NICKERSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00566-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSEPH E. NICKERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John William Hofmeyer, III +1 319 283 4785
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Agnes Marie Brown +1 202 307 1011
Office COFC
Filed 8/21/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/20/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated June 2, 1997, affirmed [38-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/23/1996 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [39-1] appeal by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON. CAFC NUMBER: 96-5120. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON. Copy to USA, Judge Futey and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 041882. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 Judgment*
        JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing complaint for lack of jurisdiction. No costs (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Published DecisionCourt Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 Terminated Case
            Case closed. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 36 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
              NOTICE of additional documentation requested during Oral Argument by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 5/8/96. (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                NOTICE to the Court by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/1/96 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/8/1996 Transcript
                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: telephone conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 25, 1996. Notice to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996 Description not available
                    Tele-conference held. ( Transcript due 4/30/96 ) (5 days) (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 4/4/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [30-1] motion for telephone conference and set Telephone Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 4/25/96 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/29/96) to [31-1] motion to consider affidavit. Reply due: 4/12/96 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 4/2/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON (Service: 3/22/96) to consider affidavit . Response due: 4/8/96 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996, Terminated: 3/29/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                            MOTION by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON (Service: 3/13/96) for telephone conference by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/1/96 (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                              COUNTER-STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/5/96 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY by USA to response to [16-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 3/5/96 (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's resistance to motion for judgment upon the administrative record and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/5/96 for [16-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996, Terminated: 2/26/1996 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/16/96) to Extend Time to reply to plaintiff's resistance to motion for judgment upon the administrative record until 3/5/96. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      RESPONSE by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON (Service: 2/5/96 ) to [16-1] motion for Summary Judgment, by leave of Judge. Reply due: 2/22/96. (HW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                        Counter STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 2/5/96. ` (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to motion for judgment and Response to [16-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 2/5/96 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Administrative Record
                                            Administrative record [two volumes] filed by USA. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File administrative record and granting [15-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 04/02/1996
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996, Terminated: 1/23/1996 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON (Service : 1/11/96 ) to Extend Time to file response to motion for judgment (to February 5, 1996). (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [18-1] motion for Entry of Default as to USA answer and filing said motion this date (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996, Terminated: 1/2/1996 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON (Service: 12/14/95) for Entry of Default as to USA . (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 2/9/1996 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/19/95 (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: 1/3/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/19/95) for Summary Judgment . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/19/96 (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995, Terminated: 1/22/1996 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 12/19/95) for Leave to File administrative record and for Waiver of Duplication . Response due: 1/5/96 (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to December 19, 1995]. Response due: 1/4/96 (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint ; set Answer deadline to 12/18/95 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE of intention to object to any further motions for enlargements of time by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON [by leave of the Judge]. Service: 11/30/95. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995, Terminated: 12/13/1995 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/8/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to December 18, 1995]. Response due: 12/26/95 (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint ; set Answer deadline to 12/8/95 ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/22/1995, Terminated: 11/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/17/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 12/8/95. Response due: 12/4/95 (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 11/17/95 (signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 11/2/1995, Terminated: 11/1/1995 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/27/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 11/17/95. Response due: 11/13/95 (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995 Order
                                                                            ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint and reset Answer deadline to 10/27/95 (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/17/1995, Terminated: 10/16/1995 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/11/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint , (until October 27, 1995). (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Agnes Marie Brown Service : 8/28/95 (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                  NOTICE by JOSEPH E. NICKERSON of no related case(s). (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through D), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #39921. Answer due on 10/20/95. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?