HEALEY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00530-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT T. HEALEY, Plaintiff
No Logo SECURITY INVESTMENTS GROUP, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Scott Lawlor
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Allen Kuiper +1 202 942 3008
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 4/4/2003
Origin
Reopened 4/4/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 63 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the claims of plaintiffs and plaintiff-intervenor are dismissed without prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 62 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION vacating [60] Judgment of 04/02/03. The Clerk is directed to dismiss plaintiff, Robert T. Healey's, claims without prejudice, and to dismiss plaintiff, Security Investments Group, Inc., without prejudice pursuant to the Court's Order of February 5, 2003, and dismiss plaintiff-intervenor's claims without prejudice and close the case. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 60 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff, Robert T. Healey's claim are dismissed, without prejudice. It is further ordered and adjudged that plaintiff-intervenor's claims are dismissed without prejudice. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 59 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
        UNPUBLISHED ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss plaintiff's claims without prejudice and dismiss plaintiff-intervenor's claims wihtout prejudice and close the case. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 61 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
          MOTION for an order dismissing remaining claims and for entry of judgment, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
            LREF
            Blank 57 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003
            Returned receipt, received this day. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 58 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 56 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re: Pursuant to the 3/5/03, Status Conference, if plaintiff does not respond to the "Order to Show Cause" by 3/21/03, the Court will also dismiss the plaintiff-intervenor's claims and close the case (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 55 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003
                  Order to show cause (filed March 7, 2003), was sent to plaintiff by certified mail, and return receipt requested, this day. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 54 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER resetting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 3/5/03 (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 52 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/24/03) to [51-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Reply due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 53 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [30] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles J. Cooper terminated; and scheduling a status conference on February 28, 2003, at 4:30 pm. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (dls, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Terminated:
                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 2/5/03) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 2/24/03. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 50 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/5/03) for Leave to file response to plaintiffs' status report . Response due: 2/24/03. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 49 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT by ROBERT T. HEALEY and SECURITY INVESTMENTS. Service: 1/31/03. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 48 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying [47-1] motion to Stay (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 47 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003, Terminated: 1/10/2003 Terminated:
                                  RENEWED MOTION by FDIC (Service: 12/9/02) to Stay . Response due: 1/6/03. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 46 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Status Report
                                    STATUS REPORT by ROBERT T. HEALEY. Service: 1/3/03. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 45 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [40-1] motion to hold motion to compel in abeyance (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 44 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER denying [39-1] motion to Stay (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 43 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                          RESPONSE by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS (Service: 12/11/02 ) to [42-1] motion for Leave to notify discovery Judge of Plaintiffs Security Investments Group, Inc. and Robert T. Healey's motion to extend stay of discovery and request for expedited treatment Reply due: 12/23/02 (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 42 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/9/02) for Leave to notify discovery Judge of Plaintiffs Security Investments Group, Inc. and Robert T. Healey's motion to extend stay of discovery and request for expedited treatment . Response due: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 41 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/9/02) to [35-1] motion to Extend Stay of Discovery and [35-2] motion For Expedited treatment. Reply due: 12/23/02. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 40 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by ROBERT T. HEALEY (Service: 12/9/02) to hold motion to compel in abeyance . Response due: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002, Terminated: 12/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service: 12/9/02) to Stay . Response due: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Stay of Discovery (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/7/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of corrected certificate of service by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS. Service: 12/3/02 (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/4/02 (by hand)) to Compel Responses to Interrogatories. Response due: 12/18/02 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002, Terminated: 12/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS (Service : 12/3/02 ) to Extend Stay of Discovery , and For Expedited treatment . Response due: 12/20/02 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            CORRECTED ORDER of 10/7/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER staying proceedings until 11/15/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                REPLY by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS to response to [30-1] motion for Charles J. Cooper to Withdraw as Attorney, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/17/02. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/3/02 ) to [30-1] motion for Charles J. Cooper to Withdraw as Attorney. Reply due: 9/16/02 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS (Service : 8/16/02 ) for Charles J. Cooper to Withdraw as Attorney . Response due: 9/3/02. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff-Intervenor FDIC by USA. Service: 7/8/02. (LTD) Modified on 07/19/2002
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                        ANSWER by USA to Plaintiffs Robert T. Healey and Security Investments Group, Inc. amended complaint. (LTD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by FDIC (Service: 4/9/01) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Bruce Clark Taylor for FDIC Added Gary Allen Kuiper . (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Scott Lawlor. Service : 10/5/00 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Bruce Clark Taylor (HW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS. Service: 12/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Bruce Clark Taylor. (HW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/28/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by ROBERT T. HEALY and SECURITY INVESTMENTS (Answer due 4/28/97 ) addressing the [17-1] intervenor's complaint, and amending the [1-1] complaint. Service: 4/15/97. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                              Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/25/97. Fee Not Required ( Answer due 5/27/97 ) (HW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ernest Leidenheimer Jr. Service : 9/25/96 (HW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Alfred Sherwood Irving Jr. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [9-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER entered Staying proceedings until conclusion WINSTAR case . (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by ROBERT T. HEALEY, SECURITY INVESTMENTS (Service: 10/30/95) to [5-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Reply due: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/27/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/13/95) to Stay proceedings , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/30/95. (HW) Modified on 11/01/1995
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER re special procedures to facilitate discovery, etc. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Alfred Sherwood Irving Jr. Service : 8/24/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39869. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?