CHARETTE, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:94-vv-00492-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CAROLYN CHARETTE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Gregory Williams +1 413 784 1240
No Logo GARY G. CHARETTE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Gregory Williams +1 413 784 1240
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Milmoe +1 202 616 4125 mike.milmoe@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/1/1994
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/11/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/26/1995 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) denying petitioner's fee petition (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/20/1995 Published Decision of Special Master - Fees
    Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright re: attorneys' fees and costs. Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Order
      ORDER Response to [11-1] motion for Attorney Fees reset to 8/11/95 (signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/11/1995 Terminated:
        MOTION by CAROLYN CHARETTE, GARY G. CHARETTE (Service : 5/30/95 ) for Attorney Fees Response due: 6/16/95 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Appendix J paragraph 30, dismissing the petition (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties and Judge. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995 Terminated Case
            Case closed. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995 Published DecisionCourt Filing
              PUBLISHED DECISION entered denying [6-1] motion For review of Special Master's Decision Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 05/12/1995
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/10/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                RESPONSE by HHS (Service: 1/8/95 ) to [6-1] motion For review of Special Master's Decision Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright (Judge's decision due on 5/9/95). Reply due: 2/27/95 (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Notice of assignment to Judge Moody R. Tidwell III. Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                    MOTION by CAROLYN CHARETTE (Service : 1/5/95 ) For review of Special Master's Decision Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright (Judge's decision due on 5/9/95) . Response due: 2/6/95 (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/16/1994 DECISION of Special Master
                      Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright dismissing petition. Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994 Terminated:
                        MOTION by HHS (Service : 10/31/94 ) to Dismiss Response due: 12/1/94 (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994 Respondent's Report
                          RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 10/31/94 (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Michael Patrick Milmoe Service : 10/31/94 (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                              NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994 Petition
                                PETITION by CAROLYN CHARETTE. FILING FEE $ 120. RECEIPT # 37297. Vac. Date: 8/8/92. (Respondent's report due). (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 9/9/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?