AILEO v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00087-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRENNA B. AILEO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Anthony Aileo +1 717 278 9703
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Michael Kinsella +1 202 307 1011
Office COFC
Filed 2/6/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/30/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/16/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER entered granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response to the complaint Answer deadline to 6/7/95 . If settlement is not resolved by 6/8/95, then a status report should be filed (signed by Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995, Terminated: 5/15/1995 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/11/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file response to the complaint (to June 7, 1995). (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint set Answer deadline to 5/8/95 ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995, Terminated: 3/24/1995 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/23/95) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to May 8, 1995]. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by James Michael Kinsella. Service : 2/14/95 (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #38546. Answer due on 4/7/95. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 214 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?