SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00544-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crawford Lewis, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Lewis +1 225 343 5290 jlewis@crawford-lewis.com
No Logo SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crawford Lewis, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James R. Lewis +1 225 343 5290 jlewis@crawford-lewis.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Thomas infelise +1 202 616 8254 +1 202 514 8624 jeffery.infelise@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/9/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County
Terminated 11/23/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-5044'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 124 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [118] Published Order/Opinion. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 123 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 05-5044 for [122] Notice of Appeal filed by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC., FIRST LOUISIANA BANK. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 122 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC., FIRST LOUISIANA BANK. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 062155. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 121 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
        [CORRECTED VERSION] PUBLISHED OPINION granting [94] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages. The Clerk shall enter judgment for the Defendant. Each party shall bear it's own costs. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 120 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Terminated:
          MOTION for Correction of [118] Published Order/Opinion Dated 11/23/2004 by USA.Service: 11/30/2004. Response due by 12/17/2004. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 119 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
            JUDGMENT, entered pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint. Each party shall bear its own costs. (dls)
              LREF
              Blank 118 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Court Filing
              PUBLISHED OPINION GRANTING [94] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Each party is to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls)
                LREF
                Blank 117 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 28, 2004 before Judge Baskir. (lg1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 116 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDERED: This Court held an oral argument on the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. At the argument we requested that the Plaintiff provide the Court and the Defendant with a copy of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Because the Plaintiff has informed the Court that its Motion is contained within the text of its brief, a copy is unnecessary. Also, with the consent of the parties, the Protective Order in this matter is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004
                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/28/2004. (vp1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 115 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Supplemental Brief
                      SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of [94] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by USA. Service: 9/1/2004.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 114 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Supplemental Brief
                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Addressing the Federal Circuit's Decision in Admiral, by FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC. Service: 8/10/2004.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 113 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Supplemental Brief
                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of [100] Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages and in Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC. Service: 8/10/2004.(jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 112 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: On 8/5/2004, the Federal Circuit handed down its decision in Admiral Financial Corp. v. US, Case No. 03-5168. Should the parties wish to address the Federal Circuit's ruling in Admiral, they may submit supplemental briefs by no later than 9/1/2004. The briefs are limited to five pages in length. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 111 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                              ORDER: This Order confirms that the Court will hold Oral Argument on the record on Tuesday, 9/28/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 110 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of [94] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages. Service: 7/28/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir: Status Conference scheduled for 6/30/04, was CANCELLED. (dcl)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 109 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The Dft's Supplemental Brief is due no later than 7/28/2004.The Pltfs' opposition to the Dft's supplemental brief is due no later than 8/11/2004. There will be no reply brief. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 108 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Joint Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, USA. Service: 6/21/2004.(hw1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 107 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Status Conference on the record will be held on Wednesday, 6/30/2004 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 6/23/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 106 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery Thomas Infelise for USA. Service: 3/29/2004.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 105 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: On 3/5/2004, the Dft filed [103] Motion for Expedited Argument on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment on Damages. Because the Motion provided the Court with extremely short notice in this complex case the Motion is hereby denied. The Court intends to hold a telephonic status conference. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report, no later than one week before the status conference. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 104 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Statement of Facts
                                              CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC., USA. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 103 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Expedited Argument on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment on Damages by USA.Service: 3/5/2004. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Description not available
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [100] CROSS MOTION to [94] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, [94] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC.. Service: 02/26/2004.(lld, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Response to Motion
                                                    OPPOSITION to [100] Pltf's CROSS MOTION and REPLY IN SUPPORT of [94] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages with Appendix filed by USA. Reply due by 2/26/2004. Service: 2/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Terminated:
