CAROLINE HUNT TRUST v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00531-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SPRIGGS & HOLLINGSWORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosemary Stewart +1 202 898 5800 +1 202 682 1639 rstewart@hollingsworthllp.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Michael Dintzer +1 202 307 0282 +1 202 514 8624 kenneth.dintzer@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 3/29/2007
Origin 4
Reopened 3/26/2007
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '05-5141'[], '05-5179'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (418) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 399 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated April 10, 2007, forwarded to Rosemary Stewart. See letter in file. (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank 398 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $12,567,400.00. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank 397 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER directing the clerk to vacate the April 29, 2005 judgment and enter judgment in favor of CHTE in the amount of $12,567,400.00. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lld)
        LREF
        Blank 396 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming in Part/Reversing in Part
        MANDATE of CAFC affirming in part and reversing in part [390] Judgment and remanding case back to U.S. Court of Federal Claims. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 395 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Terminated:
          CAFC Case Number 05-5179 for [393] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 394 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Terminated:
            CAFC Case Number 05-5141 for [392] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 393 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005, Terminated: 3/26/2007 Notice of cross-appeal
              NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Copy to opposing party, judge and to CAFC. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 063195. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 392 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005, Terminated: 3/26/2007 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee not required, appeal filed by the USA. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 391 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                  CERTIFIED TREANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated May 3, 2005, forwarded to Rosemary Stewart. See letter in file. (bre,)
                    LREF
                    Blank 390 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $14,847,100.00. No costs. (lld, ) VACATED PER ORDER OF COURT DATED 3/29/2007 (Reyes, Lisa).
                      LREF
                      Blank 389 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Court Filing
                      PUBLISHED OPINION granting [384] MOTION for Leave to File filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE,[386] MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to the Substantive Arguments in Defendant's 3/28/05 Response filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE, and [387] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Argument about New Authority filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for plaintiff in the sum of $14,847,100.00. No costs. All other motions are moot. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 388 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Response to Motion
                        RESPONSE to [386] MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to the Substantive Arguments in Defendant's 3/28/05 Response, [387] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Argument about New Authority, filed by USA. Reply due by 5/6/2005. Service: 4/22/2005.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 387 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Argument about New Authority, filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Service: 4/8/2005 by hand. Response due by 4/22/2005. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 386 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to the Substantive Arguments in Defendant's 3/28/05 Response, filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Service: 4/8/2005 by hand. Response due by 4/22/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 385 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE to [384] MOTION for Leave to File filed by USA. Reply due by 4/11/2005. Service: 3/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 384 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Leave to File Argument about New Authority filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 3/11/2005. Response due by 3/28/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 3/16/2005 (mb2, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 383 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY in Support of [379] Pltf's Supplemental Argument About Lavan v. United States, filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Service: 11/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 382 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Response to Motion
                                    RESPONSE to [379] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Argument About New Authority filed by USA. Reply due by 10/27/2004. Service: 10/13/04.(dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 381 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY to Pltf's Response to [376] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 10/1/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 380 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [379] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Argument About New Authority. On or before 10/13/2004, dft may file a Response to the argument set forth in Section II of that Moiton. Any Reply by pltf must be filed on or before 11/1/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 379 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004, Terminated: 9/22/2004 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Argument About New Authority by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 9/16/2004. Response due by 10/4/2004. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 378 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Response to Motion
                                            RESPONSE to [376] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Reply due by 10/1/2004. Service: 9/7/2004.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 377 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting [376] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. On or before 9/7/2004, pltf may file a Response to the Analysis in that Motion which may discuss any other recent authority. Any Reply by dft must be filed on or before 10/1/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 376 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004, Terminated: 8/16/2004 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 8/12/2004 by hand. Response due by 8/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 375 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Pursuant to the Court's [373] 5/13/2004 Scheduling Order by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Service: 6/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 374 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL FILING by USA. Service: 6/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 373 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 6/4/2004, the parties may file a supplemental brief. No response or reply will be allowed without leave of court. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 372 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                        ORDER: [368] Dft's Motion, filed 11/20/2003, is GRANTED to the extent that the supplemental authorities, together with the further analysis and correction by counsel in the response and reply are accepted and the transcript of the closing argument at p. 123 shall be deemed corrected to substitute "he" for "we" so as to read "we know he can't value the release." Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 371 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          REPLY to Pltf's Response to [368] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority and Correct the Official Transcript, Includes a CD-ROM filed by USA. Service: 12/9/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 370 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE to [368] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority and Correct the Official Transcript filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Reply due by 12/18/2003. Service: 12/4/03.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 369 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE of Filing by USA of a CD-ROM Version of [360] Dft's Response to Pltf's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, and [359] Dft's Response to Pltf's Post Trial Brief. [CD-ROM ATTACHED TO NOTICE] Service: 12/1/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 368 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003, Terminated: 12/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File supplemental authority and correct the official transcript by USA.Service: 11/20/03. Response due by 12/8/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 367 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 18, 2003 before Judge James F. Merow. (hw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Oral Argument held on November 14, 2003. (lae, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003
                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/15/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 366 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 ERRATA
                                                                        ERRATA SHEET for [349] Pltf's September 26, 2003 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in Support ot Contract Liability and Damages Proven at Trial by Pltf, filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 365 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER: [364] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Errata Sheet for Pltf's Post-Trial Findings of Fact is GRANTED and Pltf's Errata Sheet for Its September 26, 2003 Proposed Findings of Fact in Support of Contract Liability and Damages Proven at Trial by Pltf shall be FILED this day. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 364 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003, Terminated: 11/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Errata Sheet for Pltf's Post-Trial Findings of Fact by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 11/10/03. Response due by 11/28/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 363 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by USA of [347] Dft's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, and [348] Dft's Post Trial Brief on CD-ROM. [CD-ROM ATTACHED TO NOTICE] Service: 10/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 362 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Response
