FIRST FEDERAL SAVING v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00517-GWM
District Judge George W. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Rochester, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Taylor Case +1 202 778 9084 +1 202 778 9100 dcase@klgates.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

HSBC Bank USA, NA HSBC Bank USA, NA, Movant
Officially listed as "HSBC BANK USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Leahey +1 202 778 9000
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status TrlHeld
Flags APPEAL, ECF
  Entries (210) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 187 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 186 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Certified Transcript to Attorney
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated June 20, 2007, forwarded to David Taylor Case. See letter in file. (bre,)
      LREF
      Legal Document 185 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007
      JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b), that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $85,459,000.00 as to all plaintiff's claims except any claim for attorneys' fees and related nontaxable expenses pursuant to Section 8.10 (or otherwise). (lld)
        LREF
        Legal Document 184 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Court Filing
        This Opinion is PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment pursuant to RCFC 54(b) in the amount of $85.459 million in favor of plaintiff First Bank as to all of its claims except any claim for attorneys' fees and related nontaxable expenses. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (sdb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 183 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
          RESPONSE to [181] Published Opinion, and Order, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Expert Report)(Groner, Arlene)
            LREF
            Legal Document 182 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007
            AMENDED DOCUMENT, filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Pursuant to April 13, 2007 Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Revised Damage Calculation by Dr. Donald M. Kaplan)(Case, David)
            LREF
            Legal Document 181 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Court Filing
            PUBLISHED OPINION setting out findings of fact and conclusions of law following trial on damages. Plaintiff's revised calculations of the proceeds First Federal would have received from a standard conversion in 1993 and of the offset due by 5/15/2007. Defendant's responsive calculations, if any, due by 6/12/2007. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (sdb)
              LREF
              Legal Document 180 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007
              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 179 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 178 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Response
                  RESPONSE to [176] Response and Cross-Motion to file Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 12/12/2006.(hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 177 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                    ORDER granting Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to [174] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, ) .
                      LREF
                      Blank 176 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE to [174] MOTION for Leave to File file supplemental authority, and Cross-Motion for Leave to file Supplemental Authority filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Reply due by 12/20/2006. Service: 12/6/2006.(hw1, ) .
                        LREF
                        Blank 175 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [174] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 174 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2006 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Leave to File supplemental authority (attached), filed by USA. Service: 11/21/2006. Response due by 12/8/2006.(hw1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 173 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene Pianko Groner for USA. Service: 5/11/2006.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 172 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by David Taylor Case. Service: 1/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Transcript
                                Defendants Exhibit 2015, Plaintiffs Exhibit 50-F subimtted this date. (eph, ) Modified on 5/23/2005 (eph, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Transcript
                                  Revised and Corrected Cumulative Index of exhibits(Pg 1-13) submitted 1 June 2004 through 14 July 2004. (eph, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 171 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER re [170] Response, filed by USA, FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 170 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Response
                                      RESPONSE to [169] Notice, filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER, USA. Service: 4/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 169 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005
                                        NOTICE: there has been filed on August 26, 2004, on behalf of the parties, plaintiff's exhibits 1, 3-7, 9, 10, 13, 14, 17, 22, 23, 36, 41, 42, 43-B, 43-G, 44-L, 45-E, 45-L, 47-A-47-L, 48-A-48-L, 49-A-49-L, 50-A-50-E, 50-G-50-K, 52, 54-56, 58-64, 67, 68, 73, 80, 87, 98, 99, 101-F, 101-K, 102-A, 102-K, 103-A, 103-B, 103-D, 103-F, 103-G, 103-K, 103-M, 104-A, 104-C, 104-F, 104-H, 105-E, 105-G, 107, 108, 112, 113, 115, 118, 120, 122, 124, 134-AA, 134-B, 134-H, 134-V, 136-Z, 184, 191, 221, 248, 256, 281, 320, 330, 331, 333, 338, 341, 345, 346, 347, 352, 356, 359, 361, 364, 365, 369, 371, 372, 374-376, 381, 385, 386, 388, 391, 454, 470, 471, 473, 475, 478, 480, 485, 512-514, 517-523, 556, 559, 562, 566-A, 566, 572, 573-575, 590, 591, 602, 604, 619, 624, 625, 636, 640, 644, 645, 648, 654, 656, 659, 676-A, 676, 677, 679, 680, 703, 729, 733, 734, 735, 736-A-736-E, 737, 749, 750-759, 763, 764, 2000, 2005, 2006, 8000, and 8005; defendant's exhibits 1,4, 8-A, 8, 40, 80-A, 121, 128, 173, 178, 236, 242, 282, 284, 303, 304, 318, 329, 366, 372, 416, 440, 457, 464, 496, 511, 513, 517, 547, 558, 562, 564, 571, 575, 576, 610, 614, 625, 637, 668, 685, 690, 696, 730, 795, 810, 811, 823, 839, 854, 921, 968, 979, 980, 997, 1013, 1139, 1163, 1178, 1183, 1243, 1252, 1316, 1326, 1328, 1398, 1408, 1446, 1511, 1556, 1634, 1635, 1643-A, 1644-A, 1644-B, 1647, 1780, 1783, 1784, 1786, 1790, 2046, and 2406. (mb2, ) Modified on 3/15/2005 (mb2, ).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 168 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 12, 2004 before Judge George Miller. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004
