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        CAFC Case Number 04-5065 for [105] Notice of Appeal filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004, Terminated: 8/12/2005 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 255.00, receipt number 059721. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION on [24] Cross Motion filed by USA, [25] Cross Motion filed by USA, [87] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. No costs. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bohdan A. Futey : Oral Argument held on 10/28/2003. (mk1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/3/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/28/03 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File notice of supplemental authority by USA. (supplemental authority attached)Service: 10/21/03. Response due by 11/7/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [93] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [87] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, and [87] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages: Oral Argument set for 10/28/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [97] Pltf's MOTION for Oral Argument re: [93] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [87] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment, and [87] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Reply due by 8/26/2003. Service: 8/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Oral Argument as to [93] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [87] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment, and [87] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.Service: 8/6/03 by hand. Response due by 8/20/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [93] CROSS MOTION to [87] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States filed by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Service: 5/12/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (together with appendix) re [93] CROSS MOTION to [87] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/12/2003. Service: 4/23/03.(hw1, ) Modified on 5/13/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [92] Statement of Facts filed by The United States. Service: 4/23/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION to [87] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United Statesby GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge. [filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support] Service: 3/24/03. Response due by 4/23/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/24/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [86] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GRANITE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/24/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [89-1] motion for etnry of briefing schedule, granting [88-1] motion for entry of briefing schedule Response to [87-1] motion for Summary Judgment on damages reset to 3/24/03 ; and responses and/or cross-motions by 4/23/03 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 2/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 2/26/03) for etnry of briefing schedule . Response due: 3/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 2/26/03) for entry of briefing schedule : (1) until March 24, 2003, to file its response to defendant's motion for summary judgment; (2) until April 23, 2003, to respond to any cross-motion by Granite or to reply to response). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/6/03) for Summary Judgment on damages , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/20/03. [filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/6/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION. For the above-stated reasons, and in light of the Federal Circuit's decision in CASTLE, plaintiff's takings claim is DISMISSED ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT pursuant to [80-6] order. Service: 12/13/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [58-1] cross motion. Service: 12/6/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT pursuant to [80-6] order. Service: 11/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation by GRANITE MANAGEMENT of voluntary dismissal of Counts II and III of the first amended complaint. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Plaintiffs' voluntary dismissal and promissory estoppel of the first amended complaint due 11/22/02 , Plaintiff's Brief, not to exceed 10 pages, due 11/25/02 , Defendant's response brief, not to exceed 10 pages, due 12/6/02 and Plaintiff's reply, not to exceed five pages due, 12/13/02 , Defendant's motion for summary judgment, not to exceed 30 pages, due 1/6/03 , and Plaintiff's response and/or Cross Motion, not to exceed 30 pages, due 2/20/03 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 11/7/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by GRANITE MANAGEMENT and USA. Service: 8/28/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [56-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability and denying [58-1] cross motion Joint Status Report due 8/28/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 10, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Oral Argument re: [56-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability by GRANITE MANAGEMENT, [58-1] cross motion by USA, [25-1] cross motion by USA, [24-1] cross motion by USA (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SHORT FORM MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CONTRACT LIABILITY AND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CONTRACT LIABLITY MEMORANDUM by USA pursuant to [73-3] order. Service: 5/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY by GRANITE MANAGEMENT pursuant to [73-3] order. Service: 5/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER mooting [62-1] motion to Compel responses to interrogatories, mooting [54-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation., mooting [52-1] motion to Compel production of documents., mooting [44-1] motion to Stay, mooting [39-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's proposed order., mooting [34-1] motion to Extend Time to July 22, 1997, to reply to plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's cross-motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of liability., mooting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond motion for summary judgment on liability, mooting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment, mooting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of liability, mooting [17-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, mooting [12-1] motion for Leave to File proposed pretrial order, mooting [10-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures, mooting [9-1] motion for Leave to File response to motion to adopt special case management procedures, mooting [8-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures, mooting [7-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action, mooting [4-1] motion to Stay . The parties are directed to file supplemental briefs discussing recent WINSTAR related decisions and their relevance to this case by 5/10/02. In addition, the parties shall submit a binder containing copies of all dispositive motions and briefs by 5/10/02 . Oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 7/10/02 for [56-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability, set for 2:00 p.m., 7/10/02 for [58-1] cross motion, set for 2:00 p.m., 7/10/02 for [25-1] cross motion, set for 2:00 p.m., 7/10/02 for [24-1] cross motion ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER resetting telephonic Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 4/10/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Joint Status Report due 3/18/02 , and telephonic Status Conference set for 2:30 p.m. on 3/27/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE reassigned to Judge Bohdan A. Futey . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness list by USA. Service: 9/10/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER mooting [65-1] order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Directing parties to comply with this order re response (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by GRANITE MANAGEMENT to response to [56-1] supplemental motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability . Service: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 1/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/21/00 ) to Compel responses to interrogatories . Response due: 1/8/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 1/17/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [56-1] supplemental motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 1/17/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by GRANITE MANAGEMENT. Service: 12/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 1/17/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [58-1] supplemental cross motion and motion to dismiss. Reply due: 1/16/01 (DS) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 1/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL CROSS MOTION, together with three volumes of appendix, by USA ( Service: 10/10/00 ); RESPONSE to [17-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by GRANITE MANAGEMENT; and motion to dismiss Counts I-III, V-VIII of plaintiffs' complaint. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SUPPLEMENTAL] MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 10/10/00) for Partial Summary Judgment as to liability , together with a one (1) volume appendix. Response due: 11/29/00. (FE) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Plaintiff may request a hearing to determine whether adverse inferences should result from Defendant's failure to preserve relevant documents. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/5/00 (by hand)) to [52-1] motion to Compel production of documents. Reply due: 9/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service : 8/23/00 (by hand)) to Compel production of documents. Response due: 9/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Answer due 10/19/99 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/13/99 (JT) Modified on 10/08/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delfa Castillo. Service : 6/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [44-1] motion to Stay. Service: 8/11/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 8/3/98 ) to [44-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 8/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jacqueline Christine Romero. Service : 7/17/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/16/98 ) to Stay proceedings, etc. (until this case enters discovery in accordance with the Master Litigation). Response due: 8/6/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [38-1] notice filing by GRANITE MANAGEMENT. Service: 6/19/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to proposed order for entry of partial summary judgment, etc. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/19/98 for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's proposed order. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 5/22/98 ) to [40-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to proposed order for entry of partial summary judgment, etc. Reply due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998, Terminated: 6/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/19/98 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to proposed order for entry of partial summary judgment, etc. , (until June 19, 1998). Response due: 6/5/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's proposed order. (to May 22, 1998) Response due: 5/18/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of filing Proposed Order by GRANITE MANAGEMENT. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA. Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [25-1] cross motion, [24-1] cross motion. Service: 7/22/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/14/97 ) to Extend Time to July 22, 1997, to reply to plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's cross-motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of liability. Response due: 7/31/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing of original certificate of Granite's secretary Scott D. McKinlay by GRANITE MANAGEMENT. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [31-1] motion for Leave to File original certificate of Granite's secretary, Scott D. McKinlay ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997, Terminated: 7/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service : 7/2/97 ) for Leave to File original certificate of Granite's secretary, Scott D. McKinlay . Response due: 7/21/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/29/97 ) to [27-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. Reply due: 6/12/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 5/29/97 ) to [25-1] cross motion, together with a separate one volume appendix placed IN CAMERA. Reply due: 7/15/97 (Redacted copy also filed) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [27-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997, Terminated: 5/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service : 5/22/97 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation , (a 45 page brief) Response due: 5/19/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/10/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 4/10/97 ) and RESPONSE to [17-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by GRANITE MANAGEMENT, (by leave of the Judge). [IN CAMERA]. Response due: 4/28/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/10/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 4/15/97 ) and RESPONSE to [17-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by GRANITE MANAGEMENT, (by leave of the Judge). -- [REDACTED VERSION]. Response by: 4/28/97. (HW) Modified on 05/10/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: further procedures ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/10/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [24-1] cross motion reset to 4/28/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 5/10/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [25-1] cross motion reset to 4/28/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of supplemental filing pursuant to paragraph 5 (d) of the Omnibus case management order by USA. Service: 4/28/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 4/4/97 ) to [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond motion for summary judgment on liability. Reply due: 4/16/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/3/97) to Extend Time to respond motion for summary judgment on liability (to April 10, 1997). Response due: 4/21/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service BY HAND: 3/12/97) to [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 3/21/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 3/11/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment until 4/3/97. Response due: 3/28/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 3/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/25/97) to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of liability i[to March 18, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 12/27/1996, Entered: 12/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service : 12/27/96 ) for partial Summary Judgment as to liability, together with separate one volume of exhibits 1 through 13, filed INCAMERA with REDACTED COPY for public file. Response due: 1/27/97. (HW) Modified on 12/31/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/27/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service : 12/27/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Murray Alan Indick for GRANITE MANAGEMENT Added Charles J. Cooper. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service : 10/22/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney William R. Richardson for GRANITE MANAGEMENT Added Murray Alan Indick . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/17/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delfa Castillo. Service : 10/11/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/23/96) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Hillary Adrienne Stern (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 5/13/96) for Leave to File response to motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/30/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Staying proceedings in this case pending a final result in the United States Supreme Court in the case of WINSTAR CORPORATION ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by GRANITE MANAGEMENT (Service: 10/20/95) to [4-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 11/3/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/5/95 ) to Stay pending writ of certiorari re WINSTAR. Response due: 10/23/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Hillary Adrienne Stern Service : 8/21/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #398931. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 209 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?