                                                                                RESPONSE to [348] Dft's Post Trial Brief filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Service: 10/24/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 361 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Response
                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to [347] Dft's Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Service: 10/24/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 360 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                    RESPONSE to [243] Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. Service: 10/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 359 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Response
                                                                                      RESPONSE to [350] Pltf's Post Trial Brief filed by USA. Service: 10/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 358 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        CORRECTED CD-ROMS (Exhibits) by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE, USA. (jat, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 357 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [354] Motion for Leave to File corrected CD-ROM. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jat, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 356 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [355] Pltf's Motion for Enlargement of Pages for the Post-Trial Briefs. Both parties may have a maximum of 50 pages for their response briefs to be filed by 10/24/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 355 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003, Terminated: 10/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Parties' Post-Trial Response Briefs by 10 pages and Request for Expedited Consideration by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 10/17/03. Response due by 11/3/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 354 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003, Terminated: 10/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                JOINT MOTION for Leave to File Corrected CD-ROM by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE, USA.Service: 10/15/03 by hand. Response due by 10/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 353 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Remark
                                                                                                  CD-ROM Containing Images of All Admitted Exhibits in This Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 352 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: The [351] Joint Motion for Leave to File a CD-ROM Containing Images of All Admitted Exhibits in This Case is GRANTED and the CD-ROM is FILED this day. [CD ATTACHED TO ORDER] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 351 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003, Terminated: 10/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION for Leave to File a CD-ROM Containig Images of All Admitted Exhibits in This Case by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE, USA.Service: 10/8/03 by hand. Response due by 10/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 350 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                        POST TRIAL BRIEF by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. (hw1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 349 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. (hw1, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 348 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                            POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (hw1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 347 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                              Proposed post-trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by USA. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 346 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings [with cumulative index] held on June 27, 2003 through July 29, 2003 before Judge James F. Merow. Dx. Exhibits: 5, 6, 20, 23, 24, 24A, 26, 38, 40, 46, 51, 59A, 63-65, 66, 68, 71, 73, 75, 81, 83-88, 91, 92, 94, 97, 99, 100, 101, 103, 105-110, 112, 112A, 114-119, 121, 122, 125, 126, 133, 138-140, 148, 149, 151, 152, 152A-H, 153, 155, 157-163, 166, 169, 171, 185, 194, 198, 207, 209, 210, 213, 215, 222, 223, 227, 228, 231, 238, 244, 250, 260, 266, 268, 269, 270, 271, 272, 275, 276, 282, 287, 288, 290, 291, 294, 310, 321, 322, 325, 333, 337, 356, 368D, 372, 379, 387-65, 389-67, 389A, 391-61, 392-76, 396-33, 396A-B, 397-64, 398-64, 398-A, 398-B, 400-73, 403-A, 406, 498-000, 499, 499R-W, 500, 507, 508, 511, 513, 514, 516, 519, 522, 524, 530-534, 565, 566, 570, 573, 575, 576, 577, 580, 581, 583, 600, 629A-B, 634, 653, 654, 656, 657, 660, 665-667, 669-672, 672A, 673A, 674, 674A, 675-677, 687-689, 689-1- 689-7, 690, 690-1- 690-8, 691, 691-1- 691-7, 692, 692-1-692-9, 693, 693-1-693-8, 694, 694-1-694-8, 695, 695-1-695-7, 696, 696-1-696-7, 697-705, 709-722, 725-730, 732, 738, 903-905; Px. Exhibits: 2, 3, 7-9, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 22, 23, 24, 27, 28, 47, 48-50, 54, 69A, 70A, 71A, 72, 73, 74A, 75, 76, 77A, 78A, 79A, 80A, 81A, 82A, 83A, 84-88, 89A, 90-106, 109, 110A, 113, 114, 128, 129, 132, 141, 142, 146, 146A, 148-151, 152A-H, 163, 164, 167, 169, 170, 177, 185, 186, 187, 188, 189, 190, 193, 196, 197, 197A, 203A&F, 205A, 209A, 210A, 211A, 212A, 214-218, 219A, 222A, 223, 224A, 225, 226, 231, 232, 233, 234A-F, 237A-I,240A, 242A, 300-306, 307, 500, 501, 502, 504, 505, 505A, 507, 512, 514, 515, 517, 524, 537, 538, 567, 582, 583, 700; FDIC Exhibits:17, 22, 27, 57, 68, 71, 80, 142, 149, 174, 180, 182, 183,184,189,196, 200, 203, 204, 213, 214, 229, 237, 240, 251, 271, 299, 309, 332, 372 (dw1, ) (Entered: 09/10/2003) Presiding Judge: Merow , James F.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 345 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Joint Exhibit List Admitted Into Evidence by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE, USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 344 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Post Trial Briefs and proposed findings of fact to be filed by 9/26/2003. Response submissions to be filed by 10/24/2003. Reply submissions, if any, to be filed by 10/31/2003. Oral Argument to be held commencing on 11/14/2003 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003
                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/2/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 343 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: That [336] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Dft's Memorandum on the Use of Leading Questions During the Direct Examination of Stuart D. Root, filed on July 8, 2003, is moot and the memorandum on the use of leading questions shall be returned to dft's counsel. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Trial was held from June 27, 2003 until July 29, 2003 (excluding July 4, 28, and weekends) for twenty-one days. (lae, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 342 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [339] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Limit the Testimony of Del H. Kendall to Fact Testimony, and [341] Pltf's Motion as so filed is GRANTED to the extent provided in the cited transcripts and is, otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 341 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Del H. Kendall to Fact Testimony by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 7/21/03 by hand. Response due by 8/7/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 340 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Pltf's Motion to Limit the Testimony of Del H. Kendall to Fact Tetimony filed by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/22/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 339 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003, Terminated: 7/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Limit the Testimony of Del H. Kendall to Fact Testimony, and MOTION for Expedited Consideration by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 7/21/03 by hand. Response due by 8/4/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 338 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial FindingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying, without prejudice to consideration of the matters raised in post-trial submissions [337] Dft's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 337 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003, Terminated: 7/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment Based Upon Partial Findings by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/14/03. Response due by 8/15/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 336 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Dft's Memorandum on the Use of Leading Questions During the Direct Examination of Stuart D. Root by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/9/03 by hand. Response due by 7/23/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 335 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION by all parties. Service: 7/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 334 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 19, 2003 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/21/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Final Pretrial Conference held on June 19, 2003. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 333 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  (FDIC's) Pre-Trial Exhibit List by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE and UNITED STATES. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 330 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Index to Trial Exhibit's by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 6/18/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 329 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [320] MOTION in Limine to preclude trial testimony of Stuart D. Root filed by UNITED STATES, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/18/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 328 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        FINAL AMENDED Exhibit List by UNITED STATES, by leave of the Judge. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 332 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [320] Motion in Limine to Preclude Trial Testimony of Plaintiff's Listed Witness, Stuart D. Root. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 331 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, for good cause shown and pursuant to RCFC 45(b)(2) granting [326] Plaintiff's Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 327 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [53] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [61] Cross Motion, denying [64] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [137] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [148] Cross Motion, denying [203] Cross Motion, denying [241] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 326 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Authorization of Service of Trial Subpoena, 100+ Miles by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 06/16/03. Response due by 7/3/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 325 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to [320] Defendant's MOTION in Limine filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Reply due by 6/30/2003. Service: 06/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 324 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [319] Motion to permit defendant's witness, David E. Bradley, to testify in this case on July 21, 2003. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 323 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 6/27/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 322 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 321 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATIONS by all parties. Service: 6/9/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 320 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to preclude trial testimony of Stuart D. Root, pursuant to this Court's Order of 2/4/03 by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/6/03. Response due by 6/24/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 319 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003, Terminated: 6/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to conduct remote testimony by video teleconference filed by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/4/03. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 318 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [161] Motion in Limine filed by UNITED STATES. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 317 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot [194] Motion to Strike, [196] Motion in Limine, and [208] Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 316 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [162] Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 315 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/14/2003 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [314] Motion for Authorization of Service of Subpoenas. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 314 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003, Terminated: 6/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Authorization of Service of trial subpoenas by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/27/03. Response due by 6/13/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                          *** Attorney John Francis Elmore terminated. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 313 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [309] Motion to substitute Ben E. Barnett as an expert rebuttal witness. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 311 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [309] MOTION to substitute expert rebuttal witness filed by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE. Service: 4/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 310 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re [309] MOTION to substitute expert rebuttal witness filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/9/2003. Service: 4/25/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 312 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response re [305] FDIC's MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) . Service: 4/22/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 309 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003, Terminated: 4/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to substitute expert rebuttal witness by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ESTATE.Service: 4/22/03. Response due by 5/9/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 308 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(a)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [305] Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss - Rule 41(a). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 307 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [305] MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a)filed by The United States.Reply due by 5/2/2003. Service: 4/15/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 306 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 10, 2003 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/12/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Pretrial Conference held on April 10, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Conference held on 4/7/03 at 11:00 a.m.. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 305 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003, Terminated: 4/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) by FDIC.Service: 4/3/03. Response due by 5/5/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 303 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 20, 2003 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 304 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2003 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/21/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow: Oral Argument; Status Conference; and Initial Pretrial Conference were held on 03/20/2003. (Transcript of Proceedings was requested) (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 302 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 3/20/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 301 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [300-1] motion for a status conference (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 300 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003, Terminated: 2/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 1/15/03) for a status conference . Response due: 2/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 299 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by FDIC to response to [296-1] motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Service: 11/22/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 298 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/12/02) to [296-1] motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Reply due: 11/12/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 297 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [296-1] motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 296 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002, Terminated: 11/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/23/02 ) for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (supplemetal authority included) Response due: 11/12/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 295 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/13/02) for Leave to respond to notice of new authority filed by Caroline Hunt Trust Estate. Response due: 9/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 294 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 9/3/02) for Leave to respond to the Motion for Leave to file Notice of New Authority . Response due: 9/20/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 293 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 8/27/02 ) for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Response due: 9/13/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 292 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 8/14/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority . Response due: 9/3/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 291 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [284-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. Service: 8/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 290 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to response to [285-1] cross motion. Service: 8/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 289 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [284-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. Service: 7/29/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 288 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 7/25/02 ) to [284-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority, filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 287 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [286-2] motion for Leave to file response to Defendant's and Plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental authority ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 286 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FDIC (Service: 7/19/02) to Extend Time to file response to Defendant's and Plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental authority until 7/24/02 and for Leave to file response to Defendant's and Plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental authority . Response due: 8/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 285 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION for leave to file other supplemental authority by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 7/12/02) and RESPONSE to [284-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority by USA. Response due: 7/29/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [285-1] cross motion set to 7/29/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 284 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/28/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/15/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 283 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002, Terminated: 4/24/2002 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service : 4/24/02 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Thomas Douglas Luck for FDIC Added John Francis Elmore. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 282 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to response to [280-1] motion to Strike [279-1] motion response by FDIC. Service: 3/14/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 281 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 3/7/02) to [280-1] motion to Strike [279-1] motion response by FDIC. Reply due: 3/21/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 280 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 2/21/02) to Strike [279-1] motion response by FDIC . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 279 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 2/15/02) to [272-1] motion for Leave to file notice of new authority. Reply due: 3/4/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 278 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 2/15/02) to [271-2] motion to Dismiss FDIC. Reply due: 3/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 276 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [275-1] motion for Leave to respond to notice of new authority filed by Plaintiff-Caroline Hunt Trust Estate. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 277 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [271-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 275 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002, Terminated: 2/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/13/02) for Leave to respond to notice of new authority filed by Plaintiff-Caroline Hunt Trust Estate . Response due: 3/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 274 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of new authority by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 273 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [272-1] motion for Leave to file notice of new authority (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 272 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002, Terminated: 2/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 1/31/02) for Leave to file notice of new authority . Response due: 2/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 271 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002, Terminated: 2/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/17/02) for Leave to file supplemental authority and renewed motion to Dismiss FDIC . Response due: 2/4/02 (motion for leave); 2/19/02 (motion to dismiss) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 270 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to [266-2] order. Service: 7/9/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 269 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FDIC to [268-2] order. Service: 7/9/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 268 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [267-1] motion for Leave to reply to FDIC's response to notice of supplemental authority Plaintiff and Plaintiff-Intervenor may reply on 7/9/01 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 267 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001, Terminated: 6/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/18/01) for Leave to reply to FDIC's response to notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 7/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 266 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [265-1] motion for Leave to file reply to plaintiff's response to notice of supplemental authority Plaintiff and intervenor may file reply Brief on to 7/9/01 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 265 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001, Terminated: 6/14/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/13/01) for Leave to file reply to plaintiff's response to notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 7/2/01 (reply contained within motion) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 264 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FDIC to [261-2] order. (Supplemental Authority submitted with Motion for leave 4/27/01). Service: 6/4/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 263 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to [261-2] order. Service by hand: 6/4/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 262 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/14/01) to [260-1] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 5/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 261 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [259-1] motion for Leave to submit notice of supplemental authority Plaintiff and intervenor may file responses by 6/4/01 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 260 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 5/1/01) for a status conference . Response due: 5/18/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 259 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001, Terminated: 5/2/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/27/01) for Leave to submit notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 5/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 258 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth Michael Dintzer Service : 12/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 257 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings REVISED & CORRECTED COPY, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 8, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 256 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [252-1] motion for Leave to file documents. Service: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 255 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [252-1] motion for Leave to file documents. Service: 4/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 254 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 4/7/00 ) to [252-1] motion for Leave to file documents. Reply due: 4/21/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 253 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 4/3/00 ) to [252-1] motion for Leave to file documents. Reply due: 4/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 252 Filed: 3/28/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/28/00) for Leave to file documents . Response due: 4/11/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: oral argument (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, for date of March 8, 2000 . Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Oral Argument re: [137-1] motion for partial summary judgment as to damages. by USA ( Transcript due 4/7/00 ), [64-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST ( Transcript due 4/7/00 ), [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability by FDIC ( Transcript due 4/7/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 250 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [248-1] motion for Leave to File revised versions of response to motion for partial summary judgment and statement of genuine issues. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 249 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [239-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to FDIC's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on selected damage issues. Service: 3/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 248 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000, Terminated: 3/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 3/6/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File revised versions of response to motion for partial summary judgment and statement of genuine issues. Response due: 3/20/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 247 Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to revised submissions of Plaintiff. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 246 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 2/25/00 ) to [241-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract and memorandum of law in support thereof. Reply due: 3/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 245 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 2/24/00 ) to [239-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to FDIC's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on selected damage issues. Reply due: 3/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 244 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 2/15/00 ) to [203-1] cross motion. Reply due: 3/3/00. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 243 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service by hand: 2/15/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 242 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service by hand: 2/15/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 241 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service by hand: 2/15/00) for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract and memorandum of law in support thereof , filed with a (1) one volume appendix of exhibits. Response due: 2/25/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 240 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SURREPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST in support of opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for Summary Judgement. Service by hand: 2/15/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 239 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/11/00) for Leave to file sur-reply to FDIC's "Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on selected damage issues" . Response due: 2/25/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 238 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SURREPLY by FDIC to Defendant's reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 237 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SURREPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST in support of its opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 236 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SURREPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST on damages. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 235 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [106-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to defendant's reply to cross motion for summary judgment, denying [74-1] motion to Strike [70-1] motion response by FDIC and [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA, granting [228-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in support of opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment, granting [102-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply on Defendant's motion to strike the affidavit of Stuart D. Root, granting [172-1] motion for Leave to File Surreply Brief on Damages, dismissing as moot [91-1] motion to Expedite. Oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 3/8/00 for [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability, [64-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract, and [137-1] motion for partial summary judgment as to damages. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 234 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [84-1] motion to Strike the Affidavit of Stuart D. Root; all references to Root Affidavit; and all statements that are premised upon information gleaned from Mr. Root. Set Plaintiff's revised brief, proposed findings and supplementary document of citations deadline to 2/15/00 and set Defendant's and FDIC's response to Plaintiff's revised documents due 2/25/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 232 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING AS MOOT [119-1] motion to enforce the pretrial scheduling order; [103-1] motion to assign a trial judge; [99-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to strike; [98-1] motion to Extend Time within which it must submit its reply in of its motion for continuance, etc.; [85-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment; [78-1] motion to Extend Time to submit brief in support of motion to dismiss; [76-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; [74-1] motion to Strike [70-1] motion response by FDIC and [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA; [42-1] motion for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order; [40-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures; [39-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures; [36-1] motion for initial pretrial conference and scheduling order; [26-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures; [25-1] motion for Partial Modification of Court's [22-1] Protective Order; [20-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration; [8-1] motion to Stay until the time filing a petition for a writ of certiorari to the U.S. Supreme Court expires in Windstar Corp. v. U.S. or the date upon which the Supreme Court either denies the Government's petition for a writ of certiorari or renders its final decision in the case; and [6-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending decision of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in WINSTAR CORP ( signed Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 233 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/22/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/19/99 ) to [228-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in support of opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 11/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 231 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 230 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FDIC to [226-2] order. Service: 10/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 229 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 10/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 228 Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 10/5/99) for Leave to file a surreply in support of opposition to cross-motion for summary judgment . Response due: 10/22/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 227 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: the Order entered on 9/21/99. No. 9 of that Order is corrected as follows: Plaintiff FDIC's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge its Time to File Motions in Limine filed on August 12, 1999 is Denied as Moot. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 226 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot several outstanding motions and set joint status report deadline to 10/6/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 224 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/20/99 ) to [208-1] motion in Limine seeking rulings, prior to the comencement of trial, etc. Reply due: 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 223 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Exhibit list by FDIC. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 222 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [181-1] motion to supplement exhibit list. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 221 Filed: 9/17/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [194-1] motion to strike witnesses from FDIC's and CHTE's respective witness lists. Service: 9/17/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to response to [196-1] motion in limine to exclude testimony by Harry J. Potter. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 218 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [216-1] motion for Leave to File reply to response to motion in limine to exclude testimony by Harry J. Potter. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot [197-1] motion to Extend Time to file motions in limine. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999, Terminated: 9/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 9/9/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File reply to response to motion in limine to exclude testimony by Harry J. Potter. Response due: 9/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [212-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 9/8/99 for [203-1] cross motion. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 215 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [203-1] cross motion. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Service: 9/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [189-1] notice by FDIC. Service: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 212 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999, Terminated: 9/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/3/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment [until September 8, 1999]. Response due: 9/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [198-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the FDIC's requests for admissions. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 210 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 9/2/99 ) to [194-1] motion to strike witnesses from FDIC's and CHTE's respective witness lists. Reply due: 9/17/99 (JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 209 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 9/2/99) to [194-1] motion to strike witnesses from FDIC's and CHTE's respective witness lists. Reply due: 9/16/99. (FE) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 208 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 9/2/99) in Limine seeking rulings, prior to the comencement of trial, etc. . Response due: 9/20/99. (FE) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 207 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/30/99 ) to [196-1] motion in limine to exclude testimony by Harry J. Potter. Reply due: 9/13/99 (JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 206 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 205 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 8/20/99 (Included in same filing as statement of genuine issues) (DS) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 205 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 8/20/99 (Also includes proposed findings) (DS) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 204 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 8/20/99 ) to [203-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 9/7/99 (DS) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 203 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 7/23/99 ) and RESPONSE to [64-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. (3 Separate Volumes of Appendix [Vol. 3 is a cassette tape located in an envelope].(JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 202 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 7/23/99 (JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 201 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 7/23/99 (JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 200 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/20/99. (FE) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 199 Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [185-1] motion to strike Defendant's opposition to CHTE's motion for partial summary judgment as to liability and cross-motion for summary judgment and motion for expedited hearing thereon., denying [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint. The Court vacates the current trial date of 9/7/99. The Court will stay the obligation of Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's liability opposition and cross-motion. This case is assigned to Senior Judge James F. Merow as Trial Judge. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 198 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999, Terminated: 9/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/25/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the FDIC's requests for admissions. Response due: 9/13/99 (JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 197 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/26/1999, Terminated: 9/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FDIC (Service: 8/24/99) to Extend Time to file motions in limine , (until September 3, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 196 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 8/18/99 (by hand)) in limine to exclude testimony by Harry J. Potter. Response due: 9/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 195 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to response to [185-1] motion to strike Defendant's opposition to CHTE's motion for partial summary judgment as to liability and cross-motion for summary judgment and motion for expedited hearing thereon. Service: 8/18/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 194 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999, Terminated: 6/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/18/99 ) to strike witnesses from FDIC's and CHTE's respective witness lists. Response due: 9/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 193 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of Contentions of Law and Fact by USA. Service: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 192 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness list by USA. Service: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 191 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit list by USA. Service: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 190 