                                                      CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to [94] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume by FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC. Service: 1/8/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, ) Modified on 8/13/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [97] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Pltf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages. Dft's reply to its Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages and response to Pltfs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages is due no later than 2/9/2004. Pltfs' reply is due no later than 2/26/2004. Parties' Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts shall be filed no later than 3/5/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact by FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 3/5/2004. Reply due by 2/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004, Terminated: 1/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC.Service: 1/8/2004. Response due by 1/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 1/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER (Revised June 10, 2003). Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 1/6/2004 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER RETURNING AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Order returns 1) Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages; 2) Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages; and 3) Pltf's Proposed Findings of Facts, along with the Appendix for the following reasons: 1) the index to the appendix is to be located in both the front of the brief and in front of the appendix. 2) the brief, supporting memorandum, and affidavits to be attached to motion. 3) cross-motions should be combined in the same document as the response. 4) This Court's Special Procedures Order requires parties to file a Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in lieu of individual statements. Pltfs are ORDERED to file the corrected documents FORTHWITH, in any event no later than 1/9/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages and Memorandum in Support, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes, by USA.Service: 11/19/03. Response due by 12/19/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/19/03.(jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 27, 2003 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (hw1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir: Status Conference held at 10am, on 10/27/03 (by phone). (dcl)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:The Dft shall submit a copy of Federal Home Bank Board Resolution No. 84-571, as referenced on page 22 of the Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, to both this Court and the Pltfs. Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages is due no later than 11/19/2003. Pltfs' Response is due no later than 12/19/2003. Dft's Reply is due no later than 1/9/2004. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003
                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/28/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [77] Notice of Appeal filed by FDIC (hw1, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC. and USA. Service: 10/3/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/27/2003 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:The Court intends to hold a telephonic Status Conference in this matter during October 13-31, 2003. The parties shall notify the Court's Judicial Assistant, of three mutually convenient dates for the Status Conference no later than 9/24/2003. In preparation for the Status Conference, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report, no later than 10/3/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE of filing of original signature on consolidated statement of uncontroverted facts by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT. Service: 1/9/03. (LTD)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Statement of Facts
                                                                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 12/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [83-1] motion for Leave to file facsimile copy of plaintiff's consel's on consolidated statement of uncontroverted facts (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002, Terminated: 12/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION by USA. (Service : 12/4/02 ) for Leave to file facsimile copy of plaintiff's consel's on consolidated statement of uncontroverted facts. Response due: 12/23/02 (VO)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                REPLY by USA re: in support of [78-1] response by USA. Service: 12/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                  [SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF and appendix] and RESPONSE by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT to [78-1] response by USA. Service: 11/14/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [79-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to defendant's supplemental brief Response to Supplemental Brief deadline to 11/15/02 and Defendant's Reply and Parties' Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts deadline to 12/4/02 (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002, Terminated: 11/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT and FIRST LOUISIANA BANK (Service: 11/4/02) to Extend Time to file a response to defendant's supplemental brief , (until November 14, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                        [Supplemental brief in support of its motion for summary judgment as to liability and to dismiss all plaintiffs] RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [76-3] order (together with separate appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/7/02 (HW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                          CAFC Case Number Re: [77-1] appeal by FDIC. CAFC NUMBER: 03-5004. (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by FDIC. Copy to Plaintiff, Defendant, Judge Lawrence M. Baskir and to C.A.F.C. Fee Not paid. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002
                                                                                                              JUDGMENT entered, as provided in RCFC 54(b), that the FDIC's complaint-in-intervention is dismissed and judgment is entered in favor of defendant as to the claims of the FDIC. Each party to bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Defendant's supplemental brief due 10/8/02 and Plaintiff's response to Defendant's supplemental brief due 11/7/02 , and Defendant's reply, not to exceed 10 pages, and the parties CSUF is due 11/25/02 (signed by Judge M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff-in-intervention FDIC, filed October 10, 2000, and directing the clerk to dismiss the FDIC's complaint in intervention, pursuant to Rule 54(b) as ther is no just reason for delay and to enter judgment for the defendant as to the claims of the FDIC. Each party to bear its own costs. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Response
                                                                                                                    REPLY by FDIC to [70-1] response by USA. Service: 7/17/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [71-1] motion for Leave to file reply brief. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002, Terminated: 7/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by FDIC (Service: 7/17/02) for Leave to file reply brief . Response due: 8/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Response
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [68-1] order. Service: 7/10/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by FDIC (Service: 6/24/02) to [67-1] motion for Leave to respond to FDIC's brief in response to the court's order to show cause, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [67-1] motion for Leave to respond to FDIC's brief in response to the court's order to show cause. Defendant shall reply by 7/10/02. The defendant's brief shall be limited to ten (10) pages ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002, Terminated: 6/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 6/11/02) for Leave to respond to FDIC's brief in response to the court's order to show cause . Response due: 6/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002
