ABELLA, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00002-MRT
District Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ABRAHAM ABELLA, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E.H. Tagupa +2247 278 988 2897
No Logo FREEMAN BAKER, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E.H. Tagupa +2247 278 988 2897
No Logo MICHAEL B. MARTIN, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E.H. Tagupa +2247 278 988 2897
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rhonda Kay Schnare
Office COFC
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/22/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 2, 1996, affirmed [30-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996 CAFC Mandate Affirming
    MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 2, 1996, affirmed [30-1] judgment order. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number Re: [33-1] appeal by MICHAEL B. MARTIN, FREEMAN BAKER and ABRAHAM ABELLA. CAFC NUMBER: 96-5058. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by ABRAHAM ABELLA, FREEMAN BAKER, MICHAEL B. MARTIN. Copy to USA, Judge Tidwell and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00, RECEIPT # 040754. (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER mooting [31-1] motion to schedule hearing on plaintiff's and defendant's motions for summary judgment (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995 Judgment*
            JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58 dismissing the complaint. Costs to defendant (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995 Terminated Case
              Case closed. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 29 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/27/1995 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                PUBLISHED DECISION denying [21-1] cross motion and granting [12-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995 Terminated:
                  MOTION by ABRAHAM ABELLA, FREEMAN BAKER, MICHAEL B. MARTIN (Service : 11/16/95) to schedule hearing on plaintiff's and defendant's motions for summary judgment Response due: 12/4/95 (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment and Response to [21-1] cross motion reset to 7/31/95 (signed by Judge Moody R. III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/31/95) to [21-1] cross motion. Reply due: 8/17/95 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/31/1995, Entered: 8/4/1995 Statement of Genuine Issues
                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 7/31/95 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995, Terminated: 8/2/1995 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/26/95) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment (to July 31, 1995). Response due: 8/14/95 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment Response to [21-1] cross motion reset to 7/26/95 ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995, Terminated: 7/6/1995 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service: 6/29/95) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment (to July 26, 1995) filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER allowing the filing of defendant's motion for enlargement of time (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Terminated:
                                  CROSS MOTION by ABRAHAM ABELLA, et al. (Service: 6/7/95) and RESPONSE to [12-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Response due: 7/10/95 (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                    STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by ABRAHAM ABELLA, FREEMAN BAKER, MICHAEL B. MARTIN filed by leave the judge. Service: 5/26/95 (FE) Modified on 06/02/1995
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ABRAHAM ABELLA, FREEMAN BAKER, MICHAEL B. MARTIN filed by leave of the judge. Service: 6/7/95 (per amended certificate of service received on 6/12/95) (FE) Modified on 06/12/1995
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 Court Filing
                                        ORDER entered returning plaintiffs' motion for enlargement, etc. as MOOT because it was filed by leave of the court (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 Court Filing
                                          ORDER entered returning plaintiff's proposed finding of fact, etc. [fourth attempt] for the following defects: 1) untimely; 2) Does not comply with rule 56(d); 3) does not comply with rule 83.2(e); and 4) proposed findings should be captioned proposed finds of uncontrovered fact. Once corrections are made, these documents should be filed by leave of the court if out of time, with defendant's time to respond to run from the date of re-service (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 5/8/1995, Entered: 5/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER entered returning plaintiffs' memorandum of law in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment, etc., received on 5/5/95 for the following corrections: Rules 5(e), 56(d), 10(a), and General order 32. Once corrections have been made, document will be filed by leave of the court, if it is out time, with defendant's counsel's time to respond to run from date of re-service (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER returning Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment for correction of defects [does not comply with Rules 56(d), 82(c) and 83.2(e)] and directing Clerk to FILE BY LEAVE OF JUDGE ONCE CORRECTED (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER returning Plaintiff's memorandum of law in opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment for correction of defects [does not comply with Rules 56(d), 82(c) and 10(a)] and directing Clerk to FILE BY LEAVE OF JUDGE ONCE CORRECTIONS ARE MADE (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA Service: 3/31/95 (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 4/4/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/31/95) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 5/1/95 (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER entered granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint Answer deadline to 3/31/95 (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995, Terminated: 3/24/1995 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 3/23/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to March 31, 1995]. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER entered granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's complaint ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Order
                                                            ORDER entered granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's complaint Answer deadline to 3/23/95 (signed by Clerk of Court). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995, Terminated: 3/20/1995 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/17/95 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's complaint (to March 23, 1995) (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 3/17/95 (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995, Terminated: 3/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/3/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until March 17, 1995). Response due: 3/20/95 (HW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER entered re: enlargement of time and for filing of separate requests for oral argument (signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell III) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 02/16/1995
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Rhonda Kay Schnare. Service : 1/9/95. (HW) Modified on 02/16/1995
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Moody R. Tidwell III. Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 02/16/1995
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through G), FILING FEE $ 120, RECEIPT #38318. Answer due on 3/6/95. (FE) Modified on 02/16/1995
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?