FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00518-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo First Federal Lincoln Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Louis Lublin +1 202 944 3560 lublin@blankrome.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William George Kanellis +1 202 353 0526 +1 202 514 8640 william.kanellis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/7/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $23000
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 10/31/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-5044'[], '07-5048'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (279) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008
Appeal record returned from CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 257 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 CAFC Mandate Affirming in Part/Reversing in Part
    MANDATE of CAFC affirming in part and reversing in part [250] Published Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
      Appeal record sent to CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
        Appeal record sent to CAFC. [only docket numbers 240, 241, 242, and 243] (mb2)
          LREF
          Legal Document 255 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Terminated:
          CAFC Case Number 07-5048 for [254] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 256 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Terminated:
            CAFC Case Number 07-5044 for [253] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 254 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007 Terminated:
              NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 065987. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 253 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006, Terminated: 6/26/2008 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 252 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                  CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated Novemmber 3, 2006, forwarded to Edward Louis Lublin. See letter in file. (bre,)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 251 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $4,501,818.00. Costs for the plaintiff. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 250 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Court Filing
                      PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (tw1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 248 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                        NOTICE of Additional Authority Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Bluebonnet Sav. Bank, F.S.B. v. United States, Nos. 06-5016 & 06-5024 (Fed. Cir. Oct. 11, 2006))(Honigberg, Paul)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 247 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 246 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 245 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                            Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 22, 2006 through June 2, 2006. Filed with Px: 20,418,429,453,488,493,494,500,541,602,5000. Dx: 1,2,8,13. Jx: 1-115,117-172. For the complete list please refer to the cumulative index. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 244 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-116) held on July 26, 2006 before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006
                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/31/2006. (vp1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 243 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                  Defendent's RESPONSE to [240] Plaintiff's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by USA. Service: 7/21/2006.(mij, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 242 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Pretrial Memorandum
                                    POST TRIAL REPLY BRIEF, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 7/21/2006.(mij, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 241 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                      Post-Trial Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 240 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law Concerning Damages, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 237 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re [235] Exhibit List filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK, [234] Exhibit List filed by USA, Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 238 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Terminated:
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Exhibit A , filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 6/8/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 236 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Brief due by 7/7/2006. Response due by 7/21/2006. Hearing set for 7/26/2006 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 235 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Exhibit
                                                Exhibit List, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 6/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Exhibit
                                                  Exhibit List, filed by USA. Service: 6/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 231 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 2, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 229 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2131-2427) held on June 1, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006
                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/5/2006. (vp1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 233 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Introduction of all Testimony and Exhibits based upon Plaintiff's Previously Undisclosed Expert Analysis, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/25/2006.Response due by 6/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 232 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Response to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE to Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Trial Demonstrative Exhibits and Expert Testimony , filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Reply due by 5/26/2006. Service: 5/26/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 6/7/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1814-2130) held on May 31, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 30, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 230 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Based upon Partial Findings, filed by USA. Service: 5/30/2006.Response due by 6/30/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1187-1436) held on May 26, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 220 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 783-1186) held on May 25, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 227 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 615 of the Federal Rules of Evidence, the plaintiff is permitted to have a testifying individual serve as plaintiff's designated party representative so long as that individual has completed all testimony for both parties prior to assuming that designation. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 226 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [217] Stipulation filed by USA. