AG ROUTE SEVEN, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00534-RWG
District Judge Reginald W. Gibson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AG ROUTE SEVEN PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo BRISTOL INDUSTRIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo CANAL INVESTMENT SOCIETY L.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo CAROLINE M. AVERY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo CHARLES BERNEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo DARRELL C. FERGUSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo DAVID H. EISENSTAT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo DAVID P. CALLET, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo FERGUSON SPECIAL TRUST NO.1, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo FRANK L. EVANS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo HERMINE R. AKRAWI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo JAMES B. CARR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo JAMES R. BELOTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo JEANA AXELROD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo JON W. BELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo LYMAN M. DRAKE III CHILDREN'S TRUST, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo LYMAN M. DRAKE, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo MICHAEL L. BARRETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo MIKE M. AKRAWI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo RUTH H. CARR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo SAMUEL J. AVERY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo STERLING R. COLLETT, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo V. A. ARJUN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
No Logo WARREN E. CONNELLY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Harvey Falk, Sr. +1 202 861 0900 +1 202 296 2882
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Thomas infelise +1 202 616 8254 +1 202 514 8624 jeffery.infelise@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Allen Kuiper +1 202 942 3008
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 7/29/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-5144'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (181) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 172 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [168] Published Order/Opinion,that directed the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment in this case. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 171 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 03-5144 for [170] Notice of Appeal filed by AG ROUTE SEVEN PARTNERSHIP. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 170 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003, Terminated: 9/27/2004 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [169] Judgment by AG ROUTE SEVEN PARTNERSHIP. Copies to Senior Judge Reginald Gibson, opposing party (USA) and CAFC. [no fee received] (dw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 169 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003
        JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58 that the amended complaints of private plaintiffs filed in April 1977 and plaintiff FDIC filed in March 1977 are dismissed. No costs. (bb1, )
          LREF
          Blank 168 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION dismissing private plaintiff's April 3, 1998 short-form motion for partial summary judgment as to liability, as moot; granting, in part, defendant's July 9, 1998 motion to dismiss, as to FDIC's lack of standing, and dismissing, in part, as to private plaintiff's claims, as moot; dismissing plaintiff FDIC's October 10, 2000 motion for partial summary judgment on liability; granting, in part, defendant's October 10, 2000, motion to dismiss the non-contract claims of plaintiff FDIC, dismissing, in part, as moot, the non-contract claims of private plaintiffs, and dismissing, as to the FDIC and private plaintiffs, as moot, defendant's motion (and cross-motion) for summary judgment as to contract liability; dismissing, as moot, both the private plaintiffs' December 18, 2000 and plaintiff FDIC's January 12, 2001 respective cross-motions for summary judgment; and granting defendant's February 7, 2003 motion to dismiss private plaintiffs, as to all contract and non-contract claims. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment, pursuant to Rule 58, that the amended complaints of private plaintiffs filed in April 1977 and plaintiff FDIC filed in March 1977 are dismissed. No costs. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (bb1, )
            LREF
            Blank 167 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Court Filing
            ORDER: Upon notification from the Clerk's Office, this court issued [161] its Order of 7/21/03, directing dft to file its response to pltfs A.G. Route's proposed findings relative to damages. Said directive is hereby rescinded because the court has confirmed that in fact pltfs did not file proposed findings with their motion for summary judgment on damages. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 166 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003
              SUR-REPLY to FDIC's Reply to the Court's Order of June 25, 2003 per [165] Order of 7/25/03 filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 165 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [155] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to FDIC's Reply to the Court's Order of June 25, 2003, and the accompanying surreply is hereby FILED this date. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 164 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Court Filing
                  REPLY in Support of [143] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pltfs' Damage Claims filed by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/18/03.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 163 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Court Filing
                    REPLY to [143] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Pltfs' Damage Claims filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 7/18/2003. Service: 7/1/03.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 162 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                      OPPOSITION to [136] Pltfs' MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages filed by UNITED STATES, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Reply due by 8/4/2003. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 161 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER: On 7/17/03, the Clerk's Office received "Dft's Opposition to the Motion of Pltf's for Summary Judgment on Damages," dated 7/17/03. Said document was not filed upon receipt because it does not comply with Rule 56(h). Dft's brief shall be filed by leave of the undersigned this date; [however, dft shall immediately file its reponse to the proposed findings. - THIS PORTION OF ORDER IS RESCINDED PER ORDER OF 7/25/03.] Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (jcp, ) Modified on 7/25/2003 (jcp, ).