                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/12/2004. (vp1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 167 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Response
                                              RESPONSE to [163] Pltf's Post Trial Brief, filed by USA. Service: 10/6/2004.(jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 166 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Response
                                                REPLY to [162] Dft's Proposed Conclusions of Law, filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 10/6/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Response
                                                  REPLY to [161] Dft's Findings of Fact, filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 10/6/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file replies to proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by Wednesday, 10/6/2004. The parties' reply briefs shall be no longer than 65 pages. The Court will reserve Courtroom 5 for the afternoon of Friday, 10/8/2004. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                      Post Trial Memorandum Proposed Findings of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 162 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                        Proposed Post-Trial Conclusions of Law by USA. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact by USA. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in 27 Volumes Along with the Cumulative Index held on 6/1/2004 - 7/14/2004 before Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [158] Pltf's Motion for Extension of the Deadlines for the Prposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Replies to Those Proposed Findings and Conclusions. The parties shall file their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of alw on 9/10/2004. The parties shall file replies by 10/4/2004. The parties shall participate in closing argument at 9:00 am on 10/12/2004. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/4/2004. Closing Argument set for 10/12/2004 09:00 AM before Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004, Terminated: 8/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/10/2004 to File Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and until 10/4/2004 to File Replies to the Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law, by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 8/13/2004 by hand. Response due by 8/27/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Exhibit
                                                                    JOINT EXHIBIT LIST by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER, USA. (lld, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: As soon as practicable, the parties shall submit a complete set of the exhbits admitted and marked for identification at trial. The parties shall file their proposed findings of fact and conclusion of law on 9/1/2004. There shall be no page limit on the parties' proposed findings of fact. The parties' conclusions of law shall be filed under separate cover and be limited to 60 pages. The parties shall file replies by 9/21/2004. The parties' replies shall be limited to 50 pages. The parties shall participate in Closing Argument on 9/28/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge George W. Miller. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/15/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller : Trial on damages, Days 25 - 27 held on 7/12/04 - 7/14/04. (kxb, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller : Trial on damages, Days 22 - 24 held on 7-7-04 to 7-09-04. (ga1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Memorandum
                                                                              MEMORANDUM Regarding the Proper Scope of Rebuttal Testimony, by USA. Service: 7/8/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                POTENTIAL REBUTTAL TESTIMONY by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 7/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Response
                                                                                  RESPONSE to the Court's Oral Request of July 7, 2004, filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 7/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller: Trial on damages, Days 18 - 21 held on 6-29-04 to 7-02-04. (ga1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings
                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Brief in Support, by USA. [Styled as Brief in Support]Service: 7/2/2004 by hand. Response due by 7/30/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller : Trial on Damages, Days 13 - 17 held on 6/21/04 to 6/25/04. (ga1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004
                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/25/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 151 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE to [150] MOTION to use deposition testimony in lieu of live testimony filed by USA. Reply due by 7/6/2004. Service: 6/22/04.(dw1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 150 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              MOTION to use deposition testimony in lieu of live testimony by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 6/21/04 by hand. Response due by 7/6/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller: Trial on Damages, Days 9 - 12 held on 6/15/2004 - 6/18/2004. (kxb, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller: Trial on Damages, Days 5 - 8, held on 6/7/2004 - 6/10/2004. (kxb, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller: Trial on Damages, Days 1 - 4, held on 06/01/2004 - 6/4/2004. (kxb, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                      Revised Exhibit List as Per Correspondence With Government and Hearing of 5/26/2004, by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                        Revised Exhibit List by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/26/2004 before Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Response
