SOUTHERN NATIONAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00526-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

BB&T Corporation BB&T Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
No Logo Southern National Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Carl Garbow +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 melvin_garbow@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 9/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 138 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day.. (vro, )
    LREF
    Blank 139 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER vacating paragraph 6 of the order of 6/25/03 and the order of 9/22/03 and set Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jat, )
      LREF
      Blank 137 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law on Liability by USA. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 136 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Witness List
        Witness List by USA. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 135 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Response to Motion
          OPPOSITION to [127] Pltfs' MOTION for Leave to File to Introduce Deposition Testimony in the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial filed by USA. Reply due by 10/7/2003. Service: 9/23/03.(jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 134 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
            ORDER granting [131] Dft's Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial. Service beyond 100 miles from the place of travel for the persons listed below to testify at trial on the time and place indicated is hereby authorized: Robert J. Cohrs, Tucker, GA; John Laurence Sykes, Virginia Beach, VA; Jonathon I. Arnold, Chicago, IL; Steven Joseph Davis, Chicago, IL; and H. Ray Davis, Greenville, SC. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 133 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [132] Plts' Motion to Correct Certificates of Service. The Certificates of Service attached hereto reflecting the correct date of service on dft shall be substituted for those attached to the documents filed on September 16, 2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 132 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003, Terminated: 9/22/2003 Terminated:
                MOTION to Correct Certificates of Service for [129] Pltfs' Exhibit List, [130] Pltfs' Witness List, [127] Pltfs' MOTION for Leave to Introduce Deposition Testimony in the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial, and [128] Pltfs' Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION.Service: 9/16/03 by hand. Response due by 9/30/2003. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 131 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003, Terminated: 9/22/2003 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Authorization of Service of Subpoena More Than 100 Miles From the Place of Trial by USA.Service: 9/16/03. Response due by 10/3/2003. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 130 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Witness List
                    Witness List for the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 129 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Exhibit
                      Exhibit List for the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 128 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                        Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 127 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Leave to Introduce Deposition Testimony in the Liability Phase of the Bifurcated Trial by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION.Service: 9/15/03 by hand. Response due by 10/29/2003. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 126 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                            ORDER: [116] Pltfs' Motion to Correct Factual Errors in the Court's July 16, 2003 Opinion is granted, insofar as the attached revised pages 2,3, and 22 shall be substituted for those pages of the original opinion filed on July 16, 2003, as set forth below: 1) The two references to "December 15, 1993," as the date of First Federal's conversion from a mutual to an equity institution appearing on pages 3 and 22 shall be changed to "December 15, 1983." 2) The word "failing" shall be deleted, but only insofar as the word appears twice on page 2. 3) The text of footnote 3, appearing on page 3, shall be replaced with: (See order for details). Pltf's' motion otherwise is denied. [115] Dft's Motion for Reconsideration as to pltfs' replacement capital calculation is denied. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 125 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE to [116] Pltfs' MOTION to Correct Factual Errors in the [113] Court's July 16, 2003 Published Opinion, filed by USA. Reply due by 8/22/2003. Service: 8/8/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 124 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                ORDER: 1) [111] Pltfs' Motion is granted insofar as by 8/31/03, they may contact and interview no more than six of the individuals listed in pltfs' motion filed 3/21/03. If pltfs decide to add any of these people to their witness list, they must notify dft by 9/4/03, and dft shall make every effort to take any deposition, if requested, by 9/10/03. Pltfs' motion is otherwise denied. 2) Paragraph 3 of the order entered on 6/25/03, is modified insofar as the meeting of counsel shall be held by 9/12/03. 3) Paragraph 4 of the order entered on 6/25/03, is modified only insofar as pltfs' pretrial filings shall be made by 9/15/03. Dft's pretrial filings shall be made by 9/23/03. 4) Paragraph 5 of the order entered on 6/25/03, is modified insofar as the pretrial conference shall be held at 2:00 pm on Friday, 9/26/03. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 123 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                  OUT OF TIME OPPOSITION to [115] Dft's MOTION for Reconsideration of the [113] Court's Damages Decision Regarding Pltfs' Cost of Replacement Capital Claim filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 8/20/2003. Service: 8/6/03.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 122 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [121] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Pltf's Out of Time Opposition to Dft's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Damages Decision Regarding Pltfs' Cost of Replacement Capital Claim and said document is filed this date. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Pltfs' Pretrial Brief due by 9/15/2003. Dft's Pretrial Brief due by 9/23/2003. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                        Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 121 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003, Terminated: 8/7/2003 Terminated:
                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Response Out of Time to Dft's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Damages Decision by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION.Service: 8/6/03. Response due by 8/25/2003. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 120 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Pltfs on July 29, 2003, having filed Pltfs' Motion to Correct Factual Errors in the Court's July 16, 2003 Opinion. Pursuant to RCFC 7.1(a), dft shall Respond by 8/8/2003. The court will rule without a reply. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 119 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Response
                                              RESPONSE to [118] Pltfs' Claim That We Failed to File a Timely Opposition to the Pltfs' Motion to Reopen Fact Discovery filed by USA. Service: 8/5/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 118 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY in Support of [111] Pltfs' MOTION for Limited Additional Fact Discovery filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. Service: 8/1/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Pursuant to RCFC 7.1(a), Pltfs shall file their Response to dft's motion for reconsideration of the Court's damages decision regarding Pltfs' cost of replacement claim by 8/4/2003. The court will rule without a reply. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003, Terminated: 8/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION to Correct Factual Errors in [113] the Court's July 16, 2003 Published Opinion by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION.Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration of the [113] Court's Damages Published Decision Regarding Pltfs' Cost of Replacement Claim by USA.Service: 7/28/03 by hand. Response due by 8/11/2003. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Response to Motion
                                                        OPPOSITION to [111] Pltf's MOTION for Limited Additional Fact Discovery, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume filed by USA. Reply due by 8/11/2003. Service: 7/28/03.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION: Accordingly, based on the foregoing, IT IS ORDERED, as follows: 1) [81] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted with respect to Mr. Stokes's reliance calculation, lost profits model, and wounded bank claims for increased doposit costs and compensation for management time. 2) [81] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment is denied with respect to Dr. Kormendi's Monte Carlo model for measuring lost value and his analysis of the cost of replacement capital and with respect to mr. Stokes's wounded bank claims for loan securitization costs and losses generated by the forced sale of real estate. 3) [85] Pltf's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. 4) [95] Dft's MOTION in Limine is granted in part, insofar as the court did not consider the disputed items when ruling on the cross-motons. Dft's motion in limine is denied in part without prejudice to renewal at trial, insofar as dft may object at trial that the documents constitute unseasonable amendments to pltfs' expert reports. 5) Pltf's motion in limine is denied without prejudice to renewal at trial. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Response
                                                            RESPONSE to [109] Pltfs' Notice of New Authority: Citizens Financial filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/14/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003, Terminated: 8/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Limited Additional Fact Discovery by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION.Service: 7/11/03. Response due by 7/28/2003. [Document was delivered by hand, which was missed during docketing. The response date should have been 7/25/03.](jcp, ) Modified on 8/14/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [109] Pltf's Motion to Notify the Court of New Authority: Citizens Financial. Because this is a brief, not a notification, dft may respond. Dft may file a response not to exceed three (3) pages by 7/14/03. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Dft's Response not to exceed three (3) pages due by 7/14/2003, per Order of 7/9/03. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003, Terminated: 7/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION to Notify the Court of New Authority: Citizens Financial by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION.Service: 7/8/03 by hand. Response due by 7/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: 1) denying [98] Plaintiff's Motion to Contact Potential Trial Witnesses and to Conduct Voluntary, Confidential Interviews Outside the Presence of Counsel for the Defendant. 2) Paragraph 2 of the order entered on 12/13/02, is modified insofar as trial on liability shall commence at 10:00 am on Wednesday, 10/1/03, and conclude on Friday, 10/10/03. 3) The meeting of counsel called for by paragraph 13 of Appendix A shall be held by 8/22/03. 4) Plaintiff's pretrial filings called for by paragraphs 14-16 of Appendix A shall be made by 8/29/03. Defendant's filings called for by paragrahps 14-16 of Appendix A shall be made by 9/17/03. 5) The pretrial conference shall be held at 2:00 pm on Wednesday, 9/24/03, in the Howard T. Markey National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 19, 2003 before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for Wednesday, 9/24/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Trial on liability set for 10/1/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's filings called for by paragraphs 14-16 of Appendix A due by 9/17/2003. Plaintiff's Pretrial Filings due by 8/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003
                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/21/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY in Support re [98] MOTION to contact potential trial witnesses and to conduct voluntary, confidential interviews outside the presence of counsel for the defendant filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. Service: 06/13/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [103] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [98] MOTION to contact potential trial witnesses and to conduct voluntary, confidential interviews outside the presence of counsel for the defendant. Response due by 6/6/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE to [98] MOTION to contact potential trial witnesses and to conduct voluntary, confidential interviews outside the presence of counsel for the defendant filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 6/17/2003. Service: 6/6/03 by hand.(dls, ) FILED UNDER SEAL.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003, Terminated: 6/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [98] MOTION to contact potential trial witnesses and to conduct voluntary, confidential interviews outside the presence of counsel for the defendant (until 6/6/03) filed by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/4/03 by hand. (dls, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [95] MOTION in Limine filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. Service: 6/2/03.(jat, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [95] MOTION in Limine filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 6/2/2003. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service by hand: 5/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [81] Motion for Summary Judgment and [85] Cross Motion: Oral Argument set for 6/19/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [95] MOTION in Limine filed by UNITED STATES. FILED UNDER SEAL Service: 5/23/03 by hand.(vro, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION to contact potential trial witnesses and to conduct voluntary, confidential interviews outside the presence of counsel for the defendant by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA and SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION.Service by hand: 5/21/03. Response due by 6/4/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [95] MOTION in Limine filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION. Reply due by 5/21/2003. Service: 5/20/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's Response due by 5/20/2003; and (2) Defendant's Reply due by 5/23/2003 re: [95] Sur-reply/Motion in limine to exclue the affidavit of Dr. Kormendi, etc. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (hw1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      (SURREPLY and) MOTION in Limine to exclude the affidavit of Dr. Kormendi Offering New Opinions and Other Newly submitted Documents (together with a separate appendix) by The United States. Filed UNDER SEAL.Service: 5/12/03. Response due by 5/29/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Sur-Reply due by 5/10/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [85] Cross Motion filed by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTHERN NATIONAL CORPORATION, filed by leave of the Judge (together with a separate one volume appendix). Service: 4/10/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER denying [82] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lrd)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [88] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (14 pages). Plaintiff's are accorded the same courtsey for their brief Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                (Reply Brief in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment) RESPONSE to Motion re [85] Cross Motion filed by The United States, (together with a separate appendix.) Filed Under Seal. Reply due by 4/14/2003. Service: 3/24/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [87] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Filed UNDER SEAL. Service: 3/24/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003, Terminated: 3/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of combined reply and opposition brief by 14 pages by The United States. Service: 3/24/03. Response due by 4/10/2003. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (dw1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SOUTHERN NATIONAL. Service: 2/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                        Response by SOUTHERN NATIONAL to [80-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 2/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION, with six volumes of appendix, by SOUTHERN NATIONAL (Service: 2/21/03) and RESPONSE to [81-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding damages by USA. Response due: 3/24/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [83-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich For Judge Christine O.C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [85-1] cross motion due 3/24/03 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL (Service: 2/21/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/22/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING (Service : 2/7/03 ) For reconsideration of [71-1] order Joint Status Report due 12/6/02 under Rule 83.2 , (together with a separate appendix). (HW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 7/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/21/03) for Summary Judgment regarding damages (together with two volume separate appendix), FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 2/21/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/21/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [78-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation upon briefs and memoranda (motion for summary judgment) ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/25/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/21/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation upon briefs and memoranda (motion for summary judgment) . Response due: 2/7/03. FILED UNDER SEAL (LTD) Modified on 01/25/2003
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 13, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on damages is due 1/21/03 , and Trial, not to exceed 21 days, set for 10:00 a.m. on 9/22/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Christine O. C. Miller . Copy to parties. (Note: This reassignment was effective as of December 9, 2002). (DS) Modified on 12/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 12/13/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING, USA Service: 12/4/02 (VO)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        PUBLISHED DECISION denying [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability, denying [30-1] motion for Summary Judgment, Joint Status Report due 12/6/02 (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiff's notice of new authority: Coast Fed. Bank v. United States. Service: 11/12/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to notify the Court of New Authority: COAST FED. BANK (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002, Terminated: 10/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL and BRANCH BANKING (Service: 10/23/02) for Leave to notify the Court of New Authority: COAST FED. BANK . Response due: 11/12/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [64-1] motion for Leave to notify the Court of new authority: LaVan and Barron Bancshares. ( signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiffs' Notice of New Authority: La Van and Barron. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/8/02 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER staying Plaintiff's obligation to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Set joint Status Report deadline to 11/25/02. ( signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL (Service: 9/23/02) for Leave to notify the Court of new authority: LaVan and Barron Bancshares . Response due: 10/10/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of New Authority: CASTLE by SOUTHERN NATIONAL and BRANCH BANKING. Service: 9/17/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to Plaintiffs' notice of new authority: First Commerce. Service by hand: 8/14/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [60-1] motion for Leave to notify the court of new authority: First Commerce (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002, Terminated: 8/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL and BRANCH BANKING (Service: 8/2/02) for Leave to notify the court of new authority: First Commerce . Response due: 8/19/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 27, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 6/27/02 for [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability, [30-1] motion for Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING to [54-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 5/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [55-1] memorandum by BRANCH BANKING, SOUTHERN NATIONAL FILED UNDER SEAL. Service by hand: 5/13/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/1/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL Brief regarding liability filed by USA. Service: 5/1/02 FILED UNDER SEAL. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 12, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Parties shall file supplemental briefs by 5/1/02 and Parties Response to Supplemental Briefs deadline to 5/13/02 (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/13/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [50-1] joint motion for a status conference Status Conference set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/12/02 (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002, Terminated: 3/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION for a status conference . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Sarah L. Wilson. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE reassigned to Judge Nancy B. Firestone . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by SOUTHERN NATIONAL to response to [44-1] motion to Strike [43-1] motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 8/10/01) to [44-1] motion to Strike [43-1] motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference by USA. Reply due: 8/21/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [43-1] motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Service by hand: 8/10/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL and BRANCH BANKING (Service: 7/27/01) to Strike [43-1] motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference by USA . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NATIONAL and BRANCH BANKING (Service: 7/27/01) to [43-1] motion for Telephonic Discovery Conference. Reply due: 8/10/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/26/01) for Telephonic Discovery Conference . Response due: 8/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING to response to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Service: 1/22/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [40-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 2/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION, out of time, by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING (Service : 1/22/01 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: reply brief. Response due: 2/20/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (FILED UNDER SEAL) by USA to response to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Service: 1/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 12/26/00 ) to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Reply due: 1/10/01. UNDER SEAL. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 12/26/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 12/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 12/26/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 12/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by SOUTHERN NATIONAL and BRANCH BANKING. Service: 12/19/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING (Service: 12/19/00) to [33-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Reply due: 1/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING (Service : 10/17/00 ) for Summary Judgment on liability , filed togethre with a one volume appendix. Response due: 12/8/00. Filed by leave of the Judge (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING, out of time, (Service : 10/17/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA FILED UNDER SEAL. Service by hand: 10/16/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 10/16/00 ) for Summary Judgment , together with three separate volumes of appendix, FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 11/13/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/25/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set dispositive motions filing deadline to 10/16/00. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Plaintiffs' oral motion to extend the discovery deadline in order to accommodate the deposition of Mr. Futch, granting Plaintiff's oral motion to waive the 30 day limitation on a second deposition for Mark Rundle or in the alternative to extend the discovery deadline to comply with the 30 day limitation, granting in part [23-1] motion to Compel production of tax returns responsive to the Government's first set of requests for production of documents from Plaintiffs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/10/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [23-1] motion to Compel production of tax returns responsive to the Government's first set of requests for production of documents from Plaintiffs. Service: 3/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING (Service: 2/22/00 (by hand)) to [23-1] motion to Compel production of tax returns responsive to the Government's first set of for production of documents from Plaintiffs. Reply due: 3/2/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000, Terminated: 8/9/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/00 ) to Compel production of tax returns responsive to the Government's first set of requests for production of documents from Plaintiffs. Response due: 2/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 13, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 2/14/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference set at 9:00 a.m. on 1/13/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/17/99 (JPSR due 11/4/99). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Paul Gerald Freeborne. Service : 7/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Jay Hoffman. Service : 11/15/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Carlton Erickson III. Service: 7/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Jennifer Hong (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT Service: 5/14/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BRANCH BANKING (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; set joint Status Report deadline to 4/15/96 [90 days]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/5/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by SOUTHERN NATIONAL, BRANCH BANKING Service: 11/21/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to file a status report reset Status Report deadline to 12/5/95 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995, Terminated: 11/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/14/95) to Extend Time to file a status report [to December 5, 1995]. Response due: 12/1/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER entered directing parties to file joint status reports re status of the petition for a writ of certiorari at 90 day intervals with the first Joint Status Report by deadline of 11/21/95 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/19/95) to Stay of proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jennifer Hong Service: 8/21/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39864. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?