HOME FEDERAL BANK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00541-RJY
District Judge Robert J. Yock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Matthew Buchanan +1 202 371 5787 +1 202 371 5950 tbuchana@winston.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Paul Levasseur +1 212 463 2000 llevasseur@mayerbrown.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 9/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5015'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 84 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [81] Notice of Appeal filed by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 83 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
    ORDER RETURNING motion for reconsideration (as premature) received 12/6/2004. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 82 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 05-5015 for [81] Notice of Appeal filed by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 81 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004, Terminated: 1/5/2005 Notice of Appeal
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB. Filing fee $255.00, receipt number 061706. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 80 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 79 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED OPINION granting defendant's RENEWED [74] CROSS MOTION to [13] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB filed by USA, and finding that the plaintiff cannot sustain causes of action for either breach of contract or for breach of contract implied in fact with respect to the plaintiff's acquisitions of First Federal, Security Federal and Second Federal; therefore, Count I (Breach of Contract) and Count II (Breach of Contract Implied in Law(Fact)) of the complaint are to be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 78 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER: On 2/3/2004, an Order was issued reassigning this case to Judge George Miller. In the interest of judicial economy, the order of 2/3/2004, is hereby vacated, and the case will remain assigned to the undersigned judge. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 77 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the case to Judge George Miller. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. [VACATED PER ORDER OF 2/3/2004] (jcp, ) Modified on 2/6/2004 (jcp, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank 76 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Description not available
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [74] CROSS MOTION to [13] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB filed by USA. Service: 2/2/04.(hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 75 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE to [74] Dft's Renewed CROSS MOTION to [13] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB. Reply due by 2/9/2004. Service: 1/23/2004.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 74 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Terminated:
                      RENEWED CROSS MOTION to [13] Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment by USA.Service: 12/23/03. Response due by 1/23/2004.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 73 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Stipulation
                        JOINT STIPULATION of Facts by all parties. Service: 12/23/03.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 72 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: Specifically, the involvement of the Bank Board in the Second Federal transaction, including but not limited to any acts of ratification, remains at issue. If the Dft (or the parties jointly) believes it can resolve this issue, as well as related factual issues and concerns raised by this Court's August 26, 2003 Opinion and its September 26, 2003 Order, without a further hearing or a trial, it may wish to file or refile a motion for summary judgment. To the extent the Pltf concedes any facts relevant to that motion, the parties should file a joint stipulation of facts to support the motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 71 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB, USA. (jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 70 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying [68] Motion for Reconsideration, granting [69] Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report. . Status Report due by 10/10/2003 Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (vro, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 69 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Terminated:
                                CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/10/03 to file Status Report by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB.Service: 9/22/03. Response due by 10/9/2003. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 68 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003, Terminated: 9/26/2003 Terminated:
                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re: [67] Published Opinion of August 27, 2003, by USA.Service: 9/9/03. Response due by 9/26/2003.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 67 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                    PUBLISHED OPINION: For the foregoing reasons, the [13] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (as to liability) is DENIED, and the [16] Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (as to liability) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the Dft's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the First Federal and Security Federal transactions and DENIED as to the Second Federal transaction. The parties are ordered to file, on or before 9/30/2003, a status report (joint, if possible) as to their views on future proceedings regarding liability and potential damages in the Second Federal transaction.Signed by Judge Robert J. Yock. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 66 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Firm Name Change from Winston & Strawn to Winston & Strawn LLP by HOME FEDERAL BANK OF TENNESSEE, FSB. Service: 7/28/03.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 65 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Memorandum
                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by USA re: September 20, 2002 Notice of Supplemental Authority. Service: 10/17/02. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 64 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [62-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 63 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Response to Motion
                                            RESPONSE by HOME FEDERAL BANK (Service by hand: 10/7/02) to [62-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority. Reply due: 10/17/02. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 62 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002, Terminated: 10/21/2002 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/20/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority and Statement Regarding Oral Argument. Response due: 10/7/02. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 61 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Motions for oral argument are due by /20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002
                                                  RESPONSE by HOME FEDERAL BANK (Service: 5/16/02) to [59-1] motion for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority. Reply due: 5/31/02. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 5/13/02) for Leave to file notice of supplemental authority . Response due: 5/30/02. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [57-1] motion to Extend Time to complete expert discovery . Discovery deadline reset to 4/25/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002, Terminated: 4/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/9/02) to Extend Time to complete expert discovery , (until April 25, 2002), and statement concerning further proceedings in this case. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Memorandum