                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint as to plaintiff, Odon L. Bacque, Jr.. Each party to bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [36-1] cross motion; and pursuant to Rule 54(b), there being no just reason for delay, directing the Clerk to enter judgment dismissing the complaint as to plaintiff, Odon L. Bacque, Jr.. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by ODON L. BACQUE to [60-1] order, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/13/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FDIC to [60-1] order. Service: 5/10/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 11, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. Show Cause Response and Joint Appendix due 5/13/02 for FDIC and ODON L. BACQUE. (LTD) Modified on 04/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/13/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Joint Status Report due 5/24/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Joint Status Report due 3/18/02 , and Status Conference set for 10:00 a.m. on 4/11/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Special Procedures (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Joint Status Report deadline to 3/11/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                            CASE reassigned to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, effective February 1, 2002. Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: reassigment of cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [52-1] motion to Extend Time to deliver the expert report (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001, Terminated: 6/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE (Service: 6/25/01) to Extend Time to deliver the expert report , (30 days). Response due: 7/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Colleen Ann Conry. Service: 3/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [36-1] cross motion, together with a separate appendix. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/12/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [47-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (Filed by leave of the Judge) by FDIC to response to [45-1] cross motion. Service: 1/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION, out of time, by USA (Service : 1/12/01 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: reply brief. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by FDIC, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/15/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by FDIC ( Service: 12/15/00 ) and RESPONSE to [36-1] cross motion by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/13/00. UNDER SEAL. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/13/00 ) to [34-1] motion for Summary Judgment, (together with a separate appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/8/01. UNDER SEAL. (HW) Modified on 01/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Corrected Certificate of Service by FEDERAL DEPOSIT Service: 12/15/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 1/16/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT (Service: 12/15/00 ) to [36-1] cross motion. Reply due: 1/12/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE. Service: 12/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by FEDERAL DEPOSIT (Service: 12/4/00) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/21/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/29/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 10/10/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 10/12/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 5/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION, together with two volumes of appendix, by USA ( Service: 10/10/00 ) and RESPONSE to [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability by ODON L. BANQUE, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT FILED UNDER SEAL. Response due: 11/29/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FEDERAL DEPOSIT. Service: 10/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FEDERAL DEPOSIT (Service : 10/10/00 ) for Summary Judgment. Response due: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/27/00 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [28-1] motion for continuance on the motion of Plaintiffs Southwest Investment and Odon L. Bacque for partial summary judgment on liability. Service: 11/8/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/7/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/29/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiffs' response to motion for continuance on the Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment on liability (7 days). Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/15/99 (JT) Modified on 11/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/7/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE (Service: 10/21/99 ) to [28-1] motion for continuance on the motion of Plaintiffs Southwest Investment and Odon L. Bacque for partial summary judgment on liability. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FEDERAL DEPOSIT (Service: 9/28/99) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney James Joseph Igo for FEDERAL DEPOSIT Added Stephen Chesney Zachary . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 9/22/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/99 ) for continuance on the motion of Plaintiffs Southwest Investment and Odon L. Bacque for partial summary judgment on liability. Response due: 10/12/99 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER memorializing the oral order of the court of August 11, 1998. Pursuant to that oral order, consideration of the motions for summary judgment, including any briefing not yet complete, is stayed until October 13, 1998. (See Order in 90-8) ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [24-1] motion to Stay proceedings on motion for partial summary judgment until the case enters discovery in accordance with Procedural Order Number 1. Service: 7/30/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE (Service: 7/10/98 ) to [24-1] motion to Stay proceedings on motion for partial summary judgment until the case enters discovery in accordance with Procedural Order Number 1. Reply due: 7/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/24/98) to Stay proceedings on motion for partial summary judgment until the case enters discovery in accordance with Procedural Order Number 1 Response due: 7/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE (Service: 6/17/98 ) to [22-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 6/29/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/1/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for partial summary judgment , (23 days). Response due: 6/18/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE (Service : 4/1/98 ) for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability . Response due: 6/1/98 (JT) Modified on 01/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by FEDERAL DEPOSIT. Service: 3/20/97. Answer due 5/19/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Elizabeth Wells Newsom. Service: 12/11/96. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT to FDIC's motion to intervene which was filed in 90-8C. Service: 11/21/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE 90-581C FOR ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 8/19/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Lauren Springer Moore (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996, Terminated: 7/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the attached motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/5/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE 90-581C for ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 4/11/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/20/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/8/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE (Filed by leave of the Judge). Service: 12/19/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER returning Plaintiff's status report for correction of defects [Rules 11, 81(d) and 81(d)(1)] and directing Clerk to file by leave of Judge once corrected (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEE ORDER in 90-581C re stay & filing of papers under stay . (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEE 95-250C for STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status report due on 11/15/95, staying proceedings until 12/1/95 and directing parties to file any objections to stay by 11/2/95 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/95) to Stay pending Winstar decisions or to Extend Time to respond to complaint [60 days from denial of motion to stay]. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Lauren Springer Moore. Service: 9/7/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by SOUTHWEST INVESTMENT, FIRST LOUISIANA BANK, ODON L. BANQUE of related case(s). (90-8 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39871. Answer due on 10/10/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?