                          LREF
                          Blank 160 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003
                          NOTICE of Change of Address filed by James Harvey Falk Jr. Service: 7/1/03.(dls, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 159 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                            OPPOSITION to Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Damage Claim of FDIC by FDIC. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 158 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Response to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE to [142] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damage Claims of Substituted Plaintiff FDIC filed by FDIC. Reply due by 8/4/2003. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 157 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE to [145] FDIC's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Selected Damage Issues filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 7/31/2003. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 156 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                  RESPONSE to [146] FDIC's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact Pertaining to its Motion for Summary Judgment on Selected Damage Issues by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/17/03.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 155 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003, Terminated: 7/25/2003 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply to FDIC's Reply to the Court's Order of June 25, 2003 by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/17/03. Response due by 8/4/2003.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 154 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003
                                      REPLY to [151] Dft's Response to FDIC's Response to the Court's Order of June 25, 2003 filed by FDIC, Filed by Leave of the Juge, per Order of 7/15/03. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 153 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [152] FDIC's Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Dft's Response to FDIC's Response to the Court's Order of June 25, 2003. The reply brief attached thereto is hereby FILED this date. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 152 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003, Terminated: 7/15/2003 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Dft's Response to FDIC's Response to the Court's Order of June 25, 2003 by FDIC. (Reply attached)Service: 7/11/03. Response due by 7/28/2003. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 151 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Response
                                            RESPONSE to [149] Substituted Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation's Response to Court Order of June 25, 2003 filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/7/03.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 150 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Dft shall file a pointed and inclusive response to SUBSTITUTED PLTF FDIC's RESPONSE TO COURT [SHOW CAUSE] ORDER OF JUNE 25, 2003, no later than 2:00 pm, Monday, July 7, 2003. Response due by 7/7/2003. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 149 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Response
                                                RESPONSE to [148] Court Order of June 25, 2003 filed by FDIC. Service: 7/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE:Pursuant to defendant's 7/19/98 motion to dismiss plaintiff FDIC for lack of standing, plaintiff FDIC is hereby Ordered to Show Cause why it should not be dismissed from this action. Plaintiff FDIC shall therefore certify to this court, with specificity, by memorandum not to exceed two (2) pages, the amount of the total claim FDIC-RTC, i.e., the government, has against any recovery by FDIC as receiver for New Surety as of the date of this Order, and shall file said Memorandum with the Clerk of Court on or before 5:00 pm, 7/2/03.Show Cause Response due by 7/2/2003. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 147 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Facts in support of its motion for summary judgment on private plaintiffs' damage claims by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 146 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact Pertaining to Motion for Summary Judgment on Selected Damage Issues by FDIC, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 06/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment on Selected Damage Issues by FDIC, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 06/16/03. Response due by 7/17/2003 (jcp, ) Modified on 6/20/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 144 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                          MEMORANDUM (together with a separate appendix) in support of its motion for summary judgment by FDIC, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/16/03.(hw1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 143 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment on private plaintiffs' damage claims by UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 6/16/03. Response due by 7/21/2003 (hw1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 142 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on damage claims of plaintiff-intervenor, FDIC by UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 6/16/03. Response due by 7/21/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 141 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [138] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (hw1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 140 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by UNITED STATES, filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 6/16/03.(hw1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 139 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER re: defendant's respective motions for summary judgment on private plaint's and plaintiff FDIC's damages claims due 6/16/03 shall be filed by leave of the judge, etc. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (hw1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 138 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Selected Damage Issues by 10 pages by FDIC.Service: 06/16/03. Response due by 7/3/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment (together with a separate appendix) by AG ROUTE SEVEN PARTNERSHIP, HERMINE R. AKRAWI, MIKE M. AKRAWI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, V. A. ARJUN, CAROLINE M. AVERY, SAMUEL J. AVERY, JEANA AXELROD, MICHAEL L. BARRETT, JON W. BELL, JAMES R. BELOTE, CHARLES BERNEY, BRISTOL INDUSTRIES, INC., DAVID P. CALLET, CANAL INVESTMENT SOCIETY L.P., JAMES B. CARR, RUTH H. CARR, STERLING R. COLLETT III, WARREN E. CONNELLY, LYMAN M. DRAKE III, DAVID H. EISENSTAT, FRANK L. EVANS, DARRELL C. FERGUSON, FERGUSON SPECIAL TRUST NO.1, LYMAN M. DRAKE III CHILDREN'S TRUST.Service: 6/16/03. Response due by 7/17/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [135] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motion for Summary Judgment on Damage claim, etc. Signed by Senior Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (dw1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Motion for Summary Judgment on Damage Claims of Plaintiff-Intevenor, FDIC by 10 pages by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/9/03. (dw1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER directing all parties to file briefs on damages with the Clerk of the Court by 5:00 p.m., 6/16/03. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (hw1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying [131] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Reginald W. Gibson. (dw1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [131] Motion to Strike filed by The United States.Reply due 4/11/2003. Service: 3/31/03. (lrd)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 4/28/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                    MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 3/14/03) to Strike [130-1] motion reply by USA . Response due: 3/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003
                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [131-1] motion to Strike [130-1] motion reply by USA due 3/31/03 . (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003
                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [119-1] motion to Dismiss private plaintiffs. Service: 3/12/03. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                                          JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b), that the claims of deceased private plaintiffs Frank Evans, Philip Young and K.S. Wu are dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER directing the clerk to enter partial judgment in this case, pursuant to Rule 54(b), dismissing plaintiffs Frank Evans, Philip Young, and K.S. Wu (deceased private plaintiffs0, as there is no just reason for delay. ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 2/28/03 ) to [119-1] motion to Dismiss private plaintiffs (with separate appendix). Reply due: 3/14/03 (HW) Modified on 03/05/2003
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [120-1] motion for Leave to file an amended certificate of service (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Response
                                                                                                  RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS pursuant to [115-4] order. Service: 2/12/03 (HW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by ALL PLAINTIFFS, re: Proposed court proceedings. Service: 2/6/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by FDIC, re: Identifying party Plaintiffs, pursuant to [115-4] order. Service: 2/13/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by USA, re: Identity of the party Plaintiffs. Service by hand: 2/13/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Recommendations On How To Proceed by FDIC. Service: 2/13/03 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003, Terminated: 2/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/12/03) for Leave to file an amended certificate of service . Response due: 3/3/03. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by USA re: recommended future proceedings. Service: 2/12/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 2/7/03) to Dismiss private plaintiffs , (together with separate appendix). Response due: 3/10/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [119-1] motion to Dismiss private plaintiffs reset to 2/28/03. (JT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003
                                                                                                                    Status Conference held (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 30, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY by USA to [89-1] cross motion by FDIC. Service: 4/5/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 02/12/2003
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                          ANSWER by USA to amended complaint. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER Parties separately filed memorandums recommending the manner in which it should proceed respecting the claims, motions, etc, before it (shall not exceed 2 pages) and Parties joint memorandum identifying greater specificity who the party plaintiffs are in the present action (not to exceed 4 pages) are due by 10:00 a.m. on 2/13/03 , Defendant's re-briefing of its motion to dismiss private plaintiffs is due by 5:00 p.m. on 2/7/03 , and Plaintiff's reply is due by 5:00 p.m. on 2/28/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/27/03) to Dismiss Plaintiffs Frank Evans, Philip Young and K.S. Wu . Response due: 2/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 1/30/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 11:00 a.m., 1/21/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge Reginald W. Gibson . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER reassigning this case to Senior Judge Gibson. (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Suggestion of Death
                                                                                                                                        SUGGESTIONS OF DEATH by USA. Service: 9/27/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service: 5/15/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Hugo Alexander Zia for FDIC Added Gary Allen Kuiper . Response due: 5/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 2/21/02) to [104-1] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 3/7/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 2/21/02) to [104-1] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 3/7/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 2/13/02) for a status conference . Response due: 2/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                  CASE reassigned to Judge Lynn J. Bush . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush, effective February 2, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jeffery Thomas Infelise. Service: 4/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 4/23/01) to [99-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 5/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/5/01 ) for Leave to file sur-reply to Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 4/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by FDIC to response to [89-1] cross motion. Service by hand: 1/8/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [92-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES (in response to private plaintiffs' proposed findings) by USA. Service: 2/9/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/9/01) to [85-1] cross motion. Reply due: 3/9/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/1/01 ) to [89-1] cross motion. Reply due: 3/1/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 2/1/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FDIC (Service by hand: 1/8/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/22/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/12/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/12/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by FDIC ( Service: 12/13/00 ) and RESPONSE to [71-2] motion for Summary Judgment on all contract claims of Private Plaintiffs and of FDIC by USA filed [by leave of the judge].