TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00527-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KENNETH L. PAAPE, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Randall Gottlieb
Space Daniel D. McClain
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Stephen Gill +1 202 942 3609
No Logo First Union National Bank, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Vincent Dell'Osa +1 215 665 2745
No Logo LEONARD BECKER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by ltsrlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael B. Trister +1 202 328 1666 +1 202 328 9162 mtrister@ltsrlaw.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/12/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 73 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint of plaintiff, FDIC, is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 72 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [66-1] motion to Dismiss and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 71 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Terminated:
        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 7/10/02 ) to [70-1] motion to Withdraw [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER., [69-1] motion to Withdraw [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 70 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
          MOTION by LEONARD BECKER (Service : 6/28/02 ) to Withdraw [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/15/02 (JT) Modified on 07/01/2002
            LREF
            Blank 69 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
            MOTION by FIRST UNION NATL BK. (Service : 6/24/02 ) to Withdraw [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/11/02 (JT) Modified on 07/01/2002
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Deadline updated; Response to [70-1] motion to Withdraw [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER reset to 7/15/02. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Deadline updated; Response to [69-1] motion to Withdraw [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. reset to 7/11/02. (JT) Modified on 07/01/2002
                  LREF
                  Blank 68 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 6/24/02 for LEONARD BECKER and FIRST UNION NATL BK. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 67 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/26/02) to [66-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 5/10/02 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 66 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002, Terminated: 7/10/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by FDIC (Service: 4/12/02) to Dismiss . Response due: 5/13/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 65 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002, Terminated: 2/27/2002 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 2/27/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Robert Joel Soffer for FDIC Added Richard Stephen Gill . (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 64 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                          NOTICE of Dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A) by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC. and KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. Service: 2/21/02 (AB)
                            LREF
                            Blank 63 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 62 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Daniel D. McClain. Service: 6/25/01. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 61 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Craig Randall Gottlieb Service : 10/11/00 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 60 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 59 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery Subject to Extension of Opt-Out Deadline by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. Service: 12/31/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 58 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arlene Pianko Groner. Service : 2/17/98. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 57 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Terminated:
                                        RESPONSE by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR.(Service: 9/17/97) to [56-1] motion to Expedite decision on motion to intervene. Reply due: 9/29/97 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 56 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by LEONARD BECKER (Service : 9/12/97 ) to Expedite decision on motion to intervene. Response due: 9/29/97 (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [51-1] motion for Leave to File a supplemental response to First Union's motion to intervene ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 54 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Terminated:
                                              Supplemental RESPONSE by FDIC to [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. Service: 5/28/97 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 5/1/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. amending [1-1] complaint Service: 4/17/97 (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                  Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/27/97. Fee not required ( Answer due 5/29/97 ). (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997, Terminated: 5/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service: 3/20/97) for Leave to File a supplemental response to First Union's motion to intervene . Response due: 4/7/97 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      REPLY by LEONARD BECKER to response to [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER. Service: 1/30/97 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                        RESPONSE by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR.(Service: 1/21/97 ) to [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER. Reply due: 2/3/97 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to FDIC's response to its motion to intervene, granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to defendant's opposition to its motion to intervene as plaintiff Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/30/97 for [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/30/97 for [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. ( signed by Judge James F. Merow for Chief Judge Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997, Terminated: 1/17/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            MOTION by LEONARD BECKER (Service: 1/9/97) to Extend Time to respond to FDIC's response to its motion to intervene [to January 21, 1997] by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/27/97 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                              MOTION by LEONARD BECKER (Service: 1/7/97) to Extend Time to respond to defendant's opposition to its motion to intervene as plaintiff [to January 21, 1997] by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/21/97 (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [40-1] motion for Leave to File response to motion of Leonard Becker to intervene (signed by Acting Chief Judge James F. Merow for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to intervene of Leonard Becker Response to [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER reset to 1/21/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996
                                                                    Notice of filing amended certificate of service by FDIC. Service: 12/23/96 (FE) Modified on 01/10/1997
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 1/10/1997, Terminated: 1/2/1997 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. (Service: 12/23/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion to intervene of Leonard Becker (to January 21, 1997). (DS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/23/96) to [39-1] motion to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER. Reply due: 1/6/97 (FE) Modified on 01/10/1997
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996, Terminated: 1/15/1997 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 12/23/96) for Leave to File response to motion of Leonard Becker to intervene . Response due: 1/9/97 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                            MOTION (Service : 12/5/96 ) to Intervene by LEONARD BECKER [by leave of the Judge]. Response due: 12/23/96. (HW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 12/10/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              REPLY by FIRST UNION NATL BK. to response to [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. Service: 12/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 1/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion to intervene Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/10/96 for [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: 1/10/1997, Terminated: 12/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST UNION NATL BK. (Service: 12/2/96) to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion to intervene (to December 10, 1996). (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                    RESPONSE by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC. (Service: 11/20/96) to [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. Reply due: 12/5/96 (FE) Modified on 12/06/1996
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/8/96) to [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. Reply due: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Extend Time until 11/21/96 to respond to motion to intervene ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 11/5/1996, Entered: 11/21/1996, Terminated: 11/7/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. (Service: 11/5/96 ) to Extend Time until 11/21/96 to respond to motion to intervene . (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 11/5/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996, Terminated: 7/12/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR.(Service: 11/5/96 ) to [30-1] motion to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. Reply due: 11/18/96 (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION (Service : 10/24/96) to Intervene by FIRST UNION NATL BK. . Response due: 11/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Arthur Gerard Wyatt. Service : 10/4/96 (HW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                  SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Continuing stay to August 26, 1996 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Clarification of its July 10, 1996 Order Staying this case , until August 19, 1996 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996, Terminated: 8/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/7/96 ) for Clarification of its July 10, 1996 Order . Response due: 8/26/96. (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. Service: 8/7/96. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to File correspondence between parties (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC. (Service: 7/22/96) for Leave to File correspondence between parties . Response due: 8/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER set Brief [parties' preliminary report] deadline to 8/9/96 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Alfred Sherwood Irving Jr. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion to adopt specialized case management procedures (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996, Terminated: 5/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to the defendant's motion to adopt specialized case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996, Terminated: 5/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File notice and defendant's response to the Court's March 1, 1996 Order (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and defendant's reponse to the Court's March 1, 1996 Order . Response due: 4/5/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR. Service: 2/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [7-2] order. Service: 2/14/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER Staying proceeding until determination of WINSTAR with answer to be filed within 20 days of the termination of stay. (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by TUCKER ANTHONY, INC., KENNETH L. PAAPE JR.(Service: 10/27/95 ) to [5-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar Reply due: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995, Terminated: 3/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/95) to Stay pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/1/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER outlining special procedures (signed by Judge Diane G. Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Alfred Sherwood Irving Jr. Service : 8/29/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge Diane G. Weinstein. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39863. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 211 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?