FIRST OF AMERICA, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00540-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Champion Federal Savings & Loan Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Wendell Allen +1 269 553 3501
No Logo First Of America Bank-illinois, NA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Wendell Allen +1 269 553 3501
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee McWethy Straus
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/10/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, re: discovery (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank 61 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Notice of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FIRST OF AMERICA and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (LTD)
        LREF
        Blank 60 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Remark
        Notification of change of telephone numbers received. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 59 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 58 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 ~Notice (other)
            CONCURRENCE by FIRST OF AMERICA and CHAMPION FEDERAL re: Response of Kutak Rock plaintiff's to defendant's motion to begin fact discovery in all remaining WINSTAR-RELATED CASES. Service: 4/17/01. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 57 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lee McWethy Straus Service : 11/15/00 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 56 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of change of address by John Wendell Allen (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 55 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Noel Kane. Service : 2/1/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 54 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of decision to "opt-out" of case-specific discovery by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL. Service: 4/28/99 (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 53 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                      See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 52 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/7/1999 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Recission of Earlier Notice of Decision to Opt-Out and Conditional Notice to Opt-Out by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL. Service: 4/1/99 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 51 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/99 ) for Leave to file motion to renew the stay of proceedings, etc. , (motion included). Response due: 1/21/99. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 50 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Decision to Opt-Out by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL. Service: 12/29/98 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 49 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Terminated:
                              MOTION by FIRST OF AMERICA (Service : 10/30/98 ) for Leave to file First of America's Tables Regarding Board Resolutions in Capital Letters/Other Documents Referenced in Summary Judgment Charts . Response due: 11/16/98. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 48 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                  REPLY by USA to response to [41-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/7/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [43-1] motion for Leave to File, Out of Time, Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Stay. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL (Service: 8/19/98 ) to [43-1] motion for Leave to File, Out of Time, Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Stay. Reply due: 8/31/98 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 8/11/98 ) for Leave to file supplemental authority with the court . Response due: 8/28/98. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 43 Filed: 8/7/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998, Terminated: 8/28/1998 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/7/98 ) for Leave to File, Out of Time, Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Stay. Response due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 42 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Response to Motion
                                            RESPONSE by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL (Service: 7/17/98 ) to [41-1] motion to Stay proceedings, etc. Reply due: 8/3/98. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 41 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/15/98 ) to Stay proceedings, etc. Response due: 8/5/98. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 40 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Memorandum
                                                SURREPLY by USA re: [39-1] response by CHAMPION FEDERAL, FIRST OF AMERICA. Service: 5/22/98 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Response
                                                  REPLY by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL to [38-1] response by USA. Service: 5/14/98 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [37-1] notice filing [proposed order] by CHAMPION FEDERAL, FIRST OF AMERICA. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 notice of filing
                                                      Notice of filing Proposed Order by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL. Service: 3/30/98 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                        RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98. (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                          Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [31-1] motion to Strike Affidavits . Service: 8/18/97 (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Leave to File out of time defendant's reply to response to motion to strike affidavits. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE by FIRST OF AMERICA (Service: 7/24/97 ) to [31-1] motion to Strike Affidavits. Reply due: 8/7/97 (DS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/11/97 ) to Strike Affidavits (and Reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment) filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 7/28/97 (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    (Motion to strike affidavits and) REPLY by USA to response to [18-1] cross motion filed [by leave of the judge] . Service: 7/11/97 (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk to file defendant's motion for leave to exceed the page limitation; granting [29-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation; directing the filing of defendant's motion; and directing the Clerk to correct the filing date on plaintiff's response to motion to strike to reflect its correct filing this day. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997, Terminated: 8/20/1997 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/11/97 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: motion to strike and reply brief in support of cross-motion filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997, Terminated: 9/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/18/97 ) for Leave to File out of time its reply to response to motion to strike affidavits . (HW) Modified on 08/21/1997
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Bruce Taylor. Service : 8/14/97 (DS) Modified on 08/21/1997
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to July 11, 1997, to respond to plaintiff's reply in support of its motion for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion reset to July 11, 1997. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/14/1997, Terminated: 7/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 6/30/97) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's reply in support of its motion for partial summary judgment (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File a joint response to two reply briefs ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/11/1997, Terminated: 6/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 5/30/97) for Leave to File a joint response to two reply briefs (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/21/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                      REPLY by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL to response to [16-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: acquisition of Gibson Federal Savings & Loan Association . Service: 5/20/97 (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                        RESPONSE by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL (Service: 5/12/97 ) to [18-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 5/29/97 (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER the Clerk of Court is directed to return plaintiff's document entitled Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from this order to resubmit its filing in compliance with the rules of the court ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/15/97) to plaintiff's [16-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: acquisition of Federal Savings & Loan Association. Reply due: 5/2/97. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/97) and RESPONSE to [15-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: acquisition of Home Savings & Loan Association of Aurora, Illinois by FIRST OF AMERICA, [14-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment on liability: five way merger by FIRST OF AMERICA. Response due: 3/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [18-1] cross motion reset to 3/24/97 (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/18/97) to Extend Time to respond to Motion for partial summary judgment until 2/21/97. Response due: 3/7/97. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by FIRST OF AMERICA (Service: 12/16/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability: acquisition of Gibson Federal Savings & Loan Association . Response due: 1/16/97 (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by FIRST OF AMERICA (Service: 12/16/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability: acquisition of Home Savings & Loan Association of Aurora, Illinois . Response due: 1/16/97 (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 12/17/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by FIRST OF AMERICA (Service: 12/16/96) for partial Summary Judgment on liability: five way merger . Response due: 1/16/97 (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/19/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File proposed pretrial order . Response due: 9/3/96 (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by FIRST OF AMERICA, CHAMPION FEDERAL (Service : 5/20/96 ) for Leave to File response to motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 6/6/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/25/96) for Leave to File Motion to Adopt Special Case Management Procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File notice and declaration re:certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay pending decision in Winstar ( signed by Judge Wilkes C. Robinson ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995, Terminated: 10/5/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/2/95) to Stay pending decision in Winstar . (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos. Service: 8/25/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Judge Wilkes C. Robinson. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39875. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?