VERMONT FEDERAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00536-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vermont Federal Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Eisenhart +1 202 261 3306 +1 202 261 3333 feisenhart@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Noel Kane +1 202 305 7502
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/8/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/9/1999
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated December 8, 1999, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff shall recover of and from the United States the sum of $25,000.00, inclusive of interest, with each party to bear its own attorney fees, costs and expenses. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 42 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 Stipulation
        Stipulation by VERMONT FEDERAL, USA for entry of judgment. (AB)
          LREF
          Blank 41 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 40 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John N. Kane, Jr. Service : 6/23/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 39 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Notice of Appearance/Court Filing
              NOTICE (Filed by leave of the Judge) of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Noel Kane. Service: 6/14/99. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 38 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of change of address by Frank J. Eisenhart. (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 37 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997 Terminated:
                  MOTION by VERMONT FEDERAL (Service : 3/28/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Murray Alan Indick for VERMONT FEDERAL Added Frank J. Eisenhart. Response due: 3/28/97 (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 36 Filed: 12/10/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                    NOTICE of change of address by Murray Alan Indick (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 35 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Terminated:
                      MOTION by VERMONT FEDERAL (Service: 10/18/96) to substitute attorney (consented). Terminated attorney William R. Richardson for VERMONT FEDERAL Added Murray Alan Indick. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 34 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                        SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 33 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 32 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 31 Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER addressing future case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 30 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                NOTICE of change of address by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 29 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER further clarifying 2/20/96 order (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Leave to File status report and status report and set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/14/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996, Terminated: 5/30/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 5/24/96) for Leave to File status report and status report . Response due: 6/10/96 (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/17/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by VERMONT FEDERAL (Service: 5/13/96) for Leave to File response to motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/30/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/3/1996 Terminated:
                                          RESPONSE by VERMONT FEDERAL (Service: 5/1/96) to [23-1] motion for Partial Modificatin of Court's [19-1] Protective Order. Reply due: 5/13/96 (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/23/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 4/18/96 ) for Partial Modificatin of Court's [19-1] Protective Order . Response due: 5/5/96. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Deadline updated; Response to [23-1] motion for Partial Modificatin of Court's [19-1] Protective Order set to 5/6/96 . (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to File letter ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996, Terminated: 4/9/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/5/96) for Leave to File letter Response due: 4/22/96 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER set Brief deadline to immediately re: destroyed documents (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 5/24/96 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER addressing case proceedings (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: 2/14/1996 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [13-1] order. Service: 2/9/96 (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 Additional Documentation
                                                                  Additional Documentation [response to 1/29/96 order] by VERMONT FEDERAL. Service: 2/5/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER directing parties to review the proposed protective order and contact the court by 2/9/96 with comments or suggestions ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER the court will consider issuing a protective order directed to all documents that may relate to this case and invite comment from the parties on this point ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Memorandum
                                                                        MEMORANDUM by USA re: [9-1] order. Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Memorandum
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by VERMONT FEDERAL re: [9-1] order. Service: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER entered directing parties to notify court by 11/30/95 re WINSTAR. (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER directing counsel to begin considering how to proceed once Supreme Court makes a decision in the Winstar case (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                RESPONSE by VERMONT FEDERAL (Service: 10/6/95) to [6-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending Winstar decision. Reply due: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 10/2/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/26/95) to Stay proceedings pending Winstar decision . Response due: 10/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by VERMONT FEDERAL and USA to Stay pending WINSTAR decision in CAFC . (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service: 8/25/95 (FE)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER entered directing parties to notify the court of their intentions ; set Status Report deadline to 8/31/95 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Complaint
                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39879. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 198 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?