ABBENE, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00538-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo All Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank J Eisenhart +1 202 261 3300 +1 202 261 3333 frank.eisenhart@dechert.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo ANDREA NICHOLAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo ANTHONY O. BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo ARLENE REID, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo ARNOLD WEINBERG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo CURTIS A. DANEKAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo DAROLD W. JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo DENISE A. JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo EVELYN LASTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo FRANCES WOLF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/06/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank J Eisenhart +1 202 261 3300 +1 202 261 3333 frank.eisenhart@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo GAYLE A. KAUFMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo GLADYS A. LINEHAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo GUNNAR P. NILSSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo HELEN S. BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo HELENE C. JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo HOWARD GOLDMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo MARIE H. JACKSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo MICHAEL J. REID, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo MICHAEL T. ABBENE, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank J. Eisenhart +1 202 261 3306 +1 202 261 3333 feisenhart@msn.com
No Logo Nancy E Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo PATRICIA M. ABBENE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo RICKY IAN KAUFMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
No Logo THOMAS DRUCKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Alan Indick +1 202 261 3300

Toggle Switch Represented by William, Cutter & Pickering

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Richardson, Jr. +1 202 663 6000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey J. L. Brown
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Melvin Schwartz +1 513 579 1414 +1 513 579 1414
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/15/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaints are dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to RCFC 41(a)(2). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 49 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss the complaints without prejduice this day pursuant to RCFC 41(a)(2). ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 49 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of dismissal by FDIC. Service: 8/12/02. (LTD) Modified on 08/14/2002
          LREF
          Blank 48 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of dismissal filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service by hand: 8/6/02 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 47 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: The stay in this case will be extended an additional 10 days, to August 12 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 46 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Stay for 10 days Plaintiff's to advise court of their intentions by 7/30/02 (signed by Judge Robert Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 45 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002, Terminated: 7/23/2002 Terminated:
                MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 7/22/02) to Stay (30 days or less). Response due: 8/8/02. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 44 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service: 7/17/02) to Compel private Plaintiffs to comply with their document-production and initial-disclosure obligations under rule 34(b) and the discovery plan . Response due: 8/5/02. (LTD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 43 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/8/02) for continuance of Plaintiffs' "short-form" motion for partial summary judgment on liability . Response due: 7/25/02. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 42 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Geoffrey J. L. Brown Service : 10/12/00 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 40 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Opt-Out of Case Specific Discovery by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 4/21/00 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 39 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Opt-Out of Case Specific Discovery by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Service: 5/3/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Memorandum
                              5 Common Issue 11 Briefs by USA re: 90-8. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 37 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER filing by leave Common Issue 11 briefs re: 90-8. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/99 ) for Leave to file motion to renew the stay of proceedings on motions for summary judgment in certain cases , motion included. Response due: 1/21/99. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 35 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 12/1/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                    REPLY by USA to response to [33-1] motion for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs", by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/19/98. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 34 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 11/3/98 ) to [33-1] motion for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs." Reply due: 11/16/98. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 33 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/26/98 ) for Leave to file "Common Issue 11 Briefs" . Response due: 11/12/98. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 32 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/22/1998
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY by USA to response to [29-1] motion for Leave to File Motion for Stay of Proceedings on Motions for Summary Judgment in Certain Cases. Service: 8/6/98 (CDC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                              RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 7/30/98 ) to [29-1] motion for Leave to File Motion for Stay of Proceedings on Motions for Summary Judgment in Certain Cases. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/10/98 (JT) Modified on 08/05/1998
