BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00532-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bluebonnet Savings Bank, Fsb, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bieging Shapiro & Barber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Thomas Bieging +1 720 488 0220
No Logo CFSB CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bieging Shapiro & Barber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Thomas Bieging +1 720 488 0220
No Logo JAMES M. FAIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell Rand Berger +1 202 457 5601 +1 202 457 6315 mitchell.berger@squirepb.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Marie Hosford +1 202 616 0332 +1 202 305 7643 elizabeth.hosford@usdoj.gov
No Logo CARL C CARL C. ICAHN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Richard Karan +1 212 626 8000
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 8/16/2005
Origin
Reopened 11/27/2001
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '06-5016'[], '06-5024'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (395) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 363 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [350] Published Opinion/Order.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 362 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 06-5024 for [361] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION,, JAMES M. FAIL. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 361 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2006 Notice of cross-appeal
      NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to [351] Judgment, filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL. Filing fee $255 and receipt number 063921. (dw1)
        LREF
        Blank 360 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Terminated:
        CAFC Case Number 06-5016 for [300] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 359 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2006 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 357 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
            ORDER finding as moot [355] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 358 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
              ORDER denying [354] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 356 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to [355] MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, filed by USA. Reply due by 9/19/2005. Service: 9/7/2005.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 355 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. Service: 9/6/2005. Response due by 9/23/2005. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 354 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005, Terminated: 9/7/2005 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [350] Published Order/Opinion, filed by USA. Service: 8/30/2005. Response due by 9/16/2005. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 353 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005
                      REPLACEMENT CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated August 18, 2005, in favor of plaintiff, James M. Fail, forwarded to Mitchell Rand Berger. See letter in file. (bre,)
                        LREF
                        Blank 352 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Marie Hosford for USA. Service: 8/18/2005.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 351 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005
                          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff James M. Fail recover of and from the United States the sum of $96,798,842.00. No costs. (lld, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 350 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Court Filing
                            PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff, James M. Fail in the amount of $96,798,842.00. No costs. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 349 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Post-Trial BriefCourt Filing
                              POST TRIAL RESPONSE BRIEF by USA, w/appendix in support. [by leave of the Judge]Service: 5/23/05.(dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 348 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Post-Trial BriefCourt Filing
                                POST HEARING REPLY BRIEF by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL, w/supplemental appendix in support. [by leave of the Judge]Service by hand: 5/23/05.(dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 347 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Post-Trial Brief
                                  POST HEARING BRIEF (with two separate appendices, filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/2/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 346 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Post-Trial Brief
                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF (with a separate appendix), filed by USA. Service: 5/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Transcript
                                      Cumulative Index (Pg 1-20), Plaintiffs Exhibits: 290A, 3000, 3005, 3014, 3024- 3034, 3045, 3046, 3091, 3102, 3126, 3164, 4000-4092, 4096, 4300-4315, 4318, 4330, 4335-4338, 4347-4350, 4353, 4379, 4381, 4383, 4384, 4402, 4407, 4411, 5006-5008, 5010, 5012, 5023, 5024, 5026, 5027, 6000, 6001-6007, 6009 Defendants Exhibits: 5370-5373, 5503, 5504, 5506, 5510, 5512, 5523, 5531, 5532, 5537, 5538, 6000, 6001-6060, 6062, 7000-7027, 8000. (eph, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 345 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Michael Dintzer for USA. Service: 3/22/05.(dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/1/2005. (vp1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 344 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            POST-TRIAL ORDER:Post Trial Brief, not to exceed forty (40) pages, due 5/2/2005. Post Trial Response Brief, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, due 5/23/2005. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Transcript
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/1/05 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (eph, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/28/05 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (eph, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/25/05 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (eph, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/24/05 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (eph, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/23/05 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (eph, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 343 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 342 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Status Report
                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA. (jat, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 341 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [340] Joint Proposal to Reschedule Hearing. The court shall hold a hearing with resepect to pltf's entitlement to damages. The hearing will begin on Tuesday, 2/22/2005 at 10:00 am and continue through Tuesday, 3/1/2005. The hearing will take place at the National Courts Building. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than Wednesday, 12/8/2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/8/2004. Hearing set for 2/22/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 340 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004, Terminated: 11/30/2004 Terminated:
                                                                JOINT PROPOSAL to Reschedule Hearing until 2/22/2005, by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA.Service: 11/22/2004. Response due by 12/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 339 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Order Cancelling Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Hearing: Pursuant to the telephonic conference held on 11/8/2004, the hearing in this case scheduled for 12/13/2004 through 12/20/2004, is hereby CANCELED. The parties are directed to consult with each other and propose to the court by Monday, 11/22/2004, an alternate date for the hearing. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 338 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. Service: 11/5/2004.(dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 337 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL. Service by hand: 11/5/2004.(dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 336 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/23/2004 before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 335 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The court shall hold a hearing with respect to pltfs' entitlement to damages. The Hearing will begin on Monday, 12/13/2004 at 10:00 AM and continue through Monday, 12/20/2004 in National Courts Building before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. The parties shall simultaneously file their Appendix A Contentions of Law and Fact on Friday, 11/5/2004. The parties' respective pleadings shall not exceed fifty (50) pages in their entirety. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/28/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 334 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER allowing [333] Dft's Motion for Assignment of a Court Reporter. The telephonic status conf. scheduled for Thursday, 9/23/2004, at 2:30 pm, shall be held on the record. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 333 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Assignment of a Court Reporter for the Status Conference Scheduled for 9/23/2004 at 2:30 pm, by USA.Service: 9/17/2004. Response due by 10/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 332 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  CONFERENCE ORDER: A telephonic Conference shall be held on Thursday, 9/23/2004 02:30 PM before Judge Bohdan A. Futey. The conference will be held in chambers and the court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 331 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