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 225 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE of Designations from the Deposition Transcript of Richard H. Fischman, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 219 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 602-782) held on May 24, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages) 303-601_) held on May 23, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 22, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [215] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying [194] Motion in Limine, denying [195] Motion in Limine, denying [196] Motion in Limine, denying [197] Motion in Limine, granting in part and denying in part [201] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 217 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                        Proposed Stipulations of Pre-Trial and Trial Procedure, filed by USA. Service: 5/19/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/22/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 239 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                            RESPONSE to Notice regarding Proposed Joint Stipulation of Fact filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/12/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 214 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 16, 2006 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 215 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006, Terminated: 5/19/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles , filed by USA. Service: 5/12/2006.Response due by 5/30/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 213 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [194] MOTION in Limine, [196] MOTION in Limine , filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 5/9/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 212 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [201] MOTION to Strike filed by USA. Service: 5/9/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 211 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [195] MOTION in Limine filed by USA. Service: 5/9/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 210 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [197] MOTION in Limine filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 5/9/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing "List of Important Exhibits" filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 5/9/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE regarding Proposed Joint Stipulations of Fact filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 5/9/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [201] MOTION to Strike , filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Reply due by 5/15/2006. Service: 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [195] MOTION in Limine , filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Reply due by 5/9/2006. Service: 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 205 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [197] MOTION in Limine , filed by USA.Reply due by 5/9/2006. Service: 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 204 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [196] MOTION in Limine , filed by USA.Reply due by 5/2/2006. Service: 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 203 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [194] MOTION in Limine , filed by USA.Reply due by 5/9/2006. Service: 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: Regarding trial exhibits. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's New Expert Analysis, filed by USA. Service: 4/27/2006. Response due by 5/15/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 200 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw [190] MOTION to Compel , filed by USA. Service: 4/27/2006. Response due by 5/15/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 199 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Objection to Exhibit List
                                                                                                                              Objection to Exhibit List, filed by USA. Related document: [186] Exhibit List filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 4/25/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Objection to Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                Objection to Exhibit List, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Related document: [192] Exhibit List filed by USA.Service: 4/25/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 197 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Cumulative Government Witnesses, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 4/25/2006. Response due by 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 196 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Requesting Pre-Trial Admission of Certain Documents as Party Admissions or, Alternatively, as Public Records or Business Records, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 4/25/2006. Response due by 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 195 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Opinions of Plaintiff's Experts, filed by USA. Service: 4/25/2006. Response due by 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006, Terminated: 5/19/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Requesting a Pre-Trial Ruling as to Admission of Plaintiff's Business Records, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 4/25/2006. Response due by 5/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. Service: 4/21/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List, filed by USA. Service: 4/21/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                              Witness List, filed by USA. Service: 4/21/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 190 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with Appendix A and Rule 1006, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/12/2006. Response due by 5/1/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:. Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2006 at 1:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 3/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [184] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 186 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 3/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 185 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                          Witness List, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 3/24/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 184 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by 20 pages , filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 3/24/2006. Response due by 4/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 183 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                              Joint Certification of Counsel, filed by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/27/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 182 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER adopting the schedule set forth in the joint status report filed on December 16, 2005, with the exception of the pretrial conference date. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2006 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, ) Modified on 3/27/2006 to indicate that the order adopted the schedule outlined in the parties' status report. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's Appendix A Filings due by 3/24/2006; Defendant's Appendix A filings due by 4/21/06; Motions in limine and any objections to exhibits due by 4/25/2006; Responses to motions in limine due by 5/2/06; Replies to motions in limine and filing of any stipulations due by 5/9/2006; and Trial to commence on 5/22/06 at 9:30 am. (dls) (Entered: 03/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 181 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK, USA. Service: 12/16/2005.(vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 180 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/13/2005 at 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 179 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/4/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION on [155] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED OPINION denying [169] MOTION for Reconsideration re [126] Published Opinion. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-49) of Proceedings held on 7/27/05 before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/1/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [169] MOTION for Reconsideration re [126] Published Opinion,: Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [169] MOTION for Reconsideration re [126] Published Opinion, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 6/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 173 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [169] MOTION for Reconsideration re [126] Published Opinion, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK, Reply due by 6/21/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, ) Modified on 6/22/2005 (dls ).
