ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00039-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin L. Fountain +1 202 879 7645 +1 202 626 1700 elfountain@jonesday.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Jacob Todor +1 202 616 2382 +1 202 514 8640 john.todor@usdoj.gov
No Logo COMPASS POINT PARTNERS LLC, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 16th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Allan Traina +1 310 552 3800 +1 310 552 9434 ptraina@elllaw.com
No Logo FRANK E. WILLIAMS, JR., Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 16th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Allan Traina +1 310 552 3800 +1 310 552 9434 ptraina@elllaw.com
No Logo LEGAL ALPHA LLC, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 16th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Allan Traina +1 310 552 3800 +1 310 552 9434 ptraina@elllaw.com
No Logo STEPHEN ROSENBAUM, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 16th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Allan Traina +1 310 552 3800 +1 310 552 9434 ptraina@elllaw.com
Office COFC
Filed 1/13/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County
Terminated 6/27/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED
  Entries (395) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 364 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 349 Motion to Strike, denying 354 Motion to Intervene, and denying 357 Motion to Intervene Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mt) Copy to parties.
    LREF
    Blank 362
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
      RESPONSE to 357 Motion to Intervene,, filed by USA. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to 357 First MOTION to Intervene of Stephen Rosenbaum, Frank E. Williams, Compass Point Capital and Legal Alpha LLC, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 6/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 354 MOTION to Intervene, filed by LINDA NEUFELD. Service: 5/9/2012.(vro) (vro). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 354 MOTION to Intervene, filed by LINDA NEUFELD. Service: 5/4/2012.(vro) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012 Motion to Intervene
              First MOTION to Intervene of Stephen Rosenbaum, Frank E. Williams, Compass Point Capital and Legal Alpha LLC, filed by STEPHEN ROSENBAUM, FRANK E. WILLIAMS, JR, COMPASS POINT PARTNERS LLC, LEGAL ALPHA LLC.Response due by 5/21/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits [Part 1 of 2], # 2 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits [Part 2 of 2], # 3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order to Motion to Intervene)(Traina, Paul) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to 354 MOTION to Intervene, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 5/10/2012. (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to 354 MOTION to Intervene, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/7/2012. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Motion to Intervene
                    MOTION to Intervene, filed by LINDA NEUFELD. Service: 4/24/2012.Response due by 5/11/2012.(vro) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 Response
                      RESPONSE to Motion to Intervene, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 Response
                        RESPONSE to Motion to Intervene, filed by USA. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 349 MOTION to Strike, filed by USA. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: 3/27/2012 Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Motion to Strike
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Notice of Additional Authority
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: 6/16/2011 Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 343 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER STAYING MOTIONS--Filed this date. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 342 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB Plaintiff's Notice of Submission (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 339 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 329 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 329 , filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 340 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Response to Motion
                                                RESPONSE to 339 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendant's 329 Motion to Dismiss, filed by USA. (Schunk, Jacob) Modified on 11/9/2010 to correct text(jt1). (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 329 , filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Response due by 11/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Sur-reply, # 2 Exhibit 9 to Plaintiff's Sur-reply)(Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 321 MOTION for Award of a Tax Gross-Up, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 329 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply
                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 4, 2010 to File Reply as to 329 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 10/4/2010.(Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 304 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Notice of Appeal
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Response to Motion [Dispositive]
                                                            RESPONSE to 329 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 9/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits 1-8)(Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 303 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                                                              CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated June 27, 2008, forwarded to Edwin Louis Fountain. (bre, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 334 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Tax Gross-Up, MOTION to Expedite, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Response due by 9/20/2010.(Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 302 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                                                                  AMENDED JUDGMENT enterered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $356,454,910.91. (lld)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 333 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Response
                                                                    RESPONSE to Gross-Up Motion (Exhibit C), filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3(1), # 4 Exhibit 3(2), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 301 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER CORRECTING CLERICAL MISTAKE PURSUANT TO RCFC 60(a) granting [298] Motion Amend Judgment. The Clerk is directed to AMEND judgment to correctly reflect a final judgment of $356,454,910.91. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 332 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE to 321 MOTION for Award of a Tax Gross-Up, filed by USA.Reply due by 9/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B(1), # 3 Exhibit B(2))(Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 300 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE to [299] MOTION, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 7/21/2008. Service: 7/8/2008.(vro)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE, filed by USA and Request To Take Judicial Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 299 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Terminated:
                                                                              Renewed MOTION to correct clerical mistake or in the alternative, for reconsideration, filed by USA. Service: 7/1/2008.Response due by 7/18/2008.(vro)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 330 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 326 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2010 to File Response as to 321 MOTION for Award of a Tax Gross-Up, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Tantum, Amanda) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 297 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008
                                                                                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $382,430,910.91. (lld)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 9/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Tantum, Amanda) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                      UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER directing the Clerk to enter judgment pursuant to the Court's March 14, 2008 Opinion. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lld)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 328 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE to 326 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2010 to File Response as to 321 MOTION for Award of a Tax Gross-Up, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 8/2/2010. (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 298 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/16/2008 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION to correct clerical mistake, filed by USA. Service: 6/23/2008.Response due by 7/10/2008.(vro)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 327 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 320 MOTION to Amend/Correct Award of Mitigation Damages, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 295 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/18/2008 at 2:30 PM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 326 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2010 to File Response as to 321 MOTION for Award of a Tax Gross-Up, filed by USA.Response due by 8/2/2010.(Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
