HALEY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00560-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BARRY W. HALEY, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luis Manuel Pereira Matos +1 202 514 4325
Office COFC
Filed 8/18/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/26/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Joint Status Report
Quarterly JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 1/3/2006.(mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/24/1999 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE re: error in Certificate of Service (attached to its motion for enlargement of time file January 14, 1999) by USA. Service: 1/20/99 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 10/2/1995 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A). Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 10/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file an amended petition and set Notice of Compliance [amended complaint] deadline to 10/20/95 (signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: 10/2/1995 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/1995, Entered: 9/26/1995, Terminated: 9/26/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
            MOTION by BARRY W. HALEY (Service : 9/21/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file an amended petition , (within 30 days of signing of this order), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/10/95. Copy to defendant. (HW) Modified on 09/26/1995
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER to Show Cause , and set Response to Show Cause (an amended complaint) due: 9/19/95 for BARRY W. HALEY ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos Service : 8/29/95 (HW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39915. Answer due on 10/17/95. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 160 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?