COMMONWEALTH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00522-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Commonwealth Savings Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Marie Hosford +1 202 616 0332 +1 202 305 7643 elizabeth.hosford@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/25/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by COMMONWEALTH and USA . Complaint dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (AB)
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Marie Hosford Service : 12/13/00 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by COMMONWEALTH. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COMMONWEALTH. Service by hand: 2/26/99. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Terminated:
              MOTION by COMMONWEALTH (Service by hand: 2/26/99 ) for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract . Response due: 3/29/99. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery Subject to Extension of Opt-Out Deadline by COMMONWEALTH. Service: 12/31/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion for participation in CDU document exchange pursuant to paragraph II.g(ii) of the third order concerning implementation of paragraph 5.f of the Omnibus Case Management Order in the Winstar-Related proceedings. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/17/98 for Defendant to produce the documents sought by Plaintiff subject to the limitation on p. 5 of Plaintiff's 4/17/98 motion. Defendant may serve corresponding requests on Plaintiff when calling for responses by 8/17/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY by COMMONWEALTH to response to [21-1] motion for participation in CDU document exchange pursuant to paragraph II.g(ii) of the third order concerning implementation of paragraph 5.f of the Omnibus Case Management Order in the Winstar-Related proceedings. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/1/98 ) to [21-1] motion for participation in CDU document exchange pursuant to paragraph II.g(ii) of the third order concerning implementation of paragraph 5.f of the Omnibus Case Management Order in the Winstar-Related proceedings. Reply due: 5/15/98 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/21/1998, Terminated: 5/19/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by COMMONWEALTH (Service : 4/17/98 ) for participation in CDU document exchange pursuant to paragraph II.g(ii) of the third order concerning implementation of paragraph 5.f of the Omnibus Case Management Order in the Winstar-Related proceedings. Response due: 5/1/98 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Allen Davidovich. Service: 11/8/96 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                  NOTICE of change of address by Salomon Gomez (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by COMMONWEALTH (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion for leave to file motion to adopt specialized case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/25/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case managemnet procedures. Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying [7-1] motion for Leave to File motion to modify stay order ( signed by Judge Christine O. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Terminated:
                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/13/95 ) to [7-1] motion for Leave to File motion to modify stay order. Reply due: 11/27/95 (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by COMMONWEALTH (Service: 10/27/95) to Amend [6-2] order . Response due: 11/13/95 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER filing plaintiff's motion to modify stay order by leave of the judge. ( signed by Judge Christine O. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [9-1] motion to Amend [6-2] order reset to 11/13/95 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995, Terminated: 12/5/1995 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by COMMONWEALTH (Service: 10/31/95) for Leave to File motion to modify stay order . Response due: 11/17/95 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision until November 28, 1995 and reset Answer deadline to 12/28/95 if petition is not filed (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995, Terminated: 10/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/4/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Salomon Gomez Service : 9/21/95 (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arnold Bradley Fagg Service : 8/22/95 (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39868. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?