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 29 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/17/98 ) for Leave to File Motion for Stay of Proceedings on Motions for Summary Judgment in Certain Cases. Response due: 8/3/98 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 6/22/98 ) to [27-1] motion to Stay, [27-2] motion to Extend Time for a consolidated filing of briefs. Reply due: 7/6/98 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/4/98 ) to Stay , to Extend Time for a consolidated filing of briefs Response due: 6/22/98 (CDC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                      SHORT FORM MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service : 4/2/98 ) for Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 6/4/98 (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Notice of Change of Address
                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Frank J. Eisenhart. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: 9/11/1997 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by MICHAEL T. ABBENE JR., ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA M. ABBENE, ANTHONY O. BROWN, HELEN S. BROWN, CURTIS A. DANEKAS, THOMAS DRUCKER, HOWARD GOLDMAN, DAROLD W. JACKSON, DENISE A. JACKSON, HELENE C. JACKSON, MARIE H. JACKSON, NANCY E. JACKSON, GAYLE A. KAUFMAN, RICKY IAN KAUFMAN, EVELYN LASTER, GLADYS A. LINEHAN, ANDREA NICHOLAS, GUNNAR P. NILSSON, ARLENE REID, MICHAEL J. REID, ARNOLD WEINBERG, FRANCES WOLF (Service : 3/28/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Murray Alan Indick for ARNOLD WEINBERG, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for MICHAEL J. REID, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for ARLENE REID, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for GUNNAR P. NILSSON, attorney Murray Alan Indick for ANDREA NICHOLAS, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for GLADYS A. LINEHAN, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for EVELYN LASTER, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for RICKY IAN KAUFMAN, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for GAYLE A. KAUFMAN, attorney Murray Alan Indick for NANCY E. JACKSON, , attorney Murray Alan Indick for MARIE H. JACKSON, attorney Murray Alan Indick for HELENE C. JACKSON, attorney Murray Alan Indick for DENISE A. JACKSON, attorney Murray Alan Indick for DAROLD W. JACKSON, attorney Murray Alan Indick for HOWARD GOLDMAN, attorney Murray Alan Indick for THOMAS DRUCKER, attorney Murray Alan Indick for CURTIS A. DANEKAS, attorney Murray Alan Indick for HELEN S. BROWN, attorney Murray Alan Indick for ANTHONY O. BROWN, attorney Murray Alan Indick for PATRICIA M. ABBENE, attorney Murray Alan Indick for ALL PLAINTIFFS, attorney Murray Alan Indick for MICHAEL T. ABBENE, Added Frank J. Eisenhart. (AB) Modified on 09/11/1997
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 3/18/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                                                            Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Service: 3/18/97 RECEIPT # Fee waived ( Answer due 5/20/97 ) (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 Notice of Change of Address
                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Murray Alan Indick (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service : 10/22/96 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney William R. Richardson for FRANCES WOLF, attorney William R. Richardson for ARNOLD WEINBERG, attorney William R. Richardson for MICHAEL J. REID, attorney William R. Richardson for ARLENE REID, attorney William R. Richardson for GUNNAR P. NILSSON, attorney William R. Richardson for ANDREA NICHOLAS, attorney William R. Richardson for GLADYS A. LINEHAN, attorney William R. Richardson for EVELYN LASTER, attorney William R. Richardson for RICKY IAN KAUFMAN, attorney William R. Richardson for GAYLE A. KAUFMAN, attorney William R. Richardson for NANCY E. JACKSON, attorney William R. Richardson for MARIE H. JACKSON, attorney William R. Richardson for HELENE C. JACKSON, attorney William R. Richardson for DENISE A. JACKSON, attorney William R. Richardson for DAROLD W. JACKSON, attorney William R. Richardson for HOWARD GOLDMAN, attorney William R. Richardson for THOMAS DRUCKER, attorney William R. Richardson for CURTIS A. DANEKAS, attorney William R. Richardson for HELEN S. BROWN, attorney William R. Richardson for ANTHONY O. BROWN, attorney William R. Richardson for PATRICIA M. ABBENE, attorney William R. Richardson for MICHAEL T. ABBENE Added Murray Alan Indick. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick. Service: 10/2/96 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Lance Jay Lerman (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 5/13/96) for Leave to File Response to Government's Motion to Adopt Special Case Management procedures . Response due: 5/30/96. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to submit a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 Status Report
                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS and USA. Service: 3/6/96. (HW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File Joint Status Report, out of time ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996, Terminated: 3/6/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service : 3/5/96 ) for Leave to File Joint Status Report, out of time . (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by leave of Judge. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision Staying proceedings pending outcome of WINSTAR and resetting Joint Status Report deadline to 12/4/95 with status report due at 90 day intervals. (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                              RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Service: 10/18/95) to [4-1] motion to Stay pending Winstar decision. Reply due: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995, Terminated: 11/2/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/6/95) to Stay pending Winstar decision . Response due: 10/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lance Jay Lerman. Service : 8/24/95 (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39877. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?