ROBINSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00533-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES M. ROBINSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck Richard Pardue +1 706 823 2000 +1 706 722 0149 chuckpardue@gmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army Judge Advocate General Corps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Wallace Fleming +1 202 463 1920 +1 202 463 1925 efleming@troutrichards.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/7/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 94 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 93 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff shall recover of and from the United States the sum of $75,000.00, inclusive of interest, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneyn fees. Further, the Army shall provide plaintiff with a thirty per cent (30%) medical disability retirement as of March, 1999. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 92 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 Court Filing
      ORDER directing the clerk to enter judgment for plaintiff in the amount and manner set forth in paragraph #4 of the March 31, 1999 Stipulation for Entry of Judgment. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 91 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999
          Stipulation by JAMES M. ROBINSON, USA for entry of judgment. (CDC)
            LREF
            Blank 90 Filed: 3/25/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/25/99. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 89 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 4/7/99 ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 88 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Terminated:
                MOTION by JAMES M. ROBINSON (Service : 3/12/99) for Leave to file status report , status report included. Response due: 3/29/99. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 87 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/10/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 3/3/99 ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 86 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/5/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 85 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (CDC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 84 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [82-1] motion for Leave to submit a status report Status Report deadline to 2/8/99 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 83 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Wallace Fleming. Service : 1/12/99. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 82 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999, Terminated: 1/21/1999 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/8/99 ) for Leave to submit a status report , out of time (status report included). Response due: 2/8/99. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 81 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 11/16/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 80 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/15/98. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 79 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER vacating [73-2] order; granting [78-1] motion to Stay set Status Report deadline to 10/15/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 78 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/2/98 ) to Stay proceedings, (until 10/15/98). Response due: 9/28/98 (HW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 77 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [76-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment. Defendant's response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 9/8/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 76 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998, Terminated: 8/24/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment [until 9/8/98]. (AB)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 75 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [74-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Defendant's response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 8/19/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 74 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998, Terminated: 7/22/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/15/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [to August 19, 1998]. Response due: 8/3/98 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 73 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER lifting the stay of this action and setting Defendant's response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment to 7/15/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 06/19/1998
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 72 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Status Report
                                                STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 6/2/98 (AB)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [70-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a status report. Reset Defendant's Status Report deadline to 6/2/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998, Terminated: 5/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/26/98 ) to Extend Time to submit a status report [until 6/2/98]. Response due: 6/15/98 (AB)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [68-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a status report. Reset Defendant's Status Report deadline to 5/26/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998, Terminated: 5/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/11/98 ) to Extend Time to submit a status report [to May 25, 1998]. Response due: 5/28/98 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [66-1] motion to Extend Time to file Status Report. Reset Defendant's Status Report deadline to 5/11/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998, Terminated: 4/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 4/27/98) to Extend Time to file Status Report until 5/11/98. Response due: 5/14/98. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER continuing stay and setting Defendant's Status Report deadline to 4/27/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998 Status Report
                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/20/98 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER continuing the stay in this action and setting Defendant's Status Report deadline to 3/20/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/11/1998
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/6/1998 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/4/98 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 1/21/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [60-1] motion to Extend Time until February 4, 1998, within which to submit status report reset Status Report deadline to 2/4/98 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC) Modified on 02/05/1998
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998, Terminated: 1/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/20/98 ) to Extend Time until February 4, 1998, within which to submit status report . Response due: 2/6/98. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 12/1/1997, Entered: 12/15/1997 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER continuing suspension of proceedings and directing defendant to file a Status report by 1/20/98. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 Status Report