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/13/99) to Extend Time to submit modified Appendix G filings , (until August 16, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 189 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Proposed Stipulations by FDIC. Service: 8/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 188 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999, Terminated: 9/21/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service : 8/12/99 ) to Extend Time to file motions in limine [until August 25, 1999]. Response due: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 187 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/11/99) to [185-1] motion to strike Defendant's opposition to CHTE's motion for partial summary judgment as to liability and cross-motion for summary judgment and motion for expedited hearing thereon. Reply due: 8/23/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 186 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [184-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the FDIC'S request for admissions by 8/25/99 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999, Terminated: 8/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/6/99) to Extend Time to respond to the FDIC'S request for admissions , (until August 25, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 183 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 8/6/99) to Extend Time to submit it's modified Appendix G filings , (until August 13, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 185 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999, Terminated: 8/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 8/5/99 (by hand)) to strike Defendant's opposition to CHTE's motion for partial summary judgment as to liability and cross-motion for summary judgment and motion for expedited hearing thereon. Response due: 8/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 182 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to response to [172-1] motion for Leave to File Surreply Brief on Damages. Service: 8/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 9/20/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FDIC (Service: 8/2/99) to supplement exhibit list . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999, Terminated: 9/21/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FDIC (Service: 8/2/99) to Extend Time to serve proposed stipulations , (until August 16, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 179 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of Contentions of Fact and Law by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 178 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Contentions of Fact and Law by FDIC. Service: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 177 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by FDIC. Service: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit list by FDIC. Service: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 175 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness list by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 7/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 174 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit list by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 7/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 173 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/23/99 ) to [172-1] motion for Leave to File Surreply Brief on Damages. Reply due: 8/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 7/9/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File Surreply Brief on Damages. Response due: 7/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 171 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by FDIC to response to [148-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 170 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service by hand: 6/18/99) to [161-1] motion in limine to exclude testimony of Arthur W. Leibold, Jr. and R. Dan Brumbaugh, Jr., by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 169 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service by hand: 6/18/99) to [162-1] motion in limine to exclude testimony of Dr. George Gau, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/29/99. (FE) Modified on 06/28/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 220 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION by FDIC (Service : 6/23/99 ) to Extend Time to and including July 7, 1999, the time within which the FDIC must respond to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff FDIC's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Selected Damage Issues and Reply to FDIC's Opposition to Summary Judgment. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 6/4/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motions in limine [until June 18, 1999]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/21/99 (JT) Modified on 06/21/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC to [154-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 6/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 166 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to [154-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 6/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/11/99) to [148-1] cross motion. Reply due: 6/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 6/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 6/3/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion [until June 11, 1999]. Response due: 6/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 162 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999, Terminated: 6/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/25/99 ) in limine to exclude testimony of Dr. George Gau. Response due: 6/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999, Terminated: 6/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/25/99 ) in limine to exclude testimony of Arthur W. Leibold, Jr. and R. Dan Brumbaugh, Jr. Response due: 6/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/24/99 ) to [156-1] motion to Extend Time to file motions in limine. Reply due: 6/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to Plaintiff's response to [137-1] motion for partial summary judgment as to damages. Service: 5/24/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 158 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 5/21/99 ) to [156-1] motion to Extend Time to file motions in limine. Reply due: 6/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/20/99) to Extend Time to file reply to opposition to motion for partial summary judgment as to damages , (until May 24, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/14/99 ) to Extend Time to file motions in limine [until May 25, 1999]. Response due: 6/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [149-1] motion For a continuance regarding modified appendix G procedures, [147-1] motion to Extend Time to submit proposed stipulations. Service: 5/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 154 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED STIPULATIONS by USA. Service: 5/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 153 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/12/99) to [149-1] motion For a Continuance regarding modified appendix G procedures, [147-1] motion to Extend Time to submit proposed stipulations. Reply due: 5/24/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 152 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 5/11/99 ) to [149-1] motion For a Continuance regarding modified appendix G procedures, [147-1] motion to Extend Time to submit proposed stipulations. Reply due: 5/28/99 (motion for clarification of pretrial schedule included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 5/11/99 ) for clarification of pretrial schedule. Response due: 5/28/99 (response to motions included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 149 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/10/99) For a Continuance regarding modified appendix G procedures , (10 days). Response due: 5/27/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC. Service: 5/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC. Service: 5/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION by FDIC ( Service: 5/7/99 ) and RESPONSE to [137-1] motion for partial summary judgment as to damages by USA. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 6/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 147 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 5/10/99) to Extend Time to submit proposed stipulations , (until May 14, 1999). Response due: 5/27/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [148-1] cross motion reset to 6/7/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [143-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment as to damages Response to [137-1] motion for partial summary judgment as to damages reset to 5/10/99 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 5/6/99) to [137-1] motion for partial summary judgment as to damages, filed with an appendix of exhibits in support. Reply due: 5/24/99 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 5/6/99. (FE) Modified on 05/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 5/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999, Terminated: 5/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/4/99) to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment as to damages , (until May 10, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [139-1] motion to Extend Time to serve requests for admissions by 4/13/99 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 4/9/99) to [139-1] motion to Extend Time to serve requests for admissions. Reply due: 4/23/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Trial deadline set on 9/7/99. See Order of 4/8/99 in 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999, Terminated: 4/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/8/99 ) to Extend Time to serve requests for admissions [until April 13, 1999]. Response due: 4/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/5/99 ) for partial summary judgment as to damages. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 5/6/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 04/08/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 4/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Harry Porter's deposition, or any other deposition of an expert in this matter. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [133-1] motion for Leave to Depose two expert witnesses after discovery deadline. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999, Terminated: 2/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/29/99 ) for Leave to Depose two expert witnesses after discovery deadline. Response due: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [125-1] motion to Extend Time within which to submit expert reports Expert Report due: 2/16/99 for USA ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 1/29/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [125-1] motion to Extend Time within which to submit expert reports. Service: 1/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 1/22/99) to [125-1] motion to Extend Time within which to submit expert reports. Reply due: 2/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service by hand: 1/21/99 ) to [125-1] motion to Extend Time within which to submit expert reports. Reply due: 2/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [118-1] motion for expedited treatment, granting [118-2] motion to extend time to conduct expert discovery and complete particular fact discovery. Set fact witness and expert discovery deadline to 2/1/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Defendant filed its response to motion to enforce pretrial schedule on 1/22/98 and plaintiff replied 12/28/98 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999, Terminated: 2/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/5/99 ) to Extend Time within which to submit expert reports , (until 2/15/99). Response due: 1/22/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 12/28/98 ) to [118-2] motion to extend time to conduct expert discovery and complete particular fact discovery, [119-1] motion to enforce the pretrial scheduling order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 1/4/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [118-2] motion to extend time to conduct expert discovery and complete particular fact discovery. Service: 12/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 1/5/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to response to [119-1] motion to enforce the pretrial scheduling order. Service: 12/28/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/22/98 ) to [119-1] motion to enforce the pretrial scheduling order. Reply due: 12/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 12/22/98 ) to [118-2] motion to extend time to conduct expert discovery and complete particular fact discovery. Reply due: 1/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Defendant's response to [119-1] motion to enforce the pretrial scheduling order set to 12/22/98 and Plaintiff's reply to response to motion set to 12/28/98 for [119-1] motion to enforce the pretrial scheduling order. Service of both by facsimile transmission. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 10/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 12/14/98 (by hand) ) to enforce the pretrial scheduling order. Response due: 12/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/14/98 ) for expedited treatment and to extend time to conduct expert discovery and complete particular fact discovery [until February 1, 1999]. Response due: 1/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 12/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [111-1] motion to Strike letter of Stuart D. Root. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Defendant's Response to the FDIC's Motion to Strike, Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply and Sur-Reply Regarding the FDIC's Standing by USA. Service: 10/16/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [111-1] motion to Strike letter of Stuart D. Root. Service: 10/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 10/9/98 (by hand) ) to [111-1] motion to Strike letter of Stuart D. Root. Reply due: 10/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of filing (Brief regarding the FDIC's standing) by USA. Service: 9/24/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998, Terminated: 10/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/98 ) to Strike letter of Stuart D. Root. Response due: 10/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [107-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to defendant's first set of interrogatories and first request for production of documents reset Answer deadline to 9/28/98 (signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/17/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of by FDIC "response to defendant's show cause filing," filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/17/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/14/98 ) to [106-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to defendant's reply to cross motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 9/28/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998, Terminated: 9/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FDIC (Service : 9/11/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to defendant's first set of interrogatories and first request for production of documents , (until September 28, 1998). Response due: 10/13/98 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 2/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FDIC (Service : 8/27/98 ) for Leave to file a sur-reply to defendant's reply to cross motion for summary judgment . Response due: 9/14/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to file supplemental authority with the court by USA. Service: 8/26/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/19/98 ) to [102-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply on Defendant's motion to strike the affidavit of Stuart D. Root. Reply due: 8/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/10/98 ) to assign a trial judge. Response due: 8/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 8/5/98) for Leave to file a surreply on Defendant's motion to strike the affidavit of Stuart D. Root Response due: 8/24/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [85-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/21/98. (HW) Modified on 07/30/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [84-1] motion to Strike the Affidavit of Stuart D. Root; all references to Root Affidavit; and all statements that are premised upon information gleaned from Mr. Root, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/21/98. (HW) Modified on 07/29/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (Filed by leave of the Judge) MOTION by USA (Service: 7/20/98) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to strike until 7/21/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/20/98) to Extend Time within which it must submit its reply in support of its motion for continuance, etc. , filed by leave of the Judge. (HW) Modified on 07/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to the Court's Order to show cause. Service: 7/15/98 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [93-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to strike or exclude from the record the Affidavit of Stuart D. Root Reply to Response to Motion reset to 7/20/98 for [84-1] motion to Strike the Affidavit of Stuart D. Root; all references to Root Affidavit; and all statements that are premised upon information gleaned from Mr. Root. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by USA in response to Security Savings shareholder plaintiffs' "amicus curiae" memorandum and supplemental memorandum re: common issue 11. Service: 6/30/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [88-1] motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Security Savings Shareholder Plaintiffs' Amicus Curiae Memorandum and Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Common Issue 11. Private plaintiff and plaintiff FDIC shall be permitted to file responses, etc. by 7/21/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998, Terminated: 7/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/13/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to strike or exclude from the record the Affidavit of Stuart D. Root [to July 20, 1998]. Response due: 7/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 7/6/98 (by hand) to Expedite. Response due: 7/20/98 (JT) Modified on 07/09/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 7/6/98 (by hand)) to [84-1] motion to Strike the Affidavit of Stuart D. Root; all references to Root Affidavit; and all statements that are premised upon information gleaned from Mr. Root. Reply due: 7/13/98 (JT) Modified on 07/09/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 7/6/98 (by hand)) to [85-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 7/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 7/2/98 ) to [88-1] motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Security Savings Shareholder Plaintiffs' Amicus Curiae Memorandum and Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Common Issue 11. Reply due: 7/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998, Terminated: 7/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/98 (by hand)) for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Security Savings Shareholder Plaintiffs' Amicus Curiae Memorandum and Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Common Issue 11. Response due: 7/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [61-1] cross motion. Service: 6/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 7/1/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to response to [74-1] motion to Strike [70-1] motion response by FDIC and [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA. Service: 6/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/19/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment. Response due: 7/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998, Terminated: 2/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/19/98 ) to Strike the Affidavit of Stuart D. Root; all references to Root Affidavit; and all statements that are premised upon information gleaned from Mr. Root. Response due: 7/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/19/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 6/16/98 ) to [74-1] motion to Strike [70-1] motion response by FDIC and [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA. Reply due: 6/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by USA re: standing issues. Service: 6/5/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [75-1] motion for Leave to File Copies of Briefs re: Standing Issues. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Service: 6/11/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service BY HAND: 6/11/98 ) to [75-1] motion for Leave to File Copies of Briefs re: Standing Issues. Reply due: 6/22/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 6/9/98 ) to Extend Time to submit brief in support of motion to dismiss [to June 11, 1998]. Response due: 6/26/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC to [69-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 6/5/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [to June 19, 1998]. Response due: 6/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998, Terminated: 6/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/5/98 ) for Leave to File Copies of Briefs re: Standing Issues. (Briefs included) Response due: 6/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 6/2/98 ) to Strike [70-1] motion response by FDIC and [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA. Response due: 6/16/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; response to [74-1] motion to Strike [70-1] motion response by FDIC and [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA reset to 6/16/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 5/26/98 (by hand) ) to [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Reply due: 6/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by FDIC re: Common Issue 11 Reply Brief. Service: 5/26/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC. UNDER SEAL. Service: 5/11/98. (HW) Modified on 05/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/11/98 ) to [64-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract, [63-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Reply due: 5/26/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          120 day response by USA re: [64-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract. Service: 5/11/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/13/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC. Service: 5/11/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 05/13/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/13/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 5/11/98 ) to [61-1] cross motion. Reply due: 5/28/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 05/13/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by FDIC to response to [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability. Service: 5/11/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 05/13/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/16/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service by hand: 4/16/98 ) for Summary Judgment on liability for breach of contract [with separate appendix.] Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/14/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/21/98 ) to Dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Response due: 5/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/23/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by FDIC re: Common Issue 11 brief. Service: 4/21/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 4/13/98 ) and RESPONSE to [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability by FDIC. Response due: 5/11/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 04/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Service: 4/13/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 04/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/14/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [61-1] cross motion reset to 5/11/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [57-1] motion to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing consisting of response to FDIC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, to the show cause procedure in the Court's Opinion dated 12/22/97 and the Defendant's Cross-Motion. Response to [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability reset to 4/13/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/24/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998, Terminated: 3/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/3/98 ) to Extend Time to make a consolidated filing consisting of response to FDIC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, to the show cause procedure in the Court's Opinion dated 12/22/97 and the Defendant's Cross-Motion [to April 13, 1998]. Response due: 3/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: 2/26/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kathie Ann Whipple Service : 2/25/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Thomas Douglas Luck. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: 1/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/15/98 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Morris Boris Silverstein for FDIC Added Thomas Douglas Luck. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998, Terminated: 6/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SHORT FORM MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/8/98 ) for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability with 5 volumes of exhibits. Response due: 3/9/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 01/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Rosemary Stewart (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/14/97. Fee waived. ( Answer due 5/16/97 ) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM [SURREPLY] by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST re: issues first raised in the FDIC's reply memoranda concerning its otion to intervene and substitute itself as plaintiff by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/15/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [47-1] motion for Leave to File surreply to address issues first raised in the FDIC's reply memoranda concerning its motion to intervene and substitute itself as plaintiff (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997, Terminated: 1/17/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 1/15/97) for Leave to File surreply to address issues first raised in the FDIC's reply memoranda concerning its motion to intervene and substitute itself as plaintiff . Response due: 2/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** See 90-8 C for FDIC's reply to it's motion to intervene.*** (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to FDIC's motion to intervene and substitute itself as plaintiff [motion filed in 90-8C]. Service: 11/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Answer due 10/28/96) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 10/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/1/96 ) to [36-1] motion for initial pretrial conference and scheduling order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/15/96 (FE) Modified on 08/09/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of sending notice to Clerk of the Court by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST in accordance with 7/8/96 order. Service: 7/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 7/3/96) for initial pretrial conference and scheduling order . Response due: 7/22/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to [33-2] order. Service: 6/12//96 (FE) Modified on 06/14/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER further Clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [32-1] motion for Leave to File status report and status report and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of compliance in accordance with Order May 10, 1996 by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 5/17/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Leave to File opposition to government's motions re: special case management procedures ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996, Terminated: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service : 5/7/96 ) for Leave to File opposition to government's motions re: special case management procedures . Response due: 5/24/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/8/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [25-1] motion for Partial Modification of Court's [22-1] Protective Order . Service: 5/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST (Service: 4/26/96) to [25-1] motion for Partial Modification of Court's [22-1] Protective Order. Reply due: 5/10/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 4/18/96) for Partial Modification of Court's [22-1] Protective Order . Response due: 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [25-1] motion for Partial Modification of Court's [22-1] Protective Order set to 5/6/96 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/3/96 ) for Leave to File letter from defendant's counsel to plaintiff's counsel dated April 1, 1996 . Response due: 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [16-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to [16-1] order. Service: 2/8/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing parties to review the proposed protective order and contact court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER the court will consider issuing a protective order and invite comment from the parties on this point ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [12-1] order Service: 11/29/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 11/27/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER entered directing parties to notify court by 11/30/95 re WINSTAR 90-8C. (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [10-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney David B. Dempsey for CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Added Rosemary Stewart (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995, Terminated: 11/8/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney David B. Dempsey for CAROLINE HUNT TRUST Added Rosemary Stewart . (FE) Modified on 11/09/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing counsel to begin considering how to proceed once Supreme Court enters decision in Winstar case (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 9/20/95) to Stay until the time for filing a petition for a writ of certiorari to the U.S. Supreme Court expires in Windstar Corp. v. U.S. or the date upon which the Supreme Court either denies the Government's petition for a writ of certiorari or renders its final decision in the case Response due: 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: 8/31/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/28/95 ) to Stay proceedings pending decision of the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in WINSTAR CORP . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Stephanie Marie Jackson Service : 8/23/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER entered directing parties to notify court of their intentions ; set Status Report deadline to 8/16/95 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of related cases by CAROLINE HUNT TRUST. Service: COPY TO DEFENDANT. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39859. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?