WARREN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:95-cv-00102-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MOLLIE WARREN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles P. Buchanio +1 717 274 2517
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luis Manuel Pereira Matos +1 202 514 4325
Office COFC
Filed 2/8/1995
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/11/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/12/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 68 awarding plaintiff the sum of $51,423.00, as set forth in the 7/5/95 stipulation for entry of judgment (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Stipulation
        Stipulation of judgment's entry. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 6/20/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER set Status Report deadline to 7/19/95 ( signed by Judge Christine O. Miller ). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/21/1995 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/95 (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER entered granting [8-1] motion to Stay ; directing defendant to file a Status Report, on behalf of both parties, by 6/19/95 (signed by Chief Judge Smith for Judge Christine O. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/5/1995, Terminated: 6/5/1995 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service: 6/1/95) to Stay [to June 15, 1995]. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/25/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file response to plaintiff's complaint and reset Answer deadline to 6/1/95 (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995, Terminated: 5/25/1995 Terminated:
                    UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA (Service : 5/23/95 ) to Extend Time within which to file response to plaintiff's complaint (to June 1, 1995). (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER entered granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to plaintiff's complaint Answer deadline to 5/25/95 (signed by Judge Christine O. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995, Terminated: 4/10/1995 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/7/95 ) to Extend Time to file response to plaintiff's complaint until 5/25/95 Response due: 4/24/95 (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luis Manuel Pereira Matos. Service: 2/21/95. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/10/1995 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/10/1995 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #38554. Answer due on 4/10/95. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?