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 172 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [169] MOTION for Reconsideration re [126] Published Opinion, filed by USA. Reply due by 6/17/2005. Service: 6/3/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 171 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Defendant's 1/12/2005 motion for summary judgment on damages is stayed, pending resolution of plaintiff's 4/22/2005 motion for reconsideration of the Court's liability ruling. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Response to [169] MOTION for Reconsideration due by 6/3/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [126] Published Opinion, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 4/22/2005. Response due by 5/9/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT (Pg. 1-81) of Proceedings held on 4/14/05 before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Notice of Additional Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/1/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing re-set for 4/14/2005 at 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Supplemental Authority, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/31/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [155] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2005 at 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 3/9/2005. Response due by 3/28/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [158] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 2/24/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [155] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Service: 2/24/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (with two volume separate appendix) to [155] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Reply due by 2/24/2005. Service: 2/7/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [157] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [154] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 2/7/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 2/7/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 2/9/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by 20 pages by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 02/07/05. Response due by 2/24/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix to Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and proposed findings of uncontroverted fact. by USA. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by USA. Service: 1/7/05. Response due by 2/14/2005 (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in suppport of it's motion fo rsummary judgement by USA. Service: 1/7/05.(eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [152] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment by 20 pages by USA.Service: 01/07/05. Response due by 1/24/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Defendant's request for an additional deposition of S. Lynn Stokes is denied. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 9/9/2004 before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/12/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM Concerning Dft's Request for Additional Deposition of S. Lynn Stokes by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [147] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum Concerning Dft's Request for Additional Deposition of S. Lynn Stokes. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004, Terminated: 9/10/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum Concerning Dft's Request for Additional Deposition of S. Lynn Stokes by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 9/8/2004. Response due by 9/27/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 146 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A Status Conference by telephone is set for Thursday, 9/9/2004 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 145 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED RESPONSE to the [135] Pltf's Memorandum Concerning Damages, filed by USA. Service: 8/3/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [142] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Brief in Response to Pltf's Damages Memorandum. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:. Discovery due by 11/3/2004. Motion for summary judgment due by 1/7/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief by USA.Service: 08/03/2004 by hand. Response due by 8/17/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to [136] Dft's Response to Pltf's Memorandum Concerning Damages, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 7/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to [136] Dft's Response to Pltf's Memorandum Concerning Damages, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [138] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Dft's Response to Pltf's Memorandum Concerning Damages. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004, Terminated: 7/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum Concerning Damages by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 6/28/04. Response due by 7/15/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by William George Kanellis for USA. Service: 6/21/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [135] Memorandum filed by USA. Service: 6/18/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM Concerning Damages by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Service: 5/28/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/12/2004 before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis: Status Conference was held on 5-12-04. (lmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf shall file, with the clerk's office, a detailed memorandum, by Friday, 5/28/2004. Dft shall file, with the clerk's office, a response to pltf's memo by Friday, 6/18/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/17/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 5/10/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference in court shall be held on Wednesday, 5/12/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. The parties shall submit a joint proposal of the course of action for the remainder of the case by Monday, 5/10/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED OPINION: Because this Court still agrees with its original conclusions, [127] Dft's MOTION for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [127] Dft's MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re: [126] Published Opinion, filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Reply due by 12/30/2003. Service: 12/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf shall file a Response by 12/16/2003, to dft's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) of the [126] Court's Liability Decision/Published Opinion With Respect to the Great Plains Transaction, by USA.Service: 11/17/03. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds the dft liable for breach of contract with regard to the Great Plains merger, and the Court dismisses the breach of contract claims with regard to the Tri-Federal and Norfolk mergers.Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Liability on CD Rom (1 CD Rom included) by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/27/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [121] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Post-Trial Proposed Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law on CD Rom.Post Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 6/27/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 123 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Concerning Liability by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law as to Liability by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003, Terminated: 6/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on CD Rom by UNITED STATES.Service by hand: 6/19/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [119] Motion for Leave to File deposition transcript of testifying witness Richard Fischman. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003, Terminated: 6/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Complete Deposition Transcript of Testifying Witness Richard Fischman by UNITED STATES.Service: 06/13/03 by hand. Response due by 6/27/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Cumulative Index on May 19, 2003 thru May 22, 2003 before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Filed with Exhibit's: Px- 2, 5, 6, 7 and 8; Dx- 1, 2, 8, 13, 15; and Jx- 172. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis : Trial held on 5/19 - 22/03. (lmc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/23/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [108] Motion for Leave to Amend Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 19, 2003 thru May 22, 2003 before Judge Senior Lawrence S. Margolis. [Cumulative Index included] (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List by UNITED STATES. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Plaintiff's unopposed motion, filed May 7, 2003, to supplement its exhibit list, filed on April 16, 2003, with one additional document is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/26/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [107] Motion for Leave to amend its exhibit list Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Amended Joint Trail Exhibit List by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK, UNITED STATES. by leave of the Judge (vro, ) Modified on 5/22/2003 (vro, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence S. Margolis : Pretrial Conference held on 5-08-2003. (lmc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [97] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+, granting [101] Motion for Leave to File conduct remote testimony of Richard Fischman. A four day trial, in Washington, DC, is set for 5/19, through 5/22/2003 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of submission of joint proposed order by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK, UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/12/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003, Terminated: 5/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Amend Exhibit List by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 5/14/03. Response due by 6/2/2003 (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003, Terminated: 5/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Amend the Defendant's Exhibit list by The United States.Service: 5/13/03. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [103] Motion to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 8, 2003 before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/9/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [101] MOTION for Leave to File conduct remote testimony by video teleconference and response to plaintiff's designation of deposition testimony filed by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Reply due by 5/19/2003. Service: 5/7/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003, Terminated: 5/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: Exhibit List by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 5/7/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [98] Motion to conduct pre-trial conference. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File conduct remote testimony by video teleconference and response to plaintiff's designation of deposition testimony by The United States.Service: 4/25/03. Response due by 5/12/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply to plaintiff's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by The United States. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (Reply to Defendant's) Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003, Terminated: 4/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to conduct pre-trial conference on the record by The United States.Service by hand: 4/23/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003, Terminated: 5/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles by The United States.Service by hand: 4/23/03. Response due by 5/7/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Proposed Exhibit List, pursuant to Appendix A, 14(a)(3) by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File excerpts from the deposition transcript of Richard H. Fischman by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK.Service: 4/16/03. Response due by 5/5/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Exhibit List, pursuant to Appendix A, Rule 13(c)(2) by The United States. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION of Fact by all parties, pursuant to March 4, 2003 Order. Service: 4/16/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Stipulated Exhibit List by all parties, pursuant to March 4, 2003 Order. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by The United States. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List by The United States. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by The United States. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 249 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 10/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDEREd: As discussed at the trial, the parties shall file proposed findings of facts and consulsions of law by June 20, 2003. The proposed findings of facts and conclusions of law are limited to 35 pages for each party and shall cite to the transcript and the exhibits. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: Trial set for 5/19-22 is limited to matters concerning liability (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Trial set for 9:30 a.m. on 5/19/03 , Parties memoranda of contentions of fact and law, not to exceed 20 pages, witness and exhibit lists due 4/16/03 and parties replies, not to exceed 10 pages, are due 4/25/03 , and Pretrial Conference set for 10:30 a.m. on 5/8/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/3/03 ) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 13, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/13/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 10/17/2006, to change file date (lg1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Edward Louis Lublin (HW).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL, USA Service: 12/6/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED DECISION denying [43-1] motion for Summary Judgment, denying [19-1] cross motion, denying [18-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Joint Status Report due 12/6/02 (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER staying Plaintiff's obligation to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Set joint Status Report deadline to 11/25/02. ( signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL re: the Federal Circuit's decision in Castle v. United States. Service: 9/18/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assessment of the Fedreal Circuit's decision in Castle by USA. Service: 9/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 10, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [69-1] motion for Leave to substitute original Addendum B (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [67-1] supplemental memorandum by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN. Service: 6/12/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL to [66-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 6/12/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002, Terminated: 6/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN (Service: 6/5/02) for Leave to substitute original Addendum B . Response due: 6/24/02. (ADDENDUM B INCLUDED IN MOTION). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT APPENDIX (two volumes) pursuant to [63-5] order. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL re: [63-5] order. Service: 5/29/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENMTAL MEMORANDUM by USA re: [63-5] order. Service: 5/29/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 15, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL re: [18-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL. Service: 4/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [52-1] motion for Leave to file memorandum following the Federal Circuit's decision in CAL FED Parties shall file supplemental briefs in support of their cross-motions for summary judgment by 5/29/02 , Parties Joint Appendix due by 5/29/02 , Responses to Supplemental Briefs due: 6/12/02 for USA, for FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL and oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 7/10/02 for [43-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [19-1] motion, [18-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [59-1] motion for a status conference Status Conference set for 10:00 a.m. on 5/15/02 (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/25/02) for Leave to file, out of time, reply to Motion for Status Conference . Response due: 3/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service: 2/8/02) for Leave to file status reports . Response due: 2/25/02. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service: 2/8/02) to [59-1] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 2/22/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002, Terminated: 4/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/4/02) for a status conference . Response due: 2/21/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE reassigned to Judge Sarah L. Wilson . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Sarah L. Wilson, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (10 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of July 27, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing held ( Transcript due 8/27/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing on defendant's motion for telephonic discovery conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 7/27/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing parties to confer and agree on a time for a telephonic discovery conference. Counsel will notify the court by 7/31/01 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/3/01 ) to [52-1] motion for Leave to file memorandum following the Federal Circuit's decision in CAL FED. Reply due: 5/17/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IDENTIFICATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL. Service: 5/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001, Terminated: 5/15/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service: 4/19/01) for Leave to file memorandum following the Federal Circuit's decision in CAL FED , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of correction of the telephone number by Edward Louis Lublin (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Edward Louis Lublin (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [43-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [43-2] motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, VII and VIII. Service: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, (and statement of genuine issues), by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/22/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service: 12/22/00 ) to [43-1] motion for Summary Judgment, (together with separate appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/9/01. (HW) Modified on 01/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service : 11/16/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and to dismiss [until December 26, 2000] and For leave to exceed the page limitation. Response due: 12/4/00.(JT) Modified on 11/20/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/13/00 ) to [44-1] motion for Leave to file response to motion for leave to exceed the page limit in motion for summary judgment on liability. Reply due: 10/27/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service: 9/29/00) for Leave to file response to motion for leave to exceed the page limit in motion for summary judgment on liability , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/16/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, VI, VII and VIII. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/25/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gary Joseph Dernelle. Service: 8/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge), by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN to [36-1] notice by USA. Service: 8/21/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Supplemental AUthority with the Court by USA. Service: 8/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY by USA re: [31-1] response by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL. Service: 6/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time to file a sur-reply. Set Defendant's sur-reply deadline to 6/5/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998, Terminated: 6/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED MOTION by USA (Service : 5/26/98 ) to Extend Time to file a sur-reply [until 6/5/98]. Response due: 6/15/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/98 ) to Extend Time to file sur-reply to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's 4/30/98 response [to June 5, 1998]. Response due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL to [30-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [29-1] response [proposed order] by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL to [27-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [19-1] cross motion . Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service: 2/3/98 ) to [24-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply brief. Reply due: 2/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/26/98 ) to Extend Time to file reply brief. (to February 20, 1998) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service: 12/12/97 ) to [19-1] cross motion. Reply due: 12/29/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment Response to [19-1] cross motion reset to 12/12/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 11/12/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997, Terminated: 11/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service : 11/12/97 ) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment (to December 12, 1997). Response due: 11/28/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of supplemental filing pursuant to paragraph 5(d) of the OMNIBUS Case Management Order by USA. Service: 10/23/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 9/2/97 ) and RESPONSE to [18-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FIRST FEDERAL Response due: 28 days after service of 120 day filing. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth Michael Dintzer Service : 7/11/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ("Short Form") MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service by hand: 7/3/97) for Partial Summary Judgment , together with two separate volumes of exhibits. Response due: 8/1/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 11/5/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Martha Susan Hirschfield. Service: 11/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Sheryl Lynn Floyd (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL (Service : 5/9/96 ) for Leave to File a response to motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [8-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney Gregory Paul Schaffer for FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK. Added Edward Louis Lublin (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995, Terminated: 10/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK (Service : 10/11/95 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Gregory Paul Schaffer for FIRST FEDERAL LINCOLN BANK Added Edward Louis Lublin . (HW) Modified on 10/17/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [6-1] joint motion to Stay (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995, Terminated: 10/4/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION to Stay . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion for Stay of Proceedings until February 25, 1996, parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days of a decision by the Federal Circuit in Winstar (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995, Terminated: 8/29/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by FIRST FEDERAL LINCOL, USA (Service : 8/25/95 ) for Stay of Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sheryl Lynn Floyd Service: 8/17/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39828. Answer due on 10/6/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?