                                                                                                  Minute Entry--A recorded, telephonic status conference was conducted on 6/18/08, by Judge Lawrence J. Block, in Washington, DC. (smm)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Response
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 320 Motion to Amend/Correct Damages Award, filed by USA. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 294 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                                                                                                      JOINT REPORT, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB, USA. Service: 6/16/2008.(vro)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 324 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-13) held on June 8, 2010 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. For copy, contact Heritage Court Reporting, (202) 628-4888. Forms to Request Transcripts. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2010. (dw1) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 293 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [292] Motion for Extension of Time Accordingly, the parties shall file by Friday June 13, 2008 the gross-up award calculation Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (vro)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on June 8, 2010 in Washington, DC. (dw1) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008, Terminated: 6/5/2008 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/9/2008 to presenting the Court with calculation of Anchor's revised tax gross-up award, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB, USA. Service: 6/2/2008.Response due by 6/19/2008.(vro)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 316 MOTION to Strike Bill of Costs, filed by USA. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 291 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John Jacob Todor for USA Service: 5/30/2008.(vro)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Award of a Tax Gross-Up, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Response due by 6/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of James T. Weyant))(Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 290 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [289] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (vro)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Award of Mitigation Damages, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Response due by 6/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 289 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008, Terminated: 5/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time of thirty-days of the May 1, 2008 deadline for presenting the Court with a calcuation of Anchor's revised tax gross-up award., filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB, USA. Service: 4/30/2008.Response due by 5/19/2008.(vro)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 316 MOTION to Strike Bill of Costs, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 6/21/2010. (Fountain, Edwin) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 288 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER finding that plaintiff is entitled to recover $382,430,910.91 before the addition of the gross-up figure, and directing the parties to meet to determine the appropriate final calculation of the gross-up amount and report back to the court by May 1, 2008, so that a final determination of the gross-up can be determined and added to plaintiff's recovery. (vro) Modified on 3/18/2008 to correct docket text. (Samler, Debbie).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER MEMORALIZING STATUS CONFERENCE--Filed this date. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 287 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [285] Motion for Leave to NOTIFY THE COURT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (vro)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                    Statement of Issues for the June 8, 2010 Status Conference, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB [by leave of the judge]. Service: 6/2/10.(dls) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 286 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [285] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 10/26/2007. Service: 10/12/2007.(vro)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Bill of Costs, filed by USA.Response due by 6/24/2010.(Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 285 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007, Terminated: 10/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to notify Court of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA. Service: 9/28/2007.Response due by 10/18/2007.(vro)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Order Setting Status Conference, filed by USA. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 284 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [281] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by USA. Service: 6/23/2006.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 283 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [281] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Order Designating ECF CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 282 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [281] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority , filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Reply due by 6/26/2006. Service: 6/14/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                        BILL OF COSTS, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 6/30/2010. Service: 6/2/10 by hand.(dls) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 281 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006, Terminated: 6/22/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority , filed by USA. Service: 5/30/2006.Response due by 6/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On May 3, 2010, the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit issued a mandate in Anchor Savings Bank, FSB, Remanding to the lower court to determine whether an error had been made in mitigation cost by Anchors offsetting NAMCO's retained earnings through 1997(rather than through 1995) and, if so how to correct that error, In concideration of the above, it is Ordered that a Status Conference by telephone Shall be conducted on Tuesday, june 8, 2010, at 1:30 p.m. by the undersigned, to discuss a procedural course for addressing said remand Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (vro) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 280 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [274] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Alden Schunk for USA Service: 5/20/2010.(vro) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 279 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [274] MOTION to Strike [270] Post Trial Brief , filed by USA. Service: 11/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 309 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 CAFC Mandate Affirming in Part/Reversing in Part
                                                                                                                                                                    MANDATE of CAFC affirming in part and remanding in part to the U.S. Court of Federal Claims to allow the court to determine whether an error was made in offsetting Anchor's mitigation cost by NAMCO's retained earnings through 1997 (rather than through 1995) and, if so, how to correct that error. (hw1, ) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 278 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                      POST TRIAL BRIEF and Post Trial Response Brief (on CD-ROM), filed by USA. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Decision of CAFC
                                                                                                                                                                        Decision of the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Mandate should issue in due course (in approx. 52 days) by 5/4/2010. (hw1, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 277 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [275] Motion for Leave to File Post-Trial Brief and Post-Trial Reply Brief on CD-ROM. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008 CAFC Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 276 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [274] MOTION to Strike [270] Post Trial Brief , filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Reply due by 12/1/2005. Service: 11/18/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 275 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005, Terminated: 11/21/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Post-Trial Brief and Post-Trial Reply Brief on CD-ROM , filed by USA. Service: 11/17/2005 by hand. Response due by 12/1/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008 CAFC Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 274 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 12/6/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike New Damages Theories in [270] Post Trial Brief , filed by USA. Service: 11/4/2005. Response due by 11/21/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 273 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [272] Post Trial Brief , filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 10/31/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 272 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                          POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. Service: 10/31/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 271 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                            POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. Service: 10/17/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 270 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Post-Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                              POST TRIAL BRIEF by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 10/17/05.