                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 11/20/97 (CDC)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER set Status Report deadline for defendant to 11/25/97. This action remains suspended. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/15/1997 Status Report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 10/8/97 (CDC)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [54-1] motion to Extend Time to October 8, 1997, to submit a status report. reset Status Report deadline to 10/8/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997, Terminated: 9/22/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/17/97 ) to Extend Time to October 8, 1997, to submit a status report. Response due: 10/6/97 (CDC)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [52-1] motion for Leave to File status report out of time and status report set Status Report deadline to 9/17/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997, Terminated: 8/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/8/97 ) for Leave to File status report out of time and status report Response due: 8/25/97 (CDC)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [50-1] motion for Leave to File Status Report, Out of Time and Status Report reset Status Report deadline to 8/1/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997, Terminated: 6/23/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/4/97 ) for Leave to File Status Report, Out of Time and Status Report . (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 5/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Staying proceedings , and directing defendant to file a Status Report on behalf of both parties by 6/2/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/9/97 (AB)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to submit status report reset Status Report deadline to 4/9/97 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997, Terminated: 4/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/28/97 ) to Extend Time to submit status report , [until 4/9/97]. Response due: 4/14/97 (AB)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [44-1] motion to Extend Time to file a status report and reset Status Report deadline to 3/28/97 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/6/1997, Terminated: 3/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/3/97) to Extend Time to file a status report [to March 28, 1997]. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 3/3/97 and continuing stay of proceedings to said date (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/13/1997 Status Report
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/8/97 (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time to file status report and reset Status Report deadline to 1/8/97 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996, Terminated: 12/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/16/96) to Extend Time to file status report (January 8, 1997). Response due: 1/2/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by JAMES M. ROBINSON (Service: 10/28/96) to [37-1] motion to Stay by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Stay and set Status Report deadline to 12/16/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by USA (Service : 10/23/96) to Stay (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996, Terminated: 10/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/21/96 ) to Stay to allow parties to conduct settlement negotiations. Response due: 11/7/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [34-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/21/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss , and Response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 10/21/96 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 10/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/11/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and to dismiss [to October 21, 1996]. Response due: 10/28/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motions for summary judgment and to dismiss Response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 10/11/96 , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/11/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996, Terminated: 10/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/26/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motions for summary judgment and to dismiss , (until October 11, 1996). Response due: 10/15/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Chuck Richard Pardue (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment and response to motion to dismiss, Response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 9/27/96 and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 9/27/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address and telephone number by John Kenneth Lapiana. (HW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996, Terminated: 9/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/30/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment and response to motion to dismiss , (until September 27, 1996). Response due: 9/16/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and response to motion to dismiss, Response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 8/30/96 and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/30/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996, Terminated: 8/1/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/31/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and response to motion to dismiss (to August 31, 1996). (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM [SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION] by USA re: [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and response to motion to dismiss by USA. Service: 7/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: 7/10/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and response to motion to dismiss, Response to [21-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 7/31/96 and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 7/31/96 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996, Terminated: 7/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/1/96) to Extend Time to respond to motion for summary judgment and response to motion to dismiss until 7/31/96. Response due: 7/18/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by JAMES M. ROBINSON Service: 5/31/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by JAMES M. ROBINSON (Service : 5/31/96 ) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 7/1/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by JAMES M. ROBINSON (Service: 5/31/96 ) to [15-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 6/17/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss and Response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 6/3/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996, Terminated: 4/12/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by JAMES M. ROBINSON (Service: 4/3/96) to Extend Time [to 6/2/96] to reply to defendant's motion to dismiss Response due: 4/22/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                              Administrative record filed by USA. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to File the administrative record and granting [16-2] motion for Leave to waive the copying requirements (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996, Terminated: 4/3/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/27/96) for Leave to File the administrative record , and for Leave to waive the copying requirements . Response due: 4/15/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/19/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/8/96 ) to Dismiss , filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/8/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/11/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Chuck Richard Pardue (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996, Terminated: 3/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to March 9, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/28/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996, Terminated: 2/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/96) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to February 28, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 2/14/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996, Terminated: 1/29/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/23/96) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint until 2/14/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/23/96 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995, Terminated: 12/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 12/1/95) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint until 1/23/96. Response due: 10/10/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint set Answer deadline to 12/11/95 ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995, Terminated: 10/13/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint (to December 9, 1995). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Kenneth Lapiana. Service : 8/24/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39857. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?