AMERICAN RANGER INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00529-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMERICAN RANGER INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colleen Ann Conry
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Morris Dorsey, III +1 202 942 3609
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 6/11/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the claims of American Ranger, Inc. are dismissed, without prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
    SEE NO. 95-523C FOR ORDER granting [27-1] motion to Consolidate. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 Set/Clear Flags
      Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 95-cv-523 for further proceedings. (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Notice of Change of Address
        NOTICE of change of address by Tina Ann Lamoreaux. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
          SEE NO. 95-523C FOR REPLY by FDIC to response to [27-1] motion to Consolidate. Service: 2/5/98 (DS) Modified on 02/04/1999
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response to Motion
            SEE NO. 95-523C FOR RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/26/98) to [27-1] motion to Consolidate (DS) Modified on 02/04/1999
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998, Terminated: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
              SEE NO. 95-523C FOR MOTION by FDIC to Consolidate (DS) Modified on 02/04/1999
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                SEE NO. 95-523C FOR ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Consolidate (95-523C). ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/28/1998 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE by AMERICAN RANGER INC. (Service: 1/26/98 ) to [24-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Consolidate (95-523C). Reply due: 1/26/98 (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998, Terminated: 2/20/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/7/98 ) for Leave to File Motion to Consolidate (95-523C) . Response due: 1/26/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                      Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/25/97. Fee Not Required ( Answer due 5/27/97 ) (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Colleen Ann Conry. Service : 10/4/96. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                          NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996, Terminated: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Status Report
                                    STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN RANGER INC. and USA. Service: 7/11/96. (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                      NOTICE of change of address by Gerald Mark Alexander (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gerald Mark Alexander. Service : 6/25/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER addressing recent ruling in all Winstar related cases and reminding parties that all previously set reporting requirements remain in effect (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Response to Motion
                                            RESPONSE by AMERICAN RANGER INC. (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [11-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management proceduresu. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending U.S. Court of Appeals decision in WINSTAR. The defendant is further ordered to file a status report within five days from the later of the dates indicated in the order, informing the court of the status of the Winstar decision, and proposing dates for future proceedings in this case. (signed by Judge Marian B. Horn) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/27/95 (FE) Modified on 12/05/1995
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER Staying case until November 27, 1995 . The defendant is directed to file a status report within five days from filing of an application for certiorari or within five days from the expiration of the time for appeal . Parties are to file a Joint Status Report by deadline of 11/27/95 ( signed by Judge Marian B. Horn ) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 12/05/1995
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995, Terminated: 11/29/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/29/95 ) to Stay proceedings pending U.S. Court of Appeals decision in WINSTAR . Response due: 10/10/95 (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dean Lawrence Grayson Service : 8/29/95 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of reassignment to Judge Marian B. Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                              NOTICE by AMERICAN RANGER INC. of related case. (95-523 C). (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39861. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?