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 269 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Cumulative Index [FILED UNDER SEAL] for the trial held on June 13, 2005 through July 20, 2005 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Plaintiff Exhibits: 1-7, 16-27, 34-37, 40, 48, 50, 51, 55, 57, 74, 77, 160, 174, 181, 193, 195, 197, 204, 213, 228, 230, 236, 238, 240-242, 244-247, 258-265, 267, 282, 286, 313, 321, 323, 325, 330, 375, 376, 397, 399-401, 408, 410, 412, 416, 422, 430, 441, 445, 448, 449, 458, 473, 482, 488, 489, 494, 500, 502, 509, 511, 514-517, 530-532, 534-539, 542-545, 547, 549, 550, 553, 556, 558, 561, 564, 565A, 566, 569-572, 575, 576, 581, 583, 583B,C,D, 587, 588, 591, 592, 595, 597, 598, 604-609, 611, 614, 617, 618, 620, 621, 623, 628A, 631,637,638,641,642,646,654,656-659,662,664,665,672, 672A, 675, 676, 678, 679, 681, 688, 691, 694-696, 699, 700, 713, 714, 718, 734, 739, 741, 743, 744, 746, 747, 749, 752, 756, 759-762, 764, 771, 773, 774, 784, 785, 791, 800, 803, 810, 813, 815-818, 820, 824-826, 842, 847, 850, 851, 860, 876A, 876B, 878-889, 900, 903, 904, 907, 909, 911-915, 922, 924, 930, 932, 935, 937, 942, 946, 947, 949, 961, 968-971, 979B, 980, 981, 982B, 983, 989, 990, 1000-1002, 1010, 1012, 1013, 1015-1020, 1022-1028, 1110. Defendant Exhibits: 16, 32, 34, 50, 86, 95, 102, 103, 105, 109, 115, 131, 140, 146, 151, 153, 177, 184-186, 188, 195-197, 199, 206, 213, 246, 250, 252, 264, 272, 284, 290, 303, 308, 318, 324, 343, 353, 358, 359, 394, 395, 400, 403, 405, 407, 410, 418, 426, 435, 473, 494, 533, 534, 541, 577, 620, 656, 659, 747, 837, 846, 851, 863, 870, 926, 937, 938, 1071, 1124, 1133, 1160, 1174, 1174A, 1175, 1175B, 1176, 1176B, 1180, 1187, 1188, 1194, 1206, 1239, 1251, 1254, 1261, 1264, 2000, 2010, 2025-2027. Plaintiff Exhibits: 258-265, 542, 842, 1010-1028 [FILED UNDER SEAL] (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 268 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Joint Submission of Exhibits Entered Into Evidence at Trial (with CD-ROM), filed by USA. Service: 9/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 267 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Post Trial Brief not to exceed seventy-five (75) pages due 10/17/2005. Post Trial Response Brief not to exceed thirty-five (35) pages due 10/31/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/18 (Pg 4111-4327), 7/19 (Pg 4328-4530), and 7/20 (Pg 4541-4785), 2005 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/22/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/11 (Pg 3055-3588), 7/12 (Pg 3589-3820), 7/13 (Pg 3821-4030), (Pg 4031-4110) 2005 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 266 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [265] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Reply due by 7/20/2005. Service: 7/11/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/6/2005 (Pg 2823-3032), 7/7/2005(Pg 3033-3243), 7/8/2005 (Pg 3244-3354) before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 265 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment Based upon Partial Findings, filed by USA.Service: 7/8/2005 by hand. Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 264 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief Concerning the Legal Standards Governing the Admissibility of Expert Testimony on Legal Issues, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE NUNC PRO TUNC JUNE, 30 2005] Service: 7/1/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 7/11/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Objection to the Expert Testimony of Eugene Katz, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE NUNC PRO TUNC JUNE, 30 2005] Service: 7/1/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/27/05(pg 1822- 2065),6/28/05 (pg 2066- 2279),6/29/05 (pg 2280-2590),6/30/05 (pg 2591-2822), before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, ) Modified on 7/11/2005 (eph, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/20 (Pg 912-1137),6/21 (Pg 1138-1389),6/22 (Pg 1390-1618),6/23 (Pg 1619-1821)2005 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT (4 volumes) of Proceedings held on 6/13/2005 (PG 1-201), 6/14/2005(PG 202-431), 6/16/2005 (Pg 432-672), 6/17/2005 (Pg 473-911) before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 261 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Report on Designations and Objections to the Deposition Testimony of Walter Amend, Martin Lavelle, James Meyer, Edward O'Connell, and Michael Simone, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/27/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 260 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 6/6/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 259 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Exhibit List by all parties. Service by hand: 6/1/05.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 258 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Trial Witness List by all parties. Service: 6/1/05.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-15) of Proceedings held on 5/26/05 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-15) of Proceedings held on 6/1/05 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 257 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 6/13/2005 10:30 AM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 256 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT'S CROSS-DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS TO THE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WALTER AMEND, MARTIN LAVELLE, JAMES MEYER, EDWARD O'CONNELL, AND MICHAEL SIMONE, filed by USA. Service: 5/25/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 255 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting-in-part [242] Motion for Leave to Present Substantive Evidence by way of Deposition Testimony. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 254 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER: Exhibit List due by 6/1/2005. Witness List due by 6/1/2005. Consolidated Statement of Proposed Findings of Fact due by 6/1/2005. Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Trial set for 6/13/2005 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 253 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [242] MOTION for Leave to Present Substantive Evidence by way of Deposition Testimony, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 5/5/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 252 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference re-set for 5/26/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 251 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Pre-Trial SCHEDULING ORDER: Exhibit Lists due by 5/25/2005. Joint Witness List due by 5/25/2005. Consolidated Statement of Proposed Findings of Fact due by 5/25/2005. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, ) Modified on 4/29/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 250 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [242] MOTION for Leave to Present Substantive Evidence by way of Deposition Testimony, filed by USA. Reply due by 5/9/2005. Service: 4/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 249 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [240] Motion for Extension of Time to amend the court's January 14, 2005 pre-trial order. Joint Procedural Stipulastion and Joint Trial Witness List due by 5/5/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 248 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [234] Motion for Leave to File the deposition testimony of Donald L. Thomas as evidence. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 247 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [243] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles from the place of trial. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 246 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [241] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles from the place of trial. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 245 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [240] MOTION to Amend [221] Scheduling Order, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Reply due by 5/2/2005. Service: 4/21/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 244 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [234] MOTION for Leave to File filed by USA. Service: 4/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 243 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005, Terminated: 4/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 4/14/2005 by hand. Response due by 4/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 242 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005, Terminated: 5/17/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Present Substantive Evidence by way of Deposition Testimony, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service: 4/14/2005 by hand. Response due by 4/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 241 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005, Terminated: 4/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles, filed by USA. Service: 4/14/2005 by hand. Response due by 4/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 240 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005, Terminated: 4/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend [221] Scheduling Order filed by USA.Service: 4/14/05. Response due by 5/2/2005. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 239 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Objection to Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Exhibit List by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Related document: [230] Exhibit List filed by USA. Service: 4/12/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 238 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [232] Proposed Findings of Fact, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 4/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 237 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Objection to Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Witness List by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Related document: [228] Witness List filed by USA,. Service: 4/12/2005 by hand.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/14/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 236 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [222] MOTION for Leave to File Admit the Deposition Testimony of DOnald L. Thomas as Evidence, [234] MOTION for Leave to File, RESPONSE to [234] MOTION for Leave to File, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Reply due by 5/5/2005. Service: 4/12/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 235 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Pre-Trial and Trial Procedures, filed by all parties. Service: 4/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 234 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005, Terminated: 4/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Admit the Deposition Testimony of Donald L. Thomas as Evidence if Plaintiff's Prior Request is Granted, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service: 3/29/2005. Response due by 4/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 233 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [224] Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by USA. Service: 3/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 232 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact by USA. Service: 3/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 231 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Conclusions of Law by USA. Service: 3/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 230 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List by USA. Service: 3/29/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 229 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [223] Witness List filed by USA. Service: 3/29/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 228 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List by USA. Service: 3/29/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 227 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [225] Exhibit List filed by USA. Service: 3/29/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 226 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [222] MOTION for Leave to File Admit the Deposition Testimony of DOnald L. Thomas as Evidence. filed by USA. Reply due by 4/19/2005. Service: 3/8/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 3/31/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 225 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 3/1/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 224 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 3/1/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 223 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 3/1/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 222 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Admit the Deposition Testimony of Donald L. Thomas as Evidence filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service: 3/1/2005 by hand. Response due by 3/29/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 3/3/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 221 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pre-Trial Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Plaintiff's Appendix A filings due by 3/1/05; Defendant's Appendix A filings (and responses to plaintiff's filings)due by 3/29/05; plaintiff's responses to defendant's filings due by 4/12/05; defendant's replies due by 4/19/05; plaintiff to serve a copy of all exhibits upon defendant by 3/1/05; defendant to serve exhibits on plaintiff by 3/29/05; parties to file any motions in limine (or other pre-trial motions) by 4/14/05, with responses to motions due by 4/28/05, and replies due 5/5/05; parties to file joint stipulations, exhibit and witness lists by 5/5/05; pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2005 at 10:00 AM in The National Courts Building; and trial scheduled to commence on 6/7/2005 in The National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls, ) Note: Proposed conclusions of law are limited to 50 pages.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT and Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule by all parties. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/18/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/15/2004 11:00 AM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski for Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 217 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED OPINION: Order of 11/10/2004 is reissued on 11/18/2004 for publication. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED OPINION: Order of 11/10/2004 is reissued on 11/18/2004 for publication. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 215 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: [180] Pltf's Motion for Reconsideration is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 214 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: [182] Dft's Motion for Reconsideration is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 213 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Order on Motion for Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [211] Motion for Status Conference.Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/14/2004 11:00 AM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 212 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [211] MOTION for Status Conference filed by USA. Reply due by 10/29/2004. Service: 10/20/04.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004, Terminated: 10/25/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Status Conference by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service: 10/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 11/2/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 210 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [208] Dft's Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/30/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 209 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [208] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority. The notice which dft seeks to file--and which was incorporated within the motion for leave to file--is DEEMED to have been filed along with the motion. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004, Terminated: 8/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 8/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 9/2/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 28, 2004 (1 volume) before Judge Block. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/28/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry--A recorded teleconference was conducted on 6/28/04 in chambers by Judge Lawrence J. Block to discuss plaintiff's [193] motion.(smm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [193] Motion authorizing plaintiff to interview former Thrift Agency Employees. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/20/2004 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [201] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority. The notice which dft seeks to file--and which was incorporated within the motion for leave to file--is DEEMED to have been filed along with the motion. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [201] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Reply due by 6/7/2004. Service: 5/26/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The court requested that the parties confer and inform the court within a week regarding the status of potential interviewees. Upon receipt of the requested info, the court anticipates scheduling a follow-up teleconference. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004, Terminated: 5/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by USA.Service: 5/21/2004 by hand. Response due by 6/4/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry--A recorded teleconference was conducted this date in chambers by Judge Lawrence J. Block to discuss plaintiff's [193] motion.(smm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/21/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 200 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [199] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority. The notice which pltf seeks to file--and which was incorporated within the motion for leave to file--is DEEMED to have been filed along with the motion. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 199 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004, Terminated: 5/18/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service by hand: 5/10/04. Response due by 5/24/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 198 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to [196] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply to Pltf's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Contact Former Thrift Agency Employees filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 3/12/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 197 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [196] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to Pltf's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Contact Former Thrift Agency Employees. The sur-reply that dft seeks to file--which was incorporated within the motion for leave to file--is DEEMED to have been filed along with the motion. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 196 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004, Terminated: 3/12/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply to Pltf's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Contact Former Thrift Agency Employees by USA.Service: 3/10/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/24/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 195 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of [193] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Contact Former Thrift Agency Employees for Purpose of Trial Preparation filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 3/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 194 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [193] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to Contact Former Thrift Agency Employees for Purpose of Trial Preparation filed by USA. Reply due by 3/5/2004. Service: 2/25/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 193 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Contact Former Thrift Agency Employees for Purpose of Trial Preparation by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service: 2/11/2004 by hand. Response due by 2/25/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 192 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of [190] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Concerning Liability With Respect to the Peachtree/Crisp and Sun Transactions filed by USA. Service: 1/5/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 191 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [190] Dft's MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Concerning Liability With Respect to the Peachtree/Crisp and Sun Transactions filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Reply due by 1/12/2004. Service: 12/23/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 190 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Concerning Liability With Respect to the Peachtree/Crisp and Sun Transactions by USA.Service: 12/22/03 by hand. Response due by 1/5/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 189 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Support of [182] Dft's MOTION for Reconsideration of the [140] Order, and [129] Published Decision Concerning Liability With Respect to the Peachtree/Crisp and Sun Transactions, filed by USA. Service: 12/17/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 188 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 12/12/2003 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 187 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of [180] Pltf's MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re: [176] Published Opinion, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 12/12/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 186 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [182] Dft's MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's [140] Order, [129] Published Decision Concerning Liability With Respect to the Peachtree/Crisp and Sun Transactions, filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Reply due by 12/17/2003. Service: 12/3/03 by hand.(jcp, ) Modified on 12/17/2003 to correct reply due date (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 185 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [180] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [176] Published Opinion, filed by USA. Reply due by 12/12/2003. Service: 11/26/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 184 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The court requests pltf to respond to the motion for reconsideration by Wednesday, 12/3/2003, and dft to file a Reply thereto by Wednesday, 12/17/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/12/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 183 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The court requests dft to file by Wednesday, 11/26/2003 a response to pltf's motion for reconsideration pursuant to Rule 59(a) of portions of the 9/29/2003 decision, and pltf to Reply thereto by Friday, 12/12/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry--A recorded status teleconference was conducted this date beforeJudge Lawrence J. Block.(smm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 182 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's [140] Order of August 2, 2002, and [129] Published Decision of April 30, 2002 Concerning Liability With Respect to the Peachtree/Crisp ans Sun Transactions, by USA.Service: 11/7/03 by hand. Response due by 11/21/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 181 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Order on Motion for Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: For reasons stated herein, [179] Dft's Motion for Status Conference is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the November 12, 2003 teleconference shall be held on the record. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 180 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re: [176] the Court's Published Opinion of September 29, 2003, by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service: 10/14/03 by hand. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 179 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003, Terminated: 10/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Telephone Conference on the Record by USA.Service: 10/09/03 by hand. Response due by 10/23/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 178 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Tele-Conference set for 11/12/2003 10:30 AM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA correcting [176] Published Opinion (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on plaintiff's lost profits claim is DENIED, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's "gross-up" claim is DENIED, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's alternative claim is GRANTED, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on plaintiff's alternative claim for reliance damages is GRANTED and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's "wounded bank" damages is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [174] Motion for Leave to File subsequent authority Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003, Terminated: 9/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Submit Subsequent Authority by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. [SUBSEQUENT AUTHORITY ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 1 TO THE MOTION]Service: 9/22/03. Response due by 10/9/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 173 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek Sawi for USA. Service: 9/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 172 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Respond to New Documents Introduced at the August 20, 2003 Summary Judgment Hearing by USA.Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 20, 2003 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/22/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Oral argument regarding [164]/[168]/[169] motion for summary judgment was held on 8/20/03 before Judge Lawrence J. Block.(smm1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion Pertaining to [164] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 8/20/2003 10:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Counsel are requested to appear in person. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY IN SUPPORT re: [164] Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages With Appendix filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 6/27/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [164] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. (2 Separate Volumes of Appendix) Reply due by 6/16/2003. Service: 6/2/03 (by hand).(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Service: 6/2/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [165] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003, Terminated: 5/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of response to motion for summary judgment by 57 pages by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB.Service: 5/2/03. Response due by 5/19/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages with Appendix. by The United States.Service: 4/11/03. Response due by 6/2/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [161] Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page limitation, re: motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of motion for summary judgment upon Plaintiff's damage claims by ? pages, by The United States. Service: 3/31/03.Response due 4/17/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due 4/11/2003. Plaintiff's Response due 6/2/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, FSB and The United States. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service : 12/16/02 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Peter F. Garvin for ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK Added Edwin Louis Fountain . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness list by USA. Service by hand: 11/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of September 10, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing plaintiff to file its supplemental expert reports by 10/10/02; defendant to file its supplemental expert reports by 1/23/03 ; defendant to identify new experts by 11/12/02 ; defendant to complete depositions by 12/9/02; plaintiff to complete depositions by 3/10/03; and parties to file a joint status report within 14 days after completion of all discovery ; and granting plaintiff 50 days to respond to any dispositive motion eventually filed, with defendant granted 25 days to reply. (signed by Judge James T. Turner) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT and PROPOSED SCHEDULE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK and USA. Service: 9/23/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER mooting [104-1] motion to dismiss the remaining allegations of Anchor's complaint Joint Status Report due 9/23/02 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 9/10/02 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service: 9/4/02 (motion for clarification included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service : 9/4/02 ) for Clarification of the Court's August 26, 2002 Order. Response due: 9/23/02 (status report included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [145-1] motion for Leave to respond to Anchor's 8/13/02 response to the Court's 8/5/02 inquiry (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [59-1] cross motion, denying [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Status Report due 9/4/02 (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [145-1] motion for Leave to respond to Anchor's 8/13/02 response to the Court's 8/5/02 inquiry. Service: 8/26/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service by hand: 8/21/02) to [145-1] motion for Leave to respond to Anchor's 8/13/02 response to the Court's 8/5/02 inquiry. Reply due: 8/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002, Terminated: 8/28/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/20/02) for Leave to respond to Anchor's 8/13/02 response to the Court's 8/5/02 inquiry . Response due: 9/6/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [56-1] cross motion and granting [48-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [139-1] motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response to New Documents Introduced at the 7/25/02 Hearing (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service by hand: 8/5/02) to [139-1] motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response to New Introduced at the 7/25/02 Hearing. Reply due: 8/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to new documents introduced at the 7/25/02 hearing. Service: 7/30/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [57-1] cross motion, granting [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002, Terminated: 8/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service : 8/1/02 (by hand)) for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response to New Documents Introduced at the 7/25/02 Hearing. Response due: 8/15/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 25, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [57-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 8/26/02 ), [59-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 8/26/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 10, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER memoralizing status conference and dismissing contract claims regarding unassisted mergers (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. on 7/25/02 for [59-1] cross motion and for [57-1] cross motion (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [132-1] motion for Leave to file pre-status conference filing (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            "STATEMENT OF REMAINING LIABILITY ISSUES" by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service: 6/3/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002, Terminated: 6/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 6/3/02) for Leave to file pre-status conference filing . Response due: 6/17/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [126-1] motion for Leave to exclude the "supplement to expert report of Nevins D. Baxter" (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [48-1] motion(s) for Summary Judgment as it relates to Peachtree/Crisp acquisition, and denying the motion as it relates to the Standard Acquisition; denying [58-1] cross motion with respect to the Peachtree/Crisp transaction; granting [56-1] cross motion with respect to the Standard acquisition; and directing parties to file a joint Status Report by 5/24/02 . ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [126-1] motion for Leave to exclude the "supplement to expert report of Nevins D. Baxter". Service: 4/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 3/25/02) to [126-1] motion for Leave to exclude the "supplement to expert report of Nevins D. Baxter". Reply due: 4/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002, Terminated: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/6/02) for Leave to exclude the "supplement to expert report of Nevins D. Baxter" . Response due: 3/25/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 13, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK ( Transcript due 4/12/01 ), [58-1] cross motion by USA ( Transcript due 4/12/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 124 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 23, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER mooting [112-1] motion to Strike [110-1] notice by USA and mooting [87-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority with the Court oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. 3/13/01 for [58-1] cross motion and [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge James T. Turner). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 2/22/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER scheduling a Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 1/23/01 ; and mooting [121-1] motion for status conference, [121-2] motion for Leave to File status reports. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, USA for status conference and for Leave to File status reports. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Judge James T. Turner . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: assignment. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [105-1] motion to strike affidavits and portions of papers citing to or relying upon those affidavits. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/9/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 11/4/99 ) to [104-1] motion to dismiss and for partial summary judgment and reply to supplemental memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, together with three volumes of exhibits, filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/9/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental brief in support of motion for partial summary judgment, in opposition to defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to motion to dismiss, together with two volumes of exhibits (titled Volumes IX and X) filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK [by leave of the judge]. Service by hand: 11/3/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/6/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/2/99 (by hand)) to [112-1] motion to Strike [110-1] notice by USA. Reply due: 12/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA re: supplemental brief on cross-motions for summary judgment and motion to dismiss, and response to Plaintiff's supplemental brief in support of motions for partial summary judgment. Service: 11/29/99 (JT) Modified on 12/02/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 12/1/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [105-1] motion to strike affidavits and portions of papers citing to or relying upon those affidavits. Service: 11/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service : 11/22/99 (by hand) ) to Strike [110-1] notice by USA. Response due: 12/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [112-1] motion to Strike [110-1] notice by USA reset to 12/6/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/19/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Initial List of Potential Liability Issues Remaining to be Decided by USA. Service: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/7/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 11/3/99 (by hand) ) to [105-1] motion to strike affidavits and portions of papers citing to or relying upon those affidavits. Reply due: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated Agreement and Order re: documentary evidence by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK, USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 9/30/99) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 10/18/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [103-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999, Terminated: 12/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/99 ) to strike affidavits and portions of papers citing to or relying upon those affidavits. Response due: 10/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/14/99 ) to dismiss the remaining allegations of Anchor's complaint. Response due: 10/15/99 (supplemental memorandum included) (JT) Modified on 09/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by USA in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment as to liability and in support of Defendant's cross-motion. Service: 9/14/99 (motion for dismissal included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/3/99 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness list by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [100-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Second Phase II Case-Specific Interrogatories Interrogatories deadline to 8/13/99 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999, Terminated: 8/9/1999 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 8/2/99) to Extend Time to file response to Second Phase II Case-Specific Interrogatories , (until August 13, 1999) by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of change of address by Peter F. Garvin III. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          See Order of 4/6/99 in 90-8 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [96-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories. (nunc pro tunc) Interrogatories deadline to 11/30/98 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998, Terminated: 11/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 11/6/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories. Response due: 11/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [94-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for admissions. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for admissions deadline to 11/6/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998, Terminated: 11/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/30/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for admissions , (until November 6, 1998). Response due: 11/16/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [90-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for admissions. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for admissions deadline to 10/30/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [90-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for admissions. Service: 10/6/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service by hand: 9/25/98 ) to [90-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for admissions. Reply due: 10/6/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998, Terminated: 10/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/21/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and requests for admissions , (until ?). Response due: 10/8/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [87-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority with the Court. Service: 9/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service by hand: 8/27/98 ) to [87-1] motion for Leave to file supplemental authority with the Court. Reply due: 9/8/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/12/98) for Leave to file supplemental authority with the Court . Response due: 8/31/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SURREPLY by USA re: [84-1] memorandum by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/22/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of entry of Order of partial summary judgment as to liability by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/15/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [Corrected] RESPONSE by USA to [81-1] memorandum by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service: 5/1/98 Filed by leave of the Judge. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to [81-1] memorandum [proposed order] by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK Service: 4/30/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed order and brief in support thereof filed by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK [by leave of the judge]. Service: 3/31/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/1/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patrick Terrence Murphy. Service : 3/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to Order of December 22, 1997. Service: 2/20/98 (See Order of December 22, 1998, entered in No. 92-138.) (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing notice of appearance of David M. Cohen with respect to the pending cross-motions for partial summary judgment and the Order of December 22, 1997, by USA Service: 2/20/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 12/5/1997, Entered: 12/23/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Melida Narcisa Hodgson. Service : 12/5/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [59-1] cross motion . Service: 7/31/97 FILED UNDER SEAL. (CDC) Modified on 08/08/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [56-1] cross motion . Service: 7/31/97 FILED UNDER SEAL. (CDC) Modified on 08/08/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [57-1] cross motion . Service: 7/31/97 FILED UNDER SEAL. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [58-1] cross motion . Service: 7/31/97 FILED UNDER SEAL. (CDC) Modified on 08/08/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [71-1] motion for Leave to File addendum to exhibits to reply memorandum in support of motions for partial summary judgment and in opposition to defendant's cross-motions ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997, Terminated: 6/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service BY HAND: 6/25/97 ) for Leave to File addendum to exhibits to reply memorandum in support of motions for partial summary judgment and in opposition to defendant's cross-motions . Response due: 7/8/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 6/20/97 ) to [58-1] cross motion [acquistions of Peachtree and Crisp], by leave of the Judge], by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/7/97. IN CAMERA. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 6/20/97 ) to [56-1] cross motion [re: acquistions of Standard, Heritage, Tri-City and United], together with separate one volume of exhibits (volume VII), by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/7/97. IN CAMERA. (HW) Modified on 07/08/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 6/17/97 ) to [57-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. IN CAMERA. Reply due: 7/7/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 6/20/97 ) to [56-1] cross motion, by leave of the Judge. IN CAMERA. Reply due: 7/7/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 6/20/97 ) to [59-1] cross motion [re: acquistion of Sun], by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 7/7/97. IN CAMERA. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 6/19/97) for Leave to File addendum to exhibits to reply memoranda in support of motions for partial summary judgment and in opposition to Defendant's cross-motions Response due: 7/3/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's 120-day response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment with respect to plaintiff's acquisitions of Peachtree and Crisp filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 6/9/97 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge), by USA (Service: 6/9/97) to [48-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to plaintiff's acquisition of Sun. Reply due: 6/26/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 6/9/97 ) to [48-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to plaintiff's acquisitions of Standard, Heritage, Tri-City and United. Reply due: 6/26/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/25/1997 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 6/9/97) to [48-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to plaintiff's acquisition of Suburban. Reply due: 6/26/97. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service : 3/12/97 ) for Leave to File motion for modification of proposed stipulation and order concerning implementation of the omnibus case management order . Response due: 3/31/97. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997, Terminated: 8/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/97) and RESPONSE to [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK [acquisition of Sun] AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Response due: 4/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/97) and RESPONSE to [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK [acquisition of Peachtree and Crisp] AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Response due: 3/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997, Terminated: 8/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/97) and RESPONSE to [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK [acquisition of Suburban] AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Response due: 4/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/97) and RESPONSE to [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK [acquisitions of Standard, Heritage, Tri-City and United] AND PLACED IN CAMERA. Response due: 4/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Response to [59-1] cross motion reset to 4/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [57-1] cross motion reset to 4/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/14/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; Response to [56-1] cross motion reset to 4/7/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 2/12/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Answer due 2/25/97) amending [20-1] amended complaint by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK with two volumes of Appendices. Service: 1/3/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 2/12/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [50-1] motion for Leave to File second amended complaint (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Anne Marie Richard Service: 2/4/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [51-1] motion to place under seal its motions for partial summary judgment with support memorandum and exhibits (signed by Acting Chief Judge James F. Merow for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997, Terminated: 