(DS) Modified on 02/07/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 4, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [73-1] motion to Compel document production from Private Plaintiffs and responses to interrogatories directed to Private Plaintiffs and to FDIC (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                      Oral Argument re: [73-1] motion to Compel document production from Private Plaintiffs and responses to interrogatories directed to Private Plaintiffs and to FDIC. by USA ( Transcript due 2/5/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appendix to response to Defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 2/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by AG ROUTE SEVEN, et al. (Service: 12/18/00) and RESPONSE to [71-1] motion to dismiss [71-2] motion for Summary Judgment. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 12/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 12/18/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/13/00 ) to [72-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/10/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 12/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 1/4/01 for [73-1] motion to Compel. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by FDIC (Service : 12/1/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/4/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing "Defendant's Reply to Private Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel" by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/28/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: counsel will notify the court of a convenient hearing date no later than December 8. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [73-1] motion to Compel document production from Private Plaintiffs and responses to interrogatories directed to Private Plaintiffs and to FDIC. Service: 11/21/00 (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 11/9/00 (by hand)) to [73-1] motion to Compel document production. (1 Volume of Appendix) Reply due: 11/27/00 (motion to strike included) (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FDIC (Service : 11/9/00 (by hand)) to Strike [73-1] motion to Compel document production. (1 Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/27/00 (response to motion included) (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [74-1] motion to Strike [72-1] motion to Compel document production reset to 11/27/00. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/3/00 ) for Leave to File corrected certificate of service of Defendant's motions filed and served on 10/10/00. Response due: 11/20/00 (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000, Terminated: 1/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/00 (by hand)) to Compel document production from Private Plaintiffs and responses to interrogatories directed to Private Plaintiffs and to FDIC. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/9/00 (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/00 ) to dismiss all non-contract claims of Private Plaintiffs and of FDIC and for Summary Judgment on all contract claims of Private Plaintiffs and of FDIC and supplement to opposition to Plaintiff's short form motion for summary judgment. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 11/29/00 (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FDIC. Service: 10/10/00 (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/26/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 14, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Defendant's refusal to permit Plaintiff to conduct an examination of Mr. Feichter beyond the scope of Plaintiff FDIC's examination is consistent with the rules agreed to by all parties. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [63-1] motion for Leave to Submit short response to Plaintiffs' letter sent to the court. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 11/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by AG ROUTE SEVEN (Service: 8/25/00 ) to [63-1] motion for Leave to Submit short response to Plaintiffs' letter sent to the court filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000, Terminated: 8/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/24/00 (by hand)) for Leave to Submit short response to Plaintiffs' letter sent to the court. Response due: 9/7/00 (JT) Modified on 08/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: the parties' stipulated order to take depositions of three plaintiffs within seven days of the close of discovery is granted. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 08/15/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing held re: discovery dispute (Transcript due 9/13/00) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Stipulated Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS, USA, FDIC. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing (Discovery Dispute) set at 10:00 a.m. on 8/14/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Certification by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 7/25/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Mr. Langdon is in contempt of the court's order to appear for a deposition. That deposition is rescheduled for 8/2/00 at 9:00 a.m., at the Department of Justice. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant may record its depositions by videotape, at its expense. The parties will make an effort to schedule ten depositions prior to July 12. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [53-1] motion for Leave to File answer to Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Service: 4/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 4/14/00) to [53-1] motion for Leave to File answer to Plaintiffs' amended complaint, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/28/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA SHEET by FDIC re: [54-1] motion response by FDIC, by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/11/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 4/10/00 ) to [53-1] motion for Leave to File answer to Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Reply due: 4/24/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/28/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/27/00 (by hand)) for Leave to File answer to Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Response due: 4/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 10/12/99 ) to [38-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 11/29/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 10/12/99 ) to [38-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT) Modified on 