GREAT LAKES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00537-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Great Lakes Bancorp., Plaintiff

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Walter Evans +1 301 657 8292
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/21/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GREAT LAKES, USA. Complaint dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to file a motion to compel Plaintiff's compliance with its document-production obligations under Rule 34(b) and the discovery plan Defendant's Motion to Compel is due 1/21/03 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 1/2/2003 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/02 ) to Extend Time to file a motion to compel Plaintiff's compliance with its document-production obligations under Rule 34(b) and the discovery plan [until January 18, 2003]. Response due: 1/2/03 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service by hand: 7/8/02 (JPSR due 8/29/02). (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Walter Evans. Service: 11/29/00. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Decision to Opt Out of Case-Specific Discovery by GREAT LAKES. Service: 7/24/00 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by GREAT LAKES. Service: 4/30/99 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out of Case-Specific Discovery by GREAT LAKES. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                      NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER returning to Plaintiff their notice of decision to opt out of case specific discovery for correction of defect. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jerome Anthony Madden. Service : 8/17/98. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Ethan Steinbuch. Service: 11/4/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                              NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File proposed pretrial order (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996, Terminated: 8/27/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/19/96) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order Response due: 8/5/96 (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996, Terminated: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/25/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                          NOTICE of change of address by Domenique Grace Kirchner (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/27/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision and granting [4-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision and [4-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Service: 11/6/95 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                      RESPONSE by GREAT LAKES (Service: 10/23/95 ) to [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision, [4-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/6/95 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995, Terminated: 11/9/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/4/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision or to Extend Time to respond to complaint [60 days from denial of motion to stay]. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/7/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Domenique Grace Kirchner Service : 9/5/95 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39878. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 204 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?