1/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service BY HAND: 1/7/97) to place under seal its motions for partial summary judgment with support memorandum and exhibits . Response due: 1/21/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997, Terminated: 2/12/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service BY HAND: 1/7/97) for Leave to File second amended complaint . Response due: 1/21/97 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/6/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVITS (of Donald L. Thomas; David Fry; D. James Croft; and Thurman C. Connell) by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK Re: [48-1] motion for Summary Judgment by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service 1/6/97. FILED UNDER SEAL (HW) Modified on 05/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/6/1997, Terminated: 4/30/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  "Short Form" MOTIONS by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service by hand: 1/6/97) for Summary Judgment , together with six separate volumes of exhibits (1 through 138, inclusive). Response due: 3/7/97. FILED UNDER SEAL. (Note: There are seven individually captioned short form motions for summary judgment bound in the back of plaintiff's memorandum in support of said motions.) (HW) Modified on 05/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 11/18/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION (Filed by leave of the Judge) by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 11/4/96) for Leave to AMICUS BRIEF Response due: 11/21/96. (FE) Modified on 11/18/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Bruce Taylor. Service : 10/28/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: 9/13/1996 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE ORDER IN 90-8C for Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/16/96 ) for Leave to File attached proposed pretrial order. Response due: 9/3/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/25/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/96) for Leave to File copy of motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 8/9/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 6/20/1996, Entered: 6/24/1996 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Deborah Ann Bynum (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 5/23/96 ) to [38-1] motion for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures. Reply due: 6/10/96 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service : 5/8/96 ) for Leave to File response to defendant's motion to adopt special case management procedures. Response due: 5/28/96. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK to response to [36-1] motion for Leave to File motion for a permanent injunction, a revocation of the stay of discovery and request for a hearing. Service by hand: 4/29/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/26/96 ) for Leave to File a copy of the motion to adopt special case management procedures . Response due: 5/13/96 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/15/96) to [36-1] motion for Leave to File motion for a permanent injunction, a revocation of the stay of discovery and request for a hearing. Reply due: 4/29/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service BY HAND: 4/1/96) for Leave to File motion for a permanent injunction, a revocation of the stay of discovery and request for a hearing . Response due: 4/15/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34-1] motion for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996, Terminated: 3/26/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/19/96) for Leave to File a notice with an attached declaration Response due: 4/5/96 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 12/4/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK to response to [21-1] motion to lift stay. Service by hand: 12/4/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER entered that stay proceedings shall continue pending petition for certiorari ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file reply brief re: motion for a continued stay of proceedings (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [24-1] motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. Service: 11/27/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 11/27/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/27/95 ) to [21-1] motion to lift stay, [21-2] motion for Hearing, [24-1] motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. Reply due: 12/11/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995, Terminated: 11/27/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/22/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file reply brief re: motion for a continued stay of proceedings , (until November 27, 1995). Response due: 12/6/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 11/15/95 By hand) to [25-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to lift stay of proceedings, status report and request for hearing. Reply due: 11/27/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 11/13/95 By hand) to [24-1] motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. Reply due: 11/22/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/13/95) to Extend Time to respond to motion to lift stay of proceedings, status report and request for hearing until 11/28/95. Response due: 11/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Deborah Ann Bynum Service: 10/31/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/30/95) to Continue Stay of Proceedings . Response due: 11/16/95 (FE) Modified on 11/16/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK. Service BY HAND: 10/30/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/3/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service BY HAND: 10/30/95) to lift stay and for Hearing . Response due: 11/13/95 (FE) Modified on 11/16/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT together with exhibits (2 Volumes) by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Answer due 9/13/95) amending [1-1] complaint. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [16-1] motion to lift stay to file first amended complaint. The Clerk's Office shall file amended complaint as of the date of this order; paragraphs 1 and 2 of 6/23/95 order remain in effect ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/25/95) to [16-1] motion to lift stay to file first amended complaint. Reply due: 9/11/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Dorann Elise Banks Service : 8/11/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995, Terminated: 8/29/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 8/8/95) to lift stay to file first amended complaint . Response due: 8/25/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/23/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER entered denying [13-1] motion to Transfer Case to Chief Judge Smith; Suspending proceedings pending further order of the court, to await a decision in the CAFC in Winstar matter ; within 60 days following the en banc decision of the CAFC in Winstar, a status report(s) shall be filed in this matter (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/20/95 ) to [13-1] motion to Transfer Case to Chief Judge Smith Reply due: 7/3/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to Stay proceedings, [12-2] motion to Extend Time of its response to the complaint . Service: 6/20/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995, Terminated: 6/23/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service: 6/9/95 ) to [12-1] motion to Stay proceedings, [12-2] motion to Extend Time of its response to the complaint. Reply due: 6/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995, Terminated: 6/23/1995 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by ANCHOR SAVINGS BANK (Service : 6/9/95 ) to Transfer Case to Chief Judge Smith Response due: 6/23/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/23/95) to Stay proceedings [to 60 days], or, in the alternative to Extend Time of its response to the complaint [3 weeks from date upon which court issues its ruling upon defendant's motion for a stay] Response due: 6/9/95 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint set Answer deadline to 5/25/95 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995, Terminated: 5/4/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/3/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until May 25, 1995). (HW) Modified on 05/08/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 5/4/95 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995, Terminated: 4/28/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/27/95 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until May 4, 1995). Response due: 5/15/95 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to file its response to the complaint reset Answer deadline to 4/27/95 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/18/1995, Terminated: 4/14/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/13/95 ) to Extend Time to file its response to the complaint until 4/27/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file its response to the complaint and reset Answer deadline to 4/13/95 (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 04/17/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995, Terminated: 3/13/1995 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file its response to the complaint (to April 13, 1995). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael Scott Kane. Service: 1/30/95. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through S), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #38394. Answer due on 3/14/95. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?