                                                          MEMORANDUM filed by USA in response to [54-1] memorandum by HOME FEDERAL BANK. Service: 3/22/02 (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 28, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Memorandum
                                                              MEMORANDUM filed by HOME FEDERAL BANK supplementing its motion for partial summary judgment. Service: 3/11/02 (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002
                                                                JUDGMENT entered, as provided for in RUle 54(b) that Count III of the complaint, filed August 8, 1995, is dismissed, with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER directing plaintiff to file its supplemental brief to the January 12, 2001 filing and October 10, 2000 filing on or before 3/11/02 , and the defendant will follow with its brief on or before March 22, 2002. Further proceedings will be scheduled upon completion of discovery. The clerk is directed to dismiss with prejudice Count III of the complaint filed on August 8, 1995, as there is no just reason for delay. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Status Conference
                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/15/02 ) (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:30 a.m. 2/28/02, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                        CASE reassigned to Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock . (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER re: reassignment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luke Paul Levasseur. Service: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ann Leppert Loughlin. Service: 4/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/13/01. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/13/01. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [43-1] motion to clarify current date reply brief is due, granting [43-2] motion to Extend Time within which to file reply brief Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/13/01 for [37-1] cross motion . ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/23/01 ) to clarify current date reply brief is due , and to Extend Time within which to file reply brief , (until February 13, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by HOME FEDERAL BANK, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/14/00 (HW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by HOME FEDERAL BANK, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/14/00 (HW)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by HOME FEDERAL BANK (Service: 12/14/00 ) to [37-1] supplemental cross motion filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/11/01 (DS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luke Paul Levasseur Service : 12/21/00. (HW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by HOME FEDERAL BANK (Service : 11/13/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 2/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL CROSS MOTION to dismiss and for partial summary judgment, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA ( Service: 10/10/00 ) and RESPONSE to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment by HOME FEDERAL BANK Response due: 12/4/00 (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by HOME FEDERAL BANK. Service: 9/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ann Leppert Loughlin. Service : 8/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                            See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 8/10/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/10/98) for Leave to file Supplemental Authority with the Court Response due: 8/27/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Response
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by HOME FEDERAL BANK to [28-1] notice (Motion for a Stay of Proceedings) by USA. Service: 7/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Motion for Stay by USA. Service: 7/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to file sur-reply to May 29, 1998. ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 Response
                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to [24-1] response by HOME FEDERAL BANK. Service: 5/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998, Terminated: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/22/98 ) to Extend Time to file sur-reply [to May 29, 1998]. Response due: 6/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Response
                                                                                                                              REPLY by HOME FEDERAL BANK to [23-1] response by USA. Service: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [22-1] proposed order by HOME FEDERAL BANK. Service: 4/30/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                  Proposed order by HOME FEDERAL BANK re: [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment by HOME FEDERAL BANK filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 3/31/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1997, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                      Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [16-1] cross motion. Service: 1/7/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by HOME FEDERAL BANK (Service: 11/24/97 ) to [16-1] cross motion, reply in support of [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment.Reply due 12/8/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            (120 - day) RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/24/97 ) to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 11/10/97 (HW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA ( Service: 8/25/97 ) and RESPONSE to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment by HOME FEDERAL BANK (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE pursuant to the Court's Orders of September 10 and September 11, 1997 by HOME FEDERAL BANK Service: 9/16/97 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/25/97 ) to [13-1] motion for partial summary judgment and in support of defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 9/8/97 (CDC) Modified on 09/22/1997
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by HOME FEDERAL BANK (Service : 6/26/97 ) for Summary Judgment , together with separate one volume appendix. [IN CAMERA] Response due: 10/20/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER correcting clerical error in September 10, 1997 order; directing plaintiff to file its motion for partial summary judgment by 9/19/97 . ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Plaintiff shall file Motion for partial Summary judgment by 10/16/97 ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/24/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/24/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/12/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Mark Arnold Melnick (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain documents that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/17/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay Proceedings and directing parties to file a status report on or before 30 days after date of decision (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995, Terminated: 10/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/95 ) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Mark Arnold Melnick Service : 8/21/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 3), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39874, Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?