                                                                                    REPLY in Support of [329] Pltfs' MOTION for Leave to File Submit Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CARL C CARL C. ICAHN, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 8/25/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 330 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE to [329] Pltfs' MOTION for Leave to Submit Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Reply due by 9/7/2004. Service: 8/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 329 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Submit Notice of Supplemental Authority by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL.Service: 8/9/2004. Response due by 8/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 328 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 8/06/04.(vro, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 327 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: [321] Dft's Motion for Leave to Initiate Fact Discovery and Serve its First Set of Supplemental Interrogatories is DENIED. Dft's motion to strike is DENIED. The filing of the JSR due Tuesday, 7/14/2004, is hereby postponed. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by Friday, 8/6/2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 326 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              REPLY in Support of [321] Dft's MOTION for Leave to Initiate Fact Discovery and to Serve First Set of Supplemental Interrogatories, filed by USA. Service: 7/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 325 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [323] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [321] MOTION for Leave to Initiate Fact Discovery and Serve it's First Set of Supplemental Interrogatories. Reply due by 7/2/2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 324 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [323] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [321] MOTION for Leave to File,until July 2, 2004, filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Reply due by 7/1/2004. Service: 6/17/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 323 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004, Terminated: 6/17/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [321] MOTION for Leave to initiate fact discovery and to serve our first set of supplemental interrogatories, (until July 2, 2004), by USA.Service: 6/16/04. Response due by 7/6/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 322 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [321] Dft's MOTION for Leave to Initiate Fact Discovery and Serve its First Set of Supplemental Interrogatories, filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., JAMES M. FAIL. Reply due by 6/23/2004. Service: 6/14/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 321 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 7/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Initiate Fact Discovery and Serve its First Set of Supplemental Interrogatories, by USA.Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 320 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING of Corrected Copies of Exhibit D.2 and Exhibit F.2 to the Opening Report of Professor Charles W. Calomiris by all plaintiffs. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 5/14/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 319 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF EXPERT REBUTTAL REPORT of Professor Charles W. Calomiris filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 318 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                              SUBMISSION OF REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS filed by USA. Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 317 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORT of Professor Charles W. Calomiris filed by all plaintiffs. Service: 04/19/2004 by hand.(lld, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 316 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                  SUBMISSION OF EXPERT REPORTS filed by USA. Service: 4/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 315 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER returning unfiled for correction of defects plaintiffs and defendant's Expert Reports received on 4/7/04. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jat, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 314 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the court's order dated 12/17/2003, the parties were directed to "simultaneously file expert reports...by Tuesday, 3/16/2004..." As of this date, the court has not received said filings. The parties shall comply by Monday, 4/12/2004, or the court will issue a show cause order why the case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bohdan A. Futey : Telephonic Conference held on 12/17/2003. (lgs)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 313 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 12/17/2003 before Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 312 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Simultaneously file Expert Reports not to exceed 40 pages in length, including exhibits and other documents, by Tuesday, 3/16/2004. Simultaneously file rebuttal reports not to exceed 15 pages in length by Friday, 4/30/2004. File a Joint Status Report by Wednesday, 7/14/2004. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bohdan A. Futey : Telephonic Conference held on 12/17/2003. (mk1, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/22/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 308 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003, Terminated: 8/16/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File to respond to defendant's reply regarding motion for status conference by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL.Service: 12/16/03. Response due by 1/2/2004 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 311 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: [309] Dft's Motion for Assignment of a Court Reporter is hereby ALLOWED. The telephonic status conference is scheduled for Wednesday, 12/17/2003, at 2:30 pm, shall be held on the record. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 310 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Pltfs' Response to [305] Dft's MOTION for Status Conference filed by USA. Service: 12/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/17/2003 02:30 PM before Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 309 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for assignment of a court reporter by USA.Service: 12/12/03. Response due by 12/29/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 307 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is hereby scheduled for Wednesday, 12/17/2003 02:30 PM before Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 306 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [305] Dft's MOTION for Status Conference filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Reply due by 12/15/2003. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 305 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Status Conference by USA.Service: 11/25/03. Response due by 12/12/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 303 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of CAFC vacating [297] Unpublished Decision and remanding case. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                    Appeal record returned from CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 302 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT NOTICE in Preparation for Status Conference by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B., CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA. Service: 10/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 301 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Conference set for 10/16/2003 02:30 PM before Bohdan A. Futey. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          CAFC Case Number Re: [300-1] appeal by USA. CAFC NUMBER: 02-5123. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 300 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002, Terminated: 11/19/2003 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA. Copy to Judge Bohdan A. Futey, BLUEBONNET SAVINGS and to CAFC. Fee not required. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 299 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated March 22, 2002, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 298 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff, James M. Fail, recover of and from the United States the sum of $132,398,200.00. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 297 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  UNPUBLISHED DECISION directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff James M. Fail in the amount of $132,398,200. No costs. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                    Case closed (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Post-trial brief by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, et al. Service: 2/22/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 295 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Plaintiff's response to surreply due 2/28/02 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 294 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/22/02) to [293-1] motion for Leave to file a closing brief in support of their proposed judgment. Reply due: 3/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 293 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION (Service: 2/20/02) for Leave to file a closing brief in support of their proposed judgment . Response due: 3/11/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY filed by USA re: [284-1] proposed judgment of JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 2/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [287-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to plaintiffs proposed judgment. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 290 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS in support of [284-1] proposed judgment of JAMES M. FAIL, CFSB CORPORATION, BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Service: 2/1/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 289 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [287-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to plaintiffs proposed judgment. Service: 2/7/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 288 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS (Service: 2/5/02) to [287-1] motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to plaintiffs proposed judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 287 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002, Terminated: 2/15/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/4/02) for Leave to file a sur-reply to plaintiffs proposed judgment . Response due: 2/21/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 286 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [284-1] response (PROPOSED JUDGMENT) by JAMES M. FAIL, CFSB CORPORATION, BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Service: 1/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 285 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by I. Thomas Bieging (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 284 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED JUDGMENT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES M. FAIL by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, and JAMES M. FAIL pursuant to [283-4] order (filed by leave of the Judge). Service: 1/4/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 282 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 19, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 283 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Plaintiff's Proposed Judgment for payment of Damages due: 1/4/02 , Defendant's response to Proposed Judgment due: 1/18/02 and Reply due: for JAMES M. FAIL, for CFSB CORPORATION, for BLUEBONNET SAVINGS (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 1/25/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 281 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [280-1] motion for assignment of a Court Reporter (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 280 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001, Terminated: 12/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/11/01) for assignment of a Court Reporter . Response due: 12/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 279 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Telephonic Status conference for 2:30 p.m. 12/19/01 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 278 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated November 27, 2001 reversing the [276-1] judgment order (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CAFC Case Number Re: [277-1] appeal by JAMES M. FAIL, CFSB CORPORATION, BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. CAFC NUMBER: 00-5128. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 277 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000, Terminated: 11/27/2001 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Copy to Defendant, Judge Bohdan A. Futey and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 050302. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 276 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is entered in favor of the defendant and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 07/06/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 275 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED DECISION concluding that plaintiffs' proved that their claimed damages were reasonably foreseeable to FHLBB at the time the parties entered the contract. Plaintiffs also proved that the three breaches were a substantial factor in causing these claimed damages. The court, however, holds that plaintiffs failed to prove their alleged damages with reasonable certainty. Therefore, plaintiffs' request for damages must fail. Accordingly, the clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant. No costs. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case closed (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 274 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 273 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing a replacement copy of exhibit 182 (submitted directly to chambers) by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS Service: 12/22/99 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 272 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER set joint Status Report deadline to 1/20/00. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 271 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of December 16, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Closing Arguments held ( Transcript due 12/17/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 270 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [269-1] motion for Leave to Correct response to Plaintiffs' adverse inference briefing. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 269 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999, Terminated: 12/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/3/99 (by hand)) for Leave to Correct response to Plaintiffs' adverse inference briefing. Response due: 12/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 268 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL to [267-1] response, by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/22/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 267 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to plaintiff's "Adverse Inference Briefing" by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 11/18/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 266 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Post-trial brief by USA. Service: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 265 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Service: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 262 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 2 volumes, at Washington, D.C., for the dates of November 1-2, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 264 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [261-1] motion to provide court with complete exhibit. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 263 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set closing argument for 10:00 a.m., 12/16/99. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 261 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999, Terminated: 11/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/8/99 ) to provide court with complete exhibit . Response due: 11/26/99. (HW) Modified on 11/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Closing Arguments set at 10:00 on 12/16/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/3/1999 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Trial Days held ( Transcript due 11/3/99 ) (DS) Modified on 11/04/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 260 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [259-1] report by JAMES M. FAIL, CFSB CORPORATION, BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Service: 10/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 259 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 258 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional days of trial rescheduled to commence at 10:00 a.m. on 11/1/99 through 11/5/99. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 257 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 9/15/99 ) to [256-1] motion for Leave to file status report. Reply due: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 256 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 9/14/99) for Leave to file status report . Response due: 10/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 255 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Defendant's motion for reconsideration and Defendant may substitute expert witness Dean Fischel in place of Professor Miller. Plaintiff shall conduct a deposition of Dean Fischel by 9/24/99. Set two additional days for trial for 10:00 a.m., 10/14/99 and 10/15/99. ; set the parties post-trial briefs brief deadline to 10/29/99 ; set closing argument for 11/10/99 at 10:00 a.m.; and vacated the Order of 7/30/99 requiring the parties to designate exhibits relied upon by Professor Miller.( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 254 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [250-1] motion to admit exhibits relied upon by Professor Merton Miller in CALFED, GLENDALE, and LASALLE. Service: 9/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 8/31/99 ) to [250-1] motion to admit exhibits relied upon by Professor Merton Miller in CALFED, GLENDALE, and LASALLE. Reply due: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 251 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA to admit designations of deposition testimony and the affidavits of Del Threadgill. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 250 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/17/99) to admit exhibits relied upon by Professor Merton Miller in CALFED, GLENDALE, and LASALLE . Response due: 8/31/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 249 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WRITTEN OFFER OF PROOF FOR PROFESSOR MERTON MILLER by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 8/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED DIRECT EXAMINATION OF MERTON H. MILLER by USA. Service: 8/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation of Designated Exhibits Relied Upon By Professor Merton H. Miller by USA. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 24 volumes, taken at Washington, D.C., for the dates of June 21, 1999 through July 28, 1999 Filed together with Cumulative Index and Defendant's Exhibits: 7, 17, 19, 25, 28, 71-73, 127, 130A, 132, 134-135, 139, 156, 162, 164-166, 168, 176-177, 194, 198, 201, 208, 214, 256, 267-268, 273, 276, 287, 291, 295, 307, 331, 343, 358-359, 365-366, 381, 400, 490, 495, 559, 606, 609, 621, 623-626, 626A, 626D, 627A, 628, 646, 660-661, 678, 680, 708, 711-712, 741, 745, 766, 771, 780, 814, 816, 848, 854, 860, 863-864, 868, 876, 880, 883-883, 888, 894, 905, 919-920, 932, 932R, 945A, 1020, 1022-1025, 1028, 1500-1501, 1503-1505, 1508-1512, 2010, 2032, 2040, 2042, 2046-2053, 2069-2070, 2095-2097, 2099, 2102. Plaintiff's Exhibits: 3, 6, 10, 21, 23, 27, 31-32, 34, 36-37, 39-40, 42-56, 58, 64, 68(1-2, 6), 72-75, 78-79, 82-90, 92-94, 96-97, 100, 102-104, 109-112, 116, 119, 125, 128, 132, 137, 139, 143-144, 150-151, 153-154, 159, 162-163, 168, 170-171, 174, 177, 180-181, 188, 190-193, 195, 198, 203-204, 209-210, 214, 221-222, 226, 228, 230, 232, 236-237, 242, 244, 250-253, 260-261, 263, 265-266, 268, 270, 272, 275, 277, 280, 286, 289, 290A(1-9), 290B(1-11), 290C(1-10), 290D(1-11), 290E(1-30), 290F(1-15), 290G(1-8), 290H(1-2), 290I(1-12), 290J(1-4), 290K(1-5), 290L(1-25), 290M(1-14), 290N(1-14), 290O(1-4), 290P(1-28), 290Q(1-12), 290R(1-6), 291-308, 310-3111, 318-319, 322-323, 325, 327, 337-338, 350, 500, 1013, 1020, 1029, 1033, 1035, 1039-1040, 1042-1044. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 246 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [241-1] motion for Leave to Substitute Expert. The parties shall designate portions of Professor Miller's deposition testimony taken in this case to be admitted into evidence, along with an offer of proof and stipulate to the designation of exhibits relied upon by Professor Miller in providing testimony in Glendale, Cal Fed and LaSalle Talman and file these exhibits along with an offer of proof by 8/6/99 ; set the parties post-trial briefs (not exceeding 70 pages) deadline to 9/13/99 ; set Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' argument re: issue of inferences to 9/17/99; set Plaintiffs' reply to 9/22/99 (these briefs shall not exceed 10 pages each); set closing arguments for 10:00 a.m., 9/24/99. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trial held ( Transcript due 8/27/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 245 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [241-1] motion for Leave to Substitute Expert. Service: 7/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 244 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [236-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon partial findings. Service: 7/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 243 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 7/22/99 (by hand)) to [241-1] motion for Leave to Substitute Expert. Reply due: 8/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 241 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999, Terminated: 7/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/21/99 (by hand)) for Leave to Substitute Expert. Response due: 8/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 242 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [234-1] motion to quash trial subpoena. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 240 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999, Terminated: 7/6/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 7/19/99 ) to [236-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon partial findings and proposed findings of fact. Reply due: 8/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 239 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999, Terminated: 7/6/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 7/19/99) to [234-1] motion to quash trial subpoena, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 238 Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: the subpoena of Robert T. Shaw, received July 12, 1999, is returned unfiled. There are no provisions for the filing of this item. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 237 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by USA. Service: 7/12/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/12/99 ) for Summary Judgment upon partial findings . Response due: 8/12/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 235 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [233-1] motion for Leave to supplement amended exhibit list. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999, Terminated: 7/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CARL C ICAHN (Service : 7/6/99 ) to quash trial subpoena. Response due: 7/23/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 233 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999, Terminated: 7/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 7/7/99) for Leave to supplement amended exhibit list , supplement included. Response due: 7/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 232 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST SUPPLEMENT by USA re: second amended exhibit list. Service: 6/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 231 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [227-1] motion for Leave to file second amended exhibit list, granting [229-1] motion for Leave to File first supplement to Defendant's second amended exhibit list. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 230 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Carl C. Ichan's Objection to and Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena, received 6/29/99, is being returned unfiled because the document does not comply with the provisions of Rule 81(d)(1) re: attorney is not a member of the bar. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 229 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/29/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File first supplement to Defendant's second amended exhibit list. Response due: 7/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 6/18/99) to [226-1] motion for partial relief from a trial subpoena. Reply due: 7/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 227 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999, Terminated: 7/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 6/18/99) for Leave to file second amended exhibit list . Response due: 7/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/17/99) for partial relief from a trial subpoena . Response due: 7/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 225 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/17/99) for Leave to file renewed motions in limine , renewed motions included. Response due: 7/6/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 224 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL to [208-1] response by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 223 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [220-1] motion For reconsideration of [213-1] order under Rule 83.2. (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 222 Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER mooting [209-1] motion to Extend Time for the filings of Stipulations and Joint Statement of Issues of Fact and Law. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 221 Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file new authority is moot. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 220 Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999, Terminated: 6/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/99 ) For reconsideration of [213-1] order under Rule 83.2. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 ADR Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR hearing held (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/7/99) to [193-1] motion for Leave to File New Authority, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 218 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/9/99) to [205-1] motion for Leave to file reply to response to memorandum on burden of proof. Reply due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [193-1] motion for Leave to File New Authority (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [205-1] motion for Leave to file reply to response to memorandum on burden of proof by 6/11/99 ( signed by Judge Bohdan Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 215 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [206-1] motion to exclude all fact witnesses from attending the trial (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/9/99) to [204-1] motion to Compel the deposition testimony of defendant's expert witness Kenneth R. Cone. Reply due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [204-1] motion to Compel the deposition testimony of defendant's expert witness Kenneth R. Cone ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 212 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation of Trial Procedure (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 210 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES OF FACT AND LAW (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 209 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION to Extend Time for the filings of Stipulations and Joint Statement of Issues of Fact and Law until 6/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 208 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/10/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [196-1] memorandum by JAMES M. FAIL, CFSB CORPORATION and BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/3/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 207 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL to response to [185-1] motion for Leave to file of deposition and Senate testimony, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/3/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 206 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999, Terminated: 6/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/7/99) to exclude all fact witnesses from attending the trial . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 205 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999, Terminated: 6/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 6/4/99) for Leave to file reply to response to memorandum on burden of proof . Response due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 204 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999, Terminated: 6/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL (Service by hand: 6/4/99) to Compel the deposition testimony of defendant's expert witness Kenneth R. Cone and request for Expedited ruling . Response due: 6/18/99. (FE) Modified on 06/09/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 203 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set ADR Hearing for 9:00 a.m. on 6/10/99 ( signed by ADR Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 202 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER referring case for settlement by ADR; directing parties to submit Appendix G submissions to the ADR Judge by June 7, 1999; and informing parties that Judge Hodges has consented to serve as the ADR Judge. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 201 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Exhibit List by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 200 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [199-1] motion for Leave to Amend Exhibit List. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 199 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999, Terminated: 6/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 6/2/99) for Leave to Amend Exhibit List Response due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to ADR Judge Robert H. Hodges . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 198 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 6/1/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File Defendant's proposed agenda for May 25, 1999 Case Management Conference. (proposed agenda included) Response due: 6/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 197 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER set trial for 10:00 a.m., 6/21/99. Four weeks have been reserved for this trial. Each side shall have up to 80 hours, excluding closing arguments, to present its case. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 196 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL re: burden of proof. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/20/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 195 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 20, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/21/1999 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Oral Argument held ( Transcript due 5/21/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/19/99 ) to [185-1] motion for Leave to file transcripts of deposition and Senate testimony. Reply due: 6/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999, Terminated: 6/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 5/18/99 ) for Leave to File New Authority. Response due: 6/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/17/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file transcripts of deposition and Senate testimony [until May 19, 1999]. Response due: 6/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [190-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial, granting [182-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 190 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/10/1999, Terminated: 5/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/7/99) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial and For Expedited Consideration . Response due: 5/24/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Revised Memorandum of Contentions of fact and law by USA. Service: 4/30/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Witness list by USA. Service: 4/30/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 186 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Exhibit list by USA. Service: 4/30/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 185 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, et al. (Service : 4/30/99 ) for Leave to file transcripts of deposition and Senate testimony . Response due: 5/17/99 (DS) Modified on 05/03/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 184 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit list by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, et al. Service: 4/30/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 183 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness list by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, et al. Service: 4/30/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 182 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, et al. (Service : 4/30/99 ) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial . Response due: 5/17/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 181 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [173-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 4/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 180 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [176-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 4/29/99 for [173-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 4/21/99 (by hand) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 4/21/99 (by hand delivery)) to [173-1] motion for partial summary judgment. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Reply due: 4/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999, Terminated: 4/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/19/99) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until April 29, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [172-1] motion to compel. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 175 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 174 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [172-1] motion to Compel, [172-2] motion to Expedite. Service: 4/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 173 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 4/12/99) for partial Summary Judgment , together with separate two volume appendix, filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/21/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 172 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999, Terminated: 4/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED MOTION by USA (Service : 3/29/99 ) to Compel production of all spreadsheets and computer programs, etc., and to Expedite ruling. Response due: 4/15/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [159-1] motion for Leave to File corrected motion to compel and request for expedited ruling (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER mooting [163-1] motion for Leave to File responses to motions in limine (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT) Modified on 04/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 169 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION and JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 4/5/99) for Leave to file 1) opposition to motion to limit testimony of James M. Fail, and 2) opposition to motion in limine to limit testimony of fact witnesses Response due: 4/22/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 166 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 4/2/99 ) to [149-1] motion to Compel production of documents, [149-2] motion request for expedited ruling. Reply due: 4/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 167 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [125-1] motion for Leave to file transcripts of sworn testimony, denying [139-1] motion in Limine, denying [138-1] motion in Limine, denying [137-1] motion in Limine, denying [136-1] motion in Limine, denying [135-1] motion in Limine, denying [134-1] motion in Limine, denying [133-1] motion in Limine to limit. Defendant's motion to compel and for expedited ruling is premature for a ruling by the court at this time. Defendant's request to depose additional witnesses is allowed. Set Defendant's partial motion for summary judgment refiling deadline to 4/12/99 , set Plaintiff's response deadline to 4/21/99 and set Defendant's reply deadline to 4/26/99. Set oral argument on Defendant's partial motion for summary judgment for 2:00 p.m., 5/20/99. Set Prehearing Submissions (amended Memorandum of Contentions of fact and law, amended witness lists and amended exhibit lists) due: 4/30/99 for USA, for JAMES M. FAIL, for CFSB CORPORATION, for BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Set Pretrial Conference for 4:00 p.m., 5/20/99. Set Trial for 10:00 a.m., 6/21/99. Four weeks have been reserved for this trial. Each side shall have up to 80 hours, excluding closing arguments, to present its case. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/1/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 31, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/21/99. (Plaintiff's response to Defendant's partial motion for summary judgment.) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/1/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/30/99 ) for Leave to File proposed agenda for status conference. (proposed agenda included) Response due: 4/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 3/30/99 ) for Leave to File responses to motions in limine. Response due: 4/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER returning as unfiled Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file corrected copies of Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant's motion to limit testimony of James M. Fail, and Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant's motion in limine to limit testimony of Plaintiffs' fact witnesses because the documents do not comply with the provisions of Rule 82(c) re: binding. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/31/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 3/30/99 ) for Leave to File status conference agenda. Response due: 4/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the plaintiff's three separate documents with cover letter dated March 26, 1999, received March 29, 1999, are being returned UNFILED because the documents do not comply with the provision of Rule 82(c) re: binding ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999, Terminated: 4/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/29/99 ) for Leave to File corrected motion to compel and request for expedited ruling. Response due: 4/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/9/99 ) for Leave to File Correction to its reply to Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on damages and its memorandum of contentions of fact and law. Response due: 3/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL re: [130-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 3/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 3/26/99 (by hand)) to [138-1] motion in Limine to limit testimony of plaintiffs' witnesses. Reply due: 4/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 3/26/99 ) to [135-1] motion in Limine to limit testimony of James M. Fail. Reply due: 4/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 3/26/99 ) to [133-1] motion in Limine to limit testimony of plaintiffs' fact witnesses. Reply due: 4/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/26/99 ) to [139-1] motion in Limine to exclude evidence. Reply due: 4/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 3/24/99 ) to [141-1] motion to determine sufficiency of answers or objections. Reply due: 4/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [150-1] motion to Extend Time to file proposed stipulations and responses. Reset the parties proposed stipulations due 4/8/99 and responses to proposed stipulations due 4/22/99. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/26/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999, Terminated: 3/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 3/22/99 ) to Extend Time to file proposed stipulations and responses [until April 8, 1999 and April 22, 1999]. Response due: 4/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/16/99 ) to Compel production of documents and request for expedited ruling. Response due: 4/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing opposition to motion for leave to file transcripts of sworn testimony by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [142-1] motion for Leave to File a sur-reply to Defendant's reply to Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment., mooting [118-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. Set Plaintiff's sur-reply deadline to 3/26/99 (not more than 12 pages) , set Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/2/99 for Defendant's reply (not more than 4 pages) , set Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motions in limine to 3/26/99 , set Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion in limine to 3/26/99 and set status conference for 2:00 p.m., 3/31/99. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held (no reporter requested) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/11/99 ) for Leave to File Proposed Agenda for the Status Conference. (Proposed Agenda included) Response due: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Status Conference Agenda by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 3/11/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999, Terminated: 3/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 3/11/99 ) for Leave to File a sur-reply to Defendant's reply to Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/99 (by hand)) to determine sufficiency of answers or objections. Response due: 3/24/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 139 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, and JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 3/9/99) in Limine to exclude evidence . Response due: 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 138 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 3/9/99) in Limine to limit testimony of plaintiffs' witnesses . Response due: 3/23/99.(HW) Modified on 03/11/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 137 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/9/99) in Limine to exclude, or in the alternative to limit, the measure of damages by plaintiffs' expert, Roman L. Weil . Response due: 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 136 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 3/9/99) in Limine to exclude, as a matter of law, expert analysis that assumes the enactment of FIRREA in calcuating "But For" damages or establishing a causal relationship between breach and damages . Response due: 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 135 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/9/99 ) in Limine to limit testimony of James M. Fail . Response due: 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/9/99) in Limine to exclude hearsay statements of potential CFSB Capital Partners . Response due: 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/9/99) in Limine to limit testimony of plaintiffs' fact witnesses . Response due: 3/26/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 140 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set telephonic status conference for 2:00 p.m., 3/12/99. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by USA. Service: 3/8/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit list by USA. Service: 3/8/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 3/12/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 3/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 3/4/99 ) for a status conference. Response due: 3/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey . Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [23-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability, denying [28-1] cross motion for summary judgment, motion to dismiss plaintiffs James M. Fail and CFSB Corp., and motion to strike or dismiss subordinated debt claims are denied; findings re binding contractual promises made by the FHLBB and FSLIC to each of plaintiffs James M. Fail, CFSB Corp. (now Stone Capital) and Bluebonnet Savings Bank; that defendant, through FIRREA and its implementing regulations and related agency actions, breached the Capital Plan Forbearance, the Dividend Forbearance, and the FHLBB Sub-Debt Resolution, and that summary judgment on liability for breach of contract is entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendant with respect to the Capital Plan Forbearance, the Dividend Forbearance, and the FHLBB Sub0-Debt Resolution; Lastly, the case is reassigned for all further proceedings, except for requests for clarification of this opinion, to Judge Bohdan A. Futey as trial judge. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 03/03/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [124-1] motion to amend the pretrial scheduling order. The depositions of Merton Miller, Kenneth Cone and Laureen Ryan shall be completed by March 19, 1999. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/03/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999, Terminated: 4/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION (Service by hand: 2/25/99 ) for Leave to file transcripts of sworn testimony . Response due: 3/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999, Terminated: 2/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 2/25/99 ) to amend the pretrial scheduling order. Response due: 3/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA to amend the pre-trial scheduling order. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND LAW by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 2/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit list by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 2/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness list by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 2/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [107-1] motion for Leave to substitute proposed order in support of motion for leave to amend pre-trial scheduling order and to substitute experts., denying as moot [106-1] motion for Leave to amend the pre-trial schedule order and to substitute experts ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/23/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/10/1999 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/10/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 2/5/99 (by hand)) to [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (1 Separate volume of appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/5/99 (per court order) (JT) Modified on 02/25/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: In light of the recent revision to the trial date in this case, all motions, relating to amendments to the trial schedule that were filed prior to the court's announcement of the scheduling change on January 5, 1999 are denied as moot ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: (1) Defendant shall complete its depositions of plaintiffs' experts by 1/22/99; (2) Defendant shall identify its expert witnesses, etc. by 2/1/99; (3) Plaintiffs shall respond to motion for summary judgment by 2/5/99; (4) Parties shall respond to requests for admissions by 2/5/99; (5) Plaintiffs shall complete their depositions by 2/26/99; (6) Plaintiffs shall file their modified Appendix G filings by 2/25/99; (7) Defendant shall reply on summary judgment by 3/5/99; (8) Defendant shall file its modified Appendix G filings by 3/8/99; (9) Any motions in limine shall be filed by 3/9/99; (10) The response to any motions in limine shall be filed by 3/15/99; (11) The parties shall file their proposed stipulations by 3/22/99; and (12) The responses to any proposed stipulations shall be filed by 3/29/99 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA to Withdraw subpoenas and [102-1] motion for Protective Order quashing Plaintiffs' subpoena of expert witnesses by USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA to Amend pre-trial scheduling order . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/22/99 ) to [107-1] motion for Leave to substitute proposed order in support of motion for leave to amend pre-trial scheduling order and to substitute experts., [106-1] motion for Leave to amend the pre-trial schedule order and to substitute experts. Reply due: 2/5/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 1/19/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's proposed amended scheduling order . Response due: 2/8/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [98-1] motion to amend the pre-trial schedule ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [103-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to proposed amended scheduling order Proposed amended pretrial scheduling order to 1/19/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999, Terminated: 2/24/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 12/29/98 ) for Leave to substitute proposed order in support of motion for leave to amend pre-trial scheduling order and to substitute experts. (Order included) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 12/24/98 (by hand)) for Leave to amend the pre-trial schedule order and to substitute experts. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/7/99 (Attached Exhibit A FILED UNDER SEAL) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/17/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/17/98 ) for Summary Judgment on damages, (filed together with three volume appendix). Filed by leave of the Judge. UNDER SEAL. Response due: 1/19/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999, Terminated: 1/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 1/11/99 ) to Extend Time to file response to proposed amended scheduling order , (until January 19, 1999). Response due: 2/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/21/98 ) for Protective Order quashing Plaintiffs' subpoena of expert witnesses. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [98-1] motion to amend the pre-trial schedule. Service: 1/4/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 12/17/98 ) to [98-1] motion to amend the pre-trial schedule. Reply due: 12/31/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [95-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery from witness Robert G. Roe, Jr. Discovery deadline to 1/15/99 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998, Terminated: 1/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/3/98 ) to amend the pre-trial schedule. Response due: 12/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [95-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery from witness Robert G. Roe, Jr.. Service: 12/1/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 11/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 11/20/98 ) to [95-1] motion to Extend Time for discovery from witness Robert G. Roe, Jr. Reply due: 12/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/20/1998, Terminated: 12/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/18/98 ) to Extend Time for discovery from witness Robert G. Roe, Jr. [to January 15, 1999]. Response due: 12/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated Order Governing Expert Discovery by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA. Service: 11/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to [91-1] response by JAMES M. FAIL, CFSB CORPORATION, BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [72-1] motion for Leave to respond to defendant's reply in support of motion for assignment of trial Judge, granting [78-1] motion for Leave to file response to defendant's motion for leave to file supplemental authority and to defendant's reply in support of its motion for leave to respond to certain post-argument briefing. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL to [90-1] memorandum by USA. Service: 10/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL FILING by USA re: [28-1] cross motion by USA. Service: 10/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [86-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental evidence, mooting [85-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental evidence. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Defendant's supplemental filing and Plaintiffs' response thereto, this day by leave of the court. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL to response to [81-1] motion for Protective Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. 1 Separate of Volume of Appendix. Service: 10/14/98 (JT) Modified on 10/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [81-1] motion for Protective Order, in that the deposition testimony of Mr. Fail will be limited to 16 hours and directed to subject matter and materials not covered in prior proceedings involving his testimony. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998, Terminated: 10/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/14/98 ) for Leave to file supplemental evidence in support of cross-motion for summary judgment. Response due: 11/2/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/14/98 ) for Leave to file supplemental evidence in support of cross-motion for partial summary judgement, and in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgement on liability . Response due: 11/2/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 10/7/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/7/98 ) to [81-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 10/26/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/1/98 ) to [78-1] motion for Leave to file response to defendant's motion for leave to file supplemental authority and to defendant's reply in support of its motion for leave to respond to certain post-argument briefing Reply due: 10/16/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Defendant's response to [81-1] motion for Protective Order reset to 10/7/98, [81-2] motion to Expedite consideration of this motion reset to 10/7/98 and Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 10/14/98 for [81-1] motion for Protective Order, reset to 10/14/98 for [81-2] motion to Expedite consideration of this motion. Service by hand delivery. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998, Terminated: 10/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service by hand: 9/29/98 ) for Protective Order and to Expedite consideration of this motion , filed together with separate one volume appendix. Response due: 10/13/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 9/24/98 ) to Withdraw [79-1] motion for an order pursuant to 26 USC 7216 requiring Deloitte & Touche, USA LLP to produce documents. Response due: 10/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to [80-1] motion to Withdraw [79-1] motion for an order pursuant to 26 USC 7216 requiring Deloitte & Touche, USA LLP to produce documents reset to 10/13/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/8/97 ) for an order pursuant to 26 USC 7216 requiring Deloitte & Touche, USA LLP to produce documents, by leave of the Judge . Response due: 4/25/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service by hand: 9/17/98 ) for Leave to file response to defendant's motion for leave to file supplemental authority and to defendant's reply in support of its motion for leave to respond to certain post-argument briefing Response due: 9/28/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from David C. Hoffman to David A. Lampen dated 9/11/98 attaching a correct certificate of service to a motion filed September 8, 1998. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/17/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of "stipulated order governing videotaping of depositions" by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA, filed y leave of th Judge. Service: 9/3/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [69-1] motion to Amend the Pre-Trial Schedule. Reset Expert Report due: 8/31/98 for Plaintiffs and 11/13/98 for USA. The period for Plaintiffs to depose Defendant's expert witnesses shall be modified to 12/1/98-1/8/99. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998, Terminated: 7/6/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/25/98 ) to [72-1] motion for Leave to respond to defendant's reply in support of motion for assignment of trial Judge and memorandum in support Reply due: 9/14/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 8/6/98 ) to Defendant's motion for leave to respond to certain post-argument briefing of Plaintiffs in common issue 11. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998, Terminated: 10/29/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS (Service : 8/17/98 ) for Leave to respond to defendant's reply in support of motion for assignment of trial Judge and memorandum in support . Response due: 9/3/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [67-1] motion to assign trial judge. Service: 8/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/10/98) for Leave to file Supplemental Authority with the Court Response due: 8/27/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998, Terminated: 9/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL, USA to Amend the Pre-Trial Schedule. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 8/4/98 ) to [67-1] motion to assign trial judge. Reply due: 8/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/27/98 ) to assign trial judge. Response due: 8/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Closing Brief by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, JAMES M. FAIL in Response to Defendant's Memorandum in Response to Security Savings Plaintiffs' Amicus Curiae memorandum and Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Common Issue 11 . Service: 7/21/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by USA in response to Security Savings Shareholder plaintiffs' "amicus curiae" memorandum and supplemental memorandum re: common issue 11. Service: 6/30/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [61-1] motion for Leave to File corrected response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to file Defendant's supplemental Memorandum regarding common issue 11. Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file response by 7/21/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [59-1] motion for Leave to File copies of Plaintiffs Coordinating Committee's briefs on common issue 11. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998, Terminated: 7/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 7/6/98 ) for Leave to File corrected response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to file Defendant's supplemental Memorandum regarding common issue 11. Response due: 7/23/98 (JT) Modified on 07/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service by hand: 7/2/98 ) to [60-1] motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Security Savings Shareholder Plaintiffs' Amicus Curiae Memorandum and Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Common Issue 11. Reply due: 7/14/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/30/98 (by hand)) for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Security Savings Shareholder Plaintiffs' Amicus Curiae Memorandum and Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Common Issue 11. Response due: 7/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998, Terminated: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 6/19/98 ) for Leave to File copies of Plaintiffs Coordinating Committee's briefs on common issue 11. (Briefs Included) Response due: 7/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [57-1] motion for Leave to file copies of Defendant's briefs regarding standing issues. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/11/1998, Terminated: 6/15/1998 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) for Leave to file copies of Defendant's briefs regarding standing issues (briefs are included with the motion). Response due: 6/29/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY by USA to [55-1] response by JAMES M. FAIL, CFSB CORPORATION, BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Service: 6/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL to [53-1] response by USA. Service: 5/29/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to the Response of the United States to Plaintiffs' Reply to the Government's Show Cause Response and Proposed Order Reply to Response to Motion by 5/29/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [51-2] order re: plaintiff's reply to defendant's show cause response and proposed order. Service: 5/12/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998, Terminated: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 5/12/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to the Response of the United States to Plaintiffs' Reply to the Government's Show Cause Response and Proposed Order [to May 29, 1998]. Response due: 5/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiffs' proposed order. Defendant's response due 5/11/98 and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/26/98 for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's filing. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998, Terminated: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiffs' proposed order. (to May 11, 1998) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of filing Proposed Order by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL to [47-1] response by USA. Service: 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/4/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS (Service : 9/4/97 ) for Leave to File amicus curiae brief in Nos. 92-138C, et al. . Response due: 9/22/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/25/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS in support of [23-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability, etc. Service: 7/9/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [35-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation by 30 pages, denying [36-1] motion for Leave to File response to motion to exceed page limitation; and allowing plaintiff to file a 6 page sur-reply by 7/10/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of certification regarding confidential material pursuant to paragraph 8(c) of the Master Protective Order filed by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Service: 6/13/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [28-1] cross motion, together with a separate volume of appendix. Service by hand: 6/2/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [37-1] joint motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Interrogatories deadline to 7/14/97 , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/2/97 for [28-1] cross motion ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL to response to [36-1] motion for Leave to File response to motion to exceed page limitation . Service: 5/19/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/16/97 ) to [36-1] motion for Leave to File response to motion to exceed page limitation Reply due: 6/2/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 5/13/97 ) for Leave to File response to motion to exceed page limitation . Response due: 6/2/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997, Terminated: 5/28/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL to Extend Time to Respond to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (to July 14, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997, Terminated: 6/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/9/97 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation by 30 pages . Response due: 5/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 4/1/97 ) to [28-1] cross motion, together with separate one volume appendix [filed by leave of the Judge]. Reply due: 4/14/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time to File Combined Reply and Response Brief and Response to [28-1] cross motion reset to 4/1/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 3/26/97) for leave to move for enlargement of page limitation . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: 3/28/1997, Terminated: 4/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service : 3/21/97) to Extend Time to File Combined Reply and Response Brief (to April 1, 1997). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 2/26/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service BY HAND: 2/26/97) to [23-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability. Reply due: 3/14/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 1/24/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [25-1] motion for substitution of party (signed by Acting Chief Judge Lawrence S. Margolis for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 1/10/97) and RESPONSE to [23-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS with one volume appendix by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/10/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [28-1] cross motion reset to 2/10/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment and Response to [23-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability reset to 1/10/97 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 12/27/1996, Entered: 1/2/1997, Terminated: 1/3/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/27/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for partial summary judgment [to January 10, 1997]. Response due: 1/13/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996, Terminated: 1/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service BY HAND: 12/17/96) for substitution of party . Response due: 12/31/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Marie Hosford. Service: 10/30/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS (Service: 10/29/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability with one volume aapendix of exhibits. Response due: 1/27/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 9/9/96) to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney I. Thomas Bieging for JAMES M. FAIL. Added Mitchell Rand Berger. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by I. Thomas Bieging (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/19/96) for Leave to File Proposed Pretrial Order . Response due: 9/5/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS. Service: 7/26/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental Status Report (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 7/26/96) for Leave to File supplemental Status Report Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL. Service: 7/25/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/10/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/10/96) for Leave to File status report . Response due: 7/29/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL (Service: 5/23/96 ) to [11-1] motion for Leave to File motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 6/7/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/8/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/6/96 ) for Leave to File motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/23/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action, granting [6-1] motion to Stay Proceedings [status report(s) due within 30 days after the United States Supreme Court's decision in Winstar] (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 10/12/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS (Service: 10/6/95) to [6-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Reply due: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/27/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/95) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 10/10/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Edgar Kosloske Service : 9/6/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Laureen Kapin. Service : 8/22/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by BLUEBONNET SAVINGS, CFSB CORPORATION, JAMES M. FAIL of related case(s). (90-8 C, 90-773 C, 90-772 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39858. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?