11/29/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Amended Initial Disclosure by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 10/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [38-1] cross motion. Service: 10/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of initial disclosure by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 9/24/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing "Initial Disclosure List" by USA. Service: 9/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Susan F. LaMarca. Service: 8/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs" . Response due: 11/30/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until october 13, 1998. (See order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [40-1] response to notice of filing motion to stay by AG ROUTE SEVEN. Service: 8/26/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by AG ROUTE SEVEN to [39-1] notice of filing motion to stay by USA. Service: 8/19/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing of motion for a stay of proceedings in certain cases [motion for stay filed in Case No. 90-8] by USA. Service: 7/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 7/9/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSS MOTION to Dismiss by USA ( Service: 7/6/98 ) and RESPONSE to [34-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 6/2/98 (JT) Modified on 07/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [36-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to short form motion for summary judgment Response to [34-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability. reset to 7/6/98 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998, Terminated: 7/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/29/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to short form motion for summary judgment , (until July 3, 1998). Response due: 6/15/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jacqueline Christine Romero. Service : 5/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SHORT FORM MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service : 4/3/98 ) for Partial Summary Judgment as to Liability. 1 separate volume of appendix Response due: 6/2/98 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [32-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Charles J. Cooper for FERGUSON SPECIAL, DARRELL C. FERGUSON, FRANK L. EVANS, DAVID H. EISENSTAT, LYMAN M. DRAKE, LYMAN M. DRAKE, WARREN E. CONNELLY, STERLING R. COLLETT, RUTH H. CARR, JAMES B. CARR, CANAL INVESTMENT, DAVID P. CALLET, BRISTOL INDUSTRIES, CHARLES BERNEY, JAMES R. BELOTE, JON W. BELL, MICHAEL L. BARRETT, JEANA AXELROD, CAROLINE M. AVERY, SAMUEL J. AVERY, V. A. ARJUN, MIKE M. AKRAWI, HERMINE R. AKRAWI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, AG ROUTE SEVEN Added James Harvey Falk Jr. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997, Terminated: 6/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service : 5/20/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Charles J. Cooper for FERGUSON SPECIAL, DARRELL C. FERGUSON, FRANK L. EVANS, DAVID H. EISENSTAT, LYMAN M. DRAKE, LYMAN M. DRAKE, WARREN E. CONNELLY, STERLING R. COLLETT, RUTH H. CARR, JAMES B. CARR, CANAL INVESTMENT, DAVID P. CALLET, BRISTOL INDUSTRIES, CHARLES BERNEY, JAMES R. BELOTE, JON W. BELL, MICHAEL L. BARRETT, JEANA AXELROD, CAROLINE M. AVERY, SAMUEL J. AVERY, V. A. ARJUN, MIKE M. AKRAWI, HERMINE R. AKRAWI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, AG ROUTE SEVEN Added James Harvey Falk Jr. . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER the court will grant the motion of plaintiffs' counsel as soon as plaintiffs file a notice of attorney substitution, which plaintiffs must do within 60 days ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 4/23/1997, Entered: 5/3/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by ALL PLAINTIFFS amending [1-1] complaint filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 4/18/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 4/1/97) to [27-1] motion for Charles J. Cooper to Withdraw as Attorney. Reply due: 4/14/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 4/5/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/27/97. Fee not required ( Answer due 5/29/97 ) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 3/18/97) for Charles J. Cooper to Withdraw as Attorney Response due: 4/4/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by FDIC re:in support of motion to be substituted for seven failed financial institutions (party plaintiffs) and to be substituted as counsel. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/21/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ernest Leidenheimer Jr. Service : 9/25/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE 95-534C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Donald Evan Kinner (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [18-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Additional Plaintiffs by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 4/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA Service: 3/1/96 (JPSR due 4/18/96). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 3/1/96 (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 2/21/96 ) to [12-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint. Reply due: 3/4/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996, Terminated: 2/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/13/96 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until March 1, 1996). Response due: 3/1/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/31/1996, Entered: 2/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [9-1] motion For reconsideration of [6-2] order under Rule 83.2 and reset Answer deadline to 2/15/96 (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 1/29/96) to [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reply due: 2/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996, Terminated: 1/31/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/16/96) For reconsideration of [6-2] order under Rule 83.2 [by leave of the Judge]. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 1/16/96 (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995, Terminated: 12/19/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/15/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to January 14, 1996]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay Proceedings except for filing of answer and reset Answer deadline to 12/15/95 (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 10/23/95) to [4-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Reply due: 11/6/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995, Terminated: 11/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION filed by USA, out of time, (Service: 10/13/95) to Stay Proceedings (pending Winstar decisions). Response due: 10/30/95 (FE) Modified on 11/01/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Donald Evan Kinner Service : 8/29/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39856. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?