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to the Court's [145] Scheduling Order Dated 5/28/2004 Concerning Waiver of Privilege, filed by USA. Service: 6/1/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf shall file its response to the question posed by the Court by the start of trial on Tuesday, 6/1/2004. Dft is invited to file a brief response to the Court's question by the same day (6/1/2004). Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Original Version of Affidavit in Support of Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion in Limine (Original affidavit attached to motion) by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER: [135] Dft's Unopposed Motion to present the testimony of Simkha Palant by video teleconference and [133] Dft's Motion to introduce portions of the transcript of the deposition of Richar Coles are GRANTED. [122] Pltf's Motion in Limine is DENIED. [123] Dft's Motion in Limine is DENIED. [137] Dft's Motion in Limine is DENIED. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/1/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller : Pretrial Conference held on 05/26/2004. (kxb, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Response
                                                                                                                        REVISED OBJECTIONS to the [101] Exhibits Identified by Plaintiff, filed by USA. Service: 5/25/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion in Limine With a Facsimile Signature to an Affidavit by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 5/25/2004. Response due by 6/11/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [138] Pltf's Motion for Authorization of Subpoena More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial. Pltf is authorized to serve a subpoena upon Mr. Michael Simone at a place more than 100 miles from the place of trial. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [136] Dft's Motion for Expedited Consideration of its Motion in Limine. Pltf shall file any responsive brief to dft's motion in limine regarding excess tax payments by noon on Tuesday, 5/25/2004. Dft shall file by noon on 5/25/2004 a revised list of objections to pltf's proposed exhibits. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004, Terminated: 5/24/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Authorization of Service of a Subpoena More Than 100 Miles From Trial, by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 5/20/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/3/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude From Evidence Testimony From Dr. Donald Kaplan, by USA.Service: 5/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004, Terminated: 5/21/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Expedited Consideration of its Motion in Limine Regarding Excess Tax Payemnts, by USA.Service: 5/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004, Terminated: 5/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION to Conduct Remote Testimony by Video Teleconference by USA.Service: 5/19/2004. Response due by 6/7/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of [123] Dft's MOTION in Limine filed by USA. Service: 5/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Introduce Deposition Testimony of Richard Coles by USA.Service: 5/19/2004. Response due by 6/7/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [122] Pltf's MOTION in Limine filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 5/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                              REVISED OBJECTIONS to the [116] Exhibits Identified by the Dft, filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/17/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [128] Pltf's Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From Trial. Pltf is authorized to serve subpoenas upon Messrs. Thurman Connell, Angelo A. Vigna, and Donald Hom at a place more than 100 miles from the place of trial. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [123] Dft's MOTION in Limine, filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 5/21/2004. Service: 5/12/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004, Terminated: 5/18/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From Trial, by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 5/14/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/28/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [122] Pltf's MOTION in Limine filed by USA. Reply due by 5/26/2004. Service: 5/12/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [125] Dft's Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas Upon Eleven Persons at a Place More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial. Dft is authorized to serve subpoenas upon Messrs. Thomas Borshoff, John A. Buchman, Mark Chaplin, David Dorgan, Jack Mark Guttentag, Nicholas J. Ketcha, Peter Sear, Angus Shearer, Jr., Theodore Katsampes, Thomas Mullin, and Angelo A. Vigna. The joint request to enlarge the time allotted at trial for presenting their cases to 70 hours per side is GRANTED. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Authorization of Service of Subpoena More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial, by USA.Service: 5/7/2004. Response due by 5/24/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 4/28/2004 before Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude From Evidence Testimony From Dr. Donald Kaplan Relating to: 1) Certain "Lost Profits" an Allegedly Forgone Acquisition Would have Generated; and 2) the Hypothetical Cost of "Contractual Capital Replacement," Which Bears No Relationship to Pltf's Actual Mitigation, by USA.Service: 4/30/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Dft's "Windfall" Argument, by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 4/30/2004. Response due by 5/12/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: [111] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Add an Additional Element of Damages to PLtf's Contentions of Fact and Law is GRANTED. [112] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Amend Certain Damages Figures in Pltf's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is GRANTED PRIVISIONALLY. The deadline for filing motions in limine shall be extended to 4/30/2004. The deadlines for replies and responses will remain as specified in Judge Merow's Scheduling Order of 12/18/2003. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion(s) due by 4/30/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller : Status Conference held on 04/28/2004. (kxb, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/3/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Court amends its Order filed 4/5/2004 to provide that the Status Conference originally scheduled for Wednesday, 4/21/2004 is re-scheduled for Wednesday, 4/28/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge George W. Miller. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [111] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Amend its Damage Claims Out of Time, filed by USA. Reply due by 5/4/2004. Service: 4/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to the Exhibits Identified by Plaintiff, filed by USA. Service: 4/15/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED COPY - Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA Sheet and Corrected Version of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend Certain Damage Figures in Plaintiff's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 4/8/04 by hand. Response due by 4/22/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 111 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004, Terminated: 4/30/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Add an Additional Element of Damages to Plaintiff's Contentions of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 4/8/04. Response due by 4/20/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court amends paragraph 11 of its Order filed 4/5/2004 to provide that pltf shall file a Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Damages Report by Thursday, 4/8/2004, rather than April 16. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf shall promptly re-file its "List of Witnesses to be Called at Trial," "Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law," "Objections to Exhibits Identified by Dft," and "Notice of Filing of Pltf's List of Exhibits," with all typographical errors corrected and all previously missing citations provided. Pltf shall file a Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Damages Report by Friday, 4/16/2004. Dft shall file any opposition to pltf's motion by 12 noon on Tuesday, 4/20/2004. The Court amends paragraph 2 of its Order filed 3/25/2004 to provide that the pretrial conference will begin at 10 am on Wednesday, 5/26/2004, rather than at 2 pm. The parties shall convene for a further Status Conference before the Court on Wednesday, 4/21/2004 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge George W. Miller. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER in Response to [1] Pltf's Complaint by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 3/18/2004. JPSR due by 5/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 3/31/2004 before Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/5/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George W. Miller: Status Conference held on 03/31/2004. (kxb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall participate in a brief Status Conference before the Court on Wednesday, 3/31/2004 02:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge George W. Miller. The Trial will begin on Tuesday, 6/1/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge George W. Miller. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Motion for Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for a brief Status Conference in order to establish the "Exact Date and Duration" of the trial scheduled for June 2004 by USA.Service: 3/19/04. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to the exhibits identified by the Defendant filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 3/15/2004.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  List of Witnesses by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    List of Exhibit's by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge George W. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Puruant to the provisions of RCFC 40.1, with the agreement of the judges concerned, it is ORDERED that this case shall be TRANSFERRED to Judge George W. Miller for all further proceedings. Judge James F. Merow no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION for a Further Scheduling Order Establishing the "Exact Date and Duration" of Trial in June 2004, as Contemplated by the Court's Order of 12/18/2003 by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER, USA.Service: 3/3/2004. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The dft's Motion to Dismiss Counts V, VI, and VII contained in Dft's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI, and VII of Pltf's Complaint, filed 10/10/200, is GRANTED. [82] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Count VI, filed 11/19/2003, and the [87] Dft's Cross Motion to Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim, filed 12/15/2003, are DENIED as moot. The [83] Dft's Motion to Strike Pltf's "Cross Motion" for Summary Judgment regarding Count VI, filed 11/19/2003, is DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Pltf's Response to [87] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [82] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume filed by USA. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Thomas N. Borshoff in Support of [92] Pltf's Reply to Dft's Response to Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claaim, by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 1/16/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: [90] Pltf's Motion for Leave of Court to File Original Version of Affidavit in Support of Pltf's Reply to Dft's Response to Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim is GRANTED and the original notarized copy of Affidavit of Thomas N. Borshoff is FILED this day. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [86] Dft's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Service: 1/15/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Dft's Response to [82] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [54] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment, and RESPONSE to [87] Dft's CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Reply due by 2/6/2004. Service: 1/15/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that [89] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED and Pltf's Reply to Dft's Response to Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim With a Facsimile Signature to an Affidavit is FILED this day. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004, Terminated: 1/22/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave of Court to File Original Version of Affidavit in Support of Pltf's Reply to Dft's Response to Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 1/16/2004. Response due by 2/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004, Terminated: 1/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave of the Court to File Pltf's Reply to Dft's Response to Pltf's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Dft's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim With a Facsimile Signature to an Affidavit by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER.Service: 1/15/2004. Response due by 2/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf shall file its Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, its witness list, and its exhibit list by 3/15/2004. Dft shall file its Responsive Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, its witness list, and its exhibit list by 4/15/2004. Deadline for filing any motion in limine is 4/29/2004. Deadline for filing any responses to motions in limine is 5/12/2004. Deadline for filing any replies to motions in limine is 5/19/2004. Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [82] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Illegal Exaction Claim, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 12/12/03. Response due by 1/15/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Pltf's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of the Illegal Exaction Claim and STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS in Support of Its Cross-Motion by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to [83] Dft's MOTION to Strike [82] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [54] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Count VI filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. Reply due by 12/29/2003. Service: 12/8/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Pltf's Oppposition to [54] Dft's Motion to Dismiss Count VI filed by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike [82] Pltf's "CROSS MOTION" to [54] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Count VI, by USA.Service: 11/19/03. Response due by 12/8/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003, Terminated: 2/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION and PARTIAL OPPOSITION to [54] Dft's Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Counts V,VI, and VII of Pltf's Complaint and Dft's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Count VI, by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 11/14/03. Response due by 12/15/2003. (jcp, ) Modified on 11/25/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order by USA. Service: 11/14/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA Showing corrections to [78] Published Opinion of October 14, 2003. A corrected Opinion is posed on the court's website. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED OPINION granting [20] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF ROCHESTER and denying [54] Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismiss filed by USA. Any stay of the obligation to respond to motions for summary judgment and/or motions to dismiss regarding takings and due process claims is hereby lifted. First Federal shall respond to the government's motion for summary judgment and to dismiss. Any response shall be filed by 11/14/03. The government may file a reply by 12/1/03. The parties are directed to consult, propose, and file on or before 11/14/03 at stauts report (joint, if possible).. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response re: motion for summary judgment/dismiss due by 11/14/2003; Defendant's reply to response re: motion for summary judgment/dismiss due by 12/1/2003; (Joint) Status Report due by 11/14/2003. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 17, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 10/10/02 ) to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [54-2] motion to Dismiss Counts I-VII. Reply due: 10/28/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [74-3] order. Service by hand: 10/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 10/17/02 for [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [54-2] motion to Dismiss Counts I-VII and [20-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment , and Briefs, not to exceed 15 pages, is due 10/10/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [68-1] motion for status conference (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 9/16/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Thomas M. Leahey for FIRST FEDERAL SAVING Added David Taylor Case . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [68-1] motion for status conference. Service: 3/14/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER to file Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion for a Status Conference received on 2/20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 2/19/02) to [68-1] motion for status conference, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002, Terminated: 9/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/12/02) for status conference . Response due: 3/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE reassigned to Sr. Judge James F. Merow . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jerome Anthony Madden. Service: 8/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of withdrawl of potenial expert witness by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/1/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [Identification of potential expert witnesses] Witness list by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING. Service: 5/3/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [54-2] motion to Dismiss Counts I-VII, together with separate appendix. Service: 1/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [59-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 1/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/16/01 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: reply brief. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (i.e. PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact) by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 12/18/00 ) to [54-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [54-2] motion to Dismiss Counts I-VII, filed by leave of the Judge, (together with separate three volume appendix). Reply due: 1/16/01. (HW) Modified on 01/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 11/16/00) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/4/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss Counts I-VII. (3 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS filed by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth John Guido. Service : 4/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of "Objections to the subpoena duces tecum of the Defendant" by HSBC BANK USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/28/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: the telephone conference of 2/16/00. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 2/1/00 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000, Terminated: 2/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 1/28/00) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories , (until February 1, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [40-1] motion for Leave to the supplemental authority with the court. Service: 9/21/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Teresa Ann Kolb. Service : 9/21/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/16/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to the plaintiff's opposition to motion for leave to file supplemental authority ,(September 21, 1998). Response due: 10/19/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service by hand: 9/3/98 ) to [40-1] motion for Leave to the supplemental authority with the court. Reply due: 9/16/98. (HW) Modified on 09/25/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/26/98) for Leave to the supplemental authority with the court . Response due: 9/14/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [37-1] response by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING re: motion to stay filed in 90-8C. (Styled as Defendant's Reply in support of the motion for stay of proceedeings). Service: 8/19/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/10/98) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment until 8/24/98. Response due: 8/27/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING to defendant's motion to stay filed in No. 90-8C. Service by hand: 7/31/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 7/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING to response to [20-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Service: 6/8/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [30-1] memorandum by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING. Service: 5/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; set Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Response to proposed order deadline to 6/15/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/13/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 5/8/98) to [22-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 5/19/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's proposed order. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/22/98 for Defendant to file response to Plaintiff's proposed order. Plaintiff is also granted a 22 day enlargement for the filing of a reply to Defendant's filing. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998, Terminated: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's proposed order. (to May 22, 1998) Response due: 5/18/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING re: motion for entry of summary judgment. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98. (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA. Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delfa Castillo. Service : 2/19/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 8/5/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING to response to [20-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Service: 7/23/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service : 7/23/97 ) to Extend Time to July 23, 1997, to reply to defendant's responses to plaintiff's "short form" motion for partial summary judgment on liability. Response due: 8/11/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental MEMORANDUM by USA re: [20-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING. Service: 6/30/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/2/97 ) to [20-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 5/19/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/29/97 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for partial summary judgment , (until 5/2/97). Response due: 5/16/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gordon Michael Harvey. Service : 4/17/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            "SHORT FORM" MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service : 2/28/97 ) for Partial Summary Judgment on liability. IN CAMERA. Response due: 4/29/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Delfa Castillo. Service : 10/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service : 9/18/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Ronald Wayne Stevens for FIRST FEDERAL SAVING Added Thomas M. Leahey. Response due: 10/6/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 8/20/96) for Leave to File status report . Response due: 9/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/96) for Leave to File Proposed Pretrial Order . Response due: 9/3/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Todd Michael Hughes (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to defendant's motion for leave to file response , and to Extend Time within which to respond to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures , (until May 31, 1996). Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Todd Michael Hughes Service: 10/27/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision and directing counsel to file a status report within 20 days after expiration of stay (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL SAVING (Service: 10/17/95 ) to [5-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision. Reply due: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995, Terminated: 10/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/3/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . Response due: 10/20/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 9/1/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller Service : 8/30/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 9/1/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller Service : 8/30/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39829. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?