POLIFLY FINANCIAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00543-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo POLIFLY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Angel
No Logo POLIFLY SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Angel
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodger Daniel Citron
No Logo Fdic, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda A. Marcusen +1 214 754 0098
Office COFC
Filed 8/9/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/17/2002
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
193-cv-00038-LAS None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by POLIFLY FINANCIAL and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (LTD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (LTD)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER re: discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        SEE 93-38C FOR ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to File Motion to Consolidate (93-38C); and granting motion to consolidate filed in 93-38C. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Set/Clear Flags
          Consolidated Member Case. See lead case number 93- 38C for further proceedings. (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Opt Out by POLIFLY FINANCIAL, POLIFLY SAVINGS. Service: 1/30/98 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998, Terminated: 2/20/1998 Terminated:
              MOTION by FDIC (Service : 1/9/98 ) for Leave to File Motion to Consolidate (93-38C) . Response due: 1/26/98 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 Terminated:
                MOTION by FDIC (Service : 10/28/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Michael Patrick Condon for FDIC Added Linda A. Marcusen. (DS)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Amended Complaint
                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by POLIFLY FINANCIALfiled by leave of judge. Service: 4/16/97 (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/14/1997 Terminated:
                    MOTION by POLIFLY FINANCIAL, POLIFLY SAVINGS (Service : 3/27/97 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Charles J. Cooper for POLIFLY SAVINGS, and POLIFLY FINANCIAL Added Stephen R. Angel . (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Intervenor Complaint
                      Intervenor's COMPLAINT by FDIC against USA. Fee not Required. Service: 3/27/97. ( Answer due 5/29/97 ) (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/19/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER set Notice of Compliance [substitution of counsel] deadline to 4/21/97 , or to Show Cause within 14 days of the withdrawal (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 Terminated:
                          MOTION by POLIFLY FINANCIAL, POLIFLY SAVINGS (Service: 2/11/97) for Michael A. Carvin, Charles J. Cooper, Roert J. Cynkar and Vincent J. Colatriano to Withdraw as Attorney . Response due: 2/28/97 (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rodger Daniel Citron. Service : 11/15/96 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Martha Susan Hirschfield. Service : 10/30/96. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996
                                NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                  NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Cooper (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                    SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                          NOTICE of change of address by Deborah Ann Bynum (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                            RESPONSE by POLIFLY FINANCIAL, POLIFLY SAVINGS (Service: 5/8/96 ) to [10-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 5/20/96 (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain docucments that may be relevant to this action (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96 ) for Leave to File notice and declaration re: certain docucments that may be relevant to this action . Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Deborah Ann Bynum Service : 10/31/95 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion to stay proceedings, this case is suspended until 11/28/95, pending decision by defendant whether to file petition for writ of certiorari in 92-5164. If petition for writ is filed, case is suspended until the later dates upon which the Supreme Court denies petition or renders its final decision, if petition is not filed, defendant shall respond to complaint by 12/28/95 ( signed by Judge Christine O. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995, Terminated: 10/12/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/95 ) to Stay Proceedings . (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller Service : 8/29/95 (HW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                            NOTICE by POLIFLY FINANCIAL, POLIFLY SAVINGS of related case(s). (93-38 C). (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39872. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?