COAST-TO-COAST, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00525-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Centex Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
No Logo COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
No Logo LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott David Austin Scott.Austin@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 6/3/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (391) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 373 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004
AMENDED JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the claim is dismised with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 372 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
    ORDER denying [362] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) Defendant's request that the October 31, 2003 decision in Coast II be vacated is granted. Accordingly, summary judgment is granted to defendant on CTC's FIRREA claim. The June 1, 2004 decision in Coast III denying relief to plaintiff is amended to reflect that plaintiff's damages claim is predicated exclusively on a Guarini theory. It is otherwise unaffected. The clerk is directed to enter an amended judgment. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 371 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [362] Pltf's MOTION for Reconsideration, and REPLY to Dft's Response to Court Order of 8/6/2004, Concerning Admiral Financial Corp., filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 9/30/2004.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 370 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [369] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Govenment's Filing of 9/7/2004. Response due by 9/30/2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 369 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004, Terminated: 9/15/2004 Terminated:
          CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [368] Dft's Filing of 9/7/2004, by CENTEX CORPORATION, COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION, LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA.Service: 9/13/2004. Response due by 9/30/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 368 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Response
            RESPONSE to [367] Court Order of 8/6/2004, Concerning the Effect of Admiral Fin. Corp. v. United States, OPPOSITION to [362] Pltf's MOTION for Reconsideration, and RESPONSE to Pltf's Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 9/7/2004.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 367 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
              ORDER: The 7/12/2004 order is vacated. [363] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is granted. Dft is directed to file a response to both of pltf's motions and addressing the impact of Admiral on or before 9/6/2004. Pltf may file a response on or before 9/16/2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 366 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [365] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to [362] Pltf's MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re: [360] Published Order/Opinion, and [363] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Aunthority (Yankee Atomic). Response due by 8/13/2004. The government's response to both motions is limited to a single brief of not more than 20 pages. The court will notify pltf if a reply is required. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 365 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004, Terminated: 7/27/2004 Terminated:
                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [362] Pltf's MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re: [360] Published Order/Opinion, and [363] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Aunthority (Yankee Atomic), until 8/13/2004, by USA.Service: 7/20/2004. Response due by 8/6/2004. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 364 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Pending are pltf's 6/16/2004 Rule 59 motion for reconsideration of the court's 6/1/2004 opinion, and its 7/6/2004 motion for leave to file a notice of supplemental authority. Dft is invited to file a response to both motions on or before 7/29/2004. The government's response to both motions is limited to a single brief of not more than 20 pages. The court will notify pltf is a rely is required. [VACATED PER ORDER OF 8/6/2004] Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, ) Modified on 8/11/2004 (jcp, ).
                      LREF
                      Blank 363 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Aunthority (Yankee Atomic) by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 7/6/2004 by hand. Response due by 7/20/2004. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 362 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004, Terminated: 10/14/2004 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [360] Published Order/Opinion, by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 6/16/04. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 361 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the claim is dismissed, with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs. (lld, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric G. Bruggink : Oral Argument held on 05/07/2004. (mkb, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 360 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                              PUBLISHED OPINION denying [336] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION, granting [341] CROSS MOTION to [336] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION filed by USA, and denying [342] MOTION to Strike filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the claim with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, ) Modified on 10/14/2004 (lld, ). [AMENDED BY OCTOBER 14, 2004 ORDER TO REFLECT THAT PLAINTIFF'S DAMAGES CLAIM IS PREDICATED EXCLUSIVELY ON A GUARINI THEORY.]
                                LREF
                                Blank 359 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE to [357] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/25/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 358 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                  ORDER: [355] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Dft's Reply in Support of the Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (attached as Exhibit A to the motion) is granted. [357] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority in support of its position set forth in dft's cross motion for summary judgment and opposition to pltf's motion for summary judgment on restitution is granted. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 357 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 5/13/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/27/2004. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 356 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/7/2004 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004
                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/7/2004. (vp1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 355 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004, Terminated: 5/19/2004 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Dft's Reply in Support of the Government's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 4/27/2004. Response due by 5/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 354 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [336] Pltf's MOTION for Summary Judgment, and [345] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [336] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument will be heard from the courtroom Friday, 5/7/2004 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 353 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Description not available
                                              REPLY in Support of [341] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [336] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment With Supplemental Appendix, filed by USA. Service: 4/19/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 352 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [351] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [345] CROSS MOTION to [336] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 4/19/2004. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 351 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004, Terminated: 4/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                  CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [341] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [336] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment, until 4/19/2004, by USA.Service: 4/6/2004. Response due by 4/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 350 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Scott David Austin for USA. Service: 4/6/2004.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 349 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                      OPPOSITION to [341] Dft's CROSS MOTION and REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [336] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment Requesting Restitution, filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 4/8/2004. Service: 3/22/2004.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 348 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                        RESPONSES to [340] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 3/22/2004.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 347 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          REPLY in Support of [342] Dft's MOTION to Strike, filed by USA. Service: 3/22/2004.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 346 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Response to Motion
                                                            OPPOSITION to [342] Dft's MOTION to Strike Documents filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 3/22/2004. Service: 3/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 345 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Terminated:
                                                              [CORRECTED COPY] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [336] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment Requesting Restitution by USA.Service: 2/25/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 344 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [343] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Brief. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 343 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief by USA.Service: 2/25/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/10/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 342 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION to Strike Documents in Support of Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment by USA.Service: 2/23/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 341 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                      CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [336] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment Requesting Restitution, Together with 14 Separately Bound Appendix Volumes, by USA.Service: 2/23/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 340 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by USA. Service: 2/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 339 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                          RESPONSES to the [337] Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact Submitted in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Restitution filed by USA. Service: 2/23/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 338 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by all plaintiffs. Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 337 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Awarding $42.5 Million in Restitution by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 336 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Awarding $42.5 Million in Restitution, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume [STYLED AS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT] by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Response due by 2/23/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 335 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 30, 2003 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (hw1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003
                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/1/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 334 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                      PUBLISHED OPINION: [269] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment as to liability on its Winstar claim is granted. The government promised, among other things, to permit the acquired thrift to count supervisory goodwill toward minimum regulartory capital requirements and to amortize intagible assets, including supervisory goodwill, over a period of up to 25 years. This promise was breached by the enactment of FIRREA. Pltf is entitled to attempt to prove damages. Pltf is instructed to file a motion for summary judgment as to damages on or before 1/16/2004.Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, ) Modified on 10/14/2004 (lld, ).[VACATED PER ORDER OF OCTOBER 14, 2004]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 333 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/29/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 332 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 11, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 331 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [269] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 10/30/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Counsel for both parties shall appear in person. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 330 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003
                                                                                              JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b), that the FDIC is dismissed as a party, with prejudice. It is further ordered and adjudged that defendant's counterclaim against the FDIC is dismissed, with prejudice, except this dismissal is without prejudice to any counterclaim the defendant may assert against Coast-to-Coast (and without prejudice to Coast-to-Coast's right to oppose such a counterclaim). Each side to bear its own costs. (lld, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 329 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment, as there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b, dismissing the FDIC as a party, as well as defendant's counterclaim against the FDIC. Each side to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 328 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [327] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Status Report. The court notes that dft's status report is contained in the body of the motion. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 327 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003, Terminated: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Status Report and STATUS REPORT by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 326 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [324] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Pltfs' 7/11/03 Reply to Dft's Response and Supplemental Response to Pltfs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The court notes that dft's surreply is contained in the body of its July 22, 2003 motion. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 325 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                        REPLY to Dft's Response to Motion re: [317] FDIC's MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss its Claims Pursuant to Rule 41(a) and Dft's Counterclaims and [323] Dft's Request Ordering the FDIC to Pay Costs filed by FDIC. Service: 7/23/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 324 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003, Terminated: 7/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Surreply and Surreply by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/22/03 by hand. Response due by 8/5/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 323 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                            REQUEST for an Order Dismissing With Prejudice the FDIC's Claims and Ordering the FDIC to Pay Costs by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (Dft's Response to the FDIC's Motion to Dismiss its Claims and Dft's Counterclaims)Service: 7/11/03. Response due by 7/28/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 323 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [317] FDIC's MOTION to Dismiss Its Claims and Dft's Counterclaim filed by UNITED STATES. (Together with Dft's Request for Costs) Reply due by 7/28/2003, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 322 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1) Response to [264] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and [269] Pltf's Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Their Winstar-Related Claim, and 2) Supplemental Response to [259] Pltf's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Their Winstar-Related Claim filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 321 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 DeclarationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Herbert Held, Together with Exhibits by FDIC, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 320 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of One Expert Report Pursuant to the [284] Court's Order Dated August 2, 2002 and [315] Court's Order Dated May 22, 2003 by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 6/27/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 319 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to [259] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment With Respect to Their Winstar-Related Claim, Together With Three (3) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes (Large) filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 7/11/2003. Service: 6/27/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 318 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Response
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to the Proposed Findings Submitted by Plaintiff Coast-to-Coast filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/27/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 317 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) by FDIC.Service: 6/11/03. Response due by 7/14/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 316 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing of two Expert Reports, pursuant to the Court's Order dated 8/2/02 and 4/7/03 by UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/27/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 315 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [314] Motion to modify the court's scheduling order. Signed by Acting Chief Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, ) Modified on 6/3/2003 (dw1, ).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 314 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003, Terminated: 5/22/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION for entry of an order to modify the court's scheduling order dated April 15, 2003 by FDIC and UNITED STATES, by leave of the Judge.Service: 5/21/03. Response due by 6/9/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 313 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER finding as moot [310] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 312 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response re [310] MOTION to Compel filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/19/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 311 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [310] MOTION to Compel filed by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 5/19/2003. Service: 5/7/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 310 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel by The United States.Service: 4/21/03. Response due by 5/8/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 309 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [308] Motion to modify the Court's scheduling orders of 8/2/02 and 2/26/03. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 307 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 7, 2003 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 308 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003, Terminated: 4/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for entry of an order modifying the Court's scheduling orders dated 8/2/02 and 2/26/03, by FDIC and The United States. Service: 4/10/03.Response due 4/28/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/7/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 306 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [302] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 305 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [302] MOTION for Protective Order filed by CENTEX CORPORATION, COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION and LOCAL AMERICA BANK OF TULSA. Service: 4/4/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 304 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [302] MOTION for Protective Order filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/14/2003. Service: 4/2/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 303 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [302] MOTION for Protective Order:Oral Argument set for 4/7/2003 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink.Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 4/4/2003. Response due by 4/2/2003 (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 302 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003, Terminated: 4/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION.Service: 3/21/03. Response due 4/7/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 300 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Witness ListCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Witness list by USA. Service: 2/25/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 299 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Response to [259-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability on its Winstar-related cause of action due 6/27/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 301 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [297-1] stipulation, granting [296-1] stipulation; and dismissing UBH, Inc. and Coast Partners from this case. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation by UBH, INC. of voluntary dismissal from this action pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation by COAST PARTNERS of voluntary dismissal from this action pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 298 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing "Supplemented and Amended unified damage exhibit and expert report of Dr. Arnold A. Heggestad" by FDIC, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/23/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 295 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by FDIC. Service: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 294 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/31/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 293 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [292-1] motion for entry of an order modifying the Court's scheduling order, denying [291-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony, granting [291-2] motion to Amend [284-7] order Fact discovery against shareholder Plaintiffs' ends 2/25/03 , Expert discovery closes 5/27/03 , and Defendant to respond to motions for summary judgment with respect to their Winstar-related claims, or cross-move by 6/27/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 292 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003, Terminated: 1/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) for entry of an order modifying the Court's scheduling order . Response due: 1/27/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 291 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/16/02) to Compel deposition testimony , and to Amend [284-7] order . Response due: 1/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 290 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. to [288-1] expert report by USA. Service: 10/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 289 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FDIC to [288-1] expert report by USA. Service: 10/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 288 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Expert Report by USA. Service: 10/16/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 287 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing "Unifiled Damage Exhibit" by FDIC Service: 10/4/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 286 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST to [284-7] order. Service: 8/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 285 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED DECISION granting [249-1] motion to Dismiss the "Tax Benefit" claims of Coast Partners and UBH, Inc. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 283 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 1, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 284 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part, denying in part [274-1] motion for Leave to file accompanying surreply to Defendant's reply in support of its motion to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence Winstar-related discovery, granting in part, denying in part [252-1] motion to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence "Winstar" related discovery Liability discovery deadline is 8/5/02 , Defendant's unified exhibit due 1/15/03 and Plaintiff's unified exhibit due 8/15/02 , Defendant's response to FDIC and non-FDIC Plaintiff's motions for partial Summary Judgment on liability on their goodwill claim due 12/20/02 , Defendant's Cross-Motion due 1/17/03 , Defendant's witness and exhibit lists due 10/16/02 , and Plaintiff's response to counterclaim damages exhibit due 10/30/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 282 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY by FDIC to [271-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 6/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 281 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 9, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 280 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 8/1/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 279 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST to the Draft Scheduling Order dated 6/24/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 278 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of counsel by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service 6/24/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 277 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to the Court's draft Scheduling Order, dated 6/24/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/25/02 (JT) Modified on 07/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 276 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/24/02 ) to [269-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability on their goodwill claim, [264-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability on their Goodwill Claim. Reply due: 7/11/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 275 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 7/9/02 for [249-1] motion to Dismiss the "Tax Benefit" claims of Coast Partners and UBH, Inc. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 274 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service: 6/14/02) for Leave to file accompanying surreply to Defendant's reply in support of its motion to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence Winstar-related discovery . Response due: 7/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 273 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER filing by leave and granting [272-1] motion for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 272 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002, Terminated: 6/7/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST (Service : 6/5/02 by hand) for Leave to Notify the Court of New Authority. (Southern California Federal) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response 6/19/02 due: 6/19/02 (JT) Modified on 06/11/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 271 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [252-1] motion to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence "Winstar" related discovery. Service: 6/7/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 270 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [267-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority (Southern California Federal) (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 269 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Servic: 6/4/02) for partial Summary Judgment on liability on their goodwill claim . Response due: 7/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 268 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [266-1] motion for Leave to submit "corrected" motion for partial summary judgment on liability on their goodwill claim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 267 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002, Terminated: 6/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service by hand: 6/4/02) for Leave to notify the court of new authority (Southern California Federal) . Response due: 6/18/02. (LTD) Modified on 06/05/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 266 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002, Terminated: 6/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service: 5/31/02) for Leave to submit "corrected" motion for partial summary judgment on liability on their goodwill claim . Response due: 6/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 265 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. Service: 5/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service: 5/30/02) for partial Summary Judgment on liability on their Goodwill Claim . Response due: 7/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 263 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [262-1] motion for Leave to file their motion for partial summary judgment on liability on their Goodwill Claim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002, Terminated: 5/30/2002 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service: 5/24/02) for Leave to file their motion for partial summary judgment on liability on their Goodwill Claim . Response due: 6/10/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 261 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 7/2/02 for [249-1] motion to Dismiss the "Tax Benefit" claims of Coast Partners and UBH, Inc. (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 260 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC. Service: 5/23/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002, Terminated: 6/1/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/23/02) for Summary Judgment on liability on its Winstar-related cause of action . Response due: 6/24/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/23/02) to [252-1] motion to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence "Winstar" related discovery. Reply due: 6/7/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [256-1] motion for Leave to file Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 255 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service: 5/24/02) to [252-1] motion to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence "Winstar" related discovery. Reply due: 6/10/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 256 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002, Terminated: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST (Service by hand : 5/23/02 ) for Leave to to file Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability Response due: 6/6/02 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 254 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [249-1] motion to Dismiss the "Tax Benefit" claims of Coast Partners and UBH, Inc.. Service: 5/20/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 253 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/14/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Hugo Alexander Zia for FDIC Added Bruce Clark Taylor . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 252 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/7/02) to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence "Winstar" related discovery . Response due: 5/24/02 (Included with defendant's [status] report to the court pursuant to the opinion of 1/7/02) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 252 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [STATUS] REPORT pursuant to the opinion of January 7, 2002 (and motion to reopen counterclaim discovery and to commence "Winstar" related discovery) filed by USA. Service: 4/7/02 (DS) Modified on 05/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service: 5/1/02) to [249-1] motion to Dismiss the "Tax Benefit" claims of Coast Partners and UBH, Inc. Reply due: 5/20/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 250 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION: (1) granting [237-1] motion to Compel. CTC is directed to produce every document in its possession, custody, or control concerning COAST-TO-COAST FINANCIAL CORPORATION that is relevent to the government's counterclaim and that is not privileged. CTC is not required to produce any documents that it has already furnished to FDIC; (2) granting [212-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability on Guarini claim; (3) denying [209-1] cross motion; (4) granting [201-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and (5) Our August 24, 2001 order is amended as follows - discovery relating to the counterclaim shall be concluded on or before July 18, 2002 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 04/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 249 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/02) to Dismiss the "Tax Benefit" claims of Coast Partners and UBH, Inc. . Response due: 5/6/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 248 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by FDIC, re: Clarifying oral argument presented at hearing on 3/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 247 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [246-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental memorandum clarifying oral argument presented at hearing on 3/14/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 246 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002, Terminated: 3/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FDIC (Service: 3/21/02) for Leave to file supplemental memorandum clarifying oral argument presented at hearing on 3/14/02 . Response due: 4/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 14, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 245 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of filing of documents in response to the Court's request on 3/14/02 by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS and UBH, INC. Service: 3/14/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument re: [201-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by COAST-TO-COAST, [209-1] cross motion by USA, [212-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability on Guarini claim by FDIC ( Transcript due 4/15/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 243 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [237-1] motion to Compel, [237-2] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery. Service: 2/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 242 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service: 1/28/02) to [237-1] motion to Compel, [237-2] motion to Extend Time to complete discovery. Reply due: 2/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 241 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS and UBH, Inc. to [236-1] motion reply by USA. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 240 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [238-1] motion for Leave to file surreply to Defendant's reply to response to Defendant's cross-motion for partial summary judgment oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 3/14/02 for [212-1] motion for Summary Judgment on on Guarini claim, [209-1] cross motion and for [201-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 239 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by FDIC to [228-2] counter claim by defendant. Service: 1/23/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 238 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002, Terminated: 1/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. (Service: 1/23/02) for Leave to file surreply to Defendant's reply to response to Defendant's cross-motion for partial summary judgment . Response due: 2/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 237 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/18/02) to Compel plaintiff, Coast-to-Coast Financial Corp., to respond to requests for production of documents related to its counterclaim; and to Extend Time to complete discovery with respect to counterclaim (four months). Response due: 2/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 236 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [209-1] cross motion. Service: 1/11/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 235 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by FDIC to response to [212-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability on Guarini claim . Service: 1/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 234 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to FDIC's response to [209-1] cross motion. Service: 1/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 233 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA re: [231-1] order. Service: 1/10/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 232 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [230-1] motion to Extend Time to file replies to the oppositions to the cross-motion for partial summary judgment, granting [230-2] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation, granting [229-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to opposition to the motion for partial summary judgment on Guarini Tax Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/11/02 for [209-1] cross motion , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/11/02 for [212-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability on Guarini claim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 231 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED DECISION granting [200-1] motion to stay defendant's counterclaim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 230 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/4/02) to Extend Time to file replies to the oppositions to the cross-motion for partial summary judgment and For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 1/22/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 229 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service: 1/4/02) to Extend Time to file reply to opposition to the motion for partial summary judgment on Guarini Tax , (until January 11, 2002). Response due: 1/22/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 228 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/5/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC., FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, CENTEX CORPORATION, FIRST NATIONWIDE, FDIC filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/31/01 (Answer to counterclaim due 1/23/02) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 227 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 17, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 225 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by COAST-TO-COAST, et al. (Service: 12/19/01) to [209-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/7/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 224 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES filed by COAST-TO-COAST, et al [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/19/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 223 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER transferring all aspects of this case to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir and Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 226 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC. Service: 12/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 222 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 12/19/01 ) to [209-1] cross motion. Reply due: 1/7/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 221 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES filed by USA. Service: 12/19/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 220 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, together with three volumes of appendix, by USA (Service: 12/19/01 ) to [212-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability on Guarini claim. Reply due: 1/7/02 (DS) Modified on 12/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 219 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [218-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, granting [217-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for partial summary judgment with respect to "Tax Benefit" claims, granting [216-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to FDIC'S motion for partial summary judgment Response to [212-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability on Guarini claim reset to 12/19/01, [209-1] cross motion reset to 12/19/01 . ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001, Terminated: 12/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, et al. (Service: 12/11/01) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment (to December 19, 2001). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 217 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 12/10/01) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for partial summary judgment with respect to "Tax Benefit" claims , (until December 19, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 216 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/10/01) to Extend Time to respond to FDIC'S motion for partial summary judgment , (until December 19, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 215 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of ERRATA by FDIC, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/14/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 213 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC, filed by leave of teh Judge. Service: 11/13/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 212 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service : 11/13/01 ) for Summary Judgment on liability on Guarini claim , together with separate one volume appendix, filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/14/01. (HW) Modified on 12/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 211 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/13/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/13/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 209 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 11/13/01) and RESPONSE to [201-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by COAST-TO-COAST, (together with separate one volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/14/01. (HW) Modified on 11/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [209-1] cross motion reset to 12/14/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 Answer to CounterclaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. to [31-2] counter claim by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/13/01 JPSR due 12/31/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 208 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 12/17/01 for [200-1] motion to stay defendant's counterclaim (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 207 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by FDIC to response to [200-1] motion to stay defendant's counterclaim. Service: 10/29/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 206 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by USA to amended complaint by FDIC. Service: 10/22/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 205 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER AND SUPPLEMENTAL COUNTERCLAIM by USA against COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, UBH, INC. amending [31-1] answer by USA. (Ans. to Amd. Counterclaim due: 11/9/01 (per court order). Service: 10/19/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 204 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/18/01) to [200-1] motion to stay defendant's counterclaim. Reply due: 11/1/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 203 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [202-1] motion to Extend Time to file amended counterclaim Amended Counterclaim deadline to 10/19/01 and Plaintiff's response to amended counterclaim due by 11/9/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 202 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/12/01) to Extend Time to file amended counterclaim until 10/19/01. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 201 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, together with 10 separate volumes of appendix, by COAST-TO-COAST, et al. (Service: 10/12/01) for Partial Summary Judgment on liability on plaintiffs' Guarini claim. Response due: 11/13/01 (response brief may be 50 pages) (DS) Modified on 10/15/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 200 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FDIC (Service: 10/1/01) to stay defendant's counterclaim pending exhaustion of the administrative claims process. Response due: 10/18/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 199 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by FDIC (Answer due 10/22/01). Service: 10/1/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 198 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Suggested changes to the court's proposed order by FDIC filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 8/23/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 197 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to the Court's Proposed Scheduling Order of 8/21/01 by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS and UBH, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 196 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: The two attached facsimiles [Investor plaintiff's Response and FDIC'S Proposed changes to the Court's Proposed Order] are filed by my leave (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 195 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [193-1] motion for substitution of parties, granting [191-1] motion for Melvin C. Garbow to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Melvin Carl Garbow for SUPERIOR BANK FSB; directing FDIC to file an amended complaint by 10/1/01 ; defendant to respond to the amended complaint by 10/22/01 ; defendant to initiate discovery relating to its counterclaim by 9/14/01, with all discovery related to the counterclaim to be concluded by 1/18/02 ; defendant to amend its counterclaim by 10/12/01 , all plaintiffs to respond to the amended counterclaim by 11/2/01 ; plaintiffs, Coast-to-Coast, Coast Partners and UBH, Inc., to file their motion for summary judgment on liability concerning their "tax benefit" claims by 10/12/01 , with the brief in support of the motion and any brief in support of a cross-motion to be limited to 50 pages and reply briefs limited to 30 pages; and absent agreement by the parties, staying damages discovery pending a decision on liability. ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 194 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA to [190-1] Scheduling Order. Service: 8/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (71 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of August 17, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 9/17/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001, Terminated: 8/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FEDERAL DEPOSIT (Service: 8/14/01) for substitution of parties [and counsel] (The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as successor to the rights of Superior Bank, FSB, Hinsdale, Illinois and as Receiver of Old Superior). Response due: 8/31/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SUPERIOR BANK FSB (Service: 8/14/01) for Melvin C. Garbow to Withdraw as Attorney . Response due: 8/31/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Telephonic Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/17/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC., USA, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, CENTEX CORPORATION and FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 8/3/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 187 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due on 8/3/01 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Robert Keith Huffman (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of declaration of counsel by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/23/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denied as moot [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases, and denied as moot [137-2] motion for finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service by hand: 3/12/01. (LTD) Modified on 03/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by COAST-TO-COAST, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, CENTEX CORPORATION, FIRST NATIONWIDE Service: 2/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service by hand: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (on Section 6103 issues) by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 2/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing "Appendix in support of First Heigts Cross-Motion for summary Judgment on liability" by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC., FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, CENTEX CORPORATION, FIRST NATIONWIDE, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/12/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by USA re: SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX TO DEFENDANT'S THIRD REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST FIRST HEIGHTS ON "TAX BENEFIT" CLAIMS AND RESPONSE TO FIRST HEIGHTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Service: 1/12/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/12/01) for Leave to supplement appendix Response due: 1/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 notice of filingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing [Filed by leave of the Judge] (Supplement to appendix in support of Cross-Motion for summary judgment on liability) by COAST-TO-COAST, FIRST HEIGHTS BANK, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, CENTEX CORPORATION, FIRST NATIONWIDE. Service: 1/3/01. (FE) Modified on 01/09/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 11/14/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 175 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [174-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation in response to First Heights cross-motion. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000, Terminated: 11/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/3/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation in response to First Heights cross-motion. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [172-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to First Heights Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000, Terminated: 10/30/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/27/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to First Heights Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment [until November 7, 2000]. Response due: 11/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Additional Issue Presented in connection with Memorandum in support of cross-motion by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service : 10/25/00 (by hand)) to correct certificate of service for First Heights Plaintiffs' status report filed on 10/18/00. (certificate of service attached) Response due: 11/8/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT (on section 6103 discussions) by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 10/25/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [166-1] motion to Strike, granting [166-2] motion for Leave to File response to Plaintiffs' proposed protective order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [155-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 166 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000, Terminated: 10/24/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/23/00 ) to Strike and for Leave to File response to Plaintiffs' proposed protective order. Response due: 11/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 10/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [157-1] motion to Compel Production. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' 9/7/00 motion to compel production by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 2, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Proposed Protective Order and Attachments by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK. Service: 10/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 11/1/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 10/2/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [159-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the motion to compel . Response to [157-1] motion to Compel Production reset to 9/29/00 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000, Terminated: 9/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION (Service: 9/21/00) to Extend Time within which to respond to the motion to compel , (until September 29, 2000). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000, Terminated: 10/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service by hand: 9/7/00) to Compel Production . Response due: 9/21/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/5/00 ) to [155-1] motion for Protective Order, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 9/18/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000, Terminated: 10/24/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEMAND FOR 6103 WAIVER by COAST-TO-COAST, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, CENTEX CORPORATION. Service: 8/18/00 (motion for protective order included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000, Terminated: 10/24/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, CENTEX CORPORATION (Service : 8/18/00 (by hand)) for Protective Order. Response due: 9/1/00 (supplemental opposition included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases, [137-2] motion for finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases. Service: 8/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [152-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to responses by First Heights, Centex, Local America and Coast-to-Coast by 8/17/00 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000, Terminated: 8/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/7/00) to Extend Time to file reply to responses by First Heights, Centex, Local America and Coast-to-Coast , (until August 17, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [150-1] motion to Extend Time to file a reply to Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's motion for an order ruling that Plaintiffs placed their tax returns and return information at issue and either dismissing Plaintiffs' claims unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases, or in the alternative, finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases. Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/7/00 for [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases, reset to 8/7/00 for [137-2] motion for finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 7/25/2000, Terminated: 7/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/20/00 ) to Extend Time to file a reply to Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's motion for an order ruling that Plaintiffs placed their tax returns and return information at issue and either dismissing Plaintiffs' claims unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases, or in the alternative, finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases. Response due: 8/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [147-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for an order ruling that Plaintiffs placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiffs' claims unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases, or in the alternative, finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases. Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 7/20/00 for [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [143-1] motion to extend the discovery period to take the deposition of Mr. Edward Montgomery. Reset Discovery deadline to 7/13/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000, Terminated: 7/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/6/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for an order ruling that Plaintiffs placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiffs' claims unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases, or in the alternative, finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiffs produce signed releases [until July 20, 2000]. Response due: 7/24/00 (JT) Modified on 07/12/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Suspend Briefing With Respect to First Heights Plaintiffs' Tax Returns and Return Information by USA. Service: 7/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 1, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/29/00 ) to extend the discovery period to take the deposition of Mr. Edward Montgomery. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 145 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases, [137-2] motion for finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases. Service: 6/23/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, LOCAL AMERICA BANK (Service: 6/23/00 ) to [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases Reply due: 7/10/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 6/23/00) for Leave to suspend briefing with respect to First Heights' tax returns and return information Response due: 7/10/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service: 6/23/00) to [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases, [137-2] motion for finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases. Reply due: 7/3/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FIRST NATIONWIDE (Service by hand: 6/16/00) to [137-1] motion for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases, [137-2] motion for finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases filed with a (1) one volume appendix. Reply due: 6/27/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [131-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of defendant's objections and responses to C-L-C first set of requests for admissions. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000, Terminated: 3/13/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 6/9/00) for an order ruling that Plaintiff's placed their tax returns and return information at issue, and either dismissing Plaintiff's claims unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases ,or in the alternative for finding an adverse inference applies unless Plaintiff's produce signed releases , filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support. Response due: 6/23/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument re: [131-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of defendant's objections and responses to C-L-C first set of requests for admissions by CENTEX CORPORATION, LOCAL AMERICA BANK, COAST-TO-COAST ( Transcript due 7/3/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/30/00 ) for Protective Order. Response due: 6/16/00 (response to motion included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/30/00 ) to [131-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of defendant's objections and responses to C-L-C first set of requests for admissions. Reply due: 6/16/00 (motion for protective order included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 17, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Documents Under Seal for In Camera Review by USA. Service: 5/19/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST ( Service: 5/15/00 ) and RESPONSE to [129-1] motion for status conference regarding liability discovery by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/1/00 (JT) Modified on 05/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER reset discovery re: liability on the Plaintiffs' tax benefit claims deadline to 6/30/00 ; Defendant shall complete all depositions that were formally noticed on or before May 17, 2000, by 6/30/00; Defendant may notice a cumulative total of six additional depositions by 6/30/00; Defendant's deposition of Nelson Stephenson shall take place on 5/19/00; Defendant's response to [131-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of defendant's objections and responses to C-L-C first set of requests for admissions reset to 5/30/00 ; oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 6/1/00 for [131-1] motion to determine the sufficiency of defendant's objections and responses to C-L-C first set of requests for admissions ; Defendant shall produce to Plaintiffs the 20 boxes of documents already retrieved as a result of Defendant's REMATS search by 5/31/00/; Defendant shall submit Plaintiffs' 4/21/00 interrogatories to the appropriate agencies; Plaintiffs' limited waiver of attorney-client privilege is approved. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 05/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; response to [133-1] cross motion reset to 6/1/00. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/22/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 5/17/00 (in this, 96-584C and 96-494C) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 131 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000, Terminated: 6/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, LOCAL AMERICA BANK and CENTEX CORPORATION (Service: 5/15/00) to determine the sufficiency of defendant's objections and responses to C-L-C first set of requests for admissions . Response due: 5/30/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 130 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FIRST HEIGHTS BANK (Service by hand: 5/9/00 ) to [129-1] motion for status conference regarding liability discovery. Reply due: 5/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 129 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 5/1/00) for status conference regarding liability discovery . Response due: 5/18/00. (FE) Modified on 05/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [129-1] motion for status conference regarding liability discovery set to 5/18/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FIRST HEIGHTS response to defendant's motion for clarification of opinion of March 17, 2000 and Notice of Filing of documents UNDER SEAL for IN CAMERA reviewi, filed by leave of the Judge (MOTION FILED IN 96-811).*** (HW) Modified on 04/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, CENTEX, LOCAL AMERICA (Service: 3/21/00 ) to [124-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the requests for admissions Reply due: 3/30/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [124-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the requests for admissions reset deadline to 3/24/00 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000, Terminated: 3/20/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/15/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the requests for admissions [until March 24, 2000]. Response due: 4/3/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing documents for in camera review filed by USA. (Notice FILED UNDER SEAL; documents submitted to Judge for in camera review.) Service: 2/1/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION denying [109-1] motion to stay discovery in certain tax benefit cases, granting [114-1] motion for Leave to Serve requests for admission, granting [113-1] motion to Extend Time of discovery. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 2/1/00 for Defendant to produce documents for in camera review ; reset discovery deadline to 5/26/00. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND REPLY by USA re: motion for summary judgment against First Heights on tax benefit claims. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REVISED AFFIDAVIT of Robert K. Huffman by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. 1 Separate Volume of Exhibits. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service 10/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/14/99 ) to First Heights Plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/28/99 (by hand)) to [114-1] motion for Leave to Serve requests for admission. Reply due: 11/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion for summary judgment on "tax benefit" issues. Response due: 11/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. to response to [113-1] motion to Extend Time of discovery. Service: 10/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 10/18/1999, Entered: 10/21/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/18/99 (by hand)) to [113-1] motion to Extend Time of discovery. Reply due: 10/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service : 10/15/99 (by hand)) for Leave to Serve requests for admission. Response due: 10/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service : 9/29/99 ) to Extend Time of discovery [until January 31, 2000]. Response due: 10/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [109-1] motion to stay discovery in certain tax benefit cases. Service: 9/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 9/20/99 (by hand)) to [109-1] motion to stay discovery in certain tax benefit cases. Reply due: 9/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE [re: FIRST NATIONWIDE] by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB (Service: 9/17/99 ) to [109-1] motion to stay discovery in certain tax benefit cases. Reply due: 9/28/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/3/99 ) to stay discovery in certain tax benefit cases. Response due: 9/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 29, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [86-1] motion to Compel by UBH, INC., SUPERIOR BANK FSB, COAST PARTNERS, COAST-TO-COAST ( Transcript due 7/29/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [102-1] motion for Leave to correct brief ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/11/99) to Extend Time to file a reply in support of motion for summary judgment until 6/17/99. (FE) Modified on 06/23/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLMENTAL REPLY brief of First Heights (96-811C) in support of plaintiff's motion to compel discovery, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by COAST-TO-COAST to response to [86-1] motion to Compel. Service by hand: 6/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [101-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/10/1999, Terminated: 6/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST (Service by hand: 6/7/99) for Leave to correct brief . Response due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999, Terminated: 6/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service by hand: 6/4/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation , out of time (12 pages). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [97-1] motion for leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [CORRECTED] RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/20/99 ) to [86-1] motion to Compel, filed together with separate appendix. Reply due: 6/4/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [96-1] motion for Leave to file corrected briefs and appendix ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999, Terminated: 5/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC., (Service : 5/21/99 ) out of time, for leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT) Modified on 05/26/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999, Terminated: 5/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/20/99) for Leave to file corrected briefs and appendix . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [83-1] motion for leave to serve clarifying and supplemental privilege logs. Service: 5/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/14/99 ) to [86-1] motion to compel. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Reply due: 6/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER mooting [87-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion to compel and for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment, mooting [88-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion to compel, granting [90-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel, granting [90-2] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment, granting [91-1] motion for Leave to amend the April 29, 1999 motion for enlargement of time (defendant's). Defendant's response to [86-1] motion to compel reset to 5/14/99 , Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 5/14/99 for [83-1] motion for Leave to Serve clarifying and supplemental privilege logs , Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 6/4/99 for [86-1] motion to compel , and oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 6/29/99 for [86-1] motion to compel; motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/23/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 5/4/99) for Leave to amend the April 29, 1999 motion for enlargement of time (defendant's) . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 5/3/99 (by hand)) to [90-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel, [90-2] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 5/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/29/99 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel , (until May 14, 1999) and to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until June 14, 1999). Defendant requests that Oral Argument will be held June 21, 1999, at 10:00 a.m., and the discovery deadline enlarged to July 27, 1999. Response due: 5/17/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 4/16/99 ) to [83-1] motion for Leave to Serve clarifying and supplemental privilege logs, (separate two volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 5/3/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/22/99) to Extend Time to file response to motion to compel , (until May 3, 1999). Response due: 5/10/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 4/5/99) to Compel discovery, (together with separate three volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/22/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [84-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999, Terminated: 5/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/15/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion to compel and for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Response due: 5/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999, Terminated: 4/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 4/5/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation , (79 pages). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/2/99 ) for Leave to Serve clarifying and supplemental privilege logs. (privilege logs included) Response due: 4/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER vacating the Order of 3/25/99 and setting Plaintiffs' motion to compel filing deadline to 4/5/99 , set Defendant's response to 4/16/99 and Plaintiffs' reply to 5/3/99. Set Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's dispositive motion deadline to 4/23/99 and set Defendant's reply deadline to 5/10/99. Set Oral argument for 10:00 a.m., 5/21/99 regarding the motion to compel and motion for summary judgment. Set Discovery deadline to 7/27/99. Also pending is Defendant 3/22/99 motion for leave to amend the certificate of service. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 3/25/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Plaintiffs' (First Heights Banks, F.S.B., et al.) 3/19/99 motion for an enlargement of time. Accordingly, paragraphs 3 and 4 of the Court's 3/8/99 Order are amended. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [79-1] motion to Extend Time to file dispositive motion. Defendant will file its dispositive motion regarding one of the Plaintiffs by 3/12/99. Set Plaintiffs' motion to compel filing deadline to 3/29/99. Set Additional Documents due: 4/9/99 (Defendant's response to motion to compel and Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's dispositive motion) and 4/26/99 (Plaintiffs' reply to response to motion to compel and Defendant's reply to response to their dispositive motion). Oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 5/21/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999, Terminated: 3/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/2/99 ) to Extend Time to file dispositive motion , (until ?). Response due: 3/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [76-1] motion to Extend Time to file dispositive motion. Reset Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 3/5/99 , reset Plaintiffs' motion to compel deadline to 3/22/99 , reset Defendant's response to motion to compel and Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's dispositive motion to 4/2/99 , reset Plaintiffs reply brief and Defendant's reply to the 56(g) response to 4/19/99 and set oral argument on the motion to compel for 10:00 a.m., 5/21/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 2/22/99 (by hand)) to [76-1] motion to Extend Time to file their dispositive motion. Reply due: 3/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 3/3/99 for [76-1] motion to Extend Time to file their dispositive motion. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999, Terminated: 3/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/12/99 ) to Extend Time to file their dispositive motion. Response due: 3/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: (1) granting [74-1] motion to revise the schedule for filings ; (2) Defendant shall serve its privilege log, etc. by 2/1/99; (3) Defendant shall file its dispositive Motion by 2/16/99 ; (4) Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery by 3/5/99 ; (5) Defendant's response to motion to compel discovery by 3/15/99 ; (6) Plaintiff's reply by 4/2/99 ; (7) Oral Argument will be held 4/14/99, at 2:00 p.m., at the Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, NW, Washington, DC 20005 regarding the motion to compel and the dispositive motion ; and (8) Discovery deadline is extended to 7/27/99 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/23/1999, Terminated: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/19/99 ) to revise the schedule for filings . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [72-1] motion to Extend Time for Defendant to file privilege log until January 19, 1999. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999, Terminated: 1/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/8/99 ) to Extend Time to file privilege log. Response due: 1/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [70-1] motion to Extend Time to file privilege log by Brief deadline of 1/8/99 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/98 ) to Extend Time to file privilege log [until January 8, 1999]. Response due: 1/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/21/98 ) to Extend Time to serve their privilege log [until December 23, 1998]. Response due: 1/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/11/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 4, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Agenda for Status Conference by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/2/98 (JT) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Defendant shall serve their privilege log on Plaintiffs by 12/21/98. The Government is granted leave to file a supplemental privilege log with respect to Office of Thrift Supervision documents. Defendant shall complete their document production by 12/31/98. Set Defendant's dispositive motion filing deadline to 1/19/99 ; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/29/99 for Plaintiffs to file their motion to compel ; set Additional Documents due: 2/9/99 for USA (response to motion to compel) for Plaintiff (response to dispositive motion); 2/23/99 for Plaintiff (reply brief re: motion to compel); for USA (reply brief re: dispositive motion) ; set oral argument regarding the motion to compel on 5:00 p.m., 3/3/99 ; and reset discovery deadline to 6/30/99. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 1/4/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/3/98 ) for Leave to File Status Report & Proposed Agenda for the 12/4/98 Status Conference. (Status Report and Proposed Agenda included) Response due: 12/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filing by leave Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to fix a date for a status conference and granting [63-1] motion to fix date for status conference. Set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 12/4/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998, Terminated: 11/23/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service : 11/17/98 ) to fix date for status conference. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/4/99 (JT) Modified on 12/02/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER filing by leave and granting [61-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint interrogatories deadline to 11/6/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/30/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 10/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first joint interrogatories and extension of the discovery deadline [to November 6, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Glenn Irwin Chernigoff. Service : 8/31/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [54-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents and the time of discovery. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' first joint set of requests for production deadline to 9/28/98 and reset Discovery deadline to 12/11/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [52-1] motion to Extend Time within which to complete production of documents . Service: 8/25/98 (AB) Modified on 08/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATED MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST and USA (Service : 8/25/98 ) for Protective Order (AB) Modified on 08/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 8/14/98 (by hand)) to [52-1] motion to Extend Time to complete production of documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Reply due: 8/21/98 (JT) Modified on 08/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 8/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/5/98 ) to Extend Time to complete production of documents [to September 28, 1998] and the time of discovery [to November 9, 1998]. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT) Modified on 08/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents . (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiffs' joint request for production of documents, granting [49-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink.) Copy to parties. (CDC) Modified on 08/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service : 6/4/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to discovery requests [until July 7, 1998.] Response due: 6/22/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: consideration of defendant's motion for partial dismissal shall be suspended pending further order from the court. The parties are directed to file all future papers using a single caption reflecting all five cases. (95-525, 96-584, 96-494, 96-811, 96-590). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by COAST-TO-COAST re: [46-1] joint preliminary status rpt (re: 96-811) [95-525, 96-584, 96-494, 96-811, 96-590]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/10/98 (JT) Modified on 05/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT filed (by leave of the judge) [in this, 96-584C, 96-494C, 96-811C and 96-590C]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER allowing the joint preliminary status report to be filed by leave of the judge; directing parties to complete discovery by 9/22/98; and plaintiff to file a supplement to the joint preliminary status report by 4/10/98 (in this, 96-584C, 96-494C, 96-811C and 96-590C). ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (in this, 96-584C, 96-494C, 96-811C and 96-590C) granting [43-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 3/6/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST, et al. (Service : 2/25/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report (to March 6, 1998) filed [by leave of the judge] (in this, 96-584C, 96-494C, 96-811C and 96-590C). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER allowing the filing of defendant's motion for enlargement of time; and granting [41-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report reset date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/25/98 (in this, 96-584C, 96-494C, 96-811C and 96-590C). ( signed by Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998, Terminated: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 2/13/98 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report (to February 25, 1998) filed [by leave of the judge] (in this, 96-494C, 96-584C, 96-590C and 96-811C). Response due: 9/23/94 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 1/22/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/13/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER reassigning this, 96-584C, 96-494C, 96-811C and 96-590C to Judge Bruggink. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to all parties. parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** See 96-590 C for Motion for entry of supplemental case management order, etc. *** (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/96) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. to [31-2] counterclaim by USA. Service: 7/8/96. JPSR due 8/26/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER mooting [28-1] motion For reconsideration of [26-2] order under Rule 83.2 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. Service: 6/17/96 ( Answer to counterclaim due 7/10/96 ). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 6/17/96) to [28-1] motion For reconsideration of [26-2] order under Rule 83.2. Reply due: 7/1/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Response to [28-1] motion For reconsideration of [26-2] order under Rule 83.2 reset to 9/9/99 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 6/14/96 ) For reconsideration of [26-2] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER reset Answer deadline to 6/17/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COAST-TO-COAST (Service BY HAND: 6/11/96) for Leave to File motion to compel defendant to answer complaint . Response due: 6/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 6/7/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/7/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/24/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [22-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and reset Answer deadline to 6/10/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Service: 5/22/96 By hand) to [22-1] motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Reply due: 6/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996, Terminated: 5/24/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA ( Service : 5/20/96 ) to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (to July 8, 1996). Response due: 6/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and to file a joint status report reset Answer deadline to 5/20/96 ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996, Terminated: 5/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and to file a joint status report , (until May 20, 1996). Response due: 5/17/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action(signed by Sr. Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, UBH, INC. (Answer due 5/6/96) amending [1-1] complaint. Service BY HAND: 3/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: 3/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and anticipated amended complaint, set Amended [complaint] Pleadings deadline to 3/22/96 and reset Answer deadline to 5/6/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996, Terminated: 3/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/1/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint and anticipated amended complaint (to 45 days after the Court files plaintiffs' amended complaint) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER returning defendant's motion for reconsideration [untimely] and plaintiff's opposition [mooted], denying [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar and denying [4-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and for parties to file a joint status report, reset Answer deadline to 3/1/96 and reset Status Report deadline to 3/1/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996, Terminated: 2/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/29/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and for parties to file a joint status report (to March 1, 1996). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER returning plaintiff's response to defendant's reply to its opposition to defendant's motion for stay [no provision and no motion for leave to file] (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar. Service: 12/7/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER reset Answer deadline to 1/31/96 and set joint Status Report deadline to 1/31/96 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER set Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 12/5/95 (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 12/1/95) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to stay until 12/7/95 Response due: (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to stay . Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/29/95 for [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995, Terminated: 11/20/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/30/95) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to stay until 11/29/95 filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/16/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/26/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COAST-TO-COAST, COAST PARTNERS, SUPERIOR BANK FSB, and UBH, INC. (Service: 10/19/95 ) to [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar. Reply due: 11/2/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995, Terminated: 2/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/6/95) to Stay pending decision in Winstar or to Extend Time to respond to complaint [60 days from denial of motion]. Response due: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Sinclair Groat